Amkor Technology, Inc. v. Carsem (M) Sdn Bhd et al

Plaintiff: Amkor Technology, Inc.
Defendant: Carsem (M) Sdn Bhd, Carsem Semiconductor Sdn Hbd and Carsem, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2003cv05116
Filed: November 18, 2003
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Cruz
Presiding Judge: Vaughn R. Walker
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 24, 2014 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER MAINTAINING STAY, SETTING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, AND REQUESTING RESPONSE. Response due by 5/1/2014 at noon. Case Management Conference set for 8/7/2014 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Joint case management conference statement due July 31 at noon.. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 24, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2014)
April 15, 2014 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Case Management Statement due by noon on 4/21/2014. Case Management Conference set for 4/24/2014 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 15, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2014)
March 18, 2014 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER MAINTAINING STAY. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 18, 2014. Status report due June 26, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2014)
February 18, 2014 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING STAY AND NOTICE OF PTO ACTION. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 18, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2014)
December 4, 2013 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER MAINTAINING STAY. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 4, 2013. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2013)
August 14, 2013 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER MAINTAINING STAY (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2013)
May 17, 2013 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER MAINTAINING STAY. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 17, 2013.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2013)
January 15, 2013 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER MAINTAINING STAY AND SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2013)
January 14, 2013 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY ANDREW PRATT by Hon. William Alsup denying 68 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2013)
January 4, 2013 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 63 Status Report filed by Amkor Technology, Inc. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2013)
December 7, 2012 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING STATUS REPORT (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2012)
September 17, 2012 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING STATUS REPORT re 57 Status Report filed by Amkor Technology, Inc., Carsem, Inc., Carsem Semiconductor Sdn Hbd, Carsem (M) Sdn Bhd. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 17, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2012)
July 2, 2012 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING STAY. Signed by Judge Alsup on July 2, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2012)
March 30, 2012 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING STAY re 53 Status Report filed by Amkor Technology, Inc.. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 30, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2012)
January 3, 2012 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING STAY re 51 Status Report filed by Amkor Technology, Inc., Carsem, Inc., Carsem Semiconductor Sdn Hbd, Carsem (M) Sdn Bhd. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 3, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2012)
February 17, 2011 49 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 11/20/08. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2011)
January 31, 2011 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING STAY re 45 Order. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 31, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2011)
January 28, 2011 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Due to the pending retirement of the undersigned, the clerk is directed to re-assign this case. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 1/28/2011. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2011)
January 19, 2011 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. The action is STAYED until the earlier of the determination of the Intl Trade Commission in ITC Inv No 337-TA-501, including any appeals, or 12/31/2011. (vrwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2011) .
July 27, 2010 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1659, the Stay Order shall remain in effect until the determination of the Commission in the ITC Inv. No. 337-TA-501 becomes final, including any appeals pursuant to the decision in In re Prince Corp., 478 F.3d 1345, (Fed.Cir.2007), re doc 42 Status Report filed by Amkor Technology, Inc. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 7/27/2010. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2010)
June 25, 2010 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. The parties are directed to submit further joint status reports to the court on the following schedule: on or before 7/16/2010 and on or before 1/14/2011. Thereafter, the court shall make further orders as necessary. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 6/25/2010. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amkor Technology, Inc. v. Carsem (M) Sdn Bhd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amkor Technology, Inc.
Represented By: Teague I. Donahey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carsem (M) Sdn Bhd
Represented By: William J. Bohler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carsem Semiconductor Sdn Hbd
Represented By: William J. Bohler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carsem, Inc.
Represented By: William J. Bohler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?