Vaughn et al v. Bay Environmental Management Inc et al

Case Number: 3:2003cv05725
Filed: December 18, 2003
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Labor: E.R.I.S.A. Office
Presiding Judge: Samuel Conti
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Benefits

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 29, 2011 235 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 3/28/2011. (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2011)
February 22, 2011 233 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti granting 222 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting 226 Motion for Settlement; granting 228 Motion for Attorney Fees (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2011)
September 16, 2010 216 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER continuing Further Status Conference and Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement from 9/17/2010 to 11/15/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 9/16/10. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2010)
August 24, 2010 210 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING STIPULATION TO VACATE HEARING ON MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2010)
August 9, 2010 208 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER The pretrial and trial dates are vacated. The parties' stipulated request for an order shortening time is hereby granted and the hearing on the motion for preliminary approval of the class action settlement in this matter is hereby set for September 3, 2010.. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 8/9/10. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2010)
July 9, 2010 205 Opinion or Order of the Court COURT TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 7/9/10. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2010)
June 29, 2010 202 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The parties second stipulation to continue the trial date is DENIED. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 6/29/10. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2010)
January 5, 2010 148 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Deadlines for Discovery, Hearing on Dispositive Motions and Trial Date. The trial is continued from 6/21/10 to 9/7/10. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 1/5/10. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2010)
November 23, 2009 146 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND MEDIATION DEADLINE. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 11/19/09. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2009)
October 26, 2009 142 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Class Notice and Requiring Distribution. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 10/26/09. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2009)
October 2, 2009 135 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER for notice to class members. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 10/02/2009. (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2009)
September 2, 2009 123 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Permitting Plaintiffs to file a Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 9/1/09. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2009)
August 26, 2009 120 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Continuing the Status Conference and Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification from 9/11/09 to 9/25/09. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 8/26/09. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vaughn et al v. Bay Environmental Management Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?