Braun et al v. County of San Mateo

Plaintiff: Oscar Braun, Andrea Braun and The Oscar A. Braun Trust Dated 1996
Defendant: County of San Mateo
Movant: Committee for Green Foothills
Case Number: 3:2003cv03415
Filed: July 22, 2003
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 25, 2009 298 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James denying 268 Motion for Enforcement of Settlement Agreement (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2009)
January 16, 2009 294 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS C-08-4814 (RELATED CASE). Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/16/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2009)
December 1, 2008 289 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR PARTIES IN RELATED CASES TO APPEAR FOR STATUS CONFERENCE AND FILE JOINT STATEMENT re 286 Order. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 12/1/2008. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2008)
November 19, 2008 286 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 11/19/08. (mejlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Braun et al v. County of San Mateo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oscar Braun
Represented By: Brad Yamauchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Braun
Represented By: Brad Yamauchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Oscar A. Braun Trust Dated 1996
Represented By: Brad Yamauchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of San Mateo
Represented By: Timothy J. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Committee for Green Foothills
Represented By: Joseph W. Cotchett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?