Navarrette et al v. United States Of America

Case Number: 3:2004cv00760
Filed: February 24, 2004
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1346 Tort Claim
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 24, 2009 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 75 Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/24/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2009)
August 21, 2009 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 80 Amended Settlement Agreement. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on August 21, 2009. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2009)
July 9, 2009 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 76 Stipulation RE: Request for Conference with the Court. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/9/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2009)
April 3, 2009 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT re 73 Proposed Settlement Agreement filed by United States of America. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/3/09. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2009)
February 3, 2009 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 70 Joint Motion to Extend Deadline for Completion of Mediation. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/3/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2009)
November 25, 2008 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 68 Stipulated Joint Motion to Extend Deadlines for Completion of Mediation and Expert Discovery. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 11/25/08. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Navarrette et al v. United States Of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?