Pooshs v. Phillip Morris USA, Inc., et al.

Case Number: 3:2004cv01221
Filed: March 26, 2004
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 5, 2016 502 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR JURY REFRESHMENTS. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 2/5/16. (napS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2016)
February 3, 2016 495 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE OBJECTIONS TO TESTIMONY OF DEFENDANTS' EXPERT. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 2/3/2016. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2016)
February 2, 2016 487 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 484 Page/Line Designations and Objections as to Lincoln Mintz. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 2/2/2016. (pjhlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2016)
January 28, 2016 480 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 464 Pageline Designations and Objections [Dr. Figlar]. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/28/2016. (pjhlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2016)
January 25, 2016 475 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on Plaintiff's Objections to Defense Exhibits to Be Proffered with Dr. Cummings. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/25/2016. (pjhlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2016)
January 20, 2016 466 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 461 Designations and Objections [Lipowicz], filed by Nikki Pooshs. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/20/2016. (pjhlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2016)
January 15, 2016 456 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 1/15/2016. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2016)
January 12, 2016 453 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 1/12/2016. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2016)
April 6, 2015 421 Opinion or Order of the Court SEVENTH FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 4/6/2015. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2015)
March 4, 2015 406 Opinion or Order of the Court SIXTH FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 3/4/2015. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2015)
December 23, 2014 394 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 12/23/2014. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2014)
December 2, 2014 392 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 384 Objection,,,, filed by Philip Morris USA, Inc.. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 12/2/2014. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2014)
June 2, 2014 387 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 6/2/2014. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2014)
May 28, 2014 385 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 384 Objection,,,, filed by Philip Morris USA, Inc.. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 5/28/2014. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2014)
April 2, 2014 376 Opinion or Order of the Court FIFTH FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 4/2/2014. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2014)
February 20, 2014 364 Opinion or Order of the Court FOURTH FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER. Further Pretrial Conference set for 3/13/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 2/20/2014. (pjhlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2014)
July 19, 2013 337 Opinion or Order of the Court THIRD FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 7/19/2013. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2013)
May 22, 2013 321 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 5/22/2013. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2013)
February 15, 2013 310 Opinion or Order of the Court Second final pretrial order by Judge Hamilton. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2013)
December 5, 2012 288 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting 235 Motion to exclude testimony; granting in part and denying in part 236 Motion to exclude testimony; granting in part and denying in part 237 Motion to exclude testimony; granting in part and denying in part 238 Motion to exclude testimony. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2012)
November 29, 2012 283 Opinion or Order of the Court TRIAL RULES AND PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 11/29/12. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2012)
November 16, 2012 282 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 11/16/2012. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2012)
October 30, 2012 246 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE OF CERTAIN DEADLINES re 244 Letter, filed by Hill and Knowlton Inc., Nikki Pooshs, Philip Morris USA, Inc., R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 10/30/12. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2012)
October 22, 2012 229 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting in part and denying in part 205 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 206 Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2012)
June 14, 2012 204 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT LORILLARD, INC. re 201 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal of Defendant Lorillard, Inc., with Prejudice filed by Lorillard Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 6/14/12. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2012)
June 12, 2012 199 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO MEET AND CONFER AND FILE JOINT LETTER re 195 Discovery Letter Briefof Defendants Philip Morris USA, Inc., R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company, and Hill and Knowlton, Inc. filed by Philip Morris USA, Inc. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 6/12/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2012)
March 30, 2012 182 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING PRIOR CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPTS. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 3/30/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2012)
March 21, 2012 180 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero 177 Discovery Letter Brief.(jcslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2012)
March 2, 2012 176 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT BROWN & WILLIAMSON HOLDINGS, INC. FKA BROWN & WILLIAMSON TOBACCO CORPORATION WITHOUT PREJUDICE re 172 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Nikki Pooshs. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 3/2/12. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2012)
September 13, 2011 160 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF REFERENCE AND ORDER RE DISCOVERY PROCEDURES; Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 9/13/2011. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2011)
September 6, 2011 157 Opinion or Order of the Court REVISED CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER re 156 Case Management Conference - Further. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 9/6/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2011)
August 25, 2011 152 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re 151 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Lorillard Inc., Lorillard Tobacco Company. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 8/25/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2011)
October 1, 2007 113 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REMANDED CASE. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 10/1/07. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2007)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pooshs v. Phillip Morris USA, Inc., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?