Presniakov v. Retail Distributors LLC et al

Case Number: 3:2004cv00831
Filed: February 27, 2004
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Martin J. Jenkins
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 26, 2010 110 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White DENYING 97 Motion for Attorney Fees; DENYING 101 Motion for Attorney Fees; FINDING MOOT 108 Motion to Appear by Telephone or to Continue. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2010)
March 8, 2010 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Of Dismissal for Failure to Prosecute. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on March 8, 2010. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2010)
March 4, 2010 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White GRANTING 89 Motion to Appear by Telephone. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2010)
February 8, 2010 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AS TO WHY CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE AND WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED AND SETTING HEARING. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/8/10. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2010)
June 12, 2009 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Counsel to Self-Report. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on June 12, 2009. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2009)
March 20, 2009 61 Opinion or Order of the Court SECOND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AS TO WHY COUNSEL SHOULD NOT BE HELD IN CONTEMPT OF COURT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/20/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2009)
March 2, 2009 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE CONTEMPT AND IMPOSING SANCTIONS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on March 2, 2009. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2009)
February 18, 2009 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE CONTEMPT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on February 18, 2009. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2009)
January 23, 2009 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER IMPOSING SANCTIONS RE 49 Order to Show Cause and Order GRANTING 51 Stipulation to Continue Status Conference. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on January 23, 2009. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2009)
December 11, 2008 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on December 11, 2008. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2008)
November 25, 2008 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REQUIRING JOINT STATUS REPORTS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 11/25/08. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2008)
October 6, 2008 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on October 6, 2008. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2008)
September 12, 2008 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Status Conference. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on September 12, 2008. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Presniakov v. Retail Distributors LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?