Edgerly v. City and County of San Francisco et al

Plaintiff: Erris Edgerly
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco, David Goff and John Conefrey
Case Number: 3:2003cv02169
Filed: May 8, 2003
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: William H. Alsup
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 4, 2014 408 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE (30 days conditional dismissal.) Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/4/2014. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2014)
July 24, 2014 402 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OVERRULING re 401 Objection to the Confidential Preliminary Settlement Conference filed by Erris Edgerly. Plaintiff is ordered to appear, in person, at the preliminary settlement conference on July 24, 2014, at 3:00 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, 450 Golden Gate Ave., San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 7/24/14. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2014)
July 9, 2014 397 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Withdrawing Referral to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero re Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Plaintiff Erris Edgerly and Resetting Hearing as to 392 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Notice of Motion and Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Plaintiff Erris Edgerly, Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 7/9/2014. Motion Hearing reset for 8/22/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer.(beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2014)
May 8, 2014 386 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 384 Response to Order to Show Cause filed by Erris Edgerly Case Management Conference reset for 6/13/2014 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/8/2014. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2014)
April 30, 2014 382 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 5/9/2014 08:30 AM. Show Cause Response due by 5/9/2014. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/9/2014. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2014)
April 18, 2014 380 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL AND SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/18/2014. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2014)
February 20, 2014 372 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 371 Defendant's Request for telephonic Appearance filed by CCSF. Motions terminated: 370 MOTION to Continue DEFENDANTS CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO, ET AL.'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR ORDER CONTINUING FEBRUARY 21, 2014 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by John Conefrey, David Goff, City and County of San Francisco. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/20/2014. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2014)
February 14, 2014 369 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/14/2014. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2014)
November 26, 2013 363 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 362 MOTION to Continue DECEMBER 13, 2013 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; DECLARATION OF SEAN CONNOLLY IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed by John Conefrey, David Goff, City and County of San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 1/10/2014. Case Management Conference reset for 1/17/2014 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/25/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2013)
May 26, 2011 337 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying 310 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2011)
February 15, 2011 311 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/15/2011. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2011)
January 19, 2011 272 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/19/2011. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2011)
October 1, 2010 236 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/1/2010. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2010)
September 17, 2010 234 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING ALL DATES PENDING RE-ASSIGNMENT. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 9/17/2010. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2010)
September 3, 2010 222 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATES. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 3, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2010)
August 13, 2010 219 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING SUBMISSIONS FOR FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 13, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2010)
July 29, 2010 213 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO AUGUST 12, 2010, AT 11:00 AM by Judge William Alsup [granting 211 Motion to Continue]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edgerly v. City and County of San Francisco et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erris Edgerly
Represented By: Gregory M. Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco
Represented By: Sean F. Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Goff
Represented By: Sean F. Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Conefrey
Represented By: Sean F. Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?