September 24, 2014 |
Filing
427
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 426 Regarding Dismissal filed by Lam Research Corporation. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/24/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2014)
|
September 19, 2014 |
Filing
425
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 424 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Postponing and Rescheduling Xycarb Ceramics' Deposition in Holland filed by Lam Research Corporation. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 09/19/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2014)
|
September 15, 2014 |
Filing
409
ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINES AND RESETTING MSJ HEARING as to 402 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity of U.S. Patent No. RE41,266. Responses due by 10/10/2014. Replies due by 10/24/2014. MSJ Motion Hearing set for 11/13/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Status Report due by 11/6/2014. Status Conference set for 11/13/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/15/14. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2014)
|
August 22, 2014 |
Filing
387
ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen denying 331 Motion to Bifurcate; denying 346 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting 348 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (emclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2014)
|
August 18, 2014 |
Filing
380
DISCOVERY ORDER re 355 Letter filed by Xycarb Ceramics, Inc., 366 Letter filed by Xycarb Ceramics, Inc., 356 Letter filed by Lam Research Corporation, 354 Letter filed by Lam Research Corporation. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on August 18, 2014. (jcslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2014)
|
August 5, 2014 |
Filing
351
DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on August 5, 2014. (jcslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2014)
|
May 15, 2014 |
Filing
324
ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying 310 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration of Claim Construction Order. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2014)
|
May 14, 2014 |
Filing
323
ORDER GRANTING re 322 Letter filed by Xycarb Ceramics, Inc., for Lisbeth Merrill to appear by phone on 5/16/14 at 9:30 AM for the discovery hearing. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 5/14/14. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2014)
|
May 8, 2014 |
Filing
319
ORDER Granting Request for Extension of Time to 5/16/14 to provide letters to the Court. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 5/8/14. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2014)
|
April 7, 2014 |
Filing
306
ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying 278 Defendant Xycarb's Motion Re Intervening Rights; Granting 264 Defendant Xycarb's Motion for Reconsideration; and ORDER Re Claim Construction. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2014)
|
February 19, 2014 |
Filing
294
ORDER Denying parties request to present expert witness testimony during the claim construction hearing scheduled for February 24, 2014. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/19/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2014)
|
December 11, 2013 |
Filing
271
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 270 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 264 MOTION for Reconsideration of the Court's Revised Order Re Claim Construction Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Modifying Response Date on Opposition t o Motion for Reconsideration filed by Lam Research Corporation, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 270 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 264 MOTION for Reconsideration of the Court's Revised Order Re Claim Construction Stip ulation and [Proposed] Order Modifying Response Date on Opposition to Motion for Reconsideration, 264 MOTION for Reconsideration of the Court's Revised Order Re Claim Construction. Responses due by 12/24/2013.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/11/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2013)
|
December 3, 2013 |
Filing
260
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 259 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation to Continue CMC Hearing filed by Xycarb Ceramics, Inc. Case Management Statement due by 12/12/2013. Case Management Conference set for 12/19/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/3/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2013)
|
November 15, 2013 |
Filing
257
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 252 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulated Protective Order for Litigation Involving Patents, Highly Sensitive Confidential Information And/Or Trade Secrets filed by Lam Research Corporation. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/15/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2013)
|
October 4, 2013 |
Filing
248
ORDER granting 247 STIPULATION Stipulated Motion to Lift Stay and Reopen Case filed by Lam Research Corporation. Case reopened., Case Management Statement due by 11/1/2013. Case Management Conference set for 11/8/2013 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/1/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2013)
|
June 9, 2011 |
Filing
246
ORDER. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/9/2011. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2011)
|
April 18, 2011 |
Filing
226
ORDER re 219 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Lam Research Corporation, Attorney Marja-Liisa Overbeck; Marcus T. Hall and Beth L. Mitchell terminated. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/15/2011. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2011)
|
March 11, 2011 |
Filing
213
ORDER re 212 Stipulation filed by Schunk Semiconductor, Xycarb Ceramics, Inc. Motions due by 2/27/2012. Tutorial Hearing set for 7/12/2011 02:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Claims Construction Hearing set for 7/14/2011 02:30 PM. Jury Selection/Jury Trial set for 4/16/2012 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/11/2011. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2011)
|
December 28, 2010 |
Filing
209
STIPULATION AND ORDER withdrawing Attorney John E. Wagner as attorney of record for XYCARB CERAMICS; Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/28/2010. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2010)
|
November 24, 2010 |
Filing
206
SCHEDULING ORDER re 204 Stipulation filed by Lam Research Corporation. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/23/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2010)
|
October 21, 2010 |
Filing
202
ORDER re 201 Stipulation, filed by Schunk Semiconductor, Xycarb Ceramics, Inc., Motions terminated: 197 MOTION to Dismiss First Supplemental Complaint Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by Schunk Semiconductor, Xycarb Ceramics, Inc... Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/21/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2010)
|