Bull et al v. City and County of San Francisco et al

Plaintiff: Mary Bull, Jonah Zern, Laura Timbrook, Leigh Fleming, Charli Johnson, Micky Mangosing, Alexis Bronson, Marcy Corneau and Lisa Giampaoli
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco, San Francisco County Sheriff's Department, Michael Hennessey and San Francisco County Sheriff's Deputies
Case Number: 3:2003cv01840
Filed: April 23, 2003
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Referring Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 28, 2013 400 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Charles R. Breyer Dismissing Class Claims without Prejudice and Approving the Stipulated Settlement (399).Associated Cases: 3:03-cv-01840-CRB, 3:03-cv-03105-CRB, 3:03-cv-04022-CRB, 3:03-cv-04692-CRB, 3:04-cv-03729-CRB(crblc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2013)
April 15, 2013 393 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REQUIRING NOTICE TO CLASS. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 04/15/2013. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2013)
June 14, 2012 383 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 382 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to continue time for plaintiffs to file motion to redefine the class filed by Mary Bull. Motion to redefine class due by 9/15/2012. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/11/2012. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2012)
June 9, 2011 364 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING HEARING ON ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO STAY. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on June 9, 2011. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2011)
December 29, 2010 347 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time to and including 1/31/2011 for defendants to file responsive pleading to 4th amended complaint; Signed by Judge Charles R Breyer on 12/29/2010. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2010)
December 16, 2010 345 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 318 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 322 Motion for Reconsideration (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2010)
November 4, 2010 338 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on November 4, 2010. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2010)
September 8, 2010 314 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 291 Motion to Amend/Correct ; Plaintiffs are required to E-FILE the amended document; granting in part and denying in part 300 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2010)
August 4, 2010 299 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of Dismissal with prejduice re 295 Stipulation filed by City and County of San Francisco, Marcy Corneau terminated.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/4/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2010)
July 13, 2010 286 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to continue CMC re (284 in 3:03-cv-01840-CRB) Stipulation filed by City and County of San Francisco Case Management Conference set for 7/23/2010 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 7/9/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bull et al v. City and County of San Francisco et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Bull
Represented By: Mark E. Merin, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonah Zern
Represented By: Mark E. Merin, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Timbrook
Represented By: Mark E. Merin, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leigh Fleming
Represented By: Mark E. Merin, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charli Johnson
Represented By: Mark E. Merin, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Micky Mangosing
Represented By: Mark E. Merin, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexis Bronson
Represented By: Mark E. Merin, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcy Corneau
Represented By: Mark E. Merin, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Giampaoli
Represented By: Mark E. Merin, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco
Represented By: Robert A. Bonta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Francisco County Sheriff's Department
Represented By: Robert A. Bonta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Hennessey
Represented By: Robert A. Bonta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Francisco County Sheriff's Deputies
Represented By: Robert A. Bonta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?