Alvarado et al v. Fedex Corporation

Case Number: 3:2004cv00098
Filed: January 9, 2004
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1981 Job Discrimination (Race)
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 22, 2012 1829 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: CHARLOTTE BOSWELL'S FEBRUARY 21, 2012 FILING(Illston, Susan) (Filed on 2/22/2012)
January 4, 2012 1801 Opinion or Order of the Court amended order re: disburse funds to Alvarado and Boswell (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2012)
December 23, 2011 1800 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING McCOY'S "LETTER BRIEF" REQUESTING RECONSIDERATION OF DECEMBER 19, 2011 ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO DISBURSE INTERPLED FUNDS TO EDWARD ALVARADO AND CHARLOTTE BOSWELL (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 12/23/2011)
December 19, 2011 1794 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART KAY McKENZIE PARKER AND ROSEN, BIEN & GALVAN'S MOTION TO ALTER OR AMEND (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 12/19/2011)
November 17, 2011 1786 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 1784 Stipulation to Change Settlement Conference Date filed by Charlotte Boswell. Settlement Conference set for 1/11/2012 01:00 PM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Confidential settlement conference statements due 12/30/2011. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 11/17/2011. (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2011)
October 12, 2011 1756 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CLAIMS TO INTERPLED FUNDS (BOSWELL AND ALVARADO'S JURY AWARDS) (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2011)
September 30, 2011 1752 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: ATTORNEYS' FEES PETITIONS FILED BY KAY PARKER McKENZIE AND WAUKEEN McCOY (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 9/30/2011)
May 27, 2011 1734 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Further Case Management Conference set for 7/1/2011 03:00 PM. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2011)
April 20, 2011 1722 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION REGARDING TIMELINESS OF ITS OPPOSITIONS TO FEE PETITIONS AND SETTING NEW HEARING DATE (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2011)
March 3, 2011 1692 Opinion or Order of the Court Further ORDER RE: DISBURSEMENTS TO WAUKEEN McCOY, CHARLOTTE BOSWELL, AND EDWARD SWANSON (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2011) Modified on 3/3/2011 (ys, COURT STAFF).
February 4, 2011 1681 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: VARIOUS MOTIONS (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2011)
January 26, 2011 1680 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Request for Discontinuance of Notice to Mario A. Moya (Attorney to be terminated on the Docket sheet) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2011)
December 17, 2010 1647 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: page limit (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2010)
December 14, 2010 1646 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF FILING ERROR (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2010)
December 8, 2010 1635 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting request to exceed page limit re 1633 (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2010) Modified on 12/9/2010 (ys, COURT STAFF).
October 12, 2010 1617 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR COUNTERCLAIM AND INTERPLEADER RELIEF RE: EDWARD ALVARADO (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2010)
October 1, 2010 1609 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR COUNTERCLAIM AND INTERPLEADER RELIEF (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2010)
September 14, 2010 1598 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF EVANS' MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE NOTICE OF APPEAL re 1584 . Plaintiff may file his notice of appeal up to and including 9/30/10. (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2010)
September 7, 2010 1595 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER continuing fee petition hearing to 1/21/11 (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2010)
August 25, 2010 1585 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REMANDING BILLING MATTER TO SPECIAL MASTER (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2010)
July 30, 2010 1580 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REMANDING BILLING MATTER TO SPECIAL MASTER (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2010)
July 29, 2010 1579 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RELEASING FUNDS TO MR. McCOY (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2010)
April 6, 2010 1545 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO DISBURSE RESERVED FUNDS (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2010)
December 23, 2009 1506 Opinion or Order of the Court ERRATA RE: ORDER RE: DISBURSEMENT OF INTERPLED FUNDS (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2009)
December 18, 2009 1500 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT (against plaintiffs Maria Munoz, Christopher Wilkerson, Lore Paogofie, John Azzam and Charles Gibbs) (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2009)
November 16, 2009 1492 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: MR. McCOY'S NOVEMBER 10, 2009 LETTER (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2009)
September 11, 2009 1476 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 1461 DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO REJECT OR PARTIALLY REVERSE THE SPECIAL MASTER'S 7/2/09 ORDER (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2009)
September 8, 2009 1473 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: QUESTION ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO REJECT OR PARTIALLY REVERSE SPECIAL MASTER'S JULY 2, 2009 ORDER (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2009)
May 28, 2009 1428 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Extending Time for Filing Reply in Support of Brief Re: April 23, 2009 Hearing (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2009)
May 6, 2009 1415 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Illston granting (1410) Motion to Seal Document in case 3:04-cv-00098-SI ; Counsel is directed to SUBMIT AN ORIGINAL AND A COPY (INDIVIDUALLY SEALED) OF THE TIME RECORDS TO THE CLERK'S OFFICE FOR FILING. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2009)
April 22, 2009 1398 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER permitting Parker's time records to be filed under seal. Signed by Judge Illston on 4/21/09. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2009)
April 21, 2009 1387 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Illston granting 1381 Motion for Leave to File under seal (deft. is directed to submit the "sealed" material. Ms. Sutton has not seen anything submitted wtih the motion to seal) (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2009)
April 17, 2009 1383 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: APRIL 23, 2009 HEARING ON INTERPLED FUNDS (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2009)
March 20, 2009 1359 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY MR. McCOY'S OBJECTIONS TO SPECIAL MASTER'S NOTICES OF NON-PAYMENT SHOULD NOT BE DENIED (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2009)
March 19, 2009 1354 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MR. McCOY'S MOTION TO REVOKE THE ORDERS OF REFERENCE TO SPECIAL MASTER EDWARD SWANSON, MOTION TO STAY ALL PROCEEDINGS RELATED TO PLAINTIFFS' PETITIONS FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES, AND OBJECTION TO DOCKET NO. 1296 (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2009)
March 11, 2009 1333 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Illston granting 1329 MOTION To Remove Incorrectly Filed Exhibits (Doc. #1308) (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2009)
March 10, 2009 1332 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Illston granting 1331 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document #1326 (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2009) Modified on 3/12/2009 (ys, COURT STAFF).
March 2, 2009 1321 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING MR. McCOY TO PROVIDE SETTLEMENT PLAINTIFFS WITH NOTICE OF APRIL 23, 2009 HEARING AND TO PROVIDE COURT WITH LAST KNOWN ADDRESSES OF SETTLEMENT PLAINTIFFS(SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2009)
February 25, 2009 1314 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MR. McCOY'S MOTION TO IMMEDIATELY RELEASE SETTLEMENT FUNDS AND DISMISS INTERPLEADER; GRANTING DEFENDANT'S RULE 60(a) MOTION; DENYING PLAINTIFF RIVERA'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; AND SETTING SCHEDULE FOR RESOLUTION OF INTERPLED FUNDS re 1285 , 1290 . Evidentiary hearing is set for 4/23/09 at 9:00 a.m.. (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2009)
February 10, 2009 1301 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PARKER'S MOTION TO STRIKE OR SEAL DOCUMENTS re 1286 (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2009)
February 3, 2009 1289 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING DOCKET NO. 1288 AND REFERRING DOCKET NO. 1283 TO SPECIAL MASTER FOR DECISION IN THE FIRST INSTANCE. Signed by Judge Illston on 2/3/09. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2009)
January 27, 2009 1279 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF; GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF REQUIRING DEFENDANT TO FILE AN INTERPLEADER COMPLAINT; AND GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION re 1163 , 1193 , 1212 . (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2009)
January 14, 2009 1273 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Illston granting 1263 Motion to remove incorrectly filed document (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2009)
November 20, 2008 1249 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER referring C 08-1005 MHP Pernell Evans -v- FedEx to Hon. Susan Illston for related case determination to C 08-1005 SI Alvarado et al v. FedEx Corp et al; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 11/20/2008. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2008)
November 18, 2008 1247 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing plaintiffs' attorney to file all documents produced to special matster in response to special master's August 23, 2007 order. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 11/18/08. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2008)
November 12, 2008 1240 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting substitution of counsel re 1235 . Signed by Judge Illston on 11/11/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2008)
November 7, 2008 1231 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT TO FILE A TRUE AND CORRECT COPY OF ALL EXHIBITS TO BOLANOS DEPOSITION (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2008)
November 5, 2008 1228 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFFS' ATTORNEY TO FILE ALL DOCUMENTS PRODUCED TO SPECIAL MASTER IN RESPONSE TO SPECIAL MASTER'S AUGUST 23, 2007 ORDER (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2008)
February 4, 2008 1009 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 976 DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF. Signed by Judge Susan Illston. (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2008)
February 1, 2008 1007 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Illston granting 1005 Motion to Seal Document (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alvarado et al v. Fedex Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?