Berndt et al v. California Department of Corrections et al
Plaintiff: Martha Berndt and Judy Longo
Defendant: California Department of Corrections, Robert Ayers, Teresa Schwartz, Joseph McGrath, Augustin Lopez, D. Skerik and Dwight W. Winslow
Case Number: 3:2003cv03174
Filed: February 1, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Vaughn R. Walker
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 399 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION REGARDING CLASS COUNSEL'S ADEQUACY re 360 Order on Motion to Certify Class,. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 12/16/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2010)
December 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 395 ORDER granting plaintiffs' motion to substitute the estate of Judy Longo, Doc #302.(vrwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2010)
November 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 383 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman granting 379 Motion to Continue (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2010)
October 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 378 ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 10/20/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2010)
September 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 365 ORDER REGARDING EVIDENTIARY HEARING. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 9/29/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2010)
September 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 362 ORDER SCHEDULING MEETING. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 9/20/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2010)
September 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 361 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why plaintiffs' claim for injunctive relief should not be dismissed for lack of standing. Show Cause Response due by 10/14/2010. (vrwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2010).
May 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 338 ORDER. Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, doc #277, is DENIED without prejudice. The parties are directed to limit their arguments during the 5/27 hearing to plaintiffs' motions for a preliminary injunction and to substitute Judy Longo's estate, doc ## 302 and 310. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 5/18/2010. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2010)
February 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 298 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO ENLARGE TIME TO FILE PLAINTIFFS' REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION re doc 289 filed by Linda Scott, Martha Berndt, Judy Longo. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 2/1/2010. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2010)
January 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 286 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 01/13/10. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2010)
December 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 278 ORDER re: Defendant Dwight Winslow. Any objections to or concerns with this Court's continuing to preside over this case due by 01/08/10. Plaintiffs to file statement of intent re: claims of Plaintiff Longo by 01/08/10. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 12/22/09. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2009)
October 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 275 ORDER setting schedule for 273 Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 10/26/09. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2009)
August 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 270 ORDER extending deadlines. All discovery related to class certification shall be completed on or before 10/16/09. Stipulation and proposed order or further joint status statement due by 10/23/09. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 08/31/09. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2009)
August 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 269 ORDER RE: DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 8/28/09. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2009)
August 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 267 NOTICE OF REFERENCE; ORDER TO MEET AND CONFER, AND ORDER RE DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Lead trial counsel, in person, meet and confer, set for 8/27/2009 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C.Spero on 8/18/09. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2009)
August 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 264 RECUSAL ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on August 13, 2009. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2009)
August 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 260 ORDER setting discovery cutoff and requiring stipulation and proposed order or further joint status statement by 10/05/09. All discovery related to class certification shall be completed on or before 09/30/09. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 08/04/09. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2009)
June 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 258 ORDER requiring further joint status statement by 07/27/09. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 06/10/09. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2009)
May 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 256 ORDER granting request to file a further Joint Status Report on June 8, 2009. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 05/13/09. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2009)
April 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ORDER granting request to file a further Joint Status Report on May 11, 2009. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 04/21/09. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2009)
March 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 249 ORDER requring parties to file a futher joint case management statement on 04/20/09. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 03/17/09. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2009)
December 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 246 ORDER re 245 December 17, 2008 joint status report. All discovery continues to be referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Laporte. Joint status statement due by 03/16/09. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 12/19/08. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2008)
October 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER GRANTING request to participate by phone at the case management conference. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 10/21/08. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berndt et al v. California Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Berndt
Represented By: John L. Burris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Longo
Represented By: John L. Burris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Corrections
Represented By: Kathryn Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Ayers
Represented By: Kathryn Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teresa Schwartz
Represented By: Kathryn Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph McGrath
Represented By: Kathryn Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Augustin Lopez
Represented By: Kathryn Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Skerik
Represented By: Kathryn Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dwight W. Winslow
Represented By: Kathryn Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?