Therasense, Inc. v. Becton, Dickinson and Company
Plaintiff: Therasense, Inc. and Abbott Laboratories
Defendant: Becton, Dickinson and Company
3rd_party_defendant: Abbott Laboratories
Case Number: 3:2004cv02123
Filed: May 28, 2004
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: William H. Alsup
Presiding Judge: Bernard Zimmerman
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1169 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES by Hon. William Alsup granting in part and denying in part (1150) Motion for Attorney Fees in case 3:04-cv-02123-WHA.Associated Cases: 3:04-cv-02123-WHA, 3:04-cv-03327-WHA, 3:04-cv-03732-WHA, 3:05-cv-03117-WHA(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2012)
March 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1147 ORDER ON REMAND REGARDING INEQUITABLE CONDUCT re (1131 in 3:04-cv-02123-WHA) Brief filed by Becton, Dickinson and Company, (1132 in 3:04-cv-02123-WHA) Brief filed by Therasense, Inc., Abbott Laboratories, (1134 in 3:04-cv-02123-WHA) Brief filed by Becton, Dickinson and Company. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 27, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2012)
March 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1140 REQUEST FOR FURTHER BRIEFING. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 22, 2012. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2012)
March 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1137 REQUEST FOR INPUT. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 19, 2012.. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2012)
October 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1129 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 14, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2011)
October 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1126 ORDER APPROVING SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re 1124 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Abbott Laboratories. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 5, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2011)
July 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1120 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re (1119 in 3:04-cv-02123-WHA) Order, (1225 in 3:05-cv-03117-WHA) Stipulation filed by Bayer HealthCare LLC. Signed by Judge Alsup on July 20, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2011)
June 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1100 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING STAY OF COSTS JUDGMENT PENDING APPEAL. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 17, 2009. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2009)
April 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1096 NOTICE RE REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION BY SPECIAL MASTER. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 1, 2009. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2009)
March 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1094 ORDER RE PAYMENT OF ATTORNEY'S FEES. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 19, 2009. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2009)
March 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1089 ORDER RE PARTIES' RESPONSES RE SPECIAL MASTER REPORT. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 6, 2009. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2009)
March 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1085 ORDER RE REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION BY SPECIAL MASTER. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 2, 2009. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2009)
December 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1079 ORDER OF REFERENCE AGREED TO BY ALL PARTIES AND SPECIAL MASTER. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 1, 2008. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2008)
November 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1075 ORDER RE SELECTION OF SPECIAL MASTER. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 14, 2008. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2008)
October 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1058 ORDER by Judge Alsup denying 1001 Motion for Attorney Fees (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2008)
September 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1017 ORDER RE JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 12, 2008. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2008)
September 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1010 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 10, 2008. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2008)
September 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1009 ORDER RESCHEDULING HEARING. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 9, 2008. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2008)
September 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 1003 ORDER by Judge Alsup denying 1000 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Therasense, Inc. v. Becton, Dickinson and Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Therasense, Inc.
Represented By: Maria W. Boyce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abbott Laboratories
Represented By: Maria W. Boyce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Becton, Dickinson and Company
Represented By: Bradford J. Badke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_defendant: Abbott Laboratories
Represented By: James W. Cannon, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?