Briseno v. Woodford et al

Case Number: 3:2004cv01458
Filed: April 14, 2004
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 10, 2014 88 Opinion or Order of the Court Conditional Writ of Habeas Corpus by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton.(pjhlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2014)
October 1, 2014 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re CJA Appointment of and Authority to Pay Court Appointed Counsel. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 10/1/14. (vlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2014)
September 18, 2012 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Hamilton denying 54 Motion to Enforce Judgment (pjhlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2012)
August 16, 2012 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR LEAVE FOR ADDITIONAL BRIEFING. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 8/16/12. (pjhlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2012)
January 14, 2011 51 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 1/14/11. (pjhlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2011)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Briseno v. Woodford et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?