Flick v. City and County of San Francisco et al

Plaintiff: Deborah Flick
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco, San Francisco Police Department, Alex Fagan, Sr., Michael Hennessey, R. L. Lock, Nelson, Griffin and O'Sullivan
Miscellaneous: Ingrid M Evans
Case Number: 3:2003cv04022
Filed: September 3, 2003
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 30, 2013 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE (30 days conditional dismissal). Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/30/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2013)
September 11, 2013 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER EXCUSING CERTAIN DEFENDANTS FROM ATTENDING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ON 9/24/13. Michael Hennessey & Officers Lock, Nelson, Griffin & O'Sullivan are excused. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 9/11/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2013)
September 10, 2013 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 61 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by City and County of San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 11/1/2013. Further Case Management Conference reset for 11/8/2013 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/9/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flick v. City and County of San Francisco et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Flick
Represented By: Daniel Berko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco
Represented By: Robert A. Bonta
Represented By: Elizabeth M Pederson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Francisco Police Department
Represented By: Robert A. Bonta
Represented By: Elizabeth M Pederson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Fagan, Sr.
Represented By: Robert A. Bonta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Hennessey
Represented By: Robert A. Bonta
Represented By: Elizabeth M Pederson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. L. Lock
Represented By: Robert A. Bonta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nelson
Represented By: Robert A. Bonta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Griffin
Represented By: Robert A. Bonta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O'Sullivan
Represented By: Robert A. Bonta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Ingrid M Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?