Merrifield et al v. Lockyer et al

Case Number: 3:2004cv00498
Filed: February 6, 2004
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 29, 2009 172 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT AND INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 29, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2009)
May 19, 2009 169 Opinion or Order of the Court USCA MANDATE: The judgment of this Court, entered 09/16/08, takes effect this date. This constitutes the formal mandate of this Court. FOR THE COURT. Re 159 Notice of Appeal (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2009)
March 5, 2009 167 Opinion or Order of the Court USCA ORDER: The parties' joint motion for extension of time to file response to Appellants' application for attorneys fees is GRANTED re 159 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) filed by Alan Merrifield, Urban Wildlife Management, Inc., California Nuisance Wildlife Control Operators Association (aaa, Court Staff) (Filed on 3/5/2009)
January 9, 2009 166 Opinion or Order of the Court USCA ORDER: The petition for panel rehearing and the petition for rehearing en banc are denied. No further petitions for panel rehearing or petitions for rehearing en banc may be filed; re 159 Notice of Appeal byAlan Merrifield, Urban Wildlife Management, Inc., California Nuisance Wildlife Control Operators Association (aaa, Court Staff) (Filed on 1/9/2009)
October 24, 2008 165 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED OPINION FROM THE UNITED STATES COURT OF APPEALS FOR THE NINTH CIRCUIT. (aaa, Court Staff) (Filed on 10/24/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Merrifield et al v. Lockyer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?