Dillon v. San Francisco Veterans Administration Fort Miley Hospital

Case Number: 3:2004cv01192
Filed: March 25, 2004
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 15, 2009 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/15/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2009)
May 20, 2009 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: CORRESPONDENCE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/20/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2009)
January 28, 2009 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: LETTER DATED JANUARY 20, 2009. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/28/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2009)
November 13, 2008 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 21 Letter dated 10-31-08, filed by Rosemary Dillon. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 11/13/08. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2008)
September 12, 2008 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. To the extend Plaintiff's August 18, 2008 letter can be construed as a request to reopen or reconsider this Court's prior Orders, that request is DENIED. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/12/08. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dillon v. San Francisco Veterans Administration Fort Miley Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?