Scognamillo et al v. Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC et al

Plaintiff: Frank Scognamillo, David E. Shein, Stephen B. Galasso, John J. Cresto, Ellen H. Scognamillo, Scognamillo Family Trust, UTA, Linda Galasso and Stephen & Linda Galasso Family Trust, UTA
Defendant: Thomas Weisel Partners LLC.
3rd_party_defendant: J.P. Morgan Securities Inc.
Special_master: Edward Swanson
Case Number: 3:2003cv02061
Filed: August 20, 2009
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Thelton E. Henderson
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28:1441 - Petition for Removal: SEC Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 20, 2009 254 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER dismissing defendant Credit Suisse Securities LLC with prejudice. Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC terminated. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 08/19/09. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2009)
January 23, 2009 251 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER dismissing defendants George Boutros and Storm Duncan with prejudice. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 01/23/09. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2009)
November 18, 2008 248 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson denying 225 motion for leave to file a sixth amended complaint. (tehlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2008)
September 19, 2008 245 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER authorizing use of computer equipment. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 09/18/08. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2008)
September 18, 2008 241 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Authorizing Use of Computer Equipment and Setting Time Limits, Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on September 17, 2008. (tehlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scognamillo et al v. Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Scognamillo
Represented By: Leo Ray Beus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David E. Shein
Represented By: Leo Ray Beus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen B. Galasso
Represented By: Leo Ray Beus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John J. Cresto
Represented By: Leo Ray Beus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ellen H. Scognamillo
Represented By: Leo Ray Beus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scognamillo Family Trust, UTA
Represented By: Leo Ray Beus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Galasso
Represented By: Leo Ray Beus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen & Linda Galasso Family Trust, UTA
Represented By: Leo Ray Beus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Weisel Partners LLC.
Represented By: Jennifer L. Hadley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_defendant: J.P. Morgan Securities Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special_master: Edward Swanson
Represented By: Edward W. Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?