Securities And Exchange Commission v. Hilsenrath et al

Plaintiff: Securities And Exchange Commission
Defendant: Oliver Hilsenrath and David S. Klarman
Intervenor: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2003cv03252
Filed: July 1, 2009
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: William H. Alsup
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:77 Securities Fraud

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 1, 2009 223 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission and against defendant Oliver Hilsenrath. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 7/1/2009. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2009)
April 3, 2009 216 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE APRIL 30 HEARING (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2009)
February 12, 2009 212 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER PERMITTING LIMITED DISCOVERY FOR REMEDY-STAGE PROCEEDINGS (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2009)
January 9, 2009 208 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING TRIAL; ORDER RE REMEDY-STAGE PROCEEDINGS (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2009)
January 7, 2009 206 Opinion or Order of the Court REQUEST FOR RESPONSE (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2009)
February 6, 2008 147 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE AND ORDER SETTING FURTHER SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE for 3/3/2008, at 2:00 p.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 2/6/2008. [Note: Only Mr. Hilsenrath and Ms. Beeler need to attend.] (jcssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities And Exchange Commission v. Hilsenrath et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities And Exchange Commission
Represented By: Kathleen Bisaccia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oliver Hilsenrath
Represented By: OLIVER HILSENRATH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David S. Klarman
Represented By: Edward W. Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: United States of America
Represented By: Laurel Daniels Beeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?