Korbholz et al v. Great-West Life & Annuity Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Michael L. Korbholz and Waldman Children's Trust
Defendant: Great-West Life & Annuity Insurance Company
Mediator: Catherine A. Yanni
Case Number: 3:2003cv03792
Filed: August 13, 2003
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 20, 2009 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 73 Motion for Summary Judgment; and GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 76 Motion for Summary Judgment. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2009)
December 2, 2008 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 91 Stipulation Continuing Further Hearing Date on Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 12/2/08. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2008)
November 25, 2008 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING FURTHER HEARING ON CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON REMEDIES AND NOTICE OF TENTATIVE RULING THEREON. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 11/25/08. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Korbholz et al v. Great-West Life & Annuity Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael L. Korbholz
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth McCutcheon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Waldman Children's Trust
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth McCutcheon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great-West Life & Annuity Insurance Company
Represented By: Patrick R. McKinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Mediator: Catherine A. Yanni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?