Terra Novo,Inc., v. Golden Gate Products,Inc.,

Case Number: 3:2003cv02684
Filed: June 9, 2003
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 15, 2011 196 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT GOLDEN GATE PRODUCTS, INC. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 15, 2011. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2011)
September 19, 2011 191 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT; DIRECTIONS TO CLERK; SETTING DEADLINE FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT; CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Clerk is directed to enter Golden Gate Products, Inc.� 39;s default. No later than October 21, 2011, plaintiff shall file a motion for default judgment or, alternatively, a statement indicating why it should not be required to do so. The Court continues the Case Management Conference from September 23, 2011 to January 13, 2012, at 10:30 a.m.; a Case Management Conference shall be filed no later than January 6, 2012. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 19, 2011. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2011)
May 3, 2011 181 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REOPEN AND RESTORE; SCHEDULING STATUS CONFERENCE. The parties shall appear on June 3, 2011, at 10:30 a.m. for a status conference. A Joint Status Statement shall be filed no later than May 27, 2011. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 3, 2011. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2011)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Terra Novo,Inc., v. Golden Gate Products,Inc.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?