Keithley v. The Home Store.Com, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Kevin L. Keithley and Tren Technology Holdings LLC
Defendant: The Home Store.Com, Inc., National Association of Realtors and National Association of Home Builders of the United States
Case Number: 3:2003cv04447
Filed: October 1, 2003
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Referring Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 29, 2009 941 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TEMPORARILY STAYING MARCH 27, 2009 ORDER RE: PAYMENT OF SANCTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on April 28, 2009. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2009)
March 27, 2009 920 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING FURTHER SANCTIONS IN CONNECTION WITH AUGUST 12, 2008 ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on March 27, 2009. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2009)
March 16, 2009 916 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 915 Stipulation filed by Kevin L. Keithley, Tren Technology Holdings LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on March 16, 2009. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2009)
March 13, 2009 914 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Judgment. (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2009)
March 4, 2009 912 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Defendants' motion for summary judgment as to noninfringemnet and invalidity based on indefiniteness was granted by order dated 11/19/08. Defendants' counterclaim have been dismissed without prejudice to refiling in the event the November 19, 2008 order is reversed on appeal. Judgment is entered accordingly. (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2009)
March 2, 2009 908 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING DEFENDANTS COUNTERCLAIMS WITHOUT PREJUDICE (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2009)
January 7, 2009 899 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AWARDING SANCTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on January 7, 2009. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2009)
December 15, 2008 897 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING AND MODIFYING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION FOR SANCTIONS (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2008)
December 5, 2008 868 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER vacating pretrial (trial); setting 12/16/08 cmc. Signed by Judge Illston on 12/4/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2008)
November 20, 2008 865 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Illston finding as moot 860 Motion to Stay (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2008)
November 19, 2008 862 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO NONINFRINGEMENT AND INVALIDITY BASED ON INDEFINITENESS; DENYING OTHER MOTIONS AS MOOT 732 , 627 , 729 , 764 , 776 . (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2008)
November 6, 2008 846 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SANCTIONS by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting in part and denying in part 680 Motion for Sanctions; terminating 718 Motion (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2008)
November 5, 2008 845 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: IN CAMERA SUBMISSION OF DEFENDANTS' BILLING RECORDS re 832 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on November 5, 2008. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2008)
November 4, 2008 837 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: statistics re 812 . Signed by Judge Illston on 11/3/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2008)
November 3, 2008 835 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Illston granting 824 Motion to Seal (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2008)
October 29, 2008 810 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: PLAINTIFFS' IN-COURT SUBMISSION AND DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on October 29, 2008. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2008)
October 8, 2008 772 Opinion or Order of the Court SEALING ORDER (MOTION 742). Signed by Judge Illston on 10/7/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2008)
October 7, 2008 769 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Illston granting 735 Motion to seal (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2008)
September 22, 2008 710 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXPAND THE RECORD 674 ; SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING DATE RE: DEFENDANTS' OBJECTIONS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE LAPORTE'S AUGUST 12, 2008 ORDER. Signed by Judge Susan Illston. (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2008)
September 18, 2008 700 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: PLAINTIFFS' SEPTEMBER 16, 2008 IN CAMERA SUBMISSION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on September 18, 2008. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2008)
September 17, 2008 697 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 696 Order on Motion for Protective Order,. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on September 17, 2008. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2008)
September 16, 2008 695 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: CLARIFICATION OF AUGUST 12, 2008 ORDER AND REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on September 16, 2008. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2008)
September 2, 2008 676 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Illston granting 673 Motion for leave to file under seal (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Keithley v. The Home Store.Com, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin L. Keithley
Represented By: Robert Francis McCauley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tren Technology Holdings LLC
Represented By: Scott Richard Mosko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Home Store.Com, Inc.
Represented By: Jud Graves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Association of Realtors
Represented By: Jud Graves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Association of Home Builders of the United States
Represented By: Jitendra Malik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?