Roe et al v. Estate of Thomas White et al
Plaintiff: Jose Roe and Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego
Defendant: Arthur J. Collingsworth, Jack Eugene Teeters, Estate of Thomas F. White, Gerald Rolph, Thomas F. White and Nathan Lovaas
Petitioner: Nanci L. Clarence, Clarence & Dyer LLP (now known as Clarence Dyer & Cohen LLP) and Kathleen Dyer
Interested Party: David Replogle, Arguedas, Cassman & Headley, LLP, John D. O'Connor, Cristina C. Arguedas, Kaushal Niroula, James M. Wagstaffe, Attorney John E. Hill and Ted W. Cassman
Trustee: C. Joseph Smith
Undetermined: Bradley Phillip Kaplan
Case Number: 3:2003cv04035
Filed: September 4, 2003
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Charles R Breyer
Referring Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 31, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2018 Filing 1273 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 3/29/2005 before Judge Charles R. Breyer for Court Reporter Rosita Flores. (rjdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2018)
February 8, 2016 Filing 1272 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL by Court Staff. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2016)
February 8, 2016 Filing 1271 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL by Court Staff. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2016)
June 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1270 ORDER re payment of Guardian Ad Litem re #1267 Status Report filed by Jose Roe, James M. Wagstaffe. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/2/2015. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2015)
June 1, 2015 Filing 1269 Proposed Order re Payment of Guardian Ad Litem Invoice #10 by Jose Roe, James M. Wagstaffe. (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 6/1/2015)
June 1, 2015 Filing 1268 Declaration of James M. Wagstaffe in Support of #1267 Status Report Guardian ad Litem re: Fees and Costs filed byJose Roe, James M. Wagstaffe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #1267 ) (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 6/1/2015) Modified on 6/2/2015 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
June 1, 2015 Filing 1267 STATUS REPORT Guardian ad Litem re: Fees and Costs by Jose Roe, James M. Wagstaffe. (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 6/1/2015)
January 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1266 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/5/2015. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2015)
December 12, 2014 Filing 1265 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Charles R. Breyer: Status Conference held on 12/12/2014.Court Reporter Name - Joanne Farrell. Plaintiff Attorney - James Wagstaff. Defendant Attorney - Geoffrey Rotwein also present Jack Teeters.This is a text only Minute Entry (beS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/12/2014)
December 5, 2014 Filing 1264 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL by Court Staff. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2014)
December 5, 2014 Filing 1263 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL by Court Staff. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2014)
November 18, 2014 Filing 1262 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #1261 Order (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2014)
November 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1261 ORDER re #1260 Status Report filed by James M. Wagstaffe. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/14/2014. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2014)
November 13, 2014 Filing 1260 STATUS REPORT GAL's Report re: Fees and Costs by James M. Wagstaffe. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James Wagstaffe, #2 Proposed Order)(Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 11/13/2014)
October 10, 2014 Filing 1259 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 10/10/2014 before Charles R. Breyer (Date Filed: 10/10/2014) re #1252 MOTION for Discovery (Post-Judgment) filed by Estate of Thomas F. White, ***Motion denied #1252 MOTION for Discovery (Post-Judgment) filed by Estate of Thomas F. White.. Status Conference set for 12/12/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. (Court Reporter Kathy Sullivan.) (beS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/10/2014)
September 12, 2014 Filing 1258 REPLY (re #1252 MOTION for Discovery (Post-Judgment) ) filed byEstate of Thomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 9/12/2014)
September 5, 2014 Filing 1257 Joinder re #1252 MOTION for Discovery (Post-Judgment) NOTICE OF JOINDER BY JOHN E. HILL TO GUARDIAN AD LITEM'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR POST-JUDGMENT DISCOVERY by John E. Hill. (Hill, John) (Filed on 9/5/2014)
September 4, 2014 Filing 1256 RESPONSE (re #1252 MOTION for Discovery (Post-Judgment) ) filed byJames M. Wagstaffe. (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 9/4/2014)
August 28, 2014 Filing 1255 NOTICE of Resetting of Hearing by Estate of Thomas F. White re #1252 MOTION for Discovery (Post-Judgment) Resetting and Continuing Hearing on Motion to 10/10/14 at 10:00 am. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 8/28/2014) Modified on 8/29/2014 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
August 22, 2014 Filing 1254 Declaration of Geoffrey Rotwein in Support of #1253 Brief, #1252 MOTION for Discovery (Post-Judgment) filed byEstate of Thomas F. White. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #1253 , #1252 ) (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 8/22/2014)
August 22, 2014 Filing 1253 Brief re #1252 MOTION for Discovery (Post-Judgment) filed byEstate of Thomas F. White. (Related document(s) #1252 ) (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 8/22/2014)
August 22, 2014 Filing 1252 MOTION for Discovery (Post-Judgment) filed by Estate of Thomas F. White. Motion Hearing set for 9/26/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 9/5/2014. Replies due by 9/12/2014. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 8/22/2014)
July 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1251 ORDER OF CLARIFICATION. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on July 29, 2014. (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2014)
July 21, 2014 Filing 1250 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #1249 Order (certified) (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2014)
July 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1249 ORDER re #1245 STATUS REPORT Guardian Ad Litem's Report re: Fees and Costs, filed by James M. Wagstaffe Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 7/21/2014. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2014)
July 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1248 ORDER REGARDING OBJECTION. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on July 16, 2014. (nclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2014)
July 16, 2014 Filing 1247 OBJECTIONS to re #1246 Order following In Camera Review by Estate of Thomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 7/16/2014)
July 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1246 ORDER FOLLOWING IN CAMERA REVIEW. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on July 14, 2014. (nclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2014)
July 10, 2014 Filing 1245 STATUS REPORT Guardian Ad Litem's Report re: Fees and Costs by James M. Wagstaffe. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James Wagstaffe in Connection With Guardian Ad Litem's Report re; Fees and Costs, #2 Proposed Order)(Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 7/10/2014)
June 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1244 AMENDED ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR IN CAMERA REVIEW Re: Dkt. No. #1208 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 2/28/2014. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2014)
June 10, 2014 Filing 1243 NOTICE of Change of Address by James Matthew Wagstaffe (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 6/10/2014)
May 16, 2014 Filing 1242 CLERKS Letter Spreading Mandate to Counsel re #1241 . (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2014)
May 16, 2014 Filing 1241 MANDATE of USCA (USCA # 13-73079) : The judgment of this Court, entered 3/21/14, takes effect this date. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2014)
April 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1240 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #1222 Motion to expand in camera review by magistrate judge (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2014)
April 19, 2014 Filing 1239 Proposed Order re #1222 MOTION To Expand In Camera Review by Magistrate/Judge Nathanael M. Cousins re #1221 Order on Motion for Discovery by Estate of Thomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 4/19/2014)
April 18, 2014 Filing 1238 Mail sent to Kaushal Niroula returned as undeliverable re #1233 Order. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2014)
April 18, 2014 Filing 1237 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 4/18/2014 before Charles R. Breyer (Date Filed: 4/18/2014) re #1222 MOTION To Expand In Camera Review by Magistrate/Judge Nathanael M. Cousins re #1221 Order on Motion for Discovery filed by Estate of Thomas F. White. (Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan.) (beS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/18/2014)
April 16, 2014 Filing 1236 Letter from Guardian Ad Litem James M. Wagstaffe to Judge Breyer. (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 4/16/2014)
April 3, 2014 Filing 1235 Letter from Geoffrey Rotwein in Reply to Letter from Guardian Ad Litem, Docket No. 1234. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 4/3/2014)
April 2, 2014 Filing 1234 Letter from from Guardian Ad Litem to Hon. Judge Cousins Re: Relief Requested in Letter #1227 . (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 4/2/2014)
April 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1233 ORDER RE TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/2/2014. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2014) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/3/2014: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (lrcS, COURT STAFF).
April 1, 2014 Filing 1232 USCA Memorandum (USCA # 13-73079) : The petition of The Estate of Thomas F. White is denied. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2014)
March 28, 2014 Filing 1231 REPLY (re #1222 MOTION To Expand In Camera Review by Magistrate/Judge Nathanael M. Cousins re #1221 Order on Motion for Discovery ) filed byEstate of Thomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 3/28/2014)
March 27, 2014 Filing 1230 CLERKS NOTICE: Guardian ad litem must oppose or state non-opposition to the requested relief in Letter #1227 by 4/2/2014. This is a text-only entry. There is no document associated with this notice. (lhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2014)
March 27, 2014 Filing 1229 CORRECTED CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing. Reset Hearing as to #1222 MOTION To Expand In Camera Review by Magistrate/Judge Nathanael M. Cousins re #1221 Order on Motion for Discovery . Motion Hearing reset for 4/18/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. (text entry only, no document associated with this entry). (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2014)
March 27, 2014 Filing 1228 CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing, Set/Reset Deadlines as to #1222 MOTION To Expand In Camera Review by Magistrate/Judge Nathanael M. Cousins re #1221 Order on Motion for Discovery . Motion Hearing reset for 4/11/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. (text entry only, no document associated with this entry). (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2014)
March 25, 2014 Filing 1227 Letter from Geoffrey Rotwein Requesting Correction of Order. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 3/25/2014)
March 21, 2014 Filing 1226 RESPONSE (re #1222 MOTION To Expand In Camera Review by Magistrate/Judge Nathanael M. Cousins re #1221 Order on Motion for Discovery ) filed byJames M. Wagstaffe. (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 3/21/2014)
March 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1225 ORDER of USCA (USCA Case Number 13-73079) : Petitioner's "Motion for Leave to Augment Exhibits" is granted. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2014)
March 7, 2014 Filing 1224 Declaration of Geoffrey Rotwein in Support of #1222 MOTION To Expand In Camera Review by Magistrate/Judge Nathanael M. Cousins re #1221 Order on Motion for Discovery , #1223 Brief, filed byEstate of Thomas F. White. (Related document(s) #1222 , #1223 ) (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 3/7/2014)
March 7, 2014 Filing 1223 Brief re #1222 MOTION To Expand In Camera Review by Magistrate/Judge Nathanael M. Cousins re #1221 Order on Motion for Discovery filed byEstate of Thomas F. White. (Related document(s) #1222 ) (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 3/7/2014)
March 7, 2014 Filing 1222 MOTION To Expand In Camera Review by Magistrate/Judge Nathanael M. Cousins re #1221 Order on Motion for Discovery filed by Estate of Thomas F. White. Motion Hearing set for 4/11/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 3/21/2014. Replies due by 3/28/2014. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 3/7/2014)
February 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1221 ORDER by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins granting in camera review. (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2014)
February 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1220 ORDER re #1219 Status Report filed by James M. Wagstaffe. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/19/2014. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2014)
February 18, 2014 Filing 1219 STATUS REPORT GAL's Report re: Fees and Costs by James M. Wagstaffe. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James Wagstaffe, #2 Proposed Order)(Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 2/18/2014)
January 15, 2014 Filing 1218 Minute Entry: Hearing held on 1/15/2014 before Magistrate Judge Nathanael Cousins re Defendant's Motion for Discovery #1208 . (FTR: 1:14pm - 1:41pm.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/15/2014)
January 10, 2014 Filing 1217 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL by Court Staff. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2014)
January 10, 2014 Filing 1216 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL by Court Staff. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2014)
January 8, 2014 Filing 1215 EXHIBITS in support of #1214 REPLY (re #1208 MOTION for Discovery to Overrule Privilege Objections to Documents ) (Additional Exhibits in Support of Docket No. 1214) filed byEstate of Thomas F. White. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C, #2 Exhibit D)(Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 1/8/2014) Modified on 1/9/2014 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
January 8, 2014 Filing 1214 REPLY (re #1208 MOTION for Discovery to Overrule Privilege Objections to Documents ) filed byEstate of Thomas F. White. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 1/8/2014)
January 3, 2014 Filing 1213 RESPONSE (re #1208 MOTION for Discovery to Overrule Privilege Objections to Documents ) filed byJames M. Wagstaffe. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Angela Calderon Partida)(Tompkins, Nancy) (Filed on 1/3/2014)
January 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1212 ORDER of USCA Case 13-73079 as to #1186 Petition for Writ of Mandamus (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2014)
December 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1211 ORDER of USCA (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2013)
December 16, 2013 Filing 1210 Declaration of Geoffrey Rotwein in Support of #1209 Brief, #1208 MOTION for Discovery to Overrule Privilege Objections to Documents filed byEstate of Thomas F. White. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) #1209 , #1208 ) (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 12/16/2013)
December 16, 2013 Filing 1209 Brief re #1208 MOTION for Discovery to Overrule Privilege Objections to Documents filed byEstate of Thomas F. White. (Related document(s) #1208 ) (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 12/16/2013)
December 16, 2013 Filing 1208 MOTION for Discovery to Overrule Privilege Objections to Documents filed by Estate of Thomas F. White. Motion Hearing set for 1/15/2014 01:00 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Responses due by 1/3/2014. Replies due by 1/8/2014. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 12/16/2013)
December 11, 2013 Filing 1207 Minute Entry: Discovery Hearing held on 12/11/2013 before Nathanael Cousins. Defendant's discovery motion due 12/16/2013. Opposition due 1/3/2014 and reply due 1/8/2014. Hearing set for 1/15/2014 01:00PM. (FTR: 11:12am-11:21am.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/11/2013)
December 3, 2013 Filing 1206 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING Discovery Hearing for 12/11/2013 11:00 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. This is a text-only entry. There is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2013)
December 2, 2013 Filing 1205 RESPONSE to re #1183 Order Privilege log by James M. Wagstaffe. (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 12/2/2013) Modified on 12/3/2013 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
November 26, 2013 Filing 1204 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Estate of Thomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 11/26/2013)
November 22, 2013 Filing 1203 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL by Court Staff. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2013)
November 22, 2013 Filing 1202 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL by Court Staff. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2013)
November 21, 2013 Filing 1201 NOTICE of Appearance by Geoffrey Rotwein as Counsel for Defendant Estate of Thomas F. White (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 11/21/2013)
November 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1200 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #1196 Motion to Substitute Party ; #1197 Ex Parte Application (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2013)
November 19, 2013 Filing 1199 NOTICE by Thomas F. White of Unavailability of Counsel Who Will Appear for The Estate of Thomas F. White (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 11/19/2013)
November 6, 2013 Filing 1198 Proposed Order re #1197 Ex Parte Application re #1196 Ex Parte MOTION to Substitute Party (Estate of Thomas F. White) by Thomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 11/6/2013)
November 6, 2013 Filing 1197 Ex Parte Application re #1196 Ex Parte MOTION to Substitute Party (Estate of Thomas F. White) filed by Thomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 11/6/2013)
November 4, 2013 Filing 1196 Ex Parte MOTION to Substitute Party (Estate of Thomas F. White) filed by Thomas F. White. Responses due by 11/18/2013. Replies due by 11/25/2013. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 11/4/2013)
October 18, 2013 Filing 1195 NOTICE by Thomas F. White re #1192 Notice (Other), Supplemental Declaration of Jack Eugene Teeters Re Substitution of Parties (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 10/18/2013)
October 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1194 ORDER of USCA (USCA # 13-73079) re request to stay proceedings. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2013)
October 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1193 ORDER DENYING EX PARTE APPLICATION #1188 AND STAYING DISCOVERY. The Discovery Hearing set for 10/23/2013 is VACATED. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 10/1/13. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2013)
September 30, 2013 Filing 1192 NOTICE by Thomas F. White and Declaration of Jack Eugene Teeters Re Substitution of Parties Pending Petition for Probate of Will and for Letters Testamentary on behalf of the Estate of Thomas F. White (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 9/30/2013)
September 24, 2013 Filing 1191 RESPONSE (re #1188 Ex Parte Application for Order Compelling Production of Discovery ) GUARDIAN AD LITEMS OPPOSITION TO ATTORNEY ROTWEINS EX PARTE APPLICATION COMPELLING PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS filed byJames M. Wagstaffe. (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 9/24/2013)
September 23, 2013 Filing 1190 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by James M. Wagstaffe for Court Reporter Katherine Wyatt. (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 9/23/2013)
September 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1189 ORDER of USCA (USCA # 13-73079) : Petitioner's emergency motion for a temporary stay pending this court's disposition of this petition for a writ of mandamus is denied. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2013)
September 17, 2013 Filing 1188 Ex Parte Application for Order Compelling Production of Discovery filed by Thomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 9/17/2013)
September 16, 2013 Filing 1187 NOTICE by James M. Wagstaffe Notice of Death of Defendant Thomas F. White (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 9/16/2013)
September 5, 2013 Filing 1186 USCA Case Number 13-73079 re petition for writ of mandamus. (mclS, COURT STAFF)
August 16, 2013 Filing 1185 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Nanci L. Clarence, Clarence & Dyer LLP (now known as Clarence Dyer & Cohen LLP), Kathleen Dyer for Court Reporter Katherine Wyatt. (Clements, Tracy) (Filed on 8/16/2013)
August 15, 2013 Filing 1184 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by James M. Wagstaffe re #1170 Order (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 8/15/2013)
August 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1183 Order re: Post-Judgment Discovery Process. Motions due by 9/25/2013. Responses due by 10/9/2013. Replies due by 10/16/2013. Discovery Hearing set for 10/23/2013 at 1:00 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 08/14/2013. (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2013)
August 13, 2013 Filing 1182 Transcript of Proceedings held on 8-2-13, before Judge Charles Breyer. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Wyatt, Telephone number 925-212-5224. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/12/2013. (Related documents(s) #1178 ) (kpw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2013)
August 12, 2013 Filing 1181 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL by Court Staff. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2013)
August 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1180 ORDER re #1179 Status Report filed by James M. Wagstaffe. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/9/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2013)
August 8, 2013 Filing 1179 STATUS REPORT of GUARDIAN AD LITEM RE: FEES AND COSTS by James M. Wagstaffe. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 8/8/2013)
August 5, 2013 Filing 1178 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Thomas F. White for Court Reporter Katherine Wyatt. (Deckard, Diane) (Filed on 8/5/2013)
August 5, 2013 Filing 1177 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL by Court Staff. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2013)
August 5, 2013 Filing 1176 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL by Court Staff. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2013)
August 5, 2013 Filing 1175 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL by Court Staff. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2013)
August 2, 2013 Filing 1174 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 8/2/2013 before Charles R. Breyer (Date Filed: 8/2/2013) re #1143 MOTION for Discovery (Post-Judgment) filed by Thomas F. White, #1147 MOTION to Stay re #1146 Declaration in Support, #1143 MOTION for Discovery (Post-Judgment), #1145 Declaration in Support, #1144 Brief (Re Payments on Judgment Pending Motions) filed by Thomas F. White(Court Reporter Kathy Wyatt.) (beS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/2/2013)
August 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1173 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #1171 Ex Parte Application excusing from appearance at hearing (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2013)
August 1, 2013 Filing 1172 Minute Entry: Hearing re post-judgment discovery held on 7/31/2013 before Nathanael Cousins. (FTR: 1:14pm-1:36pm.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/1/2013)
July 31, 2013 Filing 1171 Ex Parte Application OF PLAINTIFFS' COUNSEL JOHN E. HILL FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING HEARING OR EXCUSING HIM FROM APPEARANCE AT HEARING ON MOTION TO STAY AND MOTION FOR DISCOVERY (POST TRIAL) filed by John E. Hill. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John E. Hill, #2 Proposed Order Granting Application of John E. Hill)(Hill, John) (Filed on 7/31/2013)
July 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1170 Order Setting Review Process for Post-Judgment Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 07/31/2013. (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2013)
July 23, 2013 Filing 1169 NOTICE by Thomas F. White re #1168 Order, Set Hearings,, Designating Vendor Re Post-Judgment Discovery (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 7/23/2013)
July 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1168 Order re #1086 Post-Judgment Discovery. Discovery Hearing set for 7/31/2013 at 1:00 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 07/22/2013. (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2013)
July 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1167 ORDER Resetting Hearing on Motions #1147 MOTION to Stay re #1146 #1143 MOTION for Discovery (Post-Judgment), Motions Hearing reset for 8/2/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 7/12/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2013)
July 11, 2013 Filing 1166 RESPONSE (re #1165 Ex Parte Application For An Order Continuing Hearing Dates Or, In The Alternative, For Decision Without Oral Argument ) filed byThomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 7/11/2013)
July 10, 2013 Filing 1165 Ex Parte Application For An Order Continuing Hearing Dates Or, In The Alternative, For Decision Without Oral Argument filed by James M. Wagstaffe. (Attachments: #1 Declaration DECLARATION OF DEBORAH L. GOODMAN IN SUPPORT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEMS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING HEARING DATES OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR DECISIONS WITHOUT ORAL ARGUMENT, #2 Proposed Order)(Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 7/10/2013)
June 27, 2013 Filing 1164 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL by Court Staff. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2013)
June 27, 2013 Filing 1163 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL by Court Staff. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2013)
June 27, 2013 Filing 1162 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL by Court Staff. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2013)
June 26, 2013 CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing (text entry only, no document associated with this entry). Reset Heaaring as to #1147 MOTION to Stay re #1146 Declaration in Support, #1143 MOTION for Discovery (Post-Judgment). Motion Hearing reset for 7/19/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2013)
June 14, 2013 Filing 1161 REPLY (re #1143 MOTION for Discovery (Post-Judgment) ) to Response by Plaintiffs filed byThomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 6/14/2013)
June 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1160 Order by Hon. Charles R. Breyer denying #1150 Motion to Shorten Time For Hearing on Motion to Stay Payments. (crblc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2013)
June 7, 2013 Filing 1159 RESPONSE (re #1143 MOTION for Discovery (Post-Judgment) ) filed byJose Roe. (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 6/7/2013)
June 5, 2013 Filing 1158 Declaration of Geoffrey Rotwein in Support of #1145 Declaration in Support, Attaching Supplemental Translations of the Mexican Court Order, filed byThomas F. White. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #1145 ) (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 6/5/2013)
May 30, 2013 Filing 1157 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL by Court Staff. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2013)
May 30, 2013 Filing 1156 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL by Court Staff. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2013)
May 30, 2013 Filing 1155 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL by Court Staff. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2013)
May 28, 2013 Filing 1154 RESPONSE (re #1150 MOTION to Shorten Time for Hearing on Motion for Stay of Judgment Pending Hearing on Motions ) filed byJames M. Wagstaffe. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 5/28/2013)
May 28, 2013 Filing 1153 ERRATA re #1145 Declaration in Support, Re Attached Exhibit 2 by Thomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 5/28/2013)
May 24, 2013 Filing 1152 Request for Judicial Notice re #1143 MOTION for Discovery (Post-Judgment), #1148 Brief, #1147 MOTION to Stay re #1146 Declaration in Support, #1143 MOTION for Discovery (Post-Judgment), #1145 Declaration in Support, #1144 Brief (Re Payments on Judgment Pending Motions), #1145 Declaration in Support, #1149 Declaration in Support,, #1144 Brief filed byThomas F. White. (Related document(s) #1143 , #1148 , #1147 , #1145 , #1149 , #1144 ) (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 5/24/2013)
May 24, 2013 Filing 1151 Proposed Order re #1150 MOTION to Shorten Time for Hearing on Motion for Stay of Judgment Pending Hearing on Motions by Thomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 5/24/2013)
May 24, 2013 Filing 1150 MOTION to Shorten Time for Hearing on #1147 Motion for Stay of Judgment Pending Hearing on Motions filed by Thomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 5/24/2013) Modified on 5/28/2013 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
May 24, 2013 Filing 1149 Declaration of Geoffrey Rotwein in Support of #1147 MOTION to Stay and to Vacate Judgment (Re Payments on Judgment Pending Motions), filed by Thomas F. White. (Related document(s) #1147 ) (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 5/24/2013) Modified on 5/28/2013 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
May 24, 2013 Filing 1148 MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities re #1147 MOTION to Stay and to Vacate Judgment (Re Payments on Judgment Pending Motions) filed by Thomas F. White. (Related document(s), #1147 ) (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 5/24/2013) Modified on 5/28/2013 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
May 24, 2013 Filing 1147 MOTION to Stay and to Vacate Judgment (Re Payments on Judgment Pending Motions) filed by Thomas F. White. Motion Hearing set for 6/28/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 6/7/2013. Replies due by 6/14/2013. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 5/24/2013) Modified on 5/28/2013 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
May 24, 2013 Filing 1146 Declaration of Stewart Haverlack in Support of #1143 MOTION for Discovery (Post-Judgment), #1144 Brief filed byThomas F. White. (Related document(s) #1143 , #1144 ) (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 5/24/2013)
May 24, 2013 Filing 1145 Declaration of Marco A. Pelez de Len in Support of #1143 MOTION for Discovery (Post-Judgment), #1144 Brief filed byThomas F. White. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) #1143 , #1144 ) (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 5/24/2013)
May 24, 2013 Filing 1144 Brief re #1143 MOTION for Discovery (Post-Judgment) filed byThomas F. White. (Related document(s) #1143 ) (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 5/24/2013)
May 24, 2013 Filing 1143 MOTION for Discovery (Post-Judgment) filed by Thomas F. White. Motion Hearing set for 6/28/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 6/7/2013. Replies due by 6/14/2013. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 5/24/2013)
May 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1142 ORDER RELATING CASE C-13-2106NC to C-03-4035CRB re: #1135 MOTION to Relate Case Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Case Should Be Related filed by Clarence & Dyer LLP (now known as Clarence Dyer & Cohen LLP), Kathleen Dyer, Nanci L. Clarence. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/20/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2013)
May 20, 2013 Filing 1141 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL by Court Staff. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2013)
May 20, 2013 Filing 1140 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL by Court Staff. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2013)
May 20, 2013 Filing 1139 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL by Court Staff. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2013)
May 13, 2013 Filing 1138 Joinder re #1137 Opposition/Response to Motion, (Administrative) to Consider whether to Relate Cases by Thomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 5/13/2013)
May 13, 2013 Filing 1137 RESPONSE (re #1135 MOTION to Relate Case Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Case Should Be Related ) Opposition of Thomas F. White to Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related filed byThomas F. White. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Deckard, Diane) (Filed on 5/13/2013)
May 12, 2013 Filing 1136 Notice of Withdrawal of #1119 Motion for Post-Judgment Discovery and #1122 Motion for Stay of Payments Pending Hearings on Motions for Discovery and to Vacate Judgment (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 5/12/2013) Modified on 5/13/2013 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
May 8, 2013 Filing 1135 MOTION to Relate Case Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Case Should Be Related filed by Clarence & Dyer LLP (now known as Clarence Dyer & Cohen LLP), Nanci L. Clarence, Kathleen Dyer. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Stan Roman in Support of Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Case Should Be Related, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration of Stan Roman in Support of Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Case Should Be Related, #3 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Finding that Cases are Related, #4 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Roman, Stanley) (Filed on 5/8/2013)
May 6, 2013 Filing 1134 RESPONSE (re #1119 MOTION for Discovery (Post-Judgment) ) filed byJose Roe. (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 5/6/2013)
April 25, 2013 Filing 1133 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL by Court Staff. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2013)
April 25, 2013 Filing 1132 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL by Court Staff. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2013)
April 25, 2013 Filing 1131 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL by Court Staff. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2013)
April 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1130 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying #1125 Ex Parte Application to Shorten Time. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2013)
April 24, 2013 Filing 1129 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL by Court Staff. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2013)
April 24, 2013 Filing 1128 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL by Court Staff. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2013)
April 23, 2013 Filing 1127 ERRATA re #1120 Brief in Support of Motion for Order Authorizing Post-Judgment Discovery by Thomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 4/23/2013)
April 22, 2013 Filing 1126 Proposed Order re #1125 Ex Parte Application re #1122 MOTION to Stay re #1119 MOTION for Discovery (Post-Judgment) by Thomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 4/22/2013)
April 22, 2013 Filing 1125 Ex Parte Application re #1122 MOTION to Stay re #1119 MOTION for Discovery (Post-Judgment) filed by Thomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 4/22/2013)
April 22, 2013 Filing 1124 Brief re #1122 MOTION to Stay re #1119 MOTION for Discovery (Post-Judgment) filed byThomas F. White. (Related document(s) #1122 , #1119 , #1123 ) (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 4/22/2013) Modified on 4/23/2013 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
April 22, 2013 Filing 1123 DECLARATION of Geoffrey Rotwein re #1122 MOTION to Stay re #1119 MOTION for Discovery (Post-Judgment) filed byThomas F. White. (Related document(s) #1122 , #1119 ) (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 4/22/2013) Modified on 4/23/2013 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
April 22, 2013 Filing 1122 MOTION to Stay re #1119 MOTION for Discovery (Post-Judgment) filed by Thomas F. White. Motion Hearing set for 6/7/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 5/6/2013. Replies due by 5/13/2013. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 4/22/2013)
April 22, 2013 Filing 1121 Declaration of Geoffrey Rotwein in Support of #1119 MOTION for Discovery (Post-Judgment) filed byThomas F. White. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Related document(s) #1120 , #1119 ) (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 4/22/2013) Modified on 4/23/2013 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
April 22, 2013 Filing 1120 Brief re #1119 MOTION for Discovery (Post-Judgment) filed byThomas F. White. (Related document(s) #1119 ) (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 4/22/2013)
April 22, 2013 Filing 1119 MOTION for Discovery (Post-Judgment) filed by Thomas F. White. Motion Hearing set for 6/7/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 5/6/2013. Replies due by 5/13/2013. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 4/22/2013)
April 5, 2013 Filing 1118 Statement by Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego. (mclS, COURT STAFF)
March 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 1117 ORDER re Payment of Guardian Ad Litem Invoice #6 re #1116 Status Report, filed by James M. Wagstaffe. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/28/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2013)
March 20, 2013 Filing 1116 STATUS REPORT Guardian Ad Litem's Report Re: Fees and Costs by James M. Wagstaffe. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James Wagstaffe in Connection with Guradian Ad Litem's Report Re: Fee and Costs, #2 Proposed Order)(Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 3/20/2013)
February 11, 2013 Filing 1115 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL by Court Staff. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2013)
February 11, 2013 Filing 1114 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL by Court Staff. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2013)
February 8, 2013 Filing 1113 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL by Court Staff. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2013)
February 8, 2013 Filing 1112 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL by Court Staff. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2013)
February 8, 2013 Filing 1111 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL by Court Staff. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2013)
February 8, 2013 Filing 1110 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL by Court Staff. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2013)
February 8, 2013 Filing 1109 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL by Court Staff. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2013)
February 8, 2013 Filing 1108 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL by Court Staff. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2013)
February 8, 2013 Filing 1107 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL by Court Staff. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2013)
February 8, 2013 Filing 1106 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL by Court Staff. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2013)
December 11, 2012 Filing 1105 NOTICE by Thomas F. White of Unavailability of Counsel (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 12/11/2012)
November 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1104 ORDER SETTING Hearing for 11/21/2012 01:00 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 11/6/12. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2012)
October 17, 2012 Filing 1103 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL by Court Staff. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2012)
October 17, 2012 Filing 1102 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL by Court Staff. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2012)
September 25, 2012 Filing 1101 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL by Court Staff. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2012)
September 25, 2012 Filing 1100 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL by Court Staff. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2012)
September 10, 2012 Filing 1099 STATUS REPORT Re Post-Judgment Discovery by Thomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 9/10/2012)
September 7, 2012 Filing 1098 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL by Court Staff. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2012)
September 7, 2012 Filing 1097 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL by Court Staff. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2012)
August 23, 2012 Filing 1096 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL by Court Staff. Letter (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2012)
August 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1095 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL by Court Staff. ORDER signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/23/2012 (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2012)
August 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1094 ORDER pursuant to Notice of Subpoenaed Compact Disc and Request for Court Order Releasing it to Defense Expert James Norris pursuant to Discovery Order and Protective Order. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 8/1/12. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2012)
August 1, 2012 Filing 1093 Minute Entry: Discovery Hearing held on 8/1/2012 before Nathanael Cousins. Joint status report due 9/12/2012. (Court Reporter Belle Ball.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/1/2012)
July 17, 2012 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Discovery Hearing re: #1092 set for 8/1/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (nclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2012)
July 17, 2012 Filing 1092 STATUS REPORT Re Progress of Post-Judgment Discovery by Thomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 7/17/2012)
July 16, 2012 Filing 1091 NOTICE by Thomas F. White re #1090 Notice (Other) of Subpoeaned Record (Compact Disc) and Request for Order of Delivery to Defense Expert (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 7/16/2012)
July 11, 2012 Filing 1090 NOTICE by Thomas F. White of Subpoeaned Record (Compact Disc) and Request for Order of Delivery to Defense Expert (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 7/11/2012)
May 30, 2012 Filing 1089 STATUS REPORT Regarding Progress of Post-Judgment Discovery by Thomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 5/30/2012)
May 18, 2012 Filing 1088 Minute Entry: Discovery Hearing held on 5/18/2012 before Nathanael Cousins. Supplemental status report shall be filed by 6/1/2012. Further status report due 7/17/2012. (Recording #FTR 11:09am-11:15am.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/18/2012)
May 10, 2012 Filing 1087 STATUS REPORT Regarding Post-Judgment Discovery Re Hearing May 18, 2012 by Thomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 5/10/2012)
May 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1086 ORDER OF REFERENCE. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/8/2012. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2012)
May 8, 2012 Filing 1085 Letter from James M. Wagstaffe . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 5/8/2012)
May 8, 2012 Filing 1084 Letter from Geoffrey Rotwein Regarding Appointment of Hon. James Larson as Special Master. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 5/8/2012)
May 4, 2012 Filing 1083 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 5/4/2012 before Charles R. Breyer (Date Filed: 5/4/2012) re #1072 MOTION to Stay Payments from Trust Fund Pending Completion of Post-Judgment Discovery filed by Thomas F. White, #1069 MOTION for Discovery of David Replogle's Files in State Bar Custody filed by Thomas F. White. Court to appoint special master. (Court Reporter Sahar Bartlett.) (beS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/4/2012)
May 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1082 ORDER re PAYMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM INVOICE #5 re #1068 Status Report, filed by James M. Wagstaffe. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/4/2012. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2012)
April 20, 2012 Filing 1081 REPLY (re #1072 MOTION to Stay Payments from Trust Fund Pending Completion of Post-Judgment Discovery, #1069 MOTION for Discovery of David Replogle's Files in State Bar Custody ) to Plaintiffs' Oppositions filed byThomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 4/20/2012)
April 13, 2012 Filing 1080 RESPONSE (re #1072 MOTION to Stay Payments from Trust Fund Pending Completion of Post-Judgment Discovery, #1069 MOTION for Discovery of David Replogle's Files in State Bar Custody ) filed byJames M. Wagstaffe. (Attachments: #1 Declaration James M. Wagstaffe, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of James M. Wagstaffe, #3 Declaration John Hill, #4 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations) John Hill)(Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 4/13/2012)
April 11, 2012 Filing 1079 CLERKS NOTICE CONTINUING Discovery Hearing to 5/18/2012 11:00 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Parties shall file a supplemental status report by 5/11/2012. This is a text only notice. There is no document associated with this entry. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2012)
April 11, 2012 Filing 1078 STATUS REPORT Regarding Status of Post-Judgment Discovery: Hearing April 18, 2012 by Thomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 4/11/2012)
April 10, 2012 Sent copy of #1076 Order to Kaushal Niroula. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
April 5, 2012 Filing 1077 NOTICE by Thomas F. White re #1075 Errata, #1072 MOTION to Stay Payments from Trust Fund Pending Completion of Post-Judgment Discovery, #1069 MOTION for Discovery of David Replogle's Files in State Bar Custody to Advance Time of Hearing on These Two Motions from 2:00 p.m. to 10:00 a.m. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 4/5/2012)
April 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1076 ORDER DENYING REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION #1067 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (nclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2012)
March 30, 2012 Filing 1075 ERRATA re #1069 MOTION for Discovery of David Replogle's Files in State Bar Custody (Correcting Date of Hearing to May 4, 2012) by Thomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 3/30/2012) Modified on 4/2/2012 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
March 30, 2012 Filing 1074 Brief re #1072 MOTION to Stay Payments from Trust Fund Pending Completion of Post-Judgment Discovery, #1073 Declaration in Support, filed byThomas F. White. (Related document(s) #1072 , #1073 ) (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 3/30/2012)
March 30, 2012 Filing 1073 Declaration of Geoffrey Rotwein in Support of #1072 MOTION to Stay Payments from Trust Fund Pending Completion of Post-Judgment Discovery filed byThomas F. White. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #1072 ) (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 3/30/2012) Modified on 4/2/2012 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
March 30, 2012 Filing 1072 MOTION to Stay Payments from Trust Fund Pending Completion of Post-Judgment Discovery filed by Thomas F. White. Motion Hearing set for 5/4/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 4/13/2012. Replies due by 4/20/2012. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 3/30/2012)
March 30, 2012 Filing 1071 Brief in Support of #1069 MOTION for Discovery of David Replogle's Files in State Bar Custody filed byThomas F. White. (Related document(s) #1070 , #1069 ) (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 3/30/2012) Modified on 4/2/2012 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
March 30, 2012 Filing 1070 Declaration of Geoffrey Rotwein in Support of #1069 MOTION for Discovery of David Replogle's Files in State Bar Custody filed byThomas F. White. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #1069 ) (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 3/30/2012)
March 30, 2012 Filing 1069 MOTION for Discovery of David Replogle's Files in State Bar Custody filed by Thomas F. White. Motion Hearing set for 5/4/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 4/13/2012. Replies due by 4/20/2012. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 3/30/2012)
March 29, 2012 Filing 1068 STATUS REPORT GUARDIAN AD LITEMS REPORT RE: FEES AND COSTS by James M. Wagstaffe. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James M. Wagstaffe in support of GUARDIAN AD LITEMS REPORT RE: FEES AND COSTS, #2 Proposed Order re GUARDIAN AD LITEMS REPORT RE: FEES AND COSTS)(Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 3/29/2012)
March 21, 2012 Filing 1067 MOTION for Leave to File a Motion for Reconsideration filed by Kaushal Niroula. (Attachments: #1 Part 2)(mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2012)
March 12, 2012 Filing 1066 CLERKS NOTICE. Discovery status hearing rescheduled to 4/18/2012 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (nclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2012)
March 9, 2012 Filing 1065 STATUS REPORT Regarding Status of Post-Judgment Discovery: Hearing March 19, 2012 by Thomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 3/9/2012)
March 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1063 ORDER DENYING EX PARTE APPLICATION #1056 . Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 3/6/12. (nclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2012) (Additional attachment: Certificate of service FILED IN WRONG ENTRY) Modified on 3/6/2012 (lmh, COURT STAFF).
March 5, 2012 Filing 1064 REPLY MEMORANDUM to re #1059 Opposition/Response to Motion by Kaushal Niroula. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2012)
March 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1062 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO QUASH #1051 . Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 3/5/12. (nclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2012) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/6/2012: #1 Certificate of service) (lmh, COURT STAFF).
March 2, 2012 Filing 1061 Proposed Order re #1056 Ex Parte Application for Order Authorizing Trustee C. Joseph Smith to Disclose Information to Defense Counsel by Thomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 3/2/2012)
March 2, 2012 Filing 1060 REPLY (re #1056 Ex Parte Application for Order Authorizing Trustee C. Joseph Smith to Disclose Information to Defense Counsel, #1051 MOTION to Quash ) filed byThomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 3/2/2012)
February 24, 2012 Filing 1059 RESPONSE (re #1051 MOTION to Quash ) Subpoenas by Kaushal Niroula filed byThomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 2/24/2012)
February 23, 2012 Filing 1058 RESPONSE (re #1056 Ex Parte Application for Order Authorizing Trustee C. Joseph Smith to Disclose Information to Defense Counsel ) filed byJose Roe. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James M. Wagstaffe)(Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 2/23/2012)
February 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1057 ORDER REQUESTING ADDITIONAL BRIEFING RE: #1056 . Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 2/22/12. (nclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2012)
February 17, 2012 Filing 1056 Ex Parte Application for Order Authorizing Trustee C. Joseph Smith to Disclose Information to Defense Counsel filed by Thomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 2/17/2012)
February 13, 2012 Filing 1055 Declaration of William Picard in Support of #1051 MOTION to Quash filed byKaushal Niroula. (Related document(s) #1051 ) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2012)
February 10, 2012 Filing 1054 Declaration of Stanley Stephen Spring in Support of #1051 MOTION to Quash filed byKaushal Niroula. (Related document(s) #1051 ) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2012)
February 10, 2012 Filing 1053 Declaration of William Picard in Support of #1051 MOTION to Quash filed byKaushal Niroula. (Related document(s) #1051 ) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2012)
February 10, 2012 Filing 1052 MEMORANDUM in Support re #1051 MOTION to Quash filed byKaushal Niroula. (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3)(Related document(s) #1051 ) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2012)
February 10, 2012 Filing 1051 MOTION to Quash filed by Kaushal Niroula. Responses due by 2/24/2012. Replies due by 3/2/2012. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2012)
February 10, 2012 Filing 1050 Letter to Judge Breyer FILED UNDER SEAL . (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2012)
February 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1049 ORDER FILED UNDER SEAL Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/7/12. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2012)
February 6, 2012 CLERKS NOTICE CONTINUING Discovery Hearing to 3/19/2012 11:00 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Parties to file supplemental report on status by 3/12/2012. This is a text only docket entry. There is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2012)
February 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1048 ORDER FILED UNDER SEAL Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/3/12. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2012)
February 3, 2012 Filing 1047 STATUS REPORT RE POST JUDGMENT DISCOVERY by Thomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 2/3/2012)
January 4, 2012 CLERKS NOTICE CONTINUING Discovery Hearing to 2/17/2012 11:00 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Parties to file supplemental report on status by 2/10/2012. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2012)
January 3, 2012 Filing 1046 STATUS REPORT RE POST-JUDGMENT DISCOVERY by Thomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 1/3/2012)
December 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1045 ORDER of USCA: The petition is denied. (mjj2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2011)
December 13, 2011 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING Discovery Status Conference for 1/18/2012 11:00 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Parties shall meet and confer and submit a joint status report re discovery by 1/11/2012. Status report shall include a proposed schedule for completion of the limited discovery authorized by the District Court pursuant to Docket Entry 1043. The Court may vacate the status conference if the parties report that there are no matters in dispute and discovery is proceeding with appropriate urgency. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2011)
November 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1044 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/15/2011. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2011)
November 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1043 ORDER vacating the hearing on defendant's motion. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/15/2011. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2011)
November 10, 2011 Filing 1042 STIPULATION re #1040 Letter PROPOSED STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Jose Roe. (Attachments: #1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations))(Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 11/10/2011)
November 10, 2011 Filing 1041 Proposed Order re #1040 Letter RE DEFENDANTS MOTIONS TO VACATE JUDGMENT, FOR DISCOVERY AND TO STAY PAYMENTS by Jose Roe. (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 11/10/2011)
November 10, 2011 Filing 1040 Letter from James M. Wagstaffe re Post-Judgment Discovery. (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 11/10/2011)
November 1, 2011 Filing 1039 Transcript of Proceedings held on 10/14/11, before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan, RPR, CRR, CSR, Telephone number 415-794-6659/Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 11/22/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/2/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/30/2012. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 11/1/2011)
October 14, 2011 Filing 1038 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 10/14/2011 before Charles R. Breyer (Date Filed: 10/14/2011) re #1025 MOTION for Discovery (Post-Judgment) for Evidence Re Motion to Vacate filed by Thomas F. White, #1029 MOTION to Stay re #1023 MOTION to Vacate Orders, Settlement Agreement and Judgment, filed by Thomas F. White, ***Motions terminated: #1023 MOTION to Vacate Orders, Settlement Agreement and Judgment filed by Thomas F. White, #1025 MOTION for Discovery (Post-Judgment) for Evidence Re Motion to Vacate MOTION for Discovery (Post-Judgment) for Evidence Re Motion to Vacate filed by Thomas F. White, #1029 MOTION to Stay re #1023 MOTION to Vacate Orders, Settlement Agreement and Judgment, #1026 Brief, and Motion for Discovery MOTION to Stay re #1023 MOTION to Vacate Orders, Settlement Agreement and Judgment (Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan.) (be, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/14/2011)
September 30, 2011 Filing 1037 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by Thomas F. White re #1023 MOTION to Vacate Orders, Settlement Agreement and Judgment, #1025 MOTION for Discovery (Post-Judgment) for Evidence Re Motion to Vacate MOTION for Discovery (Post-Judgment) for Evidence Re Motion to Vacate, #1029 MOTION to Stay re #1023 MOTION to Vacate Orders, Settlement Agreement and Judgment, #1026 Brief, and Motion for Discovery MOTION to Stay re #1023 MOTION to Vacate Orders, Settlement Agreement and Judgment, #1026 Brief, and Motion for Discovery (Pertinent Recent Ninth Circuit Decision) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 9/30/2011) Modified on 10/3/2011 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
September 23, 2011 Filing 1036 REPLY (re #1023 MOTION to Vacate Orders, Settlement Agreement and Judgment, #1025 MOTION for Discovery (Post-Judgment) for Evidence Re Motion to Vacate MOTION for Discovery (Post-Judgment) for Evidence Re Motion to Vacate, #1029 MOTION to Stay re #1023 MOTION to Vacate Orders, Settlement Agreement and Judgment, #1026 Brief, and Motion for Discovery MOTION to Stay re #1023 MOTION to Vacate Orders, Settlement Agreement and Judgment, #1026 Brief, and Motion for Discovery ) filed byThomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 9/23/2011)
September 16, 2011 Filing 1035 RESPONSE (re #1023 MOTION to Vacate Orders, Settlement Agreement and Judgment, #1025 MOTION for Discovery (Post-Judgment) for Evidence Re Motion to Vacate MOTION for Discovery (Post-Judgment) for Evidence Re Motion to Vacate, #1029 MOTION to Stay re #1023 MOTION to Vacate Orders, Settlement Agreement and Judgment, #1026 Brief, and Motion for Discovery MOTION to Stay re #1023 MOTION to Vacate Orders, Settlement Agreement and Judgment, #1026 Brief, and Motion for Discovery ) filed byJose Roe. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John Hill, #2 Declaration of James M. Wagstaffe, #3 Exhibits A-C to Declaration of James M. Wagstaffe)(Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 9/16/2011)
September 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1034 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying #1031 Motion to Shorten Time (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2011)
September 2, 2011 Filing 1033 EXHIBITS re #1028 Declaration in Support,, Corrected/Readable Exhibit D, filed byThomas F. White. (Attachments: #1 Internet Communications)(Related document(s) #1028 ) (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 9/2/2011)
September 2, 2011 Filing 1032 Proposed Order re #1031 MOTION to Shorten Time to Hear Motion to Stay Payments on Judgment by Thomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 9/2/2011)
September 2, 2011 Filing 1031 MOTION to Shorten Time to Hear #1029 Motion to Stay Payments on Judgment filed by Thomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 9/2/2011) Modified on 9/6/2011 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
September 2, 2011 Filing 1030 Brief re #1029 MOTION to Stay re #1023 MOTION to Vacate Orders, Settlement Agreement and Judgment, and #1025 Motion for Discovery filed byThomas F. White. (Related document(s) #1029 ) (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 9/2/2011) Modified on 9/6/2011 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
September 2, 2011 Filing 1029 MOTION to Stay re #1023 MOTION to Vacate Orders, Settlement Agreement and Judgment, and #1025 Motion for Discovery filed by Thomas F. White. Motion Hearing set for 10/14/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 9/16/2011. Replies due by 9/23/2011. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 9/2/2011) Modified on 9/6/2011 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
September 2, 2011 Filing 1028 Declaration of Geoffrey Rotwein in Support of #1025 MOTION for Discovery (Post-Judgment) for Evidence Re Motion to Vacate filed byThomas F. White. (Attachments: #1 Business Records Subpoena, #2 List of Privileged Documents, #3 Internet Communications, #4 Internet Communications, #5 Internet Communications, #6 Privileged Documents)(Related document(s) #1025 ) (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 9/2/2011) Modified on 9/6/2011 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
September 2, 2011 Filing 1027 Declaration of Patricia De Larios Peyton in Support of #1025 MOTION for Discovery (Post-Judgment) for Evidence Re Motion to Vacate filed by Thomas F. White. (Related document(s) #1025 ) (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 9/2/2011) Modified on 9/6/2011 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
September 2, 2011 Filing 1026 Brief re #1025 MOTION for Discovery (Post-Judgment) for Evidence Re Motion to Vacate filed byThomas F. White. (Related document(s) #1025 ) (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 9/2/2011) Modified on 9/6/2011 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
September 2, 2011 Filing 1025 MOTION for Discovery (Post-Judgment) for Evidence Re Motion to Vacate filed by Thomas F. White. Motion Hearing set for 10/14/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 9/16/2011. Replies due by 9/23/2011. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 9/2/2011)
September 2, 2011 Filing 1024 Brief re #1023 MOTION to Vacate Orders, Settlement Agreement and Judgment filed byThomas F. White. (Related document(s) #1023 ) (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 9/2/2011)
September 2, 2011 Filing 1023 MOTION to Vacate Orders, Settlement Agreement and Judgment filed by Thomas F. White. Motion Hearing set for 11/4/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 9/16/2011. Replies due by 9/23/2011. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 9/2/2011)
May 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1022 ORDER Re Payment of Guardian Ad Litem Invoice #4 re #1019 Status Report filed by James M. Wagstaffe. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/6/2011. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2011)
May 5, 2011 Filing 1021 Proposed Order re #1019 GUARDIAN AD LITEMS REPORT RE: FEES AND COSTS by James M. Wagstaffe. (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 5/5/2011) Modified on 5/6/2011 (mjj2, COURT STAFF).
May 5, 2011 Filing 1020 Declaration of James M. Wagstaffe in support of #1019 GUARDIAN AD LITEMS REPORT RE: FEES AND COSTS filed byJames M. Wagstaffe. (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 5/5/2011) Modified on 5/6/2011 (mjj2, COURT STAFF).
May 5, 2011 Filing 1019 STATUS REPORT GUARDIAN AD LITEMS REPORT RE: FEES AND COSTS by James M. Wagstaffe. (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 5/5/2011)
November 17, 2010 Filing 1018 MANDATE of USCA as to #886 Notice of Appeal filed by Thomas F. White. The judgment of this Court, entered 9/16/10, takes effect this date. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2010)
November 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1017 ORDER of USCA as to #886 Notice of Appeal filed by Thomas F. White. The Appellant's petition for panel rehearing is denied. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2010)
September 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1016 ORDER of USCA as to #886 Notice of Appeal filed by Thomas F. White (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2010)
September 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1015 ORDER of USCA: Appellant's motion to expedite oral argument is denied as moot; as to #886 Notice of Appeal filed by Thomas F. White (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2010)
September 24, 2010 Filing 1014 USCA Memorandum: AFFIRMED; as to #886 Notice of Appeal filed by Thomas F. White (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2010)
September 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1013 ORDER of USCA as to #886 Notice of Appeal filed by Thomas F. White (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2010)
May 11, 2010 Filing 1012 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #1011 Order (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2010)
May 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1011 ORDER Re PAYMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM INVOICE #3. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/10/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2010)
February 18, 2010 Filing 1010 Proposed Order re GUARDIAN AD LITEMS REPORT RE: FEES AND COSTS by James M. Wagstaffe. (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 2/18/2010)
February 18, 2010 Filing 1009 Declaration of James M. Wagstaffe in support of GUARDIAN AD LITEMS REPORT RE: FEES AND COSTS filed byJames M. Wagstaffe. (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 2/18/2010)
February 18, 2010 Filing 1008 STATUS REPORT : GUARDIAN AD LITEMS REPORT RE: FEES AND COSTS by James M. Wagstaffe. (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 2/18/2010)
December 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1007 ORDER RE: DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT AND FOR SANCTIONS AND DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STAY JUDGMENT PENDING RULING ON MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/11/2009. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2009)
December 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1006 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting in part #998 Motion for Reconsideration. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2009)
December 8, 2009 Filing 1005 STATUS REPORT FILED UNDER SEAL (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2009)
December 6, 2009 Filing 1004 Reply to Opposition to #998 Motion to Reconsider Order Denying Motion to Vacate Judgment, filed byThomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 12/6/2009) Modified on 12/7/2009 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
December 3, 2009 Filing 1003 Memorandum in Opposition re #998 MOTION for Reconsideration re #996 Order on Motion to Stay and to Deny Motion to Vacate Judgment, MOTION for Reconsideration re #996 Order on Motion to Stay and to Deny Motion to Vacate Judgment, filed byJames M. Wagstaffe. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 12/3/2009)
November 30, 2009 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #998 MOTION for Reconsideration re #996 Order on Motion to Stay and to Deny Motion to Vacate Judgment, MOTION for Reconsideration re #996 Order on Motion to Stay and to Deny Motion to Vacate Judgment,. Motion Hearing set for 12/18/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2009)
November 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1002 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #1000 Motion to Shorten Time (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2009)
November 25, 2009 Filing 1001 Proposed Order re #1000 MOTION to Shorten Time for Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Reconsider Order Denying Motion to Vacate Judgment, by Thomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 11/25/2009)
November 25, 2009 Filing 1000 MOTION to Shorten Time for Hearing on #998 Defendant's Motion to Reconsider Order Denying Motion to Vacate Judgment, filed by Thomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 11/25/2009) Modified on 11/30/2009 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
November 24, 2009 Filing 999 Brief re #998 MOTION for Reconsideration re #996 Order on Motion to Stay and to Deny Motion to Vacate Judgment, MOTION for Reconsideration re #996 Order on Motion to Stay and to Deny Motion to Vacate Judgment, filed byThomas F. White. (Related document(s) #998 ) (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 11/24/2009)
November 24, 2009 Filing 998 MOTION for Reconsideration re #996 Order on Motion to Stay and to Deny Motion to Vacate Judgment, filed by Thomas F. White. Motion Hearing set for 12/18/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 11/24/2009)
November 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 996 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying #993 Motion to Stay (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2009)
November 20, 2009 Filing 997 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 11/20/2009 before Charles R. Breyer (Date Filed: 11/20/2009) re #993 Final MOTION to Stay Judgment Pending Ruling on Motion to Vacate Judgment filed by Thomas F. White. (Court Reporter Kathy Wyatt.) (be, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/20/2009)
November 20, 2009 Filing 995 OBJECTIONS to Plaintiffs' Proposed Order Denying Defendant's Motion to Vacate Judgment, by Thomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 11/20/2009)
November 10, 2009 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #993 Final MOTION to Stay Judgment Pending Ruling on Motion to Vacate Judgment. Motion Hearing set for 11/20/2009 10:00 AM. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
November 10, 2009 Filing 994 CORRECTED NOTICE by Thomas F. White re 978 Memorandum in Support, #992 Reply Memorandum, #993 Final MOTION to Stay Judgment Pending Ruling on Motion to Vacate Judgment, #981 Brief, #980 Declaration in Support, (Correcting Time in Previous Pleadings), (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 11/10/2009) Modified on 11/12/2009 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
November 9, 2009 Filing 993 Final MOTION to Stay Judgment Pending Ruling on Motion to Vacate Judgment filed by Thomas F. White. Motion Hearing set for 11/20/2009 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 11/9/2009)
November 9, 2009 Filing 992 Reply Memorandum to Plaintiffs' Opposition to #979 Motion to Vacate Judgment (Request for Court Indication to Entertain/Grant Motion) filed byThomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 11/9/2009) Modified on 11/10/2009 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
November 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 991 ORDER continuing Motion to Vacate Judgment and for Sanctions re #990 Stipulation filed by James M. Wagstaffe, Set/Reset Deadlines as to #990 Stipulation. Replies due by 11/10/2009. Motion Hearing set for 11/20/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/30/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2009)
October 29, 2009 Filing 990 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order by James M. Wagstaffe. (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 10/29/2009)
October 28, 2009 Filing 989 Joinder IN #987 OPPOSITION FILED BY JAMES WAGSTAFF, GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR JOSE ROE I, JOSE ROE II, JOSE ROE III AND JOSE ROE IV TO DEFENDANT THOMAS F. WHITE'S MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT AND FOR STAY OF JUDGMENT by John E. Hill. (Hill, John) (Filed on 10/28/2009) Modified on 10/29/2009 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
October 27, 2009 Filing 988 Declaration of James M. Wagstaffe in Support of #987 Memorandum in Opposition filed byJames M. Wagstaffe. (Related document(s) #987 ) (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 10/27/2009)
October 27, 2009 Filing 987 Memorandum in Opposition to #979 DEFENDANTS MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT AND FOR SANCTIONS AND DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STAY filed byJames M. Wagstaffe. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 10/27/2009) Modified on 10/28/2009 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
October 13, 2009 Filing 986 Minute Entry: Status Conference (Date Filed: 10/13/2009), ***Motions terminated: #865 MOTION to Seal filed by John E. Hill, #752 Joint MOTION To Approve and Adopt Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law #982 Final MOTION to Shorten Time filed by Thomas F. White, #847 Ex Parte MOTION to Seal filed by Jose Roe, #979 Final MOTION to Stay of Judgment Pending Ruling on Motion to Vacate Judgment under Rule 60, filed by Thomas F. White.. Responses due by 10/27/2009. Replies due by 11/3/2009. Motion to Vacate Hearing set for 11/12/2009 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Court Reporter Debra Pas.) (be, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/13/2009)
October 8, 2009 Filing 985 Declaration of James M. Wagstaffe in Support of #984 Memorandum in Opposition to Application to Shorten Time filed byJames M. Wagstaffe. (Related document(s) #984 ) (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 10/8/2009)
October 8, 2009 Filing 984 Memorandum in Opposition to #982 Application to filed byJames M. Wagstaffe. (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 10/8/2009) Modified on 10/9/2009 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
October 5, 2009 Filing 983 Proposed Order re #982 Final MOTION to Shorten Time to Hear Motion for Stay of Judgment Pending Ruling on Motion to Vacate under Rule 60, by Thomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 10/5/2009)
October 5, 2009 Filing 982 Final MOTION to Shorten Time to Hear #979 Motion for Stay of Judgment Pending Ruling on Motion to Vacate under Rule 60, filed by Thomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 10/5/2009) Modified on 10/6/2009 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
October 5, 2009 Filing 981 Brief re #979 Final MOTION to Stay of Judgment Pending Ruling on Motion to Vacate Judgment under Rule 60,, #980 Declaration in Support filed byThomas F. White. (Related document(s) #979 , #980 ) (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 10/5/2009)
October 5, 2009 Filing 980 Declaration of Geoffrey Rotwein in Support of #979 Final MOTION to Stay of Judgment Pending Ruling on Motion to Vacate Judgment under Rule 60, filed byThomas F. White. (Related document(s) #979 ) (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 10/5/2009) Modified on 10/6/2009 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
October 5, 2009 Filing 979 Final MOTION to Stay of Judgment Pending Ruling on Motion to Vacate Judgment under Rule 60, filed by Thomas F. White. Motion Hearing set for 10/13/2009 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 10/5/2009)
October 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 976 ORDER granting protective order *** FILED UNDER SEAL *** Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/1/09. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2009)
October 1, 2009 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 10/13/2009 11:00 AM. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
October 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 975 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/1/2009. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2009)
September 25, 2009 Filing 978 MEMORANDUM of points and authorities re Motion to Vacate Judgment and for Sanctions filed byThomas F. White. *** FILED UNDER SEAL *** (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2009)
September 25, 2009 Filing 977 APPLICATION under seal for Protective Order regarding Declaration of a Witness and Redactions of his/her statements from the Memorandum in support of Motion to Vacate by Thomas F. White. *** FILED UNDER SEAL *** (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2009)
March 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 974 ORDER of USCA as to (886 in 3:03-cv-04035-CRB) Notice of Appeal filed by Thomas F. White, (103 in 3:06-cv-01595-CRB) Notice of Appeal filed by Ramon Alejandro Hernandez Garcia, Gabriel Hilario Alcaraz Martinez, Elias Felipe Orozco Sanchez, Christian Fidal Arechiga Torres, (92 in 3:06-cv-02322-CRB) Notice of Appeal filed by Jose Luis Luna Trujillo, Pedro Garcia Perez, Ernesto Alonso Benitez Diaz. Having reviewed the parties' status reports, the Court VACATES the March 26, 2009, oral argument in these consolidated appeals. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2009)
March 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 973 ORDER of USCA as to #886 Notice of Appeal filed by Thomas F. White. Status Report due 3/18/09. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2009)
March 4, 2009 Filing 972 Status Report FILED UNDER SEAL . (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2009)
January 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 971 ORDER re payment of guardian ad litem invoice no. 2. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/6/2009. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2009)
December 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 970 ORDER of USCA (USCA #08-15891, 07-16558, 07-16569) as to #886 Notice of Appeal filed by Thomas F. White. It is hereby ordered these appeals be consolidated for oral argument purposes only. Oral argument set for 3/26/09 at 3:00 pm. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/24/2008)
December 23, 2008 Filing 969 Proposed Order re: Payment of Guardian Ad Litem Invoice #2 by James M. Wagstaffe. (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 12/23/2008)
December 23, 2008 Filing 968 Declaration of James M. Wagstaffe in Connection with Guardian Ad Litem's Report re: Fees & Costs filed byJames M. Wagstaffe. (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 12/23/2008)
December 23, 2008 Filing 967 STATUS REPORT Guardian Ad Litem's Report Re: Fees & Costs by James M. Wagstaffe. (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 12/23/2008)
December 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 966 ORDER of USCA as to #886 Notice of Appeal filed by Thomas F. White. Appellant's motion to expedite oral argument hearing on appeal is granted. Oral argument set for 3/26/09 at 3:00 pm. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2008)
June 18, 2008 Filing 961 Receipt from USCA for certificate of record. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2008)
June 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 960 AMENDED ORDER re: payment of funds from court's registry. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/18/2008. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2008)
June 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 959 ORDER re: payment of funds to trust lawyer. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/6/2008. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2008)
June 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 958 ORDER re: payment of balance to Irrevocable Trust. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/11/2008. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2008)
June 10, 2008 Filing 957 Certificate of Record Mailed to USCA re #886 Notice of Appeal. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2008)
June 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 956 ORDER denying motion for sanctions. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/4/2008. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2008)
June 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 955 *** ERRONEOUS ENTRY *** ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying #815 Motion for Sanctions. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2008) Modified on 6/5/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
June 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 954 ORDER re amendment to trust. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/4/2008. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2008)
May 22, 2008 Filing 953 Transcript of Proceedings held on 05/01/08, before Judge Joseph C. Spero. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sahar McVickar, Telephone number (415) 626-6060. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/18/2008. (McVickar, Sahar) (Filed on 5/22/2008)
May 21, 2008 Filing 952 Transcript of Proceedings held on April 4, 2008, before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine A. Powell, CSR, Telephone number 415-794-6659. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/18/2008. (Katherine, Powell) (Filed on 5/21/2008)
May 19, 2008 Filing 951 Transcript Designation and Ordering Form before Judge Charles R. Breyer, (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 5/19/2008)
May 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 950 ORDER of USCA (USCA # 08-15891) denying Emergency Motion to Stay Judgment and Distribution of Funds or Set a Bond. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2008)
May 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 949 ORDER TO THE CLERK OF COURT RE DESIGNATION OF PAYEE ON CHECK FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AS TO MAURICIO RODRIGUEZ-BORREGO. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 05/14/08. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2008)
May 13, 2008 Filing 948 STIPULATION re #946 Order ; Authorization and Request re Designation of Payee on Check for Attorneys Fees by Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego. (Kawaii, Thomas) (Filed on 5/13/2008)
May 13, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 947 ORDER re: delivery of attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/13/2008. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2008)
May 13, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 946 ORDER DENYING REQUEST FOR MODIFICATION OF PAYEE.. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 05/13/08. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2008)
May 8, 2008 Filing 945 USCA ORDER (USCA # 08-70226) denying Emergency Motion to Stay Judgment and Distribution of Funds or Set a Bond. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2008)
May 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 944 AMENDED ORDER RE ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 05/08/08. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2008)
May 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 943 SECOND AMENDED MEMORANDUM AND ORDER RE COUNSEL FEES AND COSTS. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/8/2008. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2008)
May 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 942 ORDER re: payment of funds from trust to court's registry. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/7/2008. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2008)
May 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 941 AMENDED MEMORANDUM AND ORDER RE COUNSEL FEES AND COSTS. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/7/2008. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2008)
May 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 940 ORDER re: amendment to April 18, 2008 Order. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/7/2008. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2008)
May 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 939 ORDER TO CLERK OF COURT RE ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS. The Clerk of Court is directed to deliver checks payable to the following persons from the settlement funds on deposit w/the Court: David Replogle, John Hill and Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 5/6/8. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2008)
May 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 938 ORDER RE ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 05/06/08. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2008)
May 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 937 ORDER, by Judge Joseph C. Spero, signed 5/5/8, denying #895 Plaintiffs' Motion to Seal Attorney-Client Trial Exhibits. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2008)
May 5, 2008 Filing 936 Letter from David Replogle to the Honorable Joseph C. Spero. (Replogle, David) (Filed on 5/5/2008)
May 5, 2008 Filing 932 Letter Brief Letter to Judge Spero re New Case Law Regarding Attorneys' Fees filed byBradley Phillip Kaplan. (Kaplan, Bradley) (Filed on 5/5/2008)
May 5, 2008 Filing 931 Letter from David Replogle to the Honorable Joseph C. Spero. (Replogle, David) (Filed on 5/5/2008)
May 5, 2008 Filing 930 Letter from William Gwire, Esq.. (Gwire, William) (Filed on 5/5/2008)
May 2, 2008 Filing 935 TRIAL BRIEF and EXHIBITS (3 Binders) by John E. Hill. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2008)
May 2, 2008 Filing 934 TRIAL EXHIBITS (3 Binders) by Jose Roe. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2008)
May 2, 2008 Filing 933 TRIAL BRIEF, EVIDENCE LIST and EXHIBITS (1 Binder) by Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2008)
May 2, 2008 Filing 929 Letter Brief Letter to Judge Spero re Attorneys' Fees filed byBradley Phillip Kaplan. (Kaplan, Bradley) (Filed on 5/2/2008)
May 2, 2008 Filing 928 Reply Declaration of David Replogle in Support of Plaintiffs' Counsel's Request for Attorneys' Fees and Costs by David Replogle. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit D)(Replogle, David) (Filed on 5/2/2008) Modified on 5/5/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
May 1, 2008 Filing 927 Minute Entry: Evidentiary Hearing held on 5/1/2008 before Joseph C. Spero re: Binding Arbitration and Allocation of Awarded Fees and Costs among Replogle, Hill and Rodriguez Borrego. (Court Reporter Sahar McVickar.) (klh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/1/2008) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/1/2008: #1 Trial Log) (klh, COURT STAFF).
April 30, 2008 Filing 926 Declaration of Daniel Stenson Re Evidentiary Hearion of May 1, 2008 filed byBradley Phillip Kaplan. (Kaplan, Bradley) (Filed on 4/30/2008)
April 30, 2008 Filing 925 Declaration of Lorenzo M. Montoya Re Evidentiary Hearing of May 1, 2008 filed byBradley Phillip Kaplan. (Kaplan, Bradley) (Filed on 4/30/2008)
April 30, 2008 Filing 924 Declaration of John D. O'Connor Re Attorneys' Fees filed byBradley Phillip Kaplan. (Kaplan, Bradley) (Filed on 4/30/2008)
April 30, 2008 Filing 923 Declaration of John E. Hill in Support of #922 Exhibits,, Supplemental Declaration of John E. Hill filed byBradley Phillip Kaplan. (Related document(s) #922 ) (Kaplan, Bradley) (Filed on 4/30/2008)
April 30, 2008 Filing 922 EXHIBITS to Supplemental Declaration of John E. Hill filed byBradley Phillip Kaplan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 41, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 42, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 43, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 44, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 45, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 46, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 47, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 48, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 49, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 50, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 51, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 52, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 53, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 54, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 55, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 56, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 57, #18 Exhibit Exhibit 58, #19 Exhibit Exhibit 59, #20 Exhibit Exhibit 60, #21 Exhibit Exhibit 61, #22 Exhibit Exhibit 62)(Kaplan, Bradley) (Filed on 4/30/2008)
April 28, 2008 Filing 921 Minute Entry: Final Pretrial Conference held on 4/28/2008 before Joseph C. Spero. Each side will have 90 minutes to present argument. Bench Trial set for 5/1/2008 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Court Reporter Sahar McVickar.) (klh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/28/2008)
April 25, 2008 Filing 920 TRIAL BRIEF Plaintiffs' Counsel's Reply Trial Brief by David Replogle. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Replogle, David) (Filed on 4/25/2008)
April 25, 2008 Filing 919 Exhibit List Plaintiffs' Counsel's Objections to Proposed Documentary Evidence Submitted by John E. Hill by David Replogle.. (Replogle, David) (Filed on 4/25/2008)
April 25, 2008 Filing 918 OBJECTIONS to David Replogle's Trial Brief and Trial Exhibits by John E. Hill . (Kaplan, Bradley) (Filed on 4/25/2008) Modified on 4/28/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
April 23, 2008 Filing 917 Exhibit List /Evidence List for evidentiary hearing re allocation of fees and award of costs by Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego.. (Kawaii, Thomas) (Filed on 4/23/2008)
April 23, 2008 Filing 916 TRIAL BRIEF re: Allocation of Fees and Award of Costs by Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego. (Kawaii, Thomas) (Filed on 4/23/2008)
April 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 915 ORDER re: unsealing. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/23/2008. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2008)
April 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 914 *** ERRONEOUS ENTRY *** ORDER unsealing documents. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/23/2008. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2008) Modified on 4/24/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
April 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 913 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying #841 Motion to Substitute Attorney. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2008)
April 22, 2008 Filing 911 Memorandum in Opposition TO #877 DEFENDANT THOMAS F. WHITES MOTION TO STAY JUDGMENT PENDING APPEAL AND WAIVING BOND, AND IF DENIED, FOR TEMPORARY STAY TO ALLOW APPLICATION TO NINTH CIRCUIT filed byJames M. Wagstaffe. (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 4/22/2008) Modified on 4/23/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
April 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 910 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying #807 Motion to Vacate ; denying #877 Motion to Stay; finding as moot #880 Motion to Shorten Time. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2008)
April 21, 2008 Filing 912 Transcript Designation and Ordering Form by Thomas F. White for proceedings held on 4/4/08 before Judge Charles R. Breyer. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2008)
April 21, 2008 Filing 909 Exhibit List by David Replogle.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, Part One, #8 Exhibit G, Part Two, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, Part One, #14 Exhibit L, Part Two, #15 Exhibit L, Part Three)(Replogle, David) (Filed on 4/21/2008)
April 21, 2008 Filing 908 TRIAL BRIEF by David Replogle. (Replogle, David) (Filed on 4/21/2008)
April 21, 2008 Filing 907 Exhibit List 28-38 re #902 Brief by John D. O'Connor. (O'Connor, John) (Filed on 4/21/2008) Modified on 4/22/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
April 21, 2008 Filing 906 Exhibit List 19-27 re #902 Brief by John D. O'Connor. (O'Connor, John) (Filed on 4/21/2008) Modified on 4/22/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
April 21, 2008 Filing 905 Exhibit List 10-18 re #902 Brief by John D. O'Connor. (O'Connor, John) (Filed on 4/21/2008) Modified on 4/22/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
April 21, 2008 Filing 904 Exhibit List 1-9 re #902 Brief by John D. O'Connor. (O'Connor, John) (Filed on 4/21/2008) Modified on 4/22/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
April 21, 2008 Filing 903 *** DUPLICATE ENTRY. SEE #901 *** Exhibit List Evidence Presented by John Hill In Suport of Request for Attorney's Fees by John D. O'Connor. (O'Connor, John) (Filed on 4/21/2008) Modified on 4/22/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
April 21, 2008 Filing 902 BRIEF in Support of Law Offices of John E. Hill's Request for Attorneys' Fees by John D. O'Connor. (O'Connor, John) (Filed on 4/21/2008) Modified on 4/22/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
April 21, 2008 Filing 901 Exhibit List 1-38 of Evidence Submitted by John Hill in Support of Request for Attorneys' Fees by John D. O'Connor. (O'Connor, John) (Filed on 4/21/2008) Modified on 4/22/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/22/2008 (klh, COURT STAFF).
April 21, 2008 Filing 900 *** ERRONEOUS ENTRY . SEE #902 *** Exhibit List (1-9; 10-18; 19-27 & 28-38) by John D. O'Connor. (O'Connor, John) (Filed on 4/21/2008) Modified on 4/22/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
April 21, 2008 Filing 899 Declaration of Daniel Stenson Re Work Performed on Behalf of Plaintiffs filed byJohn E. Hill. (Hill, John) (Filed on 4/21/2008)
April 21, 2008 Filing 898 Proposed Order re #895 Ex Parte MOTION to Seal Attorney-Client Trial Exhibits by Jose Roe. (Replogle, David) (Filed on 4/21/2008)
April 21, 2008 Filing 897 Declaration of David Replogle in Support of #895 Ex Parte MOTION to Seal Attorney-Client Trial Exhibits filed byJose Roe. (Related document(s) #895 ) (Replogle, David) (Filed on 4/21/2008)
April 21, 2008 Filing 895 Ex Parte MOTION to Seal Attorney-Client Trial Exhibits filed by Jose Roe. (Replogle, David) (Filed on 4/21/2008)
April 21, 2008 Filing 893 Declaration of David Replogle in Support of #815 MOTION for Sanctions Notice of Motion and Motion for Order To Show Cause Why Defendant Thomas F. White Should Not Be Held in Civil Contempt, for Recovery from Defendant Thomas F. White of Attorneys' Fees and Costs Incurred by Plaintiffs and fo r Sanctions as a Result of White's Filing of a Fraudulent Petition Through His Attorney, Sub Rosa, Eric M. Safire filed byJose Roe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #815 ) (Replogle, David) (Filed on 4/21/2008)
April 20, 2008 Filing 892 RESPONSE in Support re #880 Final MOTION to Shorten Time for Service and Hearing on Motion to Stay Judgment and Waiving Bond Pending Appeal, and if Denied, for Temporary Stay to Allow Application to Ninth Circuit filed byThomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 4/20/2008)
April 18, 2008 Filing 896 USCA Scheduling Order as to #886 Notice of Appeal filed by Thomas F. White. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2008)
April 18, 2008 Filing 894 USCA Case Number 08-15891 USCA for #886 Notice of Appeal filed by Thomas F. White. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
April 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 890 ORDER awarding counsel attorney's fee and costs. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/18/2008. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2008)
April 16, 2008 Filing 889 Reply to Opposition re #880 Final MOTION to Shorten Time for Service and Hearing on Motion to Stay Judgment and Waiving Bond Pending Appeal, and if Denied, for Temporary Stay to Allow Application to Ninth Circuit filed byThomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 4/16/2008)
April 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 891 ORDER RE: PAYMENT OF FUNDS FROM COURT'S REGISTRY. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/15/08. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2008)
April 15, 2008 Filing 888 Copy of Notice of Appeal and Docket sheet mailed to all counsel re #886 Notice of Appeal. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
April 15, 2008 Filing 887 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #886 Notice of Appeal. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/15/2008: #1 Appeal Form) (mcl, COURT STAFF).
April 15, 2008 Filing 885 Memorandum in Opposition re #880 Final MOTION to Shorten Time for Service and Hearing on Motion to Stay Judgment and Waiving Bond Pending Appeal, and if Denied, for Temporary Stay to Allow Application to Ninth Circuit Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant White's Application for an Order Shortening Time for Hearing on Defedant Whiets' Motion To Stay Judgment Pending Appeal from Order Denying White's Third Rule 60 Motion filed byJose Roe. (Replogle, David) (Filed on 4/15/2008)
April 15, 2008 Filing 884 Memorandum in Opposition re #865 MOTION to Seal - Application for Order Permitting Law Offices of John E. Hill to View Documents Under Seal Plaintiffs' Opposition to Application of Terminated Associated Counsel John E. Hill To View Documents Filed Under Seal filed byJose Roe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Replogle, David) (Filed on 4/15/2008)
April 14, 2008 Set/Reset Hearings: Evidentiary Hearing set for 5/1/2008 09:00 AM. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
April 14, 2008 Filing 886 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #860 Minute by Thomas F. White. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 34611018109. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2008)
April 14, 2008 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge for Evidentiary Hearing (wh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2008)
April 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 883 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #874 Stipulation and ORDER RE: BINDING ARBITRATION filed by James M. Wagstaffe. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/14/08. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2008)
April 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 882 ORDER setting Magistrate Judge hearing and briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/14/2008. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2008)
April 14, 2008 Filing 881 Proposed Order re #880 Final MOTION to Shorten Time for Service and Hearing on Motion to Stay Judgment and Waiving Bond Pending Appeal, and if Denied, for Temporary Stay to Allow Application to Ninth Circuit by Thomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 4/14/2008)
April 14, 2008 Filing 880 Final MOTION to Shorten Time for Service and Hearing on #877 Motion to Stay Judgment and Waiving Bond Pending Appeal, and if Denied, for Temporary Stay to Allow Application to Ninth Circuit filed by Thomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 4/14/2008) Modified on 4/16/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
April 14, 2008 Filing 879 Declaration of Geoffrey Rotwein in Support of #877 Final MOTION to Stay Judgment and Distribution of Funds Pending Appeal, and if Denied, for Temporary Stay to Allow Application to Ninth Circuit, filed byThomas F. White. (Related document(s) #877 ) (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 4/14/2008) Modified on 4/16/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
April 14, 2008 Filing 878 Brief re #877 Final MOTION to Stay Judgment and Distribution of Funds Pending Appeal, and if Denied, for Temporary Stay to Allow Application to Ninth Circuit, filed byThomas F. White. (Related document(s) #877 ) (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 4/14/2008)
April 14, 2008 Filing 877 Final MOTION to Stay Judgment and Distribution of Funds Pending Appeal, and if Denied, for Temporary Stay to Allow Application to Ninth Circuit, filed by Thomas F. White. Motion Hearing set for 4/25/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 4/14/2008)
April 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 876 ORDER re payment of special master invoices nos. 4 & 5. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/14/2008. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2008)
April 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 875 ORDER re payment of guardian ad litem invoice #1. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/14/2008. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2008)
April 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 874 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: BINDING ARBITRATION by James M. Wagstaffe. (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 4/11/2008)
April 11, 2008 Filing 873 Declaration of James M. Wagstaffe in Support of #872 Status Report filed byJames M. Wagstaffe. (Related document(s) #872 ) (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 4/11/2008)
April 11, 2008 Filing 872 STATUS REPORT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM by James M. Wagstaffe. (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 4/11/2008)
April 11, 2008 Filing 871 Brief re #838 Order Memorandum in Support of Award of Contingency Fee Jointly Submitted by David Replogle, Attorney for Plaintiffs, and William Gwire, Attorney for Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego filed byMauricio Rodriguez Borrego, Jose Roe. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Related document(s) #838 ) (Replogle, David) (Filed on 4/11/2008)
April 11, 2008 Filing 870 Brief re #841 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion To Confirm Termination of John E. Hill as Associated Counsel Reply Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion To Confirm Termination of John E. Hill as Associated Counsel filed byJose Roe. (Related document(s) #841 ) (Replogle, David) (Filed on 4/11/2008)
April 11, 2008 Filing 869 Declaration of DANIEL A. STENSON filed byJohn E. Hill. (Hill, John) (Filed on 4/11/2008)
April 11, 2008 Filing 868 Proposed Order re #865 by John E. Hill. (Guta, Michael) (Filed on 4/11/2008) Modified on 4/14/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
April 11, 2008 Filing 867 Declaration of John E. Hill Supporting #865 Application for Order Allowing Law Offices of John E. Hill to View Documents Filed Under Seal filed byJohn E. Hill. (Guta, Michael) (Filed on 4/11/2008) Modified on 4/14/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
April 11, 2008 Filing 866 Declaration of Michael P. Guita Supporting #865 Application Allowing Law Offices of John E. Hill to View Documents Filed Under Seal filed byJohn E. Hill. (Guta, Michael) (Filed on 4/11/2008) Modified on 4/14/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
April 11, 2008 Filing 865 MOTION to Seal - Application for Order Permitting Law Offices of John E. Hill to View Documents Under Seal filed by John E. Hill. (Guta, Michael) (Filed on 4/11/2008)
April 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 864 ORDER of USCA Denying Petition for Writ of Mandamus. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2008)
April 9, 2008 Filing 863 AFFIDAVIT re #838 Order Declaration of David Replogle Re Supplemental Declaration of Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego in Support of Award of Attorneys' Fees by Jose Roe. (Replogle, David) (Filed on 4/9/2008)
April 8, 2008 Filing 862 NOTICE by Jose Roe Notice of Entry of Order Denying Petition for Writ of Mandamus (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Replogle, David) (Filed on 4/8/2008)
April 7, 2008 Filing 861 Memorandum in Opposition to #841 Motion to Confirm Termination of John E. Hill as Associated Counsel filed byJohn E. Hill. (Guta, Michael) (Filed on 4/7/2008) Modified on 4/8/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
April 4, 2008 Filing 860 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 4/4/2008 before Charles R. Breyer (Date Filed: 4/4/2008) re #807 Final MOTION to Vacate Orders, Settlement Agreement and Judgment, filed by Thomas F. White, #815 Notice of Motion and Motion for Order To Show Cause filed by Jose Roe, Show Cause Hearing held on 4/4/2008 before Charles R. Breyer (Date Filed: 4/4/2008). (Court Reporter Kathy Powell.) (be, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/4/2008)
April 1, 2008 Filing 859 Letter from John E. Hill to Judge Breyer. (Hill, John) (Filed on 4/1/2008)
April 1, 2008 Filing 858 Letter from David Replogle to John E. Hill and John Dennis O'Connor. (Replogle, David) (Filed on 4/1/2008)
March 28, 2008 Filing 964 Declaration of David Replogle re plaintiffs' attorneys' fees filed byJose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2008)
March 28, 2008 Filing 963 Revised Declaration of Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego re Costs Submitted Pursuant to the 3/17/08 Court Order setting briefing schedule on fees and costs filed byMauricio Rodriguez Borrego. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2008)
March 28, 2008 Filing 962 Supplemental Declaration of Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego in support of award of attorney's fees filed byMauricio Rodriguez Borrego. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2008) (mcl, COURT STAFF).
March 28, 2008 Received Lodged Documents - Declaration of David Replogle re plaintiffs' attorneys' fees, Declaration of David Replogle re costs, expenditures and advances paid by plaintiff's counsel by Jose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
March 28, 2008 Filing 857 EXHIBITS EXHIBIT A filed byJohn E. Hill. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Hill, John) (Filed on 3/28/2008)
March 28, 2008 Filing 856 Declaration of Michael P. Guta in Support of #852 Brief Declaration of Michael P. Guta in Support of Law Offices of John E. Hill Fee Application filed byJohn E. Hill. (Related document(s) #852 ) (Hill, John) (Filed on 3/28/2008)
March 28, 2008 Filing 855 EXHIBITS filed byJohn E. Hill. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit Exhibit D)(Hill, John) (Filed on 3/28/2008)
March 28, 2008 Filing 854 EXHIBITS re #853 Declaration in Support, EXHIBIT A filed byJohn E. Hill. (Related document(s) #853 ) (Hill, John) (Filed on 3/28/2008)
March 28, 2008 Filing 853 Declaration of John E. Hill in Support of #852 Brief Declaration of John E. Hill In Response to Order Setting Briefing Schedule on Fees and Costs Filed on March 17, 2008 filed byJohn E. Hill. (Related document(s) #852 ) (Hill, John) (Filed on 3/28/2008)
March 28, 2008 Filing 852 Brief Memorandum in Support of John E. Hill and John E. Hill, A Professional Corporation, in Support of Application for Attorney Fees filed byJohn E. Hill. (Hill, John) (Filed on 3/28/2008)
March 28, 2008 Filing 851 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 8/3/07 before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Court Reporter: Katherine A. Powell. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2008) (mclS, COURT STAFF).
March 28, 2008 Filing 850 Joinder re #847 Ex Parte MOTION to Seal Application of Plaintiffs for an Order To File Under Seal All Documents in Response to the Court's Order Directing Parties To Submit Additional Memoranda and Declarations Concerning Attorneys' Fees and Costs and for by Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego. (Gwire, William) (Filed on 3/28/2008)
March 26, 2008 Filing 849 Proposed Order re #847 Ex Parte MOTION to Seal Application of Plaintiffs for an Order To File Under Seal All Documents in Response to the Court's Order Directing Parties To Submit Additional Memoranda and Declarations Concerning Attorneys' Fees and Costs and for an Order To Relieve Interested Parties of the Requirement That Such Memoranda and Declarations Be Served on Defendant Thomas F. White by Jose Roe. (Replogle, David) (Filed on 3/26/2008)
March 26, 2008 Filing 848 Declaration of David Replogle in Support of #847 Ex Parte MOTION to Seal Application of Plaintiffs for an Order To File Under Seal All Documents in Response to the Court's Order Directing Parties To Submit Additional Memoranda and Declarations Concerning Attorneys' Fees and Costs and for an Order To Relieve Interested Parties of the Requirement That Such Memoranda and Declarations Be Served on Defendant Thomas F. White filed byJose Roe. (Related document(s) #847 ) (Replogle, David) (Filed on 3/26/2008)
March 26, 2008 Filing 847 Ex Parte MOTION to Seal Application of Plaintiffs for an Order To File Under Seal All Documents in Response to the Court's Order Directing Parties To Submit Additional Memoranda and Declarations Concerning Attorneys' Fees and Costs and for an Order To Relieve Interested Parties of the Requirement That Such Memoranda and Declarations Be Served on Defendant Thomas F. White filed by Jose Roe. (Replogle, David) (Filed on 3/26/2008)
March 26, 2008 Filing 846 Reply to Opposition to #807 Motion to Vacate Orders, Settlement Agreement and Judgment, filed byThomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 3/26/2008) Modified on 3/27/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
March 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 845 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying #839 Motion to Seal; denying #839 Motion to Seal Document (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2008)
March 22, 2008 Filing 844 Reply to Opposition re #815 MOTION for Sanctions Notice of Motion and Motion for Order To Show Cause Why Defendant Thomas F. White Should Not Be Held in Civil Contempt, for Recovery from Defendant Thomas F. White of Attorneys' Fees and Costs Incurred by Plaintiffs and fo r Sanctions as a Result of White's Filing of a Fraudulent Petition Through His Attorney, Sub Rosa, Eric M. Safire filed byJose Roe. (Replogle, David) (Filed on 3/22/2008)
March 21, 2008 Filing 843 Declaration of David Replogle in Support of #841 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion To Confirm Termination of John E. Hill as Associated Counsel filed byJose Roe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, Part One, #3 Exhibit B, Part Two, #4 Exhibit B, Part Three)(Related document(s) #841 ) (Replogle, David) (Filed on 3/21/2008)
March 21, 2008 Filing 842 Brief re #841 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion To Confirm Termination of John E. Hill as Associated Counsel filed byJose Roe. (Related document(s) #841 ) (Replogle, David) (Filed on 3/21/2008)
March 21, 2008 Filing 841 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion To Confirm Termination of John E. Hill as Associated Counsel filed by Jose Roe. Motion Hearing set for 4/25/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Replogle, David) (Filed on 3/21/2008)
March 21, 2008 Filing 840 Proposed Order re #839 Final MOTION to Seal Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply to Oppositions to Motion to Vacate Orders, Settlement Agreement and Judgment MOTION to Seal Document by Thomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 3/21/2008)
March 21, 2008 Filing 839 Final MOTION to Seal Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply to Oppositions to Motion to Vacate Orders, Settlement Agreement and Judgment, MOTION to Seal Document filed by Thomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 3/21/2008)
March 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 838 ORDER setting briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/17/2008. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2008)
March 14, 2008 Filing 837 Brief re #827 Status Report Response to Guardian Ad Litem Report filed byMauricio Rodriguez Borrego. (Related document(s) #827 ) (Gwire, William) (Filed on 3/14/2008)
March 14, 2008 Filing 836 Memorandum in Opposition re #807 Final MOTION to Vacate Orders, Settlement Agreement and Judgment, filed byMauricio Rodriguez Borrego. (Gwire, William) (Filed on 3/14/2008)
March 14, 2008 Filing 835 Brief - Response to Report of Guardian ad Litem filed byJohn E. Hill. (Guta, Michael) (Filed on 3/14/2008)
March 14, 2008 Filing 834 Memorandum in Opposition re #807 Final MOTION to Vacate Orders, Settlement Agreement and Judgment, Plaintiffs' Joinder in Guardian ad Litem's Opposition to Motion To Vacate Orders, Settlement Agreement and Judgment filed byJose Roe. (Replogle, David) (Filed on 3/14/2008)
March 14, 2008 Filing 833 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Vacate Orders, Settlement Agreement and Judgment filed byJohn E. Hill. (Guta, Michael) (Filed on 3/14/2008)
March 14, 2008 Filing 832 OBJECTIONS to re #817 Declaration in Support Regarding Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions and Civil Contempt against Defendant, by Thomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 3/14/2008) Modified on 3/17/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
March 14, 2008 Filing 831 Memorandum in Opposition re #815 MOTION for Sanctions Notice of Motion and Motion for Order To Show Cause Why Defendant Thomas F. White Should Not Be Held in Civil Contempt, for Recovery from Defendant Thomas F. White of Attorneys' Fees and Costs Incurred by Plaintiffs and fo r Civil Contempt, filed byThomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 3/14/2008)
March 14, 2008 Filing 830 Declaration of Geoffrey Rotwein in Support of #807 Final MOTION to Vacate Orders, Settlement Agreement and Judgment, filed byThomas F. White. (Related document(s) #807 ) (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 3/14/2008)
March 12, 2008 Filing 829 RESPONSE to re #827 Status Report Plaintiffs' Response to Report by the Guardian ad Litem and Request for Evidentiary Hearing by Jose Roe. (Replogle, David) (Filed on 3/12/2008)
March 11, 2008 Filing 828 Memorandum in Opposition re #807 Final MOTION to Vacate Orders, Settlement Agreement and Judgment, filed byJames M. Wagstaffe. (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 3/11/2008)
March 7, 2008 Filing 827 STATUS REPORT re Guardian Ad Litem Report by James M. Wagstaffe. (Wagstaffe, James) (Filed on 3/7/2008)
March 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 826 ORDER of USCA (USCA # 08-70226) : The petitioner's motion for permission to file one reply brief to oppositions by real parties is granted. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2008)
March 6, 2008 Filing 825 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley P. Kaplan (Kaplan, Bradley) (Filed on 3/6/2008)
March 5, 2008 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #815 MOTION for Sanctions Notice of Motion and Motion for Order To Show Cause Why Defendant Thomas F. White Should Not Be Held in Civil Contempt, for Recovery from Defendant Thomas F. White of Attorneys' Fees and Costs Incurred by Plaintiffs and for sanctions. Motion Hearing set for 4/4/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2008)
March 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 824 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #818 Motion to Continue (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2008)
March 5, 2008 Filing 823 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #818 Ex Parte MOTION to Continue Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions, (Third Supplement) filed byThomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 3/5/2008)
March 5, 2008 Filing 822 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #818 Ex Parte MOTION to Continue Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions, (Second Supplement) filed byThomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 3/5/2008)
March 4, 2008 Filing 821 Memorandum in Opposition re #818 Ex Parte MOTION to Continue Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions, Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant White's Ex Parte Application for Order Continuing Motion for Order To Show Cause Re Contempt filed byJose Roe. (Replogle, David) (Filed on 3/4/2008)
March 3, 2008 Filing 820 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #818 Ex Parte MOTION to Continue Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions, (Supplemental) filed byThomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 3/3/2008)
February 25, 2008 Filing 819 Proposed Order re #818 Ex Parte MOTION to Continue Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions, by Thomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 2/25/2008)
February 25, 2008 Filing 818 Ex Parte MOTION to Continue Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions, filed by Thomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 2/25/2008)
February 22, 2008 Filing 817 Declaration of David Replogle in Support of #815 MOTION for Sanctions Notice of Motion and Motion for Order To Show Cause Why Defendant Thomas F. White Should Not Be Held in Civil Contempt, for Recovery from Defendant Thomas F. White of Attorneys' Fees and Costs Incurred by Plaintiffs and fo r Sanctions as a Result of White's Filing of a Fraudulent Petition Through His Attorney, Sub Rosa, Eric M. Safire filed byJose Roe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) #815 ) (Replogle, David) (Filed on 2/22/2008)
February 22, 2008 Filing 816 Brief re #815 MOTION for Sanctions Notice of Motion and Motion for Order To Show Cause Why Defendant Thomas F. White Should Not Be Held in Civil Contempt, for Recovery from Defendant Thomas F. White of Attorneys' Fees and Costs Incurred by Plaintiffs and fo r Sanctions as a Result of White's Filing of a Fraudulent Petition Through His Attorney, Sub Rosa, Eric M. Safire filed byJose Roe. (Related document(s) #815 ) (Replogle, David) (Filed on 2/22/2008)
February 22, 2008 Filing 815 MOTION for Sanctions Notice of Motion and Motion for Order To Show Cause Why Defendant Thomas F. White Should Not Be Held in Civil Contempt, for Recovery from Defendant Thomas F. White of Attorneys' Fees and Costs Incurred by Plaintiffs and for Sanctions as a Result of White's Filing of a Fraudulent Petition Through His Attorney, Sub Rosa, Eric M. Safire filed by Jose Roe. Motion Hearing set for 3/28/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Replogle, David) (Filed on 2/22/2008)
February 21, 2008 Filing 814 AFFIDAVIT DECLARATION OF JOHN E. HILL IN RESPONSE TO #812 SUPPLEMENTAL OBJECTIONS TO REPORT NUMBER 3 OF RULE 53 SPECIAL MASTER SUBMITTED BY DAVID REPLOGLE by John E. Hill. (Hill, John) (Filed on 2/21/2008) Modified on 2/25/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
February 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 813 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying #794 Motion to Seal Document (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2008)
February 20, 2008 Filing 812 OBJECTIONS to re #746 Order Plaintiffs' Supplemental Objections to Report Number 3 of Rule 53 Special Master by Jose Roe. (Replogle, David) (Filed on 2/20/2008)
February 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 811 ORDER Denying Sealing of Memorandum In Support re #810 Proposed Order filed by Thomas F. White. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/20/08. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2008)
February 19, 2008 Filing 810 Proposed Order Granting Application to Seal Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Vacate Orders, Settlement Agreement and Judgment, by Thomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 2/19/2008)
February 18, 2008 Filing 809 Declaration of Jose Maria Ortega Ortiz in Support of #807 Final MOTION to Vacate Orders, Settlement Agreement and Judgment,, [filed byThomas F. White. (Related document(s) #807 ) (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 2/18/2008) Modified on 2/19/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
February 18, 2008 Filing 808 Brief re #807 Final MOTION to Vacate Orders, Settlement Agreement and Judgment, filed byThomas F. White. (Related document(s) #807 ) (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 2/18/2008) Modified on 2/19/2008 (ewn, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/20/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
February 18, 2008 Filing 807 Final MOTION to Vacate Orders, Settlement Agreement and Judgment, filed by Thomas F. White. Motion Hearing set for 4/4/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 2/18/2008)
February 15, 2008 Filing 806 AFFIDAVIT DECLARATION OF JOHN E. HILL by John E. Hill. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit CV of John Hill, #2 Exhibit Contingent Fee Agreements, #3 Exhibit Depositions Attended Listing, #4 Exhibit Translation of Contingent Fee Agreement, #5 Exhibit Listing of Funds Advanced, #6 Exhibit May 27, 2005 Ltr of Kate Dyer, #7 Exhibit July 5, 2005 Ltr of Kate Dyer, #8 Exhibit Addendum to Settlement Agreement, #9 Exhibit August 5, 2005 Ltr of Kate Dyer, #10 Exhibit July 24, 2007 Ltr of Daniel Stenson / October 20, 2005 Ltr of David Replogle, #11 Exhibit Notice to Withdraw Representation, #12 Exhibit To Be Provided, #13 Exhibit October 3, 2007 Memorandum, #14 Exhibit November 13, 2007 and November 15, 2007 Ltrs of William Gwire, #15 Exhibit October 15, 2007, Ltr of Jeffrey Rotwein, #16 Exhibit September 21, 2007, Ltrs of David Replogle and Stuart Hanlon, #17 Exhibit Declaration of Nanci L. Clarence)(Hill, John) (Filed on 2/15/2008)
February 15, 2008 Filing 805 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 2/15/2008 before Charles R. Breyer (Date Filed: 2/15/2008) re #752 Joint MOTION To Approve and Adopt Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law filed by Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego (Gwire Law Offices) Findings due 3/07/08; Responses due by 3/14/2008 Replies due by 3/21/2008.. (Court Reporter Kathy Wyatt.) (be, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/15/2008)
February 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 804 ORDER replacing guardian ad litem. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/14/2008. (Attachments: #1 James Wagstaffe cv)(crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2008)
February 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 803 *** ERRONEOUS ENTRY. SEE #804 *** ORDER replacing guardian ad litem. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/14/2008. (Attachments: #1 cv)(crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2008) Modified on 2/15/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
February 14, 2008 Filing 802 Reply to #772 Objections by Defendant White to Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law Pursuant to Stipulation, Doc. 772 filed byMauricio Rodriguez Borrego. (Gwire, William) (Filed on 2/14/2008) Modified on 2/19/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
February 14, 2008 Filing 801 Memorandum in Opposition re #794 MOTION to Seal Document -Declaration of John E. Hill Supporting Objection to Motion to Approve Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law filed byJose Roe. (Replogle, David) (Filed on 2/14/2008)
February 14, 2008 Filing 800 Letter from David Replogle to John E. Hill and John Dennis O'Connor. (Replogle, David) (Filed on 2/14/2008)
February 14, 2008 Filing 799 SUPPLEMENT to Objections re #752 Joint MOTION To Approve and Adopt Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law filed by Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego (Gwire Law Offices) filed byThomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 2/14/2008) Modified on 2/19/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
February 13, 2008 Filing 798 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John E. Hill PROOF OF SERVICE RE DECLARATION OF JOHN E. HILL (FILED UNDER SEAL) (Hill, John) (Filed on 2/13/2008)
February 13, 2008 Filing 797 Memorandum in Opposition re #794 MOTION to Seal Document -Declaration of John E. Hill Supporting Objection to Motion to Approve Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law filed byJose Roe. (Replogle, David) (Filed on 2/13/2008)
February 13, 2008 Filing 796 Proposed Order Sealing Declaration of John E. Hill in Support of Objections to Motion to Approve and Adopt Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by John E. Hill. (Guta, Michael) (Filed on 2/13/2008)
February 13, 2008 Filing 795 Declaration of Michael P. Guta Supporting #794 Application to Seal Declaration of John E. Hill in Support of Objection to Motion to Approve Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law filed byJohn E. Hill. (Guta, Michael) (Filed on 2/13/2008) Modified on 2/15/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
February 13, 2008 Filing 794 MOTION to Seal Document -Declaration of John E. Hill Supporting Objection to Motion to Approve Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law filed by John E. Hill. (Guta, Michael) (Filed on 2/13/2008)
February 13, 2008 Filing 793 OBJECTIONS to #752 Motion to Approve and Adopt Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by John E. Hill. (Guta, Michael) (Filed on 2/13/2008) Modified on 2/15/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
February 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 792 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying #781 Motion to Shorten Time. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2008)
February 12, 2008 Filing 791 SUPPLEMENTAL OPPOSITION to #781 Ex Parte MOTION to Shorten Time for Hearing on Motion for Order To Show Cause Why Defendant Thomas F. White Should Not Be Held in Civil Contempt, for Recovery from Defendant Thomas F. White of Attorneys' Fees and Costs Incurred by Plaintiffs and filed byThomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 2/12/2008) Modified on 2/14/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
February 12, 2008 Filing 790 STATEMENT of Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego in Support of [Docket 781] Plaintiffs' Application for Order Shortening Time on Hearing Motion for OSC and Reply to White's Objections thereto by Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego. (Kawaii, Thomas) (Filed on 2/12/2008) Modified on 2/14/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
February 12, 2008 Filing 789 AMENDED ORDER of USCA (USCA # 08-70226) : Any further distribution of money from the district court clerk's office or the trust established by the district court is stayed. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2008)
February 12, 2008 Filing 788 District court letter to Ninth Circuit. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/11/2008. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2008)
February 12, 2008 Filing 787 Reply Memorandum re #781 Ex Parte MOTION to Shorten Time for Hearing on Motion for Order To Show Cause Why Defendant Thomas F. White Should Not Be Held in Civil Contempt, for Recovery from Defendant Thomas F. White of Attorneys' Fees and Costs Incurred by Plaintiffs and and for Sanctions as a Result of White's Filing of a Fraudulent Petition Through His Attorney, Sub Rosa, Eric M. Safire filed byJose Roe. (Replogle, David) (Filed on 2/12/2008)
February 11, 2008 Filing 786 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #781 Ex Parte MOTION to Shorten Time for Hearing on Motion for Order To Show Cause Why Defendant Thomas F. White Should Not Be Held in Civil Contempt, for Recovery from Defendant Thomas F. White of Attorneys' Fees and Costs Incurred by Plaintiffs and filed byThomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 2/11/2008)
February 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 784 ORDER AMENDING AND RESTATING TERMS OF JOSE ROE V. WHITE IRREVOCABLE TRUST. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/11/08. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2008)
February 11, 2008 Filing 783 Proposed Order re #781 Ex Parte MOTION to Shorten Time for Hearing on Motion for Order To Show Cause Why Defendant Thomas F. White Should Not Be Held in Civil Contempt, for Recovery from Defendant Thomas F. White of Attorneys' Fees and Costs Incurred by Plaintiffs and and for Sanctions as a Result of White's Filing of a Fraudulent Petition Through His Attorney, Sub Rosa, Eric M. Safire by Jose Roe. (Replogle, David) (Filed on 2/11/2008)
February 11, 2008 Filing 782 Declaration of David Replogle in Support of #781 Ex Parte MOTION to Shorten Time for Hearing on Motion for Order To Show Cause Why Defendant Thomas F. White Should Not Be Held in Civil Contempt, for Recovery from Defendant Thomas F. White of Attorneys' Fees and Costs Incurred by Plaintiffs and for Sanctions as a Result of White's Filing of a Fraudulent Petition Through His Attorney, Sub Rosa, Eric M. Safire filed byJose Roe. (Related document(s) #781 ) (Replogle, David) (Filed on 2/11/2008)
February 11, 2008 Filing 781 Ex Parte MOTION to Shorten Time for Hearing on #770 Motion for Order To Show Cause Why Defendant Thomas F. White Should Not Be Held in Civil Contempt, for Recovery from Defendant Thomas F. White of Attorneys' Fees and Costs Incurred by Plaintiffs and for Sanctions as a Result of White's Filing of a Fraudulent Petition Through His Attorney, Sub Rosa, Eric M. Safire filed by Jose Roe. Motion Hearing set for 2/15/2008 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Replogle, David) (Filed on 2/11/2008) Modified on 2/12/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
February 11, 2008 Filing 780 RESPONSE to re #777 Response ( Non Motion ) Plaintiffs' Response to Response to Plaintiffs' Objections to Objections by Defendant Thomas F. White to Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law Pursuant to Stipulation by Jose Roe. (Replogle, David) (Filed on 2/11/2008)
February 11, 2008 Filing 779 *** DUPLICATE ENTRY. SEE BELOW #780 *** RESPONSE to re #777 Response ( Non Motion ) Response to Defendant White's Response to Plaintiffs' Objections to Objections by Defendant Thomas F. White to Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by Jose Roe. (Replogle, David) (Filed on 2/11/2008) Modified on 2/12/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
February 11, 2008 Filing 778 Memorandum in Opposition re #770 MOTION for Sanctions Notice of Motion and Motion for Order To Show Cause Why Defendant Thomas F. White Should Not Be Held in Civil Contempt, for Recovery from Defendant Thomas F. White of Attorneys' Fees and Costs Incurred By Plaintiffs and Sa filed byThomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 2/11/2008)
February 11, 2008 Filing 777 RESPONSE to re #774 Objection by Plaintiffs to Defendant's Objections to Plaintiffs' Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of law, by Thomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 2/11/2008)
February 10, 2008 Filing 776 Brief re #770 MOTION for Sanctions Notice of Motion and Motion for Order To Show Cause Why Defendant Thomas F. White Should Not Be Held in Civil Contempt, for Recovery from Defendant Thomas F. White of Attorneys' Fees and Costs Incurred By Plaintiffs and Sa nctions as a Result of White's Filing of a Fraudulent Petition Through His Attorney, Sub Rosa, Eric M. Safire filed byJose Roe. (Related document(s) #770 ) (Replogle, David) (Filed on 2/10/2008)
February 8, 2008 Filing 785 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 11/17/06 before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Court Reporter: Sahar McVickar. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2008) (mclS, COURT STAFF).
February 8, 2008 Filing 775 AFFIDAVIT Declaration of Mauricio Rodriguez in Support of #773 Joint Comments to Proposed Trust by Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego. (Kawaii, Thomas) (Filed on 2/8/2008) Modified on 2/11/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
February 8, 2008 Filing 774 OBJECTIONS to re #772 Objection, Plaintiffs' Objections to Objections by Defendant Thomas F. White to Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by Jose Roe. (Replogle, David) (Filed on 2/8/2008)
February 8, 2008 Filing 773 NOTICE by Jose Roe re #766 Order Joint Comments to Proposed Amended Trust filed by Plaintiffs' Counsel David Replogle and Guardian ad Litem Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego (Replogle, David) (Filed on 2/8/2008)
February 8, 2008 Filing 772 OBJECTIONS to re #753 Stipulation, #752 Joint MOTION To Approve and Adopt Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law filed by Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego (Gwire Law Offices) and , submitted by Thomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 2/8/2008)
February 8, 2008 Filing 771 Declaration of David Replogle in Support of #770 MOTION for Sanctions Notice of Motion and Motion for Order To Show Cause Why Defendant Thomas F. White Should Not Be Held in Civil Contempt, for Recovery from Defendant Thomas F. White of Attorneys' Fees and Costs Incurred By Plaintiffs and Sa nctions as a Result of White's Filing of a Fraudulent Petition Through His Attorney, Sub Rosa, Eric M. Safire filed byJose Roe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #770 ) (Replogle, David) (Filed on 2/8/2008)
February 8, 2008 Filing 770 MOTION for Sanctions Notice of Motion and Motion for Order To Show Cause Why Defendant Thomas F. White Should Not Be Held in Civil Contempt, for Recovery from Defendant Thomas F. White of Attorneys' Fees and Costs Incurred By Plaintiffs and Sanctions as a Result of White's Filing of a Fraudulent Petition Through His Attorney, Sub Rosa, Eric M. Safire filed by Jose Roe. Motion Hearing set for 2/15/2008 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Replogle, David) (Filed on 2/8/2008)
February 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 769 ORDER of USCA (USCA # 08-70226) : Any further distribution of money from the district court clerk's office of the trust established by the district court is stayed. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2008)
February 6, 2008 Filing 768 Letter from David Replogle to John E. Hill and John Dennis O'Connor. (Replogle, David) (Filed on 2/6/2008)
February 5, 2008 Filing 767 Letter from David Replogle to John E. Hill and John Dennis O'Connor. (Replogle, David) (Filed on 2/5/2008)
February 1, 2008 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #752 Joint MOTION To Approve and Adopt Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law filed by Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego (Gwire Law Offices) and. Motion Hearing set for 2/15/2008 11:00 AM. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
February 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 766 ORDER re: amendment to trust and further hearing. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/1/2008. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order re: Amendment to trust)(crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2008)
February 1, 2008 Filing 765 Trustee Report #1. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/1/2008. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2008)
February 1, 2008 Filing 764 SPECIAL MASTER REPORT #3. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/1/2008. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2008)
January 30, 2008 Filing 763 AFFIDAVIT re #753 Stipulation Declaration of Borrego in support of Joint Stipulation by Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego. (Kawaii, Thomas) (Filed on 1/30/2008)
January 30, 2008 Filing 762 Declaration of David Replogle in Support of #752 Joint MOTION To Approve and Adopt Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law filed by Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego (Gwire Law Offices) and filed byJose Roe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) #752 ) (Replogle, David) (Filed on 1/30/2008)
January 30, 2008 Filing 761 MOTION to Seal Response to Order Re: Special Master Report #3 (Amended) filed by Jose Roe. (Guta, Michael) (Filed on 1/30/2008)
January 30, 2008 Filing 760 Proposed Order re #758 Application to Seal Response to Order Re: Special Master Report #3 by Jose Roe. (Guta, Michael) (Filed on 1/30/2008) Modified on 1/31/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
January 30, 2008 Filing 759 Declaration of Michael P. Guta, Esq. Supporting #758 Application to Seal Response to Order re: Special Master Report #3 filed byJose Roe. (Guta, Michael) (Filed on 1/30/2008) Modified on 1/31/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
January 30, 2008 Filing 758 MOTION to Seal Document : Response to Order Re: Special Master Report #3 filed by Jose Roe. (Guta, Michael) (Filed on 1/30/2008)
January 29, 2008 Filing 757 NOTICE by Jose Roe Objection to Public Filing of Report Number 3 of Rule 53 Special Master (Replogle, David) (Filed on 1/29/2008)
January 29, 2008 Filing 756 AFFIDAVIT re #755 Objection Declaration of Borrege in support of Objection to Special Master's Report No. 3 by Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego. (Kawaii, Thomas) (Filed on 1/29/2008)
January 29, 2008 Filing 755 OBJECTIONS to Special Master's Report No. 3 by Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego. (Kawaii, Thomas) (Filed on 1/29/2008)
January 29, 2008 Filing 754 Proposed Order re #752 Joint MOTION To Approve and Adopt Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law filed by Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego (Gwire Law Offices) and by Jose Roe. (Replogle, David) (Filed on 1/29/2008)
January 29, 2008 Filing 753 STIPULATION re #752 Joint MOTION To Approve and Adopt Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law filed by Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego (Gwire Law Offices) and by Jose Roe. (Replogle, David) (Filed on 1/29/2008)
January 29, 2008 Filing 752 Joint MOTION To Approve and Adopt Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law filed by Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego (Gwire Law Offices) and filed by Jose Roe. (Replogle, David) (Filed on 1/29/2008)
January 29, 2008 Filing 751 NOTICE by John E. Hill OBJECTIONS OF JOHN E. HILL IN RESPONSE TO SPECIAL MASTER'S REPORT NUMBER 3 REGARDING REPRESENTATION OF PLAINTIFFS AND CONFIDENTIAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT (Hill, John) (Filed on 1/29/2008)
January 29, 2008 Filing 750 Response of John E, Hll and John E. Hill, a Professional Corporation to #746 Order re Special Master Report No. 3. (Guta, Michael) (Filed on 1/29/2008) Modified on 1/30/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
January 29, 2008 Filing 749 NOTICE by Jose Roe Plaintiffs' Objections to Report Number 3 of Rule 53 Special Master (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Replogle, David) (Filed on 1/29/2008)
January 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 748 ORDER re: Special Master Invoice #4. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/25/2008. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2008)
January 22, 2008 Filing 747 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 12/18/07 before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Court Reporter: James Yeomans. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2008) (mclS, COURT STAFF).
January 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 746 ORDER re: Special Master Report No. 3. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/22/2008. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2008)
January 21, 2008 Filing 745 Ex Parte Application for Order Setting Case Management Conference filed by Jose Roe. Motion Hearing set for 1/24/2008 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Replogle, David) (Filed on 1/21/2008)
January 18, 2008 Filing 744 Declaration of David Replogle in Support of #668 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) Supplemental Declaration of David Replogle in Support of Notice of PLaintiffs' Ratification of Termination of John E. Hill as Associated Counsel for Plaintiffs and Order by Plaintiffs that John E. Hill and Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego Immediately Stop Interfering in the Proceeding filed byJose Roe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #668 ) (Replogle, David) (Filed on 1/18/2008)
January 15, 2008 Filing 742 CORRECTION by Thomas F. White re #741 Response ( Non Motion ) , Correcting "Response to Plaintiffs' Application for Order Setting Case Management Conference," (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 1/15/2008) Modified on 1/16/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
January 14, 2008 Filing 743 Letter dated 1/10/08 from David Replogle. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2008) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/16/2008: #1 Letter) (mcl, COURT STAFF).
January 14, 2008 Filing 741 RESPONSE to re #740 Ex Parte Application for Order Setting Case Management Conference by Thomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 1/14/2008)
January 12, 2008 Filing 740 Ex Parte Application for Order Setting Case Management Conference filed by Jose Roe. Motion Hearing set for 1/18/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Replogle, David) (Filed on 1/12/2008)
January 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 738 ORDER. Signed by Judge Breyer on 01/10/2008. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2008)
January 9, 2008 Filing 739 Letter dated 1/9/08 from Richard Zitrin to Judge Breyer. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2008)
January 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 737 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #731 Motion to Seal Declaration of Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego Re Costs Submitted on December 31, 2007 (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2008)
January 3, 2008 Filing 735 NOTICE by Jose Roe Notice of Lodging of Declaration of David Replogle Re Costs, Expenditures and Advances Paid by Plaintiffs' Counsel in Compliance with the Court's Directive of December 18, 2007 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Replogle, David) (Filed on 1/3/2008)
January 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 734 ORDER granting #727 Motion to Seal Declaration of John E. Hill Re Costs (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2008)
January 2, 2008 Filing 733 CLERK'S NOTICE re: Failure to E-File Document No. 732. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2008)
January 2, 2008 Filing 731 Ex Parte MOTION to Seal Declaration of Mauricio Borrego Rodriguez re Costs filed by Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego. (Kawaii, Thomas) (Filed on 1/2/2008)
January 1, 2008 Filing 730 NOTICE by Jose Roe re #728 Declaration in Support, #729 Proposed Order, #727 MOTION to Seal APPLICATION OF MICHAEL P. GUTA FOR ORDER TO SEAL DECLARATION OF JOHN E. HILL RE COSTS Withdrawal of Unauthorized Application To Seal Filed by Terminated Associated Counsel John E. Hill (Replogle, David) (Filed on 1/1/2008)
December 31, 2007 Filing 736 Declaration of John E. Hill filed by Jose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/31/2007) Modified on 4/25/2008 (sv, COURT STAFF).
December 31, 2007 Filing 732 MEMORANDUM of Costs submitted pursuant to Court Order 703 filed by Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego. (Related document(s) 703 ) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/31/2007) Modified on 4/25/2008 (sv, COURT STAFF).
December 31, 2007 Filing 729 Proposed Order re #727 MOTION to Seal APPLICATION OF MICHAEL P. GUTA FOR ORDER TO SEAL DECLARATION OF JOHN E. HILL RE COSTS by John E. Hill. (Hill, John) (Filed on 12/31/2007)
December 31, 2007 Filing 728 Declaration in Support of #727 MOTION to Seal APPLICATION OF MICHAEL P. GUTA FOR ORDER TO SEAL DECLARATION OF JOHN E. HILL RE COSTS filed byJohn E. Hill. (Related document(s) #727 ) (Hill, John) (Filed on 12/31/2007)
December 31, 2007 Filing 727 MOTION to Seal APPLICATION OF MICHAEL P. GUTA FOR ORDER TO SEAL DECLARATION OF JOHN E. HILL RE COSTS filed by John E. Hill. (Hill, John) (Filed on 12/31/2007)
December 31, 2007 Filing 726 NOTICE by Thomas F. White re #677 MOTION to Vacate Settlement Agreement and Judgment, WITHDRAWING MOTION (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 12/31/2007)
December 21, 2007 Filing 725 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 12/21/2007 before Charles R. Breyer (Date Filed: 12/21/2007) re #713 Ex Parte MOTION for Release of Funds Applicaton for Order Authorizing and Directing Wells Fargo Bank, as Trustee, and C. Joseph Smith, as Trust Protector, To Release the Intial Monthly Distribution to the Beneficiaries filed by Jose Roe. Matter Deferred. The Court encouraged Mr. Replogle to set up a process for distribution with the trust protector during their meeting scheduled for 1/5/08. (Court Reporter Lydia Zinn.) (fj, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/21/2007)
December 21, 2007 Filing 724 Letter from John D. O'Connor to Hon. Judge Breyer. (Hill, John) (Filed on 12/21/2007)
December 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 723 ORDER by Judge Breyer denying #695 Motion to Produce (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2007)
December 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 722 ORDER by Judge Breyer denying #704 Motion for Reconsideration (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2007)
December 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 721 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/20/07.(mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2007) Modified on 4/25/2008 (sv, COURT STAFF).
December 20, 2007 Filing 719 Notice of Hearing on Motion for Order Authorizing and Directing Wells Fargo Bank, as Trustee, and C. Joseph Smith, as Trust Protector, To Release the Initial Monthly Distribution to the Beneficiaries filed by Jose Roe. Motion Hearing set for 12/21/2007 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Replogle, David) (Filed on 12/20/2007) Modified on 12/21/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
December 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 718 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #709 Motion to Seal (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2007)
December 20, 2007 Filing 716 Proposed Order re #713 Ex Parte MOTION for Release of Funds Applicaton for Order Authorizing and Directing Wells Fargo Bank, as Trustee, and C. Joseph Smith, as Trust Protector, To Release the Intial Monthly Distribution to the Beneficiaries by Jose Roe. (Replogle, David) (Filed on 12/20/2007)
December 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 715 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying #681 Motion to Stay [redacted version]. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2007)
December 20, 2007 Filing 714 Declaration of David Replogle in Support of #713 Ex Parte MOTION for Release of Funds Applicaton for Order Authorizing and Directing Wells Fargo Bank, as Trustee, and C. Joseph Smith, as Trust Protector, To Release the Intial Monthly Distribution to the Beneficiaries filed byJose Roe. (Related document(s) #713 ) (Replogle, David) (Filed on 12/20/2007)
December 20, 2007 Filing 713 Ex Parte MOTION for Release of Funds Applicaton for Order Authorizing and Directing Wells Fargo Bank, as Trustee, and C. Joseph Smith, as Trust Protector, To Release the Intial Monthly Distribution to the Beneficiaries filed by Jose Roe. (Replogle, David) (Filed on 12/20/2007)
December 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 712 ORDER APPROVING IRREVOCABLE TRUST AGREEMENT, TRUSTEE AND TRUST PROTECTOR by Judge Charles R. Breyer. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2007)
December 19, 2007 Filing 720 Reply to Opposition to defendant's application for Court Order directing plaintiff's counsel Mauricio Borrego and his counsel, to produce the Fee Agreement with David replogle dated 6/13/05 filed by Thomas F. White.(mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2007) Modified on 4/25/2008 (sv, COURT STAFF).
December 19, 2007 Filing 711 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by David Replogle Notice of Filing of Substitution of Attorney After Termination of John E. Hill as Associated Counsel for Plaintiffs (Replogle, David) (Filed on 12/19/2007)
December 19, 2007 Filing 710 Proposed Order Sealing Defendant's Reply to Opposition to Defendants Application for Court Order Directing Plaintiffs Counsel, Mauricio Borrego and His Counsel, to Produce the Fee Agreement with David Replogle Dated June 13, 2005, by Thomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 12/19/2007)
December 19, 2007 Filing 709 MOTION to Seal Defendant's Reply to Opposition to Defendants Application for Court Order Directing Plaintiffs Counsel, Mauricio Borrego and His Counsel, to Produce the Fee Agreement with David Replogle Dated June 13, 2005, filed by Thomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 12/19/2007)
December 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 705 AMENDED ORDER RE: Special Master invoice #3. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/19/2007. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2007)
December 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 717 ORDER Re: payment of funds from Court's registry. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/18/2007. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (E-Filed on 12/20/2007)
December 18, 2007 Filing 708 NOTICE re substitution of attorneys by Jose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego.(mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2007) Modified on 4/25/2008 (sv, COURT STAFF).
December 18, 2007 Filing 704 Ex Parte MOTION for Reconsideration re #702 Motion Hearing,, Set Deadlines, Motion for Order Reconsidering Directive Requiring Court Review of Reimburseable Costs Incurred for Adult Plaintiffs and Motion for an Order Amending Order Appointing Rule 53 Special Master filed by Jose Roe. (Replogle, David) (Filed on 12/18/2007)
December 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 703 ORDER Approving Irrevocable Trust Agreement, Trustee and Trust Protector. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/18/07. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2007)
December 18, 2007 Filing 702 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 12/18/2007 before Charles R. Breyer (Date Filed: 12/18/2007). Matters submitted by the Court. Report of Costs from the parties due by 12/31/07. (Court Reporter James Yeomans.) (fj, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/18/2007)
December 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 701 ORDER directing payment of special master invoice #3. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/18/2007. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2007)
December 18, 2007 Filing 700 Memorandum in Opposition re #695 MOTION to Produce Written Fee Agreement between David Replogle and Mauricio Borrego dated June 13, 2005, filed byJose Roe. (Replogle, David) (Filed on 12/18/2007)
December 17, 2007 Filing 699 Brief re #674 Order Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Support of Motion To Approve Trust and in Support of Release of Funds filed byJose Roe. (Related document(s) #674 ) (Replogle, David) (Filed on 12/17/2007)
December 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 698 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #693 Motion to Seal (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2007)
December 16, 2007 Filing 697 Reply to Opposition to #681 Motion to Stay Distribution Pending Ruling on Defendant's Motion to Vacate Settlement Agreement and Judgment, filed byThomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 12/16/2007) Modified on 12/17/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
December 15, 2007 Filing 696 Proposed Order re #695 MOTION to Produce Written Fee Agreement between David Replogle and Mauricio Borrego dated June 13, 2005, by Thomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 12/15/2007)
December 15, 2007 Filing 695 MOTION to Produce Written Fee Agreement between David Replogle and Mauricio Borrego dated June 13, 2005, filed by Thomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 12/15/2007)
December 15, 2007 Filing 694 Proposed Order re #693 MOTION to Seal Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Motion to Vacate Settlement Agreement and Judgment, and Errata Re Memorandum, by Thomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 12/15/2007)
December 15, 2007 Filing 693 MOTION to Seal Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Motion to Vacate Settlement Agreement and Judgment, and Errata Re Memorandum, filed by Thomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 12/15/2007)
December 14, 2007 Filing 707 ERRATA re 706 Memorandum in Support by Thomas F. White.(mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2007) Modified on 4/25/2008 (sv, COURT STAFF).
December 14, 2007 Filing 692 NOTICE by Jose Roe re #690 Declaration in Support Withdrawal of Unauthorized Declaration of John E. Hill Filed by Terminated Associated Counsel John E. Hill (Replogle, David) (Filed on 12/14/2007)
December 14, 2007 Filing 691 Memorandum in Opposition re #681 MOTION to Stay re #674 Order for Distribution of Funds, filed byJose Roe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Replogle, David) (Filed on 12/14/2007)
December 14, 2007 Filing 690 Declaration of JOHN E. HILL IN RESPONSE TO THIS COURT'S ORDER OF DECEMBER 11, 2007 #674 filed by John E. Hill. (Hill, John) (Filed on 12/14/2007) Modified on 12/17/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
December 14, 2007 Filing 689 NOTICE by Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego re #598 MOTION to Intervene Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Intervene (Kawaii, Thomas) (Filed on 12/14/2007)
December 14, 2007 Filing 688 NOTICE by Jose Roe re #674 Order Notice of Attorneys' Lien and Notice of Offer of Partial and Conditional Release of Attorneys' Lien (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Replogle, David) (Filed on 12/14/2007)
December 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 687 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #684 Motion to Shorten Time (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2007)
December 13, 2007 Filing 706 MEMORANDUM of points and authorities in Support re #677 MOTION to Vacate Settlement Agreement and Judgment, filed by Thomas F. White. (Related document(s) #677 ) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2007) Modified on 4/25/2008 (sv, COURT STAFF).
December 13, 2007 Filing 686 OBJECTIONS to re #674 Order Setting Hearing and Proposing the Distribution of Funds, by Thomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 12/13/2007)
December 13, 2007 Filing 685 Proposed Order re #684 MOTION to Shorten Time for Hearing on Motion for Stay of Distribution of Funds Pending Ruling on Defendant's Motion to Vacate Settlement Agreement and Judgment, by Thomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 12/13/2007)
December 13, 2007 Filing 684 MOTION to Shorten Time for Hearing on #681 Motion for Stay of Distribution of Funds Pending Ruling on Defendant's Motion to Vacate Settlement Agreement and Judgment, filed by Thomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 12/13/2007) Modified on 12/14/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
December 13, 2007 Filing 683 Declaration of Geoffrey Rotwein in Support of #681 MOTION to Stay re #674 Order for Distribution of Funds, filed byThomas F. White. (Related document(s) #681 ) (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 12/13/2007)
December 13, 2007 Filing 682 Brief re #681 MOTION to Stay re #674 Order for Distribution of Funds, filed byThomas F. White. (Related document(s) #681 ) (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 12/13/2007)
December 13, 2007 Filing 681 MOTION to Stay re #674 Order for Distribution of Funds, filed by Thomas F. White. Motion Hearing set for 12/18/2007 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 12/13/2007)
December 13, 2007 Filing 680 Proposed Order Granting Application to Seal Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Vacate Settlement Agreement and Judgment, by Thomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 12/13/2007)
December 13, 2007 Filing 679 MOTION to Seal Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Vacate Settlement Agreement and Judgment, filed by Thomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 12/13/2007)
December 13, 2007 Filing 678 Declaration of Geoffrey Rotwein in Support of #677 MOTION to Vacate Settlement Agreement and Judgment, filed byThomas F. White. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit First Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Answer and Counter Claim)(Related document(s) #677 ) (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 12/13/2007)
December 13, 2007 Filing 677 MOTION to Vacate Settlement Agreement and Judgment, filed by Thomas F. White. Motion Hearing set for 1/25/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 12/13/2007)
December 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 676 ORDER denying White's objections to special master report #2. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/12/2007. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2007)
December 11, 2007 Filing 675 OBJECTIONS to re #673 Order, #674 Order Re Special Master's Report #2, Under FRCP 53, by Thomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 12/11/2007)
December 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 674 ORDER RE: Hearing on Distribution of Settlement Funds to Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/10/2007. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2007)
December 10, 2007 Filing 673 Special Master's Report #2 REgarding Representation of Plaintiffs and Implementation of Confidential Settlement Agreement. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/10/2007. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2007)
November 29, 2007 Filing 672 APPLICATION for Order Exonerating Supersedeas Appeal Bond by Thomas F. White. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2007) Modified on 4/25/2008 (sv, COURT STAFF).
November 29, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 671 ORDER EXONERATING SUPERSEDEAS APPEAL BOND POSTED BY SURETIES FOR DEFENDANT ON DECEMBER 19, 2005. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/29/07. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2007)
November 27, 2007 Filing 670 NOTICE by Thomas F. White of his Counsel's Unavailability, December 24-28, 2007, (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 11/27/2007)
November 24, 2007 Filing 669 Declaration of David Replogle in Support of #668 Notice of Plaintiffs' Ratification of Termination of John E. Hill as Associated Counsel for Plaintiffs and Order by Plaintiffs that John E. Hill and Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego Immediately Stop Interfering in the Proceeding (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C)(Replogle, David) (Filed on 11/24/2007) Modified on 11/26/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
November 23, 2007 Filing 668 NOTICE by Jose Roe Notice of Plaintiffs' Ratification of Termination of John E. Hill as Associated Counsel for Plaintiffs and Order by Plaintiffs that John E. Hill and Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego Immediately Stop Interfering in the Proceeding (Replogle, David) (Filed on 11/23/2007)
November 23, 2007 Filing 667 NOTICE by Jose Roe Notice of Expiration of Term of Guardian ad Litem Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego (Replogle, David) (Filed on 11/23/2007)
November 20, 2007 Filing 666 Proposed Order Exonerating Supersedeas Appeal Bond Posted by Sureties for Defendant on December 19, 2005 by Thomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 11/20/2007)
November 20, 2007 Filing 665 Proposed Order re #664 MOTION to Seal Application for Order Exonerating Supersedeas Appeal Bond, by Thomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 11/20/2007)
November 20, 2007 Filing 664 MOTION to Seal Application for Order Exonerating Supersedeas Appeal Bond, filed by Thomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 11/20/2007)
November 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 662 ORDER re: special master invoice #2. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/19/2007. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2007)
November 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 661 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #654 Motion to Seal Document (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2007)
November 16, 2007 Filing 660 MOTION to Withdraw NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO DISCHARGE DAVID REPLOGLE AS ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFFS CARLOS ROE II,JOSE ROE II, JOSE ROE III, CARLOS ROE IV, CARLOS ROE V, CARLOS ROE VI, CARLOS ROE VII, CARLOS ROE VIII, CARLOS ROE X,CARLOS ROE XIII, CARLOS ROE XVII, CARLOS ROE XVIII; filed by John E. Hill. Motion Hearing set for 12/14/2007 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Hill, John) (Filed on 11/16/2007)
November 9, 2007 Filing 663 SUBMISSION of Fee Agreements by Law Offices of John E. Hill for plaintiffs.(mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2007) Modified on 4/25/2008 (sv, COURT STAFF).
November 9, 2007 Filing 659 Proposed Order re #657 MOTION to Seal Document APPLICATION OF PLAINTIFFS FORORDER TO SEAL MOTION TO DISCHARGE DAVID REPLOGLE, ESQ. AS ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFFS CARLOS ROE II, JOSE ROE II, JOSE ROE III, CARLOS ROE IV, CARLOS ROE V, CARLOS ROE VI, CARLOS ROE VII, CARLOS ROE by John E. Hill. (Hill, John) (Filed on 11/9/2007)
November 9, 2007 Filing 658 Declaration of MICHAEL P. GUTA in Support of #657 MOTION to Seal Document APPLICATION OF PLAINTIFFS FORORDER TO SEAL MOTION TO DISCHARGE DAVID REPLOGLE, ESQ. AS ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFFS CARLOS ROE II, JOSE ROE II, JOSE ROE III, CARLOS ROE IV, CARLOS ROE V, CARLOS ROE VI, CARLOS ROE VII, CARLOS ROE filed byJohn E. Hill. (Related document(s) #657 ) (Hill, John) (Filed on 11/9/2007)
November 9, 2007 Filing 657 MOTION to Seal Document APPLICATION OF PLAINTIFFS FORORDER TO SEAL MOTION TO DISCHARGE DAVID REPLOGLE, ESQ. AS ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFFS CARLOS ROE II, JOSE ROE II, JOSE ROE III, CARLOS ROE IV, CARLOS ROE V, CARLOS ROE VI, CARLOS ROE VII, CARLOS ROE VIII,CARLOS ROE IX, CARLOS ROE X, CARLOS ROE XIII, CARLOS ROE XVII, CARLOS ROE XVIII; DECLARATION OF JOHN E. HILL filed by John E. Hill. Motion Hearing set for 12/14/2007 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Hill, John) (Filed on 11/9/2007)
November 9, 2007 Filing 656 Proposed Order re #654 MOTION to Seal Document SUBMISSION OF FEE AGREEMENTS FOR PLAINTIFFS JOSE ROE II, JOSE ROE III, CARLOS ROE II, CARLOS ROE IV, CARLOS ROE V, CARLOS ROE VI, CARLOS ROE VII, CARLOS ROE VIII, CARLOS ROE IX, CARLOS ROE X, CARLOS ROE XIII, CARLOS ROE XVII by John E. Hill. (Hill, John) (Filed on 11/9/2007)
November 9, 2007 Filing 655 Declaration of MICHAEL P. GUTA in Support of #654 MOTION to Seal Document SUBMISSION OF FEE AGREEMENTS FOR PLAINTIFFS JOSE ROE II, JOSE ROE III, CARLOS ROE II, CARLOS ROE IV, CARLOS ROE V, CARLOS ROE VI, CARLOS ROE VII, CARLOS ROE VIII, CARLOS ROE IX, CARLOS ROE X, CARLOS ROE XIII, CARLOS ROE XVII filed byJohn E. Hill. (Related document(s) #654 ) (Hill, John) (Filed on 11/9/2007)
November 9, 2007 Filing 654 MOTION to Seal Document SUBMISSION OF FEE AGREEMENTS FOR PLAINTIFFS JOSE ROE II, JOSE ROE III, CARLOS ROE II, CARLOS ROE IV, CARLOS ROE V, CARLOS ROE VI, CARLOS ROE VII, CARLOS ROE VIII, CARLOS ROE IX, CARLOS ROE X, CARLOS ROE XIII, CARLOS ROE XVII AND CARLOS ROE XVIII. filed by John E. Hill. Motion Hearing set for 12/14/2007 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Hill, John) (Filed on 11/9/2007)
November 8, 2007 Filing 653 Letter from JOHN E. HILL TO HON. DAVID A. GARCIA. (Hill, John) (Filed on 11/8/2007)
November 6, 2007 Filing 652 Letter dated 11/5/07 from David Replogle to Judge Garcia re enclosed translation. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2007)
November 6, 2007 Filing 651 Letter dated 11/5/07 from David Replogle to Judge Garcia. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2007)
October 25, 2007 Filing 650 Letter from JOHN E. HILL TO HON. DAVID GARCIA. (Hill, John) (Filed on 10/25/2007)
October 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 649 ORDER denying defendant's request to participate in interviews. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/17/2007. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2007)
October 16, 2007 Filing 648 Letter from JOHN E. HILL TO HON. DAVID A. GARCIA DATED OCTOBER 16, 2007. (Hill, John) (Filed on 10/16/2007)
October 15, 2007 Filing 647 NOTICE by Jose Roe to Withdraw (Safire, Eric) (Filed on 10/15/2007)
October 14, 2007 Filing 646 Letter from David Replogle to the Honorable David A. Garcia dated October 14, 2007. (Replogle, David) (Filed on 10/14/2007)
October 13, 2007 Filing 645 NOTICE by Jose Roe re #644 Objection Notice of Conditional Joinder to Objection to Order Directing Cooperation with Special Master (Replogle, David) (Filed on 10/13/2007)
October 12, 2007 Filing 644 OBJECTIONS to re #638 Order Directing Cooperation with Special Master (Par. 8), by Thomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 10/12/2007)
October 12, 2007 Filing 643 NOTICE by Thomas F. White re #638 Order Directing Cooperation with Special Master (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 10/12/2007)
October 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 642 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying #623 Motion to Shorten Time; denying 633 Motion for Disbursement of Funds; denying #636 Motion for Settlement; denying #637 Motion for Attorney Fees; denying #640 Motion to Disqualify Counsel. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2007)
October 12, 2007 Filing 641 Declaration of David Replogle in Support of #640 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel Notice of Motion and Motion To Deny Eric M. Safire's Petition To Substitute into the Action as Attorney for Plaintiffs and To Require Eric M. Safire To Disgorge to Plaintiffs All Fees Paid to Him by White filed byJose Roe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B, Part 1#3 Exhibit B, Part 2#4 Exhibit B, Part 3#5 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) #640 ) (Replogle, David) (Filed on 10/12/2007)
October 12, 2007 Filing 640 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel Notice of Motion and Motion To Deny Eric M. Safire's Petition To Substitute into the Action as Attorney for Plaintiffs and To Require Eric M. Safire To Disgorge to Plaintiffs All Fees Paid to Him by White filed by Jose Roe. Motion Hearing set for 11/16/2007 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Replogle, David) (Filed on 10/12/2007)
October 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 639 ORDER re: payment of special master invoice #1. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/11/2007. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2007)
October 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 638 ORDER directing cooperation with special master. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/11/2007. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2007)
October 12, 2007 Filing 637 MOTION for Attorney Fees Notice of Motion and Motion To Approve Attorneys' Fees, Costs and Expenses Incurred Representing Minor Plaintiffs and To Direct the Clerk of the Court To Release the Settlement Proceeds filed by Jose Roe. Motion Hearing set for 11/16/2007 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Replogle, David) (Filed on 10/12/2007)
October 12, 2007 Filing 636 MOTION for Settlement Notice of Motion and Motion To Approve Irrevocable Trust Agreement filed by Jose Roe. Motion Hearing set for 11/16/2007 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Replogle, David) (Filed on 10/12/2007)
October 10, 2007 Filing 635 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition to #623 Order Shortening Time by Eric M. Safire filed byJose Roe. (Safire, Eric) (Filed on 10/10/2007) Modified on 10/11/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
October 10, 2007 Filing 634 ERRATA re #632 Objection re #617 Order on Special Master's Report #1 Regarding Proposed Investigation, by Thomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 10/10/2007)
October 9, 2007 Filing 632 OBJECTIONS to re #617 Order on Special Master's Report #1 Regarding Proposed Investigation, by Thomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 10/9/2007)
October 9, 2007 Filing 631 Reply to Opposition to Motion for Partial Distribution of Settlement filed byJohn E. Hill. (Guta, Michael) (Filed on 10/9/2007)
October 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 630 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #618 Motion to Seal Document. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2007)
October 8, 2007 Filing 629 NOTICE by Jose Roe Withdrawal of Unauthorized Motion for Partial Distribution Filed by Terminated Associated Counsel John E. Hill (Replogle, David) (Filed on 10/8/2007)
October 8, 2007 Filing 628 *** ERRONEOUS ENTRY *** NOTICE by Jose Roe Withdrawal of Unauthorized Motion for Partial Distribution Filed by Terminated Associated Counsel John E. Hill (Replogle, David) (Filed on 10/8/2007) Modified on 10/11/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
October 5, 2007 Filing 633 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Disbursement of Settlement Funds ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities, Declaration of John E. Hill and Declarations of Plaintiffs in support thereof filed by Jose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego. Motion Hearing set for 11/9/2007 10:00 AM. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2007) Modified on 4/25/2008 (sv, COURT STAFF).
October 5, 2007 Filing 627 Declaration of David Replogle in Support of #623 MOTION to Shorten Time Application of Plaintiffs for Order Shortening Time for Hearing on Motion To Deny Eric M. Safire's Petition To Substitute into the Action as Attorney for Plaintiffs and To Require Eric M. Safire To Disgorge to Plaintiffs filed byJose Roe. (Related document(s) #623 ) (Replogle, David) (Filed on 10/5/2007)
October 4, 2007 Filing 626 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #623 MOTION to Shorten Time Application of Plaintiffs for Order Shortening Time for Hearing on Motion To Deny Eric M. Safire's Petition To Substitute into the Action as Attorney for Plaintiffs and To Require Eric M. Safire To Disgorge to Plaintiffs filed byThomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 10/4/2007)
October 4, 2007 Filing 625 Proposed Order re #623 MOTION to Shorten Time Application of Plaintiffs for Order Shortening Time for Hearing on Motion To Deny Eric M. Safire's Petition To Substitute into the Action as Attorney for Plaintiffs and To Require Eric M. Safire To Disgorge to Plaintiffs All Fees Paid to Him by White by Jose Roe. (Replogle, David) (Filed on 10/4/2007)
October 4, 2007 Filing 624 Declaration of David Replogle in Support of #623 MOTION to Shorten Time Application of Plaintiffs for Order Shortening Time for Hearing on Motion To Deny Eric M. Safire's Petition To Substitute into the Action as Attorney for Plaintiffs and To Require Eric M. Safire To Disgorge to Plaintiffs filed byJose Roe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B, Part 1#3 Exhibit B, Part 2#4 Exhibit B, Part 3)(Related document(s) #623 ) (Replogle, David) (Filed on 10/4/2007)
October 4, 2007 Filing 623 MOTION to Shorten Time Application of Plaintiffs for Order Shortening Time for Hearing on Motion To Deny Eric M. Safire's Petition To Substitute into the Action as Attorney for Plaintiffs and To Require Eric M. Safire To Disgorge to Plaintiffs All Fees Paid to Him by White filed by Jose Roe. (Replogle, David) (Filed on 10/4/2007)
October 3, 2007 Filing 622 Memorandum in Opposition re #618 MOTION to Seal Document, #619 Supporting Declaration of Michael P. Guta. Opposition To Filing of Documents by Terminated Assocated Counsel John E. Hill filed byJose Roe. (Replogle, David) (Filed on 10/3/2007) Modified on 10/4/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
October 3, 2007 Filing 621 NOTICE by Jose Roe Notice of Termination of John E. Hill as Associated Counsel for Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Replogle, David) (Filed on 10/3/2007)
October 3, 2007 Filing 620 [Proposed] Order re #618 motion to seal filed by John E. Hill. (Guta, Michael) (Filed on 10/3/2007) Modified on 10/4/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
October 3, 2007 Filing 619 Declaration of Michael P. Guta in support of #618 motion to seal filed by John E. Hill. (Guta, Michael) (Filed on 10/3/2007) Modified on 10/4/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
October 3, 2007 Filing 618 MOTION to Seal Document filed by John E. Hill. Motion Hearing set for 11/9/2007 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Guta, Michael) (Filed on 10/3/2007)
October 1, 2007 Filing 617 Special Master's Report #1. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2007)
September 21, 2007 Filing 616 Letter from David Replogle to the Honorable David A. Garcia, Judge of the Superior Court, Retired. (Replogle, David) (Filed on 9/21/2007)
August 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 614 ORDER RELATING CASE C-07-4170JL to C-03-4035CRB.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/29/07. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2007)
August 28, 2007 Filing 615 NOTICE of consent of Special Master and Affidavit re #610 Order (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2007)
August 24, 2007 Filing 613 NOTICE by Jose Roe Notice of Lodging of Report with Special Master and Availability of Exhibits (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Replogle, David) (Filed on 8/24/2007)
August 20, 2007 Received Document in compliance with #603 Order by Thomas F. White. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2007) Modified on 8/20/2007 (sv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/25/2008 (sv, COURT STAFF).
August 17, 2007 Filing 612 NOTICE of Proposed Intervenor's Compliance with the Court's Order #603 by Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2007)
August 16, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 611 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying #604 Motion to Amend/Correct ; (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2007)
August 16, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 610 ORDER appointing special master. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/16/2007. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2007)
August 15, 2007 Filing 609 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition Declaration of David Replogle in Opposition to Motion by Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego To Intervene and To Stay Release of Settlement Proceeds filed by Jose Roe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B)(Replogle, David) (Filed on 8/15/2007).
August 15, 2007 Filing 608 NOTICE by Thomas F. White of Non-Opposition to Motion to Intervene and Stay Case, filed by Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego, and Notice of Objections to Plaintiffs' Opposition Memorandum (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 8/15/2007)
August 15, 2007 Filing 607 Memorandum in Opposition Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Motion by Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego To Intervene and To Stay Release of Settlement Proceeds filed byJose Roe. (Replogle, David) (Filed on 8/15/2007)
August 14, 2007 Filing 965 Fee Agreements filed by Erik Safire. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2007)
August 10, 2007 Filing 606 NOTICE by Jose Roe Request for Appointment of Rule 53 Investigator (Replogle, David) (Filed on 8/10/2007)
August 9, 2007 Filing 605 MEMORANDUM in Support re #604 Final MOTION to Amend/Correct or Alter Post-Judgment Order, filed byThomas F. White. (Related document(s) #604 ) (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 8/9/2007)
August 9, 2007 Filing 604 Final MOTION to Amend/Correct or Alter Post-Judgment Order, filed by Thomas F. White. Motion Hearing set for 9/28/2007 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 8/9/2007)
August 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 603 ORDER re: fee agreements. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/9/2007. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2007)
August 8, 2007 Filing 602 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego re #599 Memorandum in Support, #600 Declaration in Support, Received Order, #598 MOTION to Intervene (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2007)
August 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 596 ORDER denying without prejudice proposed intervenor's motion to file documents under seal. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/6/2007. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2007)
August 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 595 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #590 Motion to Seal (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2007)
August 3, 2007 Received Order re #597 MOTION to Seal Document by Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
August 3, 2007 Filing 597 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Retroactively Seal Documents Containing Confidential Information that were inadvertently filed on 8/2/07 in support of "Ex Parte Motion for (1) Order granting leave to intervene, and (2) Order staying proceedings on 'Motion to approve attorneys fees/release settlement proceeds' filed by Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2007) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/8/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
August 3, 2007 Filing 594 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 8/3/2007 before Charlesl R. Breyer (Date Filed: 8/3/2007) re 547 MOTION Judgment Against Sureties Enforcing Supersedas Bond filed by Jose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego, #585 Amended MOTION for Attorney Fees Amended Notice of Motion and Motion To Approve Attorneys' Fees, Costs and Expenses Incurred Representing Minor Planitiffs and To Direct the Clerk of the Court To Release the Settlement Proceeds filed by Jose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego, 566 MOTION to Approve Irrevocable Trust Agreement filed by Jose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego, #562 Final MOTION to Amend/Correct #561 Proposed Order, #560 Final MOTION to Seal Opposition to Motion for Judgment against SuretiesFinal MOTION to Amend/Correct #561 Proposed Order, #560 Final MOTION to Seal Opposition to Motion for Judgment against Sureties filed by Thomas F. White, Further Case Management Conference held on 8/3/2007 before Charles R. Breyer (Date Filed: 8/3/2007). (Court Reporter Kathy Powell.) (be, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/3/2007)
August 3, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 593 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 547 Motion for payment by sureties. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2007)
August 2, 2007 Received Order re #598 MOTION to Intervene and for Order staying proceedings by Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
August 2, 2007 Filing 600 Declaration of Mauricio Rodrigez Borrego in Support of #598 MOTION to Intervene and for Order staying proceedings filed byMauricio Rodriguez Borrego. (Related document(s) #598 ) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2007) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/8/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
August 2, 2007 Filing 599 MEMORANDUM of points and authorities in Support re #598 MOTION to Intervene and for Order staying proceedings filed byMauricio Rodriguez Borrego. (Related document(s) #598 ) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2007) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/8/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
August 2, 2007 Filing 598 NOTICE OF EX PARTE MOTION and EX PARTE MOTION for (1) Order granting Leave to Intervene and (2) Order staying proceedings on "Motion to approve attorneys fees/release settlement proceeds" filed by Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2007) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/8/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
August 1, 2007 Filing 592 Proposed Order re #590 Ex Parte MOTION to Seal Declaration of David Replogle in Opposition To Application Filed by Eric M. Safire Purporting To Act on Behalf of Plaintiffs by Jose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego. (Replogle, David) (Filed on 8/1/2007)
August 1, 2007 Filing 591 Declaration of David Replogle in Support of #590 Ex Parte MOTION to Seal Declaration of David Replogle in Opposition To Application Filed by Eric M. Safire Purporting To Act on Behalf of Plaintiffs filed byJose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego. (Related document(s) #590 ) (Replogle, David) (Filed on 8/1/2007)
August 1, 2007 Filing 590 Ex Parte MOTION to Seal Declaration of David Replogle in Opposition To Application Filed by Eric M. Safire Purporting To Act on Behalf of Plaintiffs filed by Jose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego. Motion Hearing set for 8/3/2007 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Replogle, David) (Filed on 8/1/2007)
August 1, 2007 Filing 589 Declaration of Eric M. Safire in Support of Memorandum Regarding Substitution of Counsel filed byJose Roe. (Safire, Eric) (Filed on 8/1/2007)
August 1, 2007 Filing 588 NOTICE of Appearance by John Dennis O'Connor (O'Connor, John) (Filed on 8/1/2007)
August 1, 2007 Filing 587 Declaration of David Replogle in Support of #585 Amended MOTION for Attorney Fees Amended Notice of Motion and Motion To Approve Attorneys' Fees, Costs and Expenses Incurred Representing Minor Planitiffs and To Direct the Clerk of the Court To Release the Settlement Proceeds filed byJose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D#5 Exhibit E)(Related document(s) #585 ) (Replogle, David) (Filed on 8/1/2007)
August 1, 2007 Filing 586 MEMORANDUM in Support re #585 Amended MOTION for Attorney Fees Amended Notice of Motion and Motion To Approve Attorneys' Fees, Costs and Expenses Incurred Representing Minor Planitiffs and To Direct the Clerk of the Court To Release the Settlement Proceeds filed byJose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego. (Related document(s) #585 ) (Replogle, David) (Filed on 8/1/2007)
August 1, 2007 Filing 585 Amended MOTION for Attorney Fees Amended Notice of Motion and Motion To Approve Attorneys' Fees, Costs and Expenses Incurred Representing Minor Planitiffs and To Direct the Clerk of the Court To Release the Settlement Proceeds filed by Jose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego. Motion Hearing set for 8/3/2007 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Replogle, David) (Filed on 8/1/2007)
August 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 584 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying #574 Motion to Seal (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2007)
August 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 583 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying without prejudice #577 moltion to seal documents. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2007)
July 31, 2007 Filing 601 DECLARATION of David Replogle in opposition to application filed by Eric M. Safire purporting to act on behalf of plaintiffs filed by plaintiffs Jose Roe et al(mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2007) Modified on 4/25/2008 (sv, COURT STAFF).
July 31, 2007 Filing 582 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jose Roe re #577 Second MOTION to Substitute Attorney, #578 Proposed Order (Safire, Eric) (Filed on 7/31/2007)
July 31, 2007 Filing 581 Memorandum in Opposition re #577 Second MOTION to Substitute Attorney Opposition To Motion To Seal Documents Submitted by Eric M. Safire filed byJose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego. (Replogle, David) (Filed on 7/31/2007)
July 30, 2007 Filing 580 NOTICE by Thomas F. White re #579 Notice (Other) of Correction to Joinder by Sureties in Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Judgment Against Sureties on Supersedeas Bond (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 7/30/2007)
July 30, 2007 Filing 579 NOTICE by Thomas F. White of Sureties' Joinder in 569 Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Judgment Against Sureties Enforcing Supersedeas Bond (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 7/30/2007) Modified on 7/31/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
July 30, 2007 Filing 578 Proposed Order re #577 Exparte MOTION to Seal Documents by Jose Roe. (Safire, Eric) (Filed on 7/30/2007) Modified on 7/31/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
July 30, 2007 Filing 577 Exparte MOTION to Seal Documents filed by Jose Roe. (Safire, Eric) (Filed on 7/30/2007) Modified on 7/31/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
July 27, 2007 Filing 576 Proposed Order re #574 Ex Parte MOTION to Seal Documents Submitted in Support of Motion To Approve Attorneys' Fees, Costs and Expenses Incurred Representing Minor Plaintiffs and To Direct the Clerk of the Court To Release the Settlement Proceeds by Jose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego. (Replogle, David) (Filed on 7/27/2007)
July 27, 2007 Filing 575 Declaration of David Replogle in Support of #574 Ex Parte MOTION to Seal Documents Submitted in Support of Motion To Approve Attorneys' Fees, Costs and Expenses Incurred Representing Minor Plaintiffs and To Direct the Clerk of the Court To Release the Settlement Proceeds filed byJose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego. (Related document(s) #574 ) (Replogle, David) (Filed on 7/27/2007)
July 27, 2007 Filing 574 Ex Parte MOTION to Seal Documents Submitted in Support of Motion To Approve Attorneys' Fees, Costs and Expenses Incurred Representing Minor Plaintiffs and To Direct the Clerk of the Court To Release the Settlement Proceeds filed by Jose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego. Motion Hearing set for 8/3/2007 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Replogle, David) (Filed on 7/27/2007)
July 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 573 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #562 Motion to Amend/Correct ; (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2007)
July 27, 2007 Filing 572 Proposed Order re #570 Ex Parte MOTION to Shorten Time Application of Plaintiffs for Order Shortening Time for Hearing on Motion To Approve Attorneys' Fees, Costs and Expenses Incurred Representing Minor Plaintiffs and To Direct the Clerk of the Court To Release the S ettlement Proceeds by Jose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego. (Replogle, David) (Filed on 7/27/2007)
July 27, 2007 Filing 571 Declaration of David Replogle in Support of #570 Ex Parte MOTION to Shorten Time Application of Plaintiffs for Order Shortening Time for Hearing on Motion To Approve Attorneys' Fees, Costs and Expenses Incurred Representing Minor Plaintiffs and To Direct the Clerk of the Court To Release the S filed byJose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego. (Related document(s) #570 ) (Replogle, David) (Filed on 7/27/2007)
July 27, 2007 Filing 570 Ex Parte MOTION to Shorten Time Application of Plaintiffs for Order Shortening Time for Hearing on Motion To Approve Attorneys' Fees, Costs and Expenses Incurred Representing Minor Plaintiffs and To Direct the Clerk of the Court To Release the Settlement Proceeds filed by Jose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego. Motion Hearing set for 8/3/2007 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Replogle, David) (Filed on 7/27/2007)
July 26, 2007 Filing 565 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (Hearing 8/3/07) filed by Thomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 7/26/2007)
July 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 564 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #560 Motion to Seal (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2007)
July 26, 2007 Filing 563 Proposed Order re #562 Final MOTION to Amend/Correct #561 Proposed Order, #560 Final MOTION to Seal Opposition to Motion for Judgment against Sureties by Thomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 7/26/2007) Modified on 7/27/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
July 26, 2007 Filing 562 Final MOTION to Amend/Correct #561 Proposed Order, #560 Final MOTION to Seal Opposition to Motion for Judgment against Sureties filed by Thomas F. White. Motion Hearing set for 8/3/2007 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 7/26/2007)
July 26, 2007 Filing 561 Proposed Order re #560 Final MOTION to Seal Opposition to Motion for Judgment against Sureties by Thomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 7/26/2007)
July 26, 2007 Filing 560 Final MOTION to Seal Opposition to Motion for Judgment against Sureties filed by Thomas F. White. Motion Hearing set for 8/3/2007 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 7/26/2007)
July 26, 2007 Filing 559 STATUS REPORT Plaintiffs' Status Conference Statement by Jose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego. (Replogle, David) (Filed on 7/26/2007)
July 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 558 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #553 Motion to Seal (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2007)
July 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 557 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #550 Motion to Shorten Time (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2007)
July 25, 2007 Filing 569 Memorandum in Opposition re 547 MOTION Judgment Against Sureties Enforcing Supersedas Bond filed by Thomas F. White. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2007) Modified on 4/25/2008 (sv, COURT STAFF).
July 25, 2007 Filing 568 Declaration of David Replogle in Support of 566 MOTION to Approve Irrevocable Trust Agreement filed by Jose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego. (Related document(s) 566 ) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2007) Modified on 4/25/2008 (sv, COURT STAFF).
July 25, 2007 Filing 567 MEMORANDUM in Support re 566 MOTION to Approve Irrevocable Trust Agreement filed by Jose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego. (Related document(s) 566 ) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2007) Modified on 4/25/2008 (sv, COURT STAFF).
July 25, 2007 Filing 566 MOTION to Approve Irrevocable Trust Agreement filed by Jose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego. Motion Hearing set for 8/3/2007 10:00 AM. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2007) Modified on 4/25/2008 (sv, COURT STAFF).
July 25, 2007 Filing 556 NOTICE by Jose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego re #524 Ex Parte MOTION Order Authorizing the Clerk of the Court To Release Certified Copies of Documents Filed Under Seal Withdrawal Without Prejudice of Application for Order Authorizing the Clerk of the Court To Release Certified Copies of Documents Filed Under Seal (Replogle, David) (Filed on 7/25/2007)
July 24, 2007 Filing 555 Proposed Order re #553 Ex Parte MOTION to Seal Documents Submitted in Support of Motion To Approve Irrevocable Trust Agreement by Jose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego. (Replogle, David) (Filed on 7/24/2007)
July 24, 2007 Filing 554 Declaration of David Replogle in Support of #553 Ex Parte MOTION to Seal Documents Submitted in Support of Motion To Approve Irrevocable Trust Agreement filed byJose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego. (Related document(s) #553 ) (Replogle, David) (Filed on 7/24/2007)
July 24, 2007 Filing 553 Ex Parte MOTION to Seal Documents Submitted in Support of Motion To Approve Irrevocable Trust Agreement filed by Jose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego. Motion Hearing set for 8/3/2007 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Replogle, David) (Filed on 7/24/2007)
July 24, 2007 Filing 552 Proposed Order re #550 Ex Parte MOTION to Shorten Time for Hearing on Motion To Approve Trust Agreement by Jose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego. (Replogle, David) (Filed on 7/24/2007)
July 24, 2007 Filing 551 Declaration of David Replogle in Support of #550 Ex Parte MOTION to Shorten Time for Hearing on Motion To Approve Trust Agreement filed byJose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego. (Related document(s) #550 ) (Replogle, David) (Filed on 7/24/2007)
July 24, 2007 Filing 550 Ex Parte MOTION to Shorten Time for Hearing on Motion To Approve Trust Agreement filed by Jose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego. Motion Hearing set for 8/3/2007 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Replogle, David) (Filed on 7/24/2007)
July 24, 2007 Filing 546 NOTICE by Jose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego re #545 Order on Motion to Shorten Time Notice of Entry of Order Shortening Time for Hearing on Motion for Judgment Against Sureties Enforcing Supersedeas Bond (Replogle, David) (Filed on 7/24/2007)
July 23, 2007 Set/Reset Hearings: Motion for Judgment Against Sureties Enforcing Suersedeas Bond Hearing set for 8/3/2007 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2007)
July 23, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 545 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #540 Motion to Shorten Time (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2007)
July 23, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 544 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #537 Motion to Seal (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2007)
July 22, 2007 Filing 543 Memorandum in Opposition and Response to #540 Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Request to Shorten Time to Hearing Motion filed byThomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 7/22/2007) Modified on 7/23/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
July 20, 2007 Filing 549 Declaration of David Replogle in Support of 547 MOTION for Judgment Against Sureties Enforcing Supersedas Bond filed by Jose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego.(Related document(s) 547 ) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2007) Modified on 4/25/2008 (sv, COURT STAFF).
July 20, 2007 Filing 548 MEMORANDUM of points and authorities in Support re 547 MOTION for Judgment Against Sureties Enforcing Supersedas Bond filed by Jose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego. (Related document(s) 547 ) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2007) Modified on 4/25/2008 (sv, COURT STAFF).
July 20, 2007 Filing 547 MOTION for Judgment Against Sureties Enforcing Supersedas Bond filed by Jose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego.(mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2007) Modified on 4/25/2008 (sv, COURT STAFF).
July 20, 2007 Filing 542 Proposed Order re #540 Ex Parte MOTION to Shorten Time for Hearing on Motion for Judgment Against Sureties Enforcing Supersedeas Bond by Jose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego. (Replogle, David) (Filed on 7/20/2007)
July 20, 2007 Filing 541 Declaration of David Replogle in Support of #540 Ex Parte MOTION to Shorten Time for Hearing on Motion for Judgment Against Sureties Enforcing Supersedeas Bond filed byJose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego. (Related document(s) #540 ) (Replogle, David) (Filed on 7/20/2007)
July 20, 2007 Filing 540 Ex Parte MOTION to Shorten Time for Hearing on Motion for Judgment Against Sureties Enforcing Supersedeas Bond filed by Jose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego. Motion Hearing set for 8/3/2007 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Replogle, David) (Filed on 7/20/2007)
July 20, 2007 Filing 539 Proposed Order re #537 Ex Parte MOTION to Seal Documents Submitted in Support of Motion for Judgment Against Sureties Enforcing Supersedeas Bond by Jose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego. (Replogle, David) (Filed on 7/20/2007)
July 20, 2007 Filing 538 Declaration of David Replogle in Support of #537 Ex Parte MOTION to Seal Documents Submitted in Support of Motion for Judgment Against Sureties Enforcing Supersedeas Bond filed byJose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego. (Related document(s) #537 ) (Replogle, David) (Filed on 7/20/2007)
July 20, 2007 Filing 537 Ex Parte MOTION to Seal Documents Submitted in Support of Motion for Judgment Against Sureties Enforcing Supersedeas Bond filed by Jose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego. Motion Hearing set for 8/3/2007 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Replogle, David) (Filed on 7/20/2007)
July 19, 2007 Filing 536 APPLICATION to seal 533 Order by Thomas F. White.(mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2007) Modified on 4/25/2008 (sv, COURT STAFF).
July 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 535 ORDER sealing Court Order (document no. 533) and defendant's Application to Seal. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 7/19/07. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2007) Modified on 4/25/2008 (sv, COURT STAFF).
July 11, 2007 Set/Reset Hearings: Case Management Conference set for 8/3/2007 10:00 AM. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
July 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 534 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer setting CMC for 8/3/2007 at 10 a.m. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2007)
July 10, 2007 Filing 532 Proposed Order re #530 Ex Parte Application for Order Directing Clerk of the Court To Deposit Funds in Segregated, Interest Bearing Account by Jose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego. (Replogle, David) (Filed on 7/10/2007)
July 10, 2007 Filing 531 Declaration of David Replogle in Support of #530 Ex Parte Application for Order Directing Clerk of the Court To Deposit Funds in Segregated, Interest Bearing Account filed byJose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego. (Related document(s) #530 ) (Replogle, David) (Filed on 7/10/2007)
July 10, 2007 Filing 530 Ex Parte Application for Order Directing Clerk of the Court To Deposit Funds in Segregated, Interest Bearing Account filed by Jose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego. (Replogle, David) (Filed on 7/10/2007)
July 3, 2007 Filing 529 Proposed Order re #528 Final Ex Parte Application to Set Case Management Conference and/or Hearing on Remaining Issues by Thomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 7/3/2007)
July 3, 2007 Filing 528 Final Ex Parte Application to Set Case Management Conference and/or Hearing on Remaining Issues filed by Thomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 7/3/2007)
July 2, 2007 Filing 527 Memorandum in Opposition re #524 Ex Parte MOTION Order Authorizing the Clerk of the Court To Release Certified Copies of Documents Filed Under Seal ; the Opposition filed byThomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 7/2/2007)
July 2, 2007 Filing 526 Proposed Order re #524 Ex Parte MOTION Order Authorizing the Clerk of the Court To Release Certified Copies of Documents Filed Under Seal by Jose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego. (Replogle, David) (Filed on 7/2/2007)
July 2, 2007 Filing 525 Declaration of David Replogle in Support of #524 Ex Parte MOTION Order Authorizing the Clerk of the Court To Release Certified Copies of Documents Filed Under Seal filed byJose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego. (Related document(s) #524 ) (Replogle, David) (Filed on 7/2/2007)
July 2, 2007 Filing 524 Ex Parte MOTION Order Authorizing the Clerk of the Court To Release Certified Copies of Documents Filed Under Seal filed by Jose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego. (Replogle, David) (Filed on 7/2/2007)
July 1, 2007 Filing 523 NOTICE by Thomas F. White of His Counsel's Unavailability (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 7/1/2007)
June 30, 2007 Filing 522 Memorandum in Opposition Opposition to Defendant White's Application for Hearing Regarding Substitution of Counsel for Plaintiffs filed byJose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A#2 Exhibit Exhibit B#3 Proof of Service)(Replogle, David) (Filed on 6/30/2007)
June 28, 2007 Filing 521 Proposed Order re #520 filed by Jose Roe. (Safire, Eric) (Filed on 6/28/2007) Modified on 6/29/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
June 28, 2007 Filing 520 Second Ex Parte Application Request for Hearing filed by Jose Roe. (Safire, Eric) (Filed on 6/28/2007)
June 28, 2007 Filing 519 CLERKS Letter Spreading Mandate to Counsel re #517 , #518 . (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2007)
June 27, 2007 Filing 518 USCA JUDGMENT as to #361 Notice of Appeal, filed by Thomas F. White. The judgment of the District Court is affirmed. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2007)
June 27, 2007 Filing 517 MEMORANDUM of USCA as to #361 Notice of Appeal, filed by Thomas F. White. The district court did not abuse its discretion in approving the settlement and ordering White to submit his payment to the clerk of court. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2007)
June 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 516 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying #515 Ex Parte Application (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2007)
June 21, 2007 Filing 515 First Ex Parte Application for hearing re substitution of counsel and Request for Order to submit Evidence under seal filed by Jose Roe. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Safire, Eric) (Filed on 6/21/2007) Modified on 6/25/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
November 20, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 511 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying 491 Motion for Sanctions (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2006)
November 17, 2006 Filing 512 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 11/17/2006 before Charles R. Breyer (Date Filed: 11/17/2006) re 491 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Jose Roe,, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego,. (Court Reporter Sahar McVickar.) (be, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/17/2006)
November 16, 2006 Filing 514 Letter dated 11/15/06 from Court to Ms. Catterson re jurisdiction. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2006)
November 16, 2006 Filing 513 Letter dated 11/14/06 from John E. Hill, Esq. re jurisdiction. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2006)
November 15, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 508 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #505 Motion for Leave to File (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2006)
November 14, 2006 Filing 510 DECLARATION of Geoffrey Rotwein in Opposition to 491 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Thomas F. White.(Related document(s) 491 ) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2006) Modified on 4/25/2008 (sv, COURT STAFF).
November 14, 2006 Filing 509 DECLARATION of Alberto Moran in Opposition to 491 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Thomas F. White. (Related document(s) 491 ) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2006) Modified on 4/25/2008 (sv, COURT STAFF).
November 14, 2006 Filing 507 OBJECTIONS to re 504 Declaration in Support of Rule 11 Sanctions; Declaration of David Replogle, objections by Thomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 11/14/2006)
November 14, 2006 Filing 506 Proposed Order re #505 Final MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Declarations, and under seal, by Thomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 11/14/2006)
November 14, 2006 Filing 505 Final MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Declarations, and under seal, filed by Thomas F. White. Motion Hearing set for 11/17/2006 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 11/14/2006)
November 8, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 502 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #498 Motion to Seal (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2006)
November 6, 2006 Filing 500 Proposed Order re #498 Ex Parte MOTION to Seal Documents Filed in Support of Rule 11 Sanctions by Jose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego. (Replogle, David) (Filed on 11/6/2006)
November 6, 2006 Filing 499 Declaration of David Replogle in Support of #498 Ex Parte MOTION to Seal Documents Filed in Support of Rule 11 Sanctions filed byJose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego. (Related document(s) #498 ) (Replogle, David) (Filed on 11/6/2006)
November 6, 2006 Filing 498 Ex Parte MOTION to Seal Documents Filed in Support of Rule 11 Sanctions filed by Jose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego. (Replogle, David) (Filed on 11/6/2006)
November 3, 2006 Filing 504 Reply Declaration of David Replogle in Support of 491 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Jose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego. (Related document(s) 491 ) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2006) Modified on 4/25/2008 (sv, COURT STAFF).
November 3, 2006 Filing 503 Reply Memorandum re 491 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Jose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego.(mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2006) Modified on 4/25/2008 (sv, COURT STAFF).
November 3, 2006 Filing 501 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 9/29/06 before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Court Reporter: Connie Kuhl. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2006) (mclS, COURT STAFF).
October 30, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 495 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #493 Motion to Seal (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2006)
October 27, 2006 Filing 497 DECLARATION of Geoffrey Rotwein in Opposition to 496 Memorandum in Opposition filed by Thomas F. White. (Related document(s) 496 ) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2006) Modified on 4/25/2008 (sv, COURT STAFF).
October 27, 2006 Filing 496 Memorandum in Opposition re 491 MOTION for Sanctions filed byThomas F. White.(mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2006) Modified on 4/25/2008 (sv, COURT STAFF).
October 27, 2006 Filing 494 Proposed Order re #493 Final MOTION to Seal Memorandum of Points and Authorities and Declaration of Geoffrey Rotwein in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Rule 11 Sanctions, and Request for Sanctions against David Replogle and John E. Hill by Thomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 10/27/2006)
October 27, 2006 Filing 493 Final MOTION to Seal Memorandum of Points and Authorities and Declaration of Geoffrey Rotwein in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Rule 11 Sanctions, and Request for Sanctions against David Replogle and John E. Hill filed by Thomas F. White. Motion Hearing set for 11/17/2006 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 10/27/2006)
October 4, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 490 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying #454 Motion to Vacate. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2006)
October 3, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 488 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #482 Motion to Seal (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2006)
October 2, 2006 Filing 492 MEMORANDUM of points adn authorities in Support re 491 MOTION for Sanctions filed byJose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego.(Related document(s) 491 ) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2006) Modified on 4/25/2008 (sv, COURT STAFF).
October 2, 2006 Filing 491 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Jose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego. Motion Hearing set for 11/17/2006 10:00 AM. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2006) Modified on 4/25/2008 (sv, COURT STAFF).
September 29, 2006 Filing 489 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 9/29/2006 before Charles R. Breyer (Date Filed: 9/29/2006) re #454 Amended MOTION to Vacate 451 Declaration in Support, 450 Memorandum in Support, #453 Final MOTION to Vacate 344 Judgment filed by Thomas F. White,. (Court Reporter Connie Kuhl.) (be, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/29/2006)
September 29, 2006 Filing 484 Proposed Order re #482 MOTION to Seal Documents Filed in Support of Motion for Rule 11 Sanctions by Jose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego. (Replogle, David) (Filed on 9/29/2006)
September 29, 2006 Filing 483 Declaration of David Replogle in Support of #482 MOTION to Seal Documents Filed in Support of Motion for Rule 11 Sanctions filed byJose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego. (Related document(s) #482 ) (Replogle, David) (Filed on 9/29/2006)
September 29, 2006 Filing 482 MOTION to Seal Documents Filed in Support of Motion for Rule 11 Sanctions filed by Jose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego. Motion Hearing set for 11/17/2006 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Replogle, David) (Filed on 9/29/2006)
September 29, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 481 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #479 Motion to Seal Document (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2006)
September 27, 2006 Filing 487 Declaration of Lloyd C. Cunningham filed by Thomas F. White.(mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2006) Modified on 4/25/2008 (sv, COURT STAFF).
September 27, 2006 Filing 486 OBJECTIONS to re 478 Declaration of Mauricio Borrego and Declaration of Ulices Garcia by Thomas F. White.(mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2006) Modified on 4/25/2008 (sv, COURT STAFF).
September 27, 2006 Filing 485 Supplemental Reply to Opposition re 449 MOTION to Vacate filed byThomas F. White.(mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2006) Modified on 4/25/2008 (sv, COURT STAFF).
September 27, 2006 Filing 480 Proposed Order re #479 Final MOTION to Seal Document Supplemental Reply, Objections to Declarations and Declaration of Lloyd W. Cunningham by Thomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 9/27/2006)
September 27, 2006 Filing 479 Final MOTION to Seal Document Supplemental Reply, Objections to Declarations and Declaration of Lloyd W. Cunningham filed by Thomas F. White. Motion Hearing set for 9/29/2006 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 9/27/2006)
September 25, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 477 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #474 Motion to Seal (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2006)
September 22, 2006 Filing 478 DECLARATION of Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego in Opposition to #453 Final MOTION to Vacate 344 Judgment filed byJose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego.(Related document(s) #453 ) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2006) Modified on 4/25/2008 (sv, COURT STAFF).
September 22, 2006 Filing 476 Proposed Order re #474 Ex Parte MOTION to Seal Document Filed in Opposition to Motion To Vacate Judgment by Jose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego. (Replogle, David) (Filed on 9/22/2006)
September 22, 2006 Filing 475 *** ERRONEOUS DOCKET ENTRY *** Declaration of David Replogle in Support of #474 Ex Parte MOTION to Seal Document Filed in Opposition to Motion To Vacate Judgment filed byJose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego. (Related document(s) #474 ) (Replogle, David) (Filed on 9/22/2006) Modified on 9/25/2006 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
September 22, 2006 Filing 474 Ex Parte MOTION to Seal Document Filed in Opposition to Motion To Vacate Judgment filed by Jose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego. Motion Hearing set for 9/29/2006 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Replogle, David) (Filed on 9/22/2006)
September 20, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 469 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #467 Motion to Seal (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2006)
September 15, 2006 Filing 473 Declaration of Geoffrey Rotwein in Support of 471 Reply to Opposition filed byThomas F. White.(Related document(s) 471 ) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2006) Modified on 4/25/2008 (sv, COURT STAFF).
September 15, 2006 Filing 472 Declaration of Stuart Hanlon in Support of 471 Reply to Opposition filed byThomas F. White.(Related document(s) 471 ) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2006) Modified on 4/25/2008 (sv, COURT STAFF).
September 15, 2006 Filing 471 Reply to Opposition re 449 MOTION to Vacate filed byThomas F. White.(mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2006) Modified on 4/25/2008 (sv, COURT STAFF).
September 15, 2006 Filing 470 OBJECTIONS to Testimony, Exhibits and Representations in plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Vacate Judgment by Thomas F. White.(mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2006) Modified on 4/25/2008 (sv, COURT STAFF).
September 15, 2006 Filing 468 Proposed Order re #467 Final MOTION to Seal Pleadings Filed in Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Vacate Judgment and for Sanctions by Thomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 9/15/2006)
September 15, 2006 Filing 467 Final MOTION to Seal Pleadings Filed in Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Vacate Judgment and for Sanctions filed by Thomas F. White. Motion Hearing set for 9/29/2006 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 9/15/2006)
September 11, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 464 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #461 Motion to Seal (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2006)
September 10, 2006 Filing 463 Proposed Order re #461 Ex Parte MOTION to Seal Documents Filed in Opposition to Motion To Vacate Judgment by Jose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego. (Replogle, David) (Filed on 9/10/2006)
September 10, 2006 Filing 462 Declaration of David Replogle in Support of #461 Ex Parte MOTION to Seal Documents Filed in Opposition to Motion To Vacate Judgment filed byJose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego. (Related document(s) #461 ) (Replogle, David) (Filed on 9/10/2006)
September 10, 2006 Filing 461 Ex Parte MOTION to Seal Documents Filed in Opposition to Motion To Vacate Judgment filed by Jose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego. Motion Hearing set for 9/29/2006 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Replogle, David) (Filed on 9/10/2006)
September 8, 2006 Filing 466 DECLARATION of David Replogle in Opposition to #453 Final MOTION to Vacate 344 Judgment filed byJose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego.(Related document(s) #453 ) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2006) Modified on 4/25/2008 (sv, COURT STAFF).
September 8, 2006 Filing 465 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #453 Final MOTION to Vacate 344 Judgment filed byJose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego.(Related document(s) #453 ) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2006) Modified on 4/25/2008 (sv, COURT STAFF).
August 21, 2006 Filing 460 NOTICE by Thomas F. White re #455 Final MOTION to Quash Subpoenas Duces Tecum and for Sanctions under FRCP Rules 11 and 37 To Withdraw Motion (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 8/21/2006)
August 15, 2006 Filing 459 Proposed Order re #458 Final MOTION to Shorten Time for Hearing on Motion to Quash Subpoenas Duces Tecum and Sanctions under FRCP Rules 11 and 37 and to Stay Effect of and Compliance With Subpoenas Pending Hearing, by Thomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 8/15/2006)
August 15, 2006 Filing 458 Final MOTION to Shorten Time for Hearing on Motion to Quash Subpoenas Duces Tecum and Sanctions under FRCP Rules 11 and 37 filed by Thomas F. White. Motion Hearing set for 8/25/2006 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 8/15/2006)
August 15, 2006 Filing 457 MEMORANDUM in Support re #455 Final MOTION to Quash Subpoenas Duces Tecum and for Sanctions under FRCP Rules 11 and 37, #456 Declaration in Support, filed byThomas F. White. (Related document(s) #455 , #456 ) (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 8/15/2006)
August 15, 2006 Filing 456 Declaration of Geoffrey Rotwein in Support of #455 Final MOTION to Quash Subpoenas Duces Tecum and for Sanctions under FRCP Rules 11 and 37 filed byThomas F. White. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) #455 ) (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 8/15/2006)
August 15, 2006 Filing 455 Final MOTION to Quash Subpoenas Duces Tecum and for Sanctions under FRCP Rules 11 and 37 filed by Thomas F. White. Motion Hearing set for 8/25/2006 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 8/15/2006)
August 11, 2006 Filing 454 Amended MOTION to Vacate 451 Declaration in Support, 450 Memorandum in Support, 452 Declaration in Support, #453 Final MOTION to Vacate 344 Judgment filed by Thomas F. White. Motion Hearing set for 9/29/2006 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 8/11/2006)
August 8, 2006 Filing 453 Final MOTION to Vacate 344 Judgment filed by Thomas F. White. Motion Hearing set for 9/15/2006 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 8/8/2006)
August 8, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 448 ORDER denying motion for shortened time. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/7/2006. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2006)
August 7, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 447 *** ERRONEOUS ENTRY. SEE BELOW #448 *** ORDER denying application for shortened time. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/7/2006. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2006) Modified on 8/8/2006 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
August 7, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 446 ORDER SEALING PLEADINGS. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/04/06. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2006)
August 7, 2006 Filing 445 Memorandum in Opposition to Application for Order To Allow Rule 60 Motion filed byJose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego. (Replogle, David) (Filed on 8/7/2006)
August 3, 2006 Filing 452 Declaration of Geoffrey Rotwein in Support of 449 MOTION to Vacate Judgment and for Sanctions filed by Thomas F. White. (Related document(s) 449 ) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2006) Modified on 4/25/2008 (sv, COURT STAFF).
August 3, 2006 Filing 451 Declaration of Nina Safdie-Enoch in Support of 449 MOTION to Vacate Judgment and for Sanctions filed by Thomas F. White.(Related document(s) 449 ) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2006) Modified on 4/25/2008 (sv, COURT STAFF).
August 3, 2006 Filing 450 MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Support re 449 MOTION to Vacate and for Sanctions filed by Thomas F. White. (Related document(s) 449 ) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2006) Modified on 4/25/2008 (sv, COURT STAFF).
August 3, 2006 Filing 449 MOTION to Vacate Judgment and for Sanctions filed by Thomas F. White.(mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2006) Modified on 4/25/2008 (sv, COURT STAFF).
August 3, 2006 Filing 444 Application to seal pleadings and Declaration of Geoffrey Rotwein in Support of #443 Proposed Order to Seal Pleadings Filed Re Motion to Vacate Judgment and for Sanctions filed byThomas F. White. (Related document(s) #443 ) (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 8/3/2006) Modified on 8/4/2006 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
August 3, 2006 Filing 443 Proposed Order to Seal Pleadings Filed Re Motion to Vacate Judgment and for Sanctions by Thomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 8/3/2006)
August 3, 2006 Filing 442 Declaration of Geoffrey Rotwein in Support of #441 Proposed Order to Set Hearing on Motion to Vacate Judgment and for Sanctions on Shortened Time filed byThomas F. White. (Related document(s) #441 ) (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 8/3/2006)
August 3, 2006 Filing 441 Proposed Order to Set Hearing on Motion to Vacate Judgment and for Sanctions on Shortened Time by Thomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 8/3/2006)
June 6, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 440 ORDER RELATING CASE C-06-2322EDL to C-03-4035CRB. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/02/06. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2006)
May 30, 2006 Filing 439 Proposed Order re #437 MOTION to Related Case by Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego. (Replogle, David) (Filed on 5/30/2006)
May 30, 2006 Filing 438 STIPULATION re #437 MOTION to Related Case by Jose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego. (Replogle, David) (Filed on 5/30/2006)
May 30, 2006 Filing 437 MOTION to Related Case filed by Jose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego. (Replogle, David) (Filed on 5/30/2006)
March 21, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 432 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #429 Motion to Seal (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2006)
March 20, 2006 Filing 431 Proposed Order re #429 MOTION to Seal Application of Plaintiffs for Order To File Under Seal Documents Submitted in Connection with October 7, 2005 Hearing by Jose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego. (Replogle, David) (Filed on 3/20/2006)
March 20, 2006 Filing 430 Declaration of David Replogle in Support of #429 MOTION to Seal Application of Plaintiffs for Order To File Under Seal Documents Submitted in Connection with October 7, 2005 Hearing filed byJose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego. (Related document(s) #429 ) (Replogle, David) (Filed on 3/20/2006)
March 20, 2006 Filing 429 MOTION to Seal Application of Plaintiffs for Order To File Under Seal Documents Submitted in Connection with October 7, 2005 Hearing filed by Jose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego. (Replogle, David) (Filed on 3/20/2006)
March 17, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 423 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #419 Motion to Relate Case (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2006)
March 17, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 422 ORDER re #317 MOTION to Seal Memoranda and Declarations Filed in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Jose Roe,, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego,. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/16/06. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2006)
March 16, 2006 Filing 421 Proposed Order re #419 MOTION to Related Case by Jose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego. (Replogle, David) (Filed on 3/16/2006)
March 16, 2006 Filing 420 STIPULATION re #419 MOTION to Related Case by Jose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego. (Replogle, David) (Filed on 3/16/2006)
March 16, 2006 Filing 419 MOTION to Related Case filed by Jose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego. (Replogle, David) (Filed on 3/16/2006)
March 14, 2006 Filing 418 Letter from David Replogle. (Replogle, David) (Filed on 3/14/2006)
March 6, 2006 Filing 417 Letter dated 3/3/06 from Geoffrey Rotwein re 10/19/05 letter. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2006)
March 1, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 415 ORDER of USCA as to #361 Notice of Appeal, filed by Thomas F. White. Appellant's opposed motion to reinstate the original briefing schedule is granted. The opening brief due 3/27/06, answering brief due 4/25/06. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2006)
February 13, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 414 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying 386 Motion for Attorney Fees (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2006)
February 9, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 413 ORDER of USCA as to #361 Notice of Appeal, filed by Thomas F. White. Appellees' and appellant's motions to seal are granted. The amended briefing schedule is as follows : opening brief due 2/21/06, answering brief due 3/23/06. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2006)
February 9, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 409 ORDER granting leave to file pleading post-reply and file pleadings under seal. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/08/06. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2006)
February 7, 2006 Filing 412 Declaration of Kate Dyer in Support of 393 Memorandum in Opposition filed byThomas F. White. (Related document(s) 393 ) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2006) Modified on 4/25/2008 (sv, COURT STAFF).
February 7, 2006 Filing 411 OBJECTIONS to Statements re 405 Reply Memorandum, 406 Declaration in Support by Thomas F. White. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2006) Modified on 4/25/2008 (sv, COURT STAFF).
February 7, 2006 Filing 410 MOTION for Leave to File Defendant's Objections and Declaration of Kate Dyer in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Reply Declaration and Memorandum Under Seal filed by Thomas F. White.(mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2006) Modified on 4/25/2008 (sv, COURT STAFF).
February 7, 2006 Filing 408 Proposed Order Granting Leave to File Pleadings Post-Reply, and Sealing Filed Pleadings by Thomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 2/7/2006)
February 6, 2006 Filing 407 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing Motion Hearing reset for 2/17/2006 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2006)
January 30, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 403 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #399 Motion to Seal Document (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2006)
January 30, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 402 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #396 Motion for Leave to File (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2006)
January 27, 2006 Filing 406 Reply Declaration of David Replogle in Support of 386 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed byJose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego. (Related document(s) 386 ) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2006) Modified on 4/25/2008 (sv, COURT STAFF).
January 27, 2006 Filing 405 Reply Memorandum re 386 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed byJose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego.(mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2006) Modified on 4/25/2008 (sv, COURT STAFF).
January 27, 2006 Filing 401 Proposed Order re #399 MOTION to Seal Document Reply Memorandum and Reply Declaration in Support of Motion To Award Plaintiffs Attorneys' Fees, Costs and Expenses by Jose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego. (Replogle, David) (Filed on 1/27/2006)
January 27, 2006 Filing 400 Declaration of David Replogle in Support of #399 MOTION to Seal Document Reply Memorandum and Reply Declaration in Support of Motion To Award Plaintiffs Attorneys' Fees, Costs and Expenses filed byJose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego. (Related document(s) #399 ) (Replogle, David) (Filed on 1/27/2006) Modified on 1/30/2006 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
January 27, 2006 Filing 399 MOTION to Seal Document Reply Memorandum and Reply Declaration in Support of Motion To Award Plaintiffs Attorneys' Fees, Costs and Expenses filed by Jose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego. Motion Hearing set for 2/10/2006 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Replogle, David) (Filed on 1/27/2006)
January 26, 2006 Filing 398 OBJECTIONS to re 386 MOTION for Attorney Fees Plaintiffs' Objection to Evidence Submitted in Support of Defendant's Opposition to Motion To Award Plaintiffs Attorneys' Fees, Costs and Expenses by Jose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego. (Replogle, David) (Filed on 1/26/2006)
January 25, 2006 Filing 404 SUPPLEMENT by Thomas F. White re 393 Memorandum in Opposition.(mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2006) Modified on 4/25/2008 (sv, COURT STAFF).
January 25, 2006 Filing 397 Proposed Order re #396 Final MOTION for Leave to File and Under Seal, Supplement to Opposition by Thomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 1/25/2006)
January 25, 2006 Filing 396 Final MOTION for Leave to File and Under Seal, Supplement to Opposition filed by Thomas F. White. Motion Hearing set for 2/10/2006 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 1/25/2006)
January 23, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 392 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #389 Motion to Seal (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2006)
January 23, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 391 ORDER re: transcript.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/23/2006. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2006)
January 20, 2006 Filing 395 Declaration of Geoffrey Rotwein in Support of 393 Memorandum in Opposition filed byThomas F. White. (Related document(s) 393 ) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2006) Modified on 4/25/2008 (sv, COURT STAFF).
January 20, 2006 Filing 394 OBJECTIONS to statements re 386 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Thomas F. White.(mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2006) Modified on 4/25/2008 (sv, COURT STAFF).
January 20, 2006 Filing 393 MEMORANDUM in Oppostion re 386 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed byThomas F. White.(Related document(s) 386 ) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2006) Modified on 4/25/2008 (sv, COURT STAFF).
January 20, 2006 Filing 390 Proposed Order re #389 Final MOTION to Seal Opposition Pleadings by Thomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 1/20/2006)
January 20, 2006 Filing 389 Final MOTION to Seal Opposition Pleadings filed by Thomas F. White. Motion Hearing set for 2/10/2006 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 1/20/2006)
January 17, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 385 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #381 Motion to Seal (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2006)
January 9, 2006 Filing 388 Declaration of David Replogle in Support of 386 MOTION for Attorney Fees, Costs and Expenses filed byJose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego.(Related document(s) 386 ) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2006) Modified on 4/25/2008 (sv, COURT STAFF).
January 9, 2006 Filing 387 MEMORANDUM of points and authorities in Support re 386 MOTION for Attorney Fees, Costs and Expenses filed byJose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego. (Related document(s) 386 ) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2006) Modified on 4/25/2008 (sv, COURT STAFF).
January 9, 2006 Filing 386 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees, Costs and Expenses filed by Jose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego. Motion Hearing set for 2/10/2006 10:00 AM.(mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2006) Modified on 4/25/2008 (sv, COURT STAFF).
January 9, 2006 Filing 384 Receipt from U.S. Court of Appeals for certificate of record. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2006)
January 9, 2006 Filing 383 Proposed Order re #381 MOTION to Seal Motion for Order Awarding Plaintiffs Attorneys' Fees, Costs and Expenses by Jose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego. (Replogle, David) (Filed on 1/9/2006)
January 9, 2006 Filing 382 AFFIDAVIT re #381 MOTION to Seal Motion for Order Awarding Plaintiffs Attorneys' Fees, Costs and Expenses by Jose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego. (Replogle, David) (Filed on 1/9/2006)
January 9, 2006 Filing 381 MOTION to Seal Motion for Order Awarding Plaintiffs Attorneys' Fees, Costs and Expenses filed by Jose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego. Motion Hearing set for 2/10/2006 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Replogle, David) (Filed on 1/9/2006)
January 4, 2006 Filing 380 Certificate of Record Mailed to USCA re appeal #361 . (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2006)
January 4, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 378 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #375 Motion for Extension of Time to File (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2006)
January 3, 2006 Filing 379 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 10/7/05 before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Court Reporter: Sahar McVickar. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2006) (mclS, COURT STAFF).
December 27, 2005 USCA Case Number 05-17398 for #361 Notice of Appeal. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2005)
December 22, 2005 Filing 377 REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings Held on 11/4/05 before Judge Charles R. Breyer - [Court Reporter: Belle Ball]. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2005) (mclS, COURT STAFF).
December 20, 2005 Filing 376 Proposed Order re #375 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Stipulation for Order Extending Time To File Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Bill of Costs by Jose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego. (Replogle, David) (Filed on 12/20/2005)
December 20, 2005 Filing 375 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Stipulation for Order Extending Time To File Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Bill of Costs filed by Jose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego. (Replogle, David) (Filed on 12/20/2005)
December 19, 2005 Filing 374 BOND ON APPEAL FILED PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 79-5 by Thomas F. White Re #372 Order (aaa, Court Staff) (Filed on 12/19/2005) Modified on 4/25/2008 (sv, COURT STAFF).
December 19, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 373 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #369 Motion to Seal (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2005)
December 19, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 372 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #363 Motion to Seal (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2005)
December 19, 2005 Filing 371 Memorandum in Opposition re #369 Final MOTION to Seal "Designation of Record on Appeal" filed byJose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego. (Replogle, David) (Filed on 12/19/2005)
December 17, 2005 Filing 370 Proposed Order re #368 Designation of Record on Appeal, #369 Final MOTION to Seal "Designation of Record on Appeal" by Thomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 12/17/2005)
December 17, 2005 Filing 369 Final MOTION to Seal "Designation of Record on Appeal" filed by Thomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 12/17/2005)
December 17, 2005 Filing 368 DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal by Thomas F. White, Thomas F. White re #361 Notice of Appeal, (Rotwein, Geoffrey) Re #373 Order (Filed on 12/17/2005) Modified on 12/20/2005 (aaa, Court Staff). Modified on 4/25/2008 (sv, COURT STAFF).
December 16, 2005 Filing 367 Reply to Opposition re #363 Final MOTION to Seal Bond on Appeal (Supplemental) filed byThomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 12/16/2005)
December 16, 2005 Filing 366 Reply to Opposition re #363 Final MOTION to Seal Bond on Appeal filed byThomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 12/16/2005)
December 16, 2005 Filing 365 Memorandum in Opposition re #363 Final MOTION to Seal Bond on Appeal filed byJose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego. (Replogle, David) (Filed on 12/16/2005)
December 16, 2005 Filing 364 Proposed Order re #363 Final MOTION to Seal Bond on Appeal by Thomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 12/16/2005)
December 16, 2005 Filing 363 Final MOTION to Seal Bond on Appeal filed by Thomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 12/16/2005)
December 15, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 362 ORDER. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on December 15, 2005. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2005)
December 14, 2005 TRANSMISSION of Notice of Appeal & Docket Sheet to United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit re #361 Notice of Appeal (tn, COURT STAFF)
December 14, 2005 COPY of Notice of Appeal & Docket Sheet Mailed To All Counsel. (tn, COURT STAFF)
December 13, 2005 Filing 360 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 12/13/2005 before Charles R. Breyer (Date Filed: 12/13/2005) re #346 Final MOTION for Bond On Appeal, and Stay Judgment on Appeal filed by Thomas F. White,. (Court Reporter Debra Pas.) (be, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/13/2005)
December 12, 2005 Filing 359 Reply to Opposition re #346 Final MOTION for Bond On Appeal, and Stay Judgment on Appeal filed byThomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 12/12/2005)
December 12, 2005 Filing 358 Final MOTION for Hearing re #357 Order on Motion for Hearing, To Change Time, filed by Thomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 12/12/2005)
December 12, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 357 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #354 Motion for Hearing, granting #355 Motion for Hearing (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2005)
December 10, 2005 Filing 356 Memorandum in Opposition re #346 Final MOTION for Bond On Appeal, and Stay Judgment on Appeal filed byJose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego. (Replogle, David) (Filed on 12/10/2005)
December 9, 2005 Filing 355 Final MOTION for Hearing re #353 Order Advancing Hearing on Motion to Stay Judgment and Set Bond filed by Thomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 12/9/2005)
December 9, 2005 Filing 354 Final MOTION for Hearing re #352 Order on Motion to Shorten Time To Advance Hearing on Motion to Stay Judgment and Set Bond filed by Thomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 12/9/2005)
December 9, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 353 ORDER setting hearing on motion for bond.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/9/2005. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2005)
December 8, 2005 Filing 361 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to the Court's Partial Judgment re 344 - [Filing Fee: $255.00, Receipt No. 3379242]. Filed by Defendant Thomas F. White. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2005) Additional attachment(s) added on 12/16/2005 (tn, COURT STAFF).
December 8, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 352 *** ERRONEOUS DOCKET ENTRY. *** ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #349 Motion to Shorten Time (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2005) Modified on 1/6/2006 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
December 8, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 351 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer finding as moot #333 Motion to Shorten Time, granting #336 Motion to Dismiss (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2005)
December 8, 2005 Filing 350 Proposed Order re #349 Final MOTION to Shorten Time To Hear Motion for Stay of Judgment and for Bond Pending Appeal by Thomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 12/8/2005)
December 8, 2005 Filing 349 Final MOTION to Shorten Time To Hear Motion for Stay of Judgment and for Bond Pending Appeal filed by Thomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 12/8/2005)
December 8, 2005 Filing 348 Declaration of Geoffrey Rotwein in Support of #346 Final MOTION for Bond On Appeal, and Stay Judgment on Appeal filed byThomas F. White. (Related document(s) #346 ) (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 12/8/2005)
December 8, 2005 Filing 347 MEMORANDUM in Support re #346 Final MOTION for Bond On Appeal, and Stay Judgment on Appeal filed byThomas F. White. (Related document(s) #346 ) (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 12/8/2005)
December 8, 2005 Filing 346 Final MOTION for Bond On Appeal, and Stay Judgment on Appeal filed by Thomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 12/8/2005)
December 7, 2005 Filing 345 NOTICE by Thomas F. White Reasons to Maintain Sealing of Memorandum and Order (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 12/7/2005)
December 6, 2005 Filing 339 NOTICE by Thomas F. White Unavailability of Counsel (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 12/6/2005)
December 6, 2005 Filing 338 MEMORANDUM in Support re #336 MOTION to Dismiss Claims Against Defendant Nathan Lovaas filed byJose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego. (Related document(s) #336 ) (Replogle, David) (Filed on 12/6/2005)
December 6, 2005 Filing 337 Declaration of David Replogle in Support of #336 MOTION to Dismiss Claims Against Defendant Nathan Lovaas filed byJose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego. (Related document(s) #336 ) (Replogle, David) (Filed on 12/6/2005)
December 6, 2005 Filing 336 MOTION to Dismiss Claims Against Defendant Nathan Lovaas filed by Jose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego. Motion Hearing set for 12/9/2005 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Replogle, David) (Filed on 12/6/2005)
December 6, 2005 Filing 335 Proposed Order re #333 Ex Parte MOTION to Shorten Time for Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion To Dismiss Claims Against Nathan Lovaas by Jose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego. (Replogle, David) (Filed on 12/6/2005)
December 6, 2005 Filing 334 Declaration of David Replogle in Support of #333 Ex Parte MOTION to Shorten Time for Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion To Dismiss Claims Against Nathan Lovaas filed byJose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego. (Related document(s) #333 ) (Replogle, David) (Filed on 12/6/2005)
December 6, 2005 Filing 333 Ex Parte MOTION to Shorten Time for Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion To Dismiss Claims Against Nathan Lovaas filed by Jose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego. Motion Hearing set for 12/9/2005 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Replogle, David) (Filed on 12/6/2005)
December 5, 2005 Filing 344 PARTIAL JUDGMENT Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/5/05. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2005) Modified on 4/25/2008 (sv, COURT STAFF).
December 5, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 343 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/5/05. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2005) Modified on 4/25/2008 (sv, COURT STAFF).
December 5, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 332 ORDER re: Nathan Lovaas. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/5/2005. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2005)
November 21, 2005 Filing 331 NOTICE of Change of Address by David Replogle (Replogle, David) (Filed on 11/21/2005)
November 8, 2005 Filing 330 Reply Memorandum Re Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment filed byThomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 11/8/2005)
November 7, 2005 Filing 328 Proposed Order Sealing Supplemental Memorandum by Thomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 11/7/2005)
November 7, 2005 Filing 327 Final MOTION to Seal Supplemental Memorandum filed by Thomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 11/7/2005)
November 7, 2005 Filing 326 Reply to Opposition Reply Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Defendant White's Post-Hearing Brief, Request That the Court Enter an Order Sealing White's Post-Hearing Brief, and Request for Rule 11 Sanctions filed byJose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego. (Replogle, David) (Filed on 11/7/2005)
November 7, 2005 Filing 325 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 11/4/2005 before Charles R. Breyer (Date Filed: 11/7/2005) re #310 Cross MOTION to Continue to Continue Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Thomas F. White,, #312 Cross MOTION to Withdraw Stipulation filed by Thomas F. White,, #320 Supplemental MOTION to Continue Hearing on Summary Judgment Motion and Allow Discovery filed by Thomas F. White,. (Court Reporter Belle Ball.) (be, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/7/2005)
November 7, 2005 Filing 324 Reply Memorandum (Supplement) In Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment filed byThomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 11/7/2005)
November 7, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 323 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #321 Motion to Seal (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2005)
November 3, 2005 Filing 329 OBJECTIONS to statements by David Replogle and representations in plaintiffs' reply memorandum of points and authorities by Thomas F. White.(mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2005) Modified on 4/25/2008 (sv, COURT STAFF).
November 3, 2005 Filing 322 Proposed Order Sealing Pleading by Thomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 11/3/2005)
November 3, 2005 Filing 321 Final MOTION to Seal Objections to Declaration Re Summary Judgment Motion filed by Thomas F. White. Motion Hearing set for 11/4/2005 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 11/3/2005)
November 3, 2005 Filing 320 Supplemental MOTION to Continue Hearing on Summary Judgment Motion and Allow Discovery filed by Thomas F. White. Motion Hearing set for 11/4/2005 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 11/3/2005)
November 2, 2005 Filing 428 Reply Declaration of David Replogle in Support of 424 Motion filed byJose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego.(Related document(s) 424 ) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2005) Modified on 4/25/2008 (sv, COURT STAFF).
November 2, 2005 Filing 427 Reply Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support of 424 filed byJose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego.(mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2005) Modified on 4/25/2008 (sv, COURT STAFF).
November 2, 2005 Filing 319 Proposed Order re #317 MOTION to Seal Memoranda and Declarations Filed in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment by Jose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego. (Replogle, David) (Filed on 11/2/2005)
November 2, 2005 Filing 318 Declaration of David Replogle in Support of #317 MOTION to Seal Memoranda and Declarations Filed in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment filed byJose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego. (Related document(s) #317 ) (Replogle, David) (Filed on 11/2/2005)
November 2, 2005 Filing 317 MOTION to Seal Memoranda and Declarations Filed in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Jose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego. Motion Hearing set for 11/4/2005 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Replogle, David) (Filed on 11/2/2005)
November 1, 2005 Filing 342 Letter dated 10/31/05 from Geoffrey Rotwein.(mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2005) Modified on 4/25/2008 (sv, COURT STAFF).
October 31, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 313 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #308 Motion to Seal (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2005)
October 28, 2005 Filing 316 Declaration of Geoffrey Rotwein in support of motion to continue hearing on summary judgment motion to allow defendant to take depositions filed byThomas F. White.(mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2005) Modified on 4/25/2008 (sv, COURT STAFF).
October 28, 2005 Filing 315 Declaration of Geoffrey Rotwein in Support of 314 Memorandum in Opposition filed byThomas F. White.(Related document(s) 314 ) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2005) Modified on 4/25/2008 (sv, COURT STAFF).
October 28, 2005 Filing 314 Opposition to plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment and Request that Court enter summary judgment sua sponte for defendant Thomas White filed byThomas F. White.(mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2005) Modified on 4/25/2008 (sv, COURT STAFF).
October 28, 2005 Filing 312 Cross MOTION to Withdraw Stipulation filed by Thomas F. White. Motion Hearing set for 11/4/2005 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 10/28/2005)
October 28, 2005 Filing 311 MEMORANDUM in Support re #310 Cross MOTION to Continue to Continue Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment filed byThomas F. White. (Related document(s) #310 ) (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 10/28/2005)
October 28, 2005 Filing 310 Cross MOTION to Continue to Continue Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Thomas F. White. Motion Hearing set for 11/4/2005 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 10/28/2005)
October 28, 2005 Filing 309 Proposed Order to Seal Pleadings by Thomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 10/28/2005)
October 28, 2005 Filing 308 Ex Parte MOTION to Seal Pleadings Re Opposition to Summary Judgment Motion filed by Thomas F. White. Motion Hearing set for 11/4/2005 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 10/28/2005)
October 28, 2005 Filing 307 OBJECTIONS to Plaintiffs' Factual Support by Thomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 10/28/2005)
October 27, 2005 Filing 306 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 9/9/05 before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Court Reporter: James Yeomans. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2005) (mclS, COURT STAFF).
October 27, 2005 Filing 305 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 8/29/05 before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Court Reporter: James Yeomans. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2005) (mclS, COURT STAFF).
October 24, 2005 Filing 341 Letter dated 10/20/05 from David Replogle.(mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2005) Modified on 4/25/2008 (sv, COURT STAFF).
October 24, 2005 Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 11/4/2005 02:00 PM. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
October 24, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 301 ORDER to Seal. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/24/05. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2005)
October 24, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 300 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #293 Motion to Seal Document (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2005)
October 24, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 299 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying #291 Motion to Shorten Time (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2005)
October 24, 2005 Filing 298 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 10/7/2005 before Charles R. Breyer (Date Filed: 10/24/2005). Plaintiff's motion to summarily enforce settlement is denied. Plaintiff's motion to appoint receiver is denied. Defendant's motion to vacate agreement is submitted. Hearing on motion for summary judgment set for 11/4/05 at 2:00 pm. (Court Reporter Sahar McVickar.) (be, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/24/2005) Modified on 10/25/2005 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
October 20, 2005 Filing 297 Proposed Order Sealing Points and Authorities Supporting Motion for Summary Judgment by Jose Roe. (Guta, Michael) (Filed on 10/20/2005)
October 20, 2005 Filing 296 Declaration of John E. Hill Supporting Motion to Seal filed byJose Roe. (Guta, Michael) (Filed on 10/20/2005)
October 19, 2005 Filing 416 Letter from Geoffrey Rotwein.(mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2005) Modified on 4/25/2008 (sv, COURT STAFF).
October 18, 2005 Filing 304 MEMORANDUM of points and authorities in Support of motion to set aside orders approving stipulation and to strike stipulation filed byThomas F. White.(mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2005) Modified on 4/25/2008 (sv, COURT STAFF).
October 18, 2005 Filing 294 Proposed Order re #293 MOTION to Seal Document #289 First MOTION for Reconsideration re #244 Order,, #273 Memorandum & Opinion, #246 Order, #243 Motion Hearing,, #289 First MOTION for Reconsideration re #244 Order,, #273 Memorandum & Opinion, #246 Order, #243 Motion Hearing, by Thomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 10/18/2005)
October 18, 2005 Filing 293 MOTION to Seal Document #289 First MOTION for Reconsideration re #244 Order,, #273 Memorandum & Opinion, #246 Order, #243 Motion Hearing, filed by Thomas F. White. Motion Hearing set for 10/24/2005 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 10/18/2005)
October 18, 2005 Filing 292 Proposed Order re #291 First MOTION to Shorten Time by Thomas F. White. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 10/18/2005)
October 18, 2005 Filing 291 First MOTION to Shorten Time filed by Thomas F. White. Motion Hearing set for 10/24/2005 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 10/18/2005)
October 18, 2005 Filing 290 Declaration of Geoffrey Rotwein in Support of #289 First MOTION for Reconsideration re #244 Order,, #273 Memorandum & Opinion, #246 Order, #243 Motion Hearing, filed byThomas F. White. (Related document(s) #289 ) (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 10/18/2005)
October 18, 2005 Filing 289 *** ERRONEOUS DOCKET ENTRY. *** First MOTION for Reconsideration re #244 Order,, #273 Memorandum & Opinion, #246 Order, #243 Motion Hearing, filed by Thomas F. White. Motion Hearing set for 10/24/2005 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Rotwein, Geoffrey) (Filed on 10/18/2005) Modified on 10/19/2005 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
October 14, 2005 Filing 303 Declaration of John E. Hill in support of motion for summary judgment filed byJose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego.(mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2005) Modified on 4/25/2008 (sv, COURT STAFF). (mclS, COURT STAFF).
October 14, 2005 Filing 302 FURTHER MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment filed byMauricio Rodriguez Borrego. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2005) Modified on 4/25/2008 (sv, COURT STAFF). (mclS, COURT STAFF).
October 14, 2005 Received Order sealing further memorandum of points and authorities in support of motion for summary judgment and Declaration of John E. Hill by Jose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
October 14, 2005 Filing 295 Declaration of John E. Hill re application to seal further memorandum of points and authorities in support of motion for summary judgment and Declaration of John Hill filed byJose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2005) (mclS, COURT STAFF).
October 12, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 287 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #279 Motion to Seal Document [ (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2005)
October 11, 2005 Filing 426 Declaration of David Replogle in Support of 424 Motion filed byJose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego.(Related document(s) 424 ) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2005) Modified on 4/25/2008 (sv, COURT STAFF).
October 11, 2005 Filing 425 MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Support re 424 Motion filed byJose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego.(Related document(s) 424 ) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2005) Modified on 4/25/2008 (sv, COURT STAFF).
October 11, 2005 Filing 424 Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment by Jose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2005) Modified on 4/25/2008 (sv, COURT STAFF).
October 11, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 286 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer finding as moot #281 Motion for Leave to File, denying #284 Motion to Vacate (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2005)
October 7, 2005 Filing 283 Declaration of Geoffrey Rotwein in Support of #281 MOTION for Leave to File motion to reconsider filed byJose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego.(Related document(s) #281 ) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2005) Modified on 4/25/2008 (sv, COURT STAFF). (mclS, COURT STAFF).
October 7, 2005 Filing 282 MEMORANDUM of points and authorities in Support re #281 MOTION for Leave to File motion to reconsider filed byThomas F. White.(Related document(s) #281 ) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2005) Modified on 4/25/2008 (sv, COURT STAFF). (mclS, COURT STAFF).
October 7, 2005 Filing 281 MOTION for Leave to File motion to reconsider denial on 9/9/05 of motion to vacate approval of settlement agreement and set aside dismissals filed by Thomas F. White.(mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2005) Modified on 4/25/2008 (sv, COURT STAFF). (mclS, COURT STAFF).
October 7, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 276 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #267 Motion to Seal Document (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2005)
October 6, 2005 Filing 288 Further Memorandum in Opposition to motion to vacate #284 filed byJose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego.(mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2005) Modified on 4/25/2008 (sv, COURT STAFF). (mclS, COURT STAFF).
October 6, 2005 Received Order re #279 MOTION to Seal Document by Jose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
October 6, 2005 Filing 280 Declaration of John E. Hill in Support of #279 MOTION to Seal Document filed byJose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego. (Related document(s) #279 ) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2005) (mclS, COURT STAFF).
October 6, 2005 Filing 279 MOTION to Seal Further Memorandum of points and authorities in opposition to motion to vacate approval of settlement agreement and set aside dismissals filed by Jose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2005) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/7/2019: #1 Proposed Order) (mclS, COURT STAFF).
October 5, 2005 Filing 436 Reply Memorandum of points and authorities in opposition to motion to permit defendant White to rescind Settlement Agreement and in support of motion to enforce Settlement Agreement, enter judgment and appoint Stuart Kaplan as Receiver filed byJose Roe, Mauricio Rodriguez Borrego.(mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2005) Modified on 4/25/2008 (sv, COURT STAFF).