Johnson et al v. California Conservation Core et al
Plaintiff: Lameche Jewell Jordan and Christine Grimes Johnson
Defendant: U.S. Army, The Permanente Medical Group, State of California, California Conservation Core and U.S. Navy
Case Number: 3:2003cv03251
Filed: July 11, 2003
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Martin J Jenkins
Nature of Suit: Occupational Safety And Health
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2017 Filing 24 RESPONSE TO NOTICE re #23 Notice (Other) Signed by Judge Alsup on 7/24/2017. (whalc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2017) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/10/2017: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (dl, COURT STAFF).
July 13, 2017 Filing 23 NOTICE filed by Bridgett Phelps. (tnS) (Filed on 7/13/2017)
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria denying #21 Motion to Reopen Case. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2017)
June 19, 2017 Filing 21 MOTION to Re-open Case filed by Bridgett Charmain Phelps Crowder. (tnS) (Filed on 6/19/2017)
February 4, 2004 Filing 20 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Christine Grimes Johnson, Lameche Jewell Jordan, California Conservation Core, Kaiser Permanente as to California Conservation Core, Kaiser Permanente. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2004)
November 21, 2003 Filing 19 JUDGMENT granting defendants' Motions to Dismiss 10 13 . (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2003)
November 21, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Judge Martin J. Jenkins GRANTING defendants' Motions to Dismiss 10 13 . (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2003)
November 12, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Martin J. Jenkins: plaintiff is ordered to show cause by 11/17/03 why defendants' Motion to Dismiss should not be granted. (slh, COURT STAFF)
November 7, 2003 Filing 16 Reply Memorandum to Motion re 13 Motion to Dismiss filed by U.S. Army, U.S. Navy. (slh, COURT STAFF)
October 28, 2003 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed, by pro se Christine Grimes Johnson, Lameche Jewell Jordan. U.S. Army (slh, COURT STAFF)
October 16, 2003 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed, by pro se Christine Grimes Johnson, Lameche Jewell Jordan. U.S. Navy (slh, COURT STAFF)
October 16, 2003 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss filed by U.S. Army, U.S. Navy. Motion Hearing set for 11/25/2003 09:30 AM. (slh, COURT STAFF)
October 7, 2003 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE: Case Management Conference reset for 1/6/2004 at 02:00 PM. (slh, COURT STAFF)
October 7, 2003 Filing 11 Request for Judicial Notice re 10 Motion to Dismiss filed by California Conservation Core, State of California. (Related document(s) 10 ) (slh, COURT STAFF)
October 7, 2003 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by California Conservation Core, State of California. Motion Hearing set for 11/25/2003 09:30 AM. (slh, COURT STAFF)
October 6, 2003 Filing 9 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Kaiser Permanente. (slh, COURT STAFF)
October 2, 2003 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed, by pro se Christine Grimes Johnson, Lameche Jewell Jordan. U.S. Navy (slh, COURT STAFF)
September 25, 2003 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed, by pro se Christine Grimes Johnson. U.S. Army (slh, COURT STAFF)
September 22, 2003 Filing 6 NOTICE of Change of Address by pro se Christine Grimes Johnson. (slh, COURT STAFF)
September 17, 2003 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed, by pro se Christine Grimes Johnson, Lameche Jewell Jordan. State of California (slh, COURT STAFF)
September 10, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Judge Martin J. Jenkins GRANTING plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis 2 ; for issuance by the Clerk and service by the U.S. Marshal of summons and complaint. (slh, COURT STAFF)
July 11, 2003 Filing 3 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 10/7/2003 at 02:00 PM. (slh)
July 11, 2003 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by pro se Christine Grimes Johnson, Lameche Jewell Jordan. (slh, )
July 11, 2003 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (no process) against Kaiser Permanente, California Conservation Core, State of California, U.S. Army, U.S. Navy ( Filing fee $IFPP ). Filed by pro se Christine Grimes Johnson, Lameche Jewell Jordan. (slh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson et al v. California Conservation Core et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Army
Represented By: Andrew Y.S. Cheng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Permanente Medical Group
Represented By: William Thomas Horsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of California
Represented By: John P. Devine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Conservation Core
Represented By: John P. Devine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Navy
Represented By: Andrew Y.S. Cheng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lameche Jewell Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Grimes Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?