Charles O. Bradley Trust et al v. Zenith Capital LLC et al
Plaintiff: Brad Martin Burge, Linda L. Bradley Trust, Ronald C. Hall, Rental Center Properties, Ken & Sharon Burge Trust, Charles O. Bradley Trust, Scott Dykstra and Noa Dykstra
Defendant: Martel Jed Cooper, Judy Smith aka Judy Smith individually and doing business as also known as Judy Chiao Smith, Irwin S. Rothenberg, Chiao, Smith & Associates Accountancy Corporation, Marvin Friedman, Rick Lane Tasker, Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group LLC, Judy Chiao Smith, Paul Levy, Pisenti & Brinker LLP, Mark J. Albrecht, Irv Rothenberg, Gregg Smith, Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group Ltd., Jed Cooper, Zenith Capital LLC, Kenneth Widder, Mark J. Albrecht Accountancy Corporation, Milton Lohr and CSA Consulting
3Rd Party Defendant: ALL PARTIES
Case Number: 3:2004cv02239
Filed: June 7, 2004
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Edward M Chen
Referring Judge: Jeffrey S White
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 77
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2009. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 392 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White adopting Report and Recommendations and denying #379 Motion to Enforce Judgment. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2009)
April 29, 2009 Filing 391 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #379 MOTION to Enforce Judgment filed by Charles O. Bradley Trust Objections to R&R due by 5/13/2009. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 4/29/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2009)
April 16, 2009 Filing 390 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion To Enforce Settlement held on 4/16/2009 before Maria-Elena James (Date Filed: 4/16/2009). Matter submitted. (Court Reporter Kelly Bryce.) (fj, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/16/2009)
April 13, 2009 Filing 389 Brief re #386 Memorandum in Opposition,,,,,, Settling Defendants' Surrebuttal to Plaintiffs' Reply to Opposition filed byZenith Capital LLC, Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group Ltd., Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group LLC, Rick Lane Tasker, Martel Jed Cooper, Gregg Smith. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Related document(s) #386 ) (Bacalski, A.) (Filed on 4/13/2009)
April 2, 2009 Filing 388 AFFIDAVIT in Support #379 of Motion to Enforce Settlement filed byCharles O. Bradley Trust. (Miskel, Glendon) (Filed on 4/2/2009) Modified on 4/3/2009 (hdj, COURT STAFF).
April 2, 2009 Filing 387 Reply to Opposition #379 to Motion to Enforce Settlement filed byCharles O. Bradley Trust. (Miskel, Glendon) (Filed on 4/2/2009) Modified on 4/3/2009 (hdj, COURT STAFF).
March 26, 2009 Filing 386 Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement and File Judgment, and Request for Attorneys' Fees filed byZenith Capital LLC, Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group Ltd., Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group LLC, Rick Lane Tasker, Martel Jed Cooper, Gregg Smith. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of A. Daniel Bacalski, Jr., in Support of Settling Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement, and Request for Attorneys' Fees, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Scott Raber in Support of Settling Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement, and Request for Attorneys' Fees, #3 Affidavit Declaration of John G. Appel, Jr., in Support of Settling Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement, and Request for Attorneys' Fees, #4 Affidavit Declaration of Rick Tasker in Support of Settling Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement, and Request for Attorneys' Fees, #5 Affidavit Declaration of M. Gregory Smith in Support of Settling Defendants' Opposition to Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement, and Request for Attorneys' Fees, #6 Affidavit Declaration of M. Jed Cooper in Support of Settling Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement, and Request for Attorneys' Fees, #7 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Bacalski, A.) (Filed on 3/26/2009)
March 10, 2009 Filing 385 STIPULATION JOINT REQUEST TO PROCEED; PROOF OF SERVICE by Zenith Capital LLC, Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group Ltd., Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group LLC, Rick Lane Tasker, Martel Jed Cooper, Gregg Smith. (Bacalski, A.) (Filed on 3/10/2009)
February 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 384 ORDER re #379 MOTION to Enforce Judgment filed by Charles O. Bradley Trust. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 2/27/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2009)
February 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 383 NOTICE OF REFERENCE re #382 Order Referring Motion. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 2/26/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2009)
February 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 382 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #379 MOTION to Enforce Judgment filed by Charles O. Bradley Trust. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/25/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2009)
February 24, 2009 Filing 381 Proposed Order re #379 MOTION to Enforce Judgment by Charles O. Bradley Trust. (Miskel, Glendon) (Filed on 2/24/2009)
February 24, 2009 Filing 380 Declaration of Gerald L Williams in Support of #379 MOTION to Enforce Judgment filed byCharles O. Bradley Trust. (Related document(s) #379 ) (Miskel, Glendon) (Filed on 2/24/2009)
February 24, 2009 Filing 379 MOTION to Enforce Judgment filed by Charles O. Bradley Trust. Motion Hearing set for 5/8/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Miskel, Glendon) (Filed on 2/24/2009)
February 17, 2009 Filing 378 Proposed Order re #376 MOTION to Enforce Judgment by Charles O. Bradley Trust. (Miskel, Glendon) (Filed on 2/17/2009)
February 17, 2009 Filing 377 Declaration of Gerald L. Williams in Support of #376 MOTION to Enforce Judgment filed byCharles O. Bradley Trust. (Related document(s) #376 ) (Miskel, Glendon) (Filed on 2/17/2009)
February 17, 2009 Filing 376 MOTION to Enforce Judgment filed by Charles O. Bradley Trust. Motion Hearing set for 4/3/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Miskel, Glendon) (Filed on 2/17/2009) Modified on 2/26/2009 (mejlc1, COURT STAFF).
January 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 375 ORDER DETERMINING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT RE #373 MOTION for Settlement to Determine Good Faith Settlement. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/12/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2009)
October 31, 2008 Filing 374 AFFIDAVIT re #373 MOTION for Settlement to Determine Good Faith Settlement re: service on Plaintiffs and Albrecht Defendants by Zenith Capital LLC, Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group Ltd., Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group LLC, Rick Lane Tasker, Martel Jed Cooper, Gregg Smith. (Bacalski, A.) (Filed on 10/31/2008)
October 31, 2008 Filing 373 MOTION for Settlement to Determine Good Faith Settlement filed by Zenith Capital LLC, Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group Ltd., Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group LLC, Rick Lane Tasker, Martel Jed Cooper, Gregg Smith. Motion Hearing set for 1/16/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of P&As in Support, #2 Affidavit i nSupport of Motion, #3 Exhibit 1 to Decl. of Dube, #4 Proposed Order)(Bacalski, A.) (Filed on 10/31/2008)
October 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 372 ORDER GRANTING #371 Stipulation for Dismissal. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/30/08. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2008)
October 29, 2008 Filing 371 Proposed Order on Stipulation for Dismissal by Charles O. Bradley Trust. (Miskel, Glendon) (Filed on 10/29/2008)
October 23, 2008 Filing 370 Transcript of Proceedings held on 10-20-08, before Judge Maria James. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Wyatt, Telephone number 415-487-9834. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/20/2009. (kpw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2008)
October 22, 2008 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 11/7/2008 01:30 PM. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2008)
October 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 369 ORDER GRANTING #368 Stipulation to Vacate Trial Date and Setting of Status Conference. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/22/08. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2008)
October 21, 2008 Filing 368 NOTICE by Charles O. Bradley Trust Stipulation to Vacate (Miskel, Glendon) (Filed on 10/21/2008)
October 21, 2008 Filing 367 Minute Entry: Settlement Conference (Date Filed: 10/21/2008). (Court Reporter Katherine Wyatt.) (bjt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/21/2008)
October 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 366 ORDER GRANTING #363 Stipulation to File Amended Revised Proposed Jury Instructions. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on October 17, 2008. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2008)
October 16, 2008 Filing 365 Proposed Jury Instructions by Charles O. Bradley Trust AMENDED REVISED JOINT PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS. (Albarran, Tammy) (Filed on 10/16/2008)
October 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 364 ORDER re #354 Evidentiary Rulings. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on October 15, 2008. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2008)
October 15, 2008 Filing 363 STIPULATION re #362 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Revised Joint Proposed Jury Instructions and [Proposed] Order by Charles O. Bradley Trust. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Plaintiff's Request for Leave to File Amended Revised Joint Proposed Jury Instructions and [Proposed] Order)(Albarran, Tammy) (Filed on 10/15/2008)
October 15, 2008 Filing 362 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET #363 . *** MOTION for Leave to File Amended Revised Joint Proposed Jury Instructions filed by Charles O. Bradley Trust. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Albarran, Tammy) (Filed on 10/15/2008) Modified on 10/16/2008 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
October 15, 2008 Filing 361 RESPONSE to Order to Submit Joint Statement on Financial Condition Evidence of Defendants by Charles O. Bradley Trust. (Miskel, Glendon) (Filed on 10/15/2008)
October 14, 2008 Filing 360 Proposed Jury Instructions by Brad Martin Burge, Scott Dykstra, Noa Dykstra, Ronald C. Hall, Rental Center Properties, Zenith Capital LLC, Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group Ltd., Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group LLC, Charles O. Bradley Trust, Rick Lane Tasker, Martel Jed Cooper, Gregg Smith, Judy Smith, CSA Consulting, Chiao, Smith & Associates Accountancy Corporation, Linda L. Bradley Trust, Ken & Sharon Burge Trust JOINT, REVISED. (Bacalski, A.) (Filed on 10/14/2008)
October 14, 2008 Filing 359 Proposed Form of Verdict by Zenith Capital LLC, Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group Ltd., Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group LLC, Rick Lane Tasker, Martel Jed Cooper, Gregg Smith. (Bacalski, A.) (Filed on 10/14/2008)
October 14, 2008 Filing 358 Proposed Jury Instructions by ALL PARTIES, Martin Quinn, Brad Martin Burge, Mark J. Albrecht, Marvin Friedman, Paul Levy, Milton Lohr, Mark J. Albrecht Accountancy Corporation, Kenneth Widder, Scott Dykstra, Noa Dykstra, Ronald C. Hall, Rental Center Properties, Zenith Capital LLC, Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group Ltd., Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group LLC, Pisenti & Brinker LLP, Charles O. Bradley Trust, Rick Lane Tasker, Martel Jed Cooper, Gregg Smith, Irwin S. Rothenberg, Judy Smith, CSA Consulting, Chiao, Smith & Associates Accountancy Corporation, Linda L. Bradley Trust, Ken & Sharon Burge Trust Stipulated Ninth Circuit Manual of Model Jury Instructions (Civil). (Wild, Donald) (Filed on 10/14/2008)
October 14, 2008 Filing 357 Proposed Voir Dire by Judy Smith, Chiao, Smith & Associates Accountancy Corporation or Follow-Up Questions. (Wild, Donald) (Filed on 10/14/2008)
October 14, 2008 Filing 356 Proposed Voir Dire by Charles O. Bradley Trust Plaintiffs' and Zenith Defendants' Revised Joint Proposed Questions for Voir Dire. (Albarran, Tammy) (Filed on 10/14/2008)
October 14, 2008 Filing 355 Proposed Form of Verdict by Charles O. Bradley Trust , Plaintiff. (Albarran, Tammy) (Filed on 10/14/2008)
October 14, 2008 Filing 354 RESPONSE to re #348 Pretrial Conference - Final JOINT STATEMENT OF OBJECTIONS TO EXHIBITS AND RESPONSES by ALL PARTIES, Brad Martin Burge, Scott Dykstra, Noa Dykstra, Ronald C. Hall, Rental Center Properties, Zenith Capital LLC, Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group Ltd., Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group LLC, Charles O. Bradley Trust, Rick Lane Tasker, Martel Jed Cooper, Gregg Smith, Judy Smith, Chiao, Smith & Associates Accountancy Corporation, Linda L. Bradley Trust, Ken & Sharon Burge Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 5, #2 Exhibit 32, #3 Exhibit 33, #4 Exhibit 34, #5 Exhibit 35, #6 Exhibit 78, #7 Exhibit 158, #8 Exhibit 162, #9 Exhibit 165, #10 Exhibit 174, #11 Exhibit 175, #12 Exhibit 242, #13 Exhibit 243, #14 Exhibit 603, #15 Exhibit 605, #16 Exhibit 609, #17 Exhibit 610, #18 Exhibit 710)(Bacalski, A.) (Filed on 10/14/2008)
October 13, 2008 Filing 353 ERRATA To Amend Plaintiffs' Witness List by Charles O. Bradley Trust. (Miskel, Glendon) (Filed on 10/13/2008)
October 10, 2008 Filing 352 STIPULATION re #346 Order DECLINING PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTION by Brad Martin Burge, Scott Dykstra, Noa Dykstra, Ronald C. Hall, Rental Center Properties, Zenith Capital LLC, Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group Ltd., Charles O. Bradley Trust, Rick Lane Tasker, Martel Jed Cooper, Gregg Smith, Judy Smith, CSA Consulting, Chiao, Smith & Associates Accountancy Corporation, Linda L. Bradley Trust, Ken & Sharon Burge Trust. (Bacalski, A.) (Filed on 10/10/2008)
October 9, 2008 Filing 351 Transcript of Proceedings held on October 6, 2008, before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Court Reporter/Transcriber Belle Ball, CSR, RMR, CRR, e-mail address belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov, Telephone number (415)373-2529. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/5/2009. (Ball, Belle) (Filed on 10/9/2008)
October 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 350 ORDER GRANTING #347 Allowing Graphics Equipment In Court. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/6/08. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2008)
October 7, 2008 Filing 349 AMENDED Minute Entry: (Correction is in bold under II JURY) Pretrial Conference held on 10/6/2008 before Judge Jeffrey S. White (Date Filed: 10/7/2008). (Court Reporter Belle Ball.) (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/7/2008)
October 7, 2008 Filing 348 Minute Entry: Pretrial Conference held on 10/6/2008 before Judge Jeffrey S. White (Date Filed: 10/7/2008). (Court Reporter Belle Ball.) (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/7/2008)
October 7, 2008 Filing 347 Proposed Order Allowing Graphics Equipment by Charles O. Bradley Trust. (Miskel, Glendon) (Filed on 10/7/2008)
October 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 346 ORDER RE MODEL JURY INSTRUCTION 1.12. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on October 7, 2008. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Jury Instruction)(jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2008)
October 3, 2008 Filing 345 OBJECTIONS to PLAINTIFFS' PROPOSED TRIAL EXHIBITS (EXCEPT RULE 402 AND 403) by Zenith Capital LLC, Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group Ltd., Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group LLC, Rick Lane Tasker, Martel Jed Cooper, Gregg Smith. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bacalski, A.) (Filed on 10/3/2008)
October 3, 2008 Filing 344 TRIAL BRIEF to Plaintiffs' Proposed Jury Instructions by Judy Smith, Chiao, Smith & Associates Accountancy Corporation. (Wild, Donald) (Filed on 10/3/2008)
October 3, 2008 Filing 343 NOTICE by Charles O. Bradley Trust Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defense Motion to Exclude Witnesses (Miskel, Glendon) (Filed on 10/3/2008)
October 3, 2008 Filing 342 Exhibit List Plaintiffs' Objections to Defendants' Exhibits by Charles O. Bradley Trust.. (Miskel, Glendon) (Filed on 10/3/2008)
October 3, 2008 Filing 341 Memorandum in Opposition #332 to Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Defense Witnesses (Doc. 332 - filed 09/30/08) filed byZenith Capital LLC, Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group Ltd., Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group LLC, Rick Lane Tasker, Martel Jed Cooper, Gregg Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit No. One, #2 Exhibit No. Two, #3 Exhibit No. Three, #4 Exhibit No. Four, #5 Exhibit No. Five, #6 Certificate of Service)(Bacalski, A.) (Filed on 10/3/2008) Modified on 10/6/2008 (hdj, COURT STAFF).
October 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 340 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re #335 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiffs' Witnesses. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on October 2, 2008. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2008)
October 1, 2008 Filing 339 NOTICE by Charles O. Bradley Trust of Brief to Support Punitive Damages Claim in Proposed Pretrial Order (Miskel, Glendon) (Filed on 10/1/2008)
October 1, 2008 Filing 338 NOTICE by Charles O. Bradley Trust of Brief to Support Count 4 Claim in Proposed Pretrial Order (Miskel, Glendon) (Filed on 10/1/2008)
October 1, 2008 Filing 337 NOTICE by Charles O. Bradley Trust of Brief in Support of Count 3 in Proposed Pretrial Order (Miskel, Glendon) (Filed on 10/1/2008)
October 1, 2008 Filing 336 NOTICE by Charles O. Bradley Trust of Brief Supporting Count 2 and 3 Claims in Proposed Pretrial Order (Miskel, Glendon) (Filed on 10/1/2008)
October 1, 2008 Filing 335 MOTION exclude plaintiffs' witnesses filed by Zenith Capital LLC, Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group Ltd., Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group LLC, Rick Lane Tasker, Gregg Smith. Motion Hearing set for 10/6/2008 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PLAINTIFFS' INITIAL DISCLOSURE, #2 Exhibit PLAINTIFFS' 3RD DISCLOSURE, #3 Exhibit PLAINTIFFS' 4TH DISCLOSURE, #4 certificate of service)(Bacalski, A.) (Filed on 10/1/2008)
October 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 334 ORDER re #332 Notice, SETTING BRIEFING. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on October 1, 2008. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2008)
September 30, 2008 Filing 333 ERRATA to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Limine Motion No. 3 by Charles O. Bradley Trust. (Miskel, Glendon) (Filed on 9/30/2008)
September 30, 2008 Filing 332 NOTICE by Charles O. Bradley Trust Request to Exclude Defense Witnesses (Miskel, Glendon) (Filed on 9/30/2008)
September 29, 2008 Filing 331 TRIAL BRIEF by Judy Smith, Chiao, Smith & Associates Accountancy Corporation. (Wild, Donald) (Filed on 9/29/2008)
September 29, 2008 Filing 330 TRIAL BRIEF by Zenith Capital LLC, Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group Ltd., Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group LLC, Rick Lane Tasker, Martel Jed Cooper, Gregg Smith. (Attachments: #1 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE)(Bacalski, A.) (Filed on 9/29/2008)
September 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 329 ORDER re #328 Order Settlement Conference set for 10/20/2008 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge MARIA-ELENA JAMES on 9/24/08. (bjt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2008)
September 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 328 ORDER Referring and Setting Settlement Conference Before Magistrate James. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on September 24, 2008. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2008)
September 24, 2008 Filing 327 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Zenith Capital LLC, Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group Ltd., Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group LLC, Rick Lane Tasker, Martel Jed Cooper, Gregg Smith. Amendment to #316 Pretrial Conference Statement Appendix - Zenith Amended Witness List. (Bacalski, A.) (Filed on 9/24/2008)
September 23, 2008 Filing 326 PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF DISPUTED JURY INSTRUCTIONS [CORRECTED] by Zenith Capital LLC, Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group Ltd., Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group LLC, Rick Lane Tasker, Martel Jed Cooper, Gregg Smith. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Bacalski, A.) (Filed on 9/23/2008)
September 23, 2008 Filing 325 Proposed Jury Instructions by Zenith Capital LLC, Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group Ltd., Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group LLC, Rick Lane Tasker, Martel Jed Cooper, Gregg Smith DISPUTED NO. 48 OFFERED BY DEFENDANTS RE SECTION 206 - RESCISSION DAMAGES [CORRECTED]. (Bacalski, A.) (Filed on 9/23/2008)
September 23, 2008 Filing 324 Proposed Jury Instructions by Zenith Capital LLC, Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group Ltd., Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group LLC, Rick Lane Tasker, Martel Jed Cooper, Gregg Smith Disputed No. 10 Offered by Defendants Re SEction 10(b) - Omission [Corrected]. (Bacalski, A.) (Filed on 9/23/2008)
September 23, 2008 Filing 323 Proposed Jury Instructions by Zenith Capital LLC, Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group Ltd., Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group LLC, Rick Lane Tasker, Martel Jed Cooper, Gregg Smith DISPUTED NO. 10 OFFERED BY DEFENDANTS RE ELEMENTS OF LIABILITY UNDER SECTION 10(B) [CORRECTED]. (Bacalski, A.) (Filed on 9/23/2008)
September 22, 2008 Filing 322 PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM of Law In Support of Disputed Jury Instructions Offered by Plaintiffs by Charles O. Bradley Trust. (Albarran, Tammy) (Filed on 9/22/2008)
September 22, 2008 Filing 321 Proposed Voir Dire by Charles O. Bradley Trust filed Jointly. (Albarran, Tammy) (Filed on 9/22/2008)
September 22, 2008 Filing 320 Proposed Jury Instructions by Charles O. Bradley Trust Filed Jointly. (Albarran, Tammy) (Filed on 9/22/2008)
September 22, 2008 Filing 319 PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF DISPUTED JURY INSTRUCTIONS by Zenith Capital LLC, Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group Ltd., Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group LLC, Rick Lane Tasker, Martel Jed Cooper, Gregg Smith. (Bacalski, A.) (Filed on 9/22/2008)
September 22, 2008 Filing 318 Witness List by Zenith Capital LLC, Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group Ltd., Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group LLC, Rick Lane Tasker, Martel Jed Cooper, Gregg Smith (appendix to JT PTO). (Bacalski, A.) (Filed on 9/22/2008)
September 22, 2008 Filing 317 Witness List by Judy Smith, Chiao, Smith & Associates Accountancy Corporation (appendix to JT PTO). (Bacalski, A.) (Filed on 9/22/2008)
September 22, 2008 Filing 316 Pretrial Conference Statement by Charles O. Bradley Trust Joint with Defendants. (Miskel, Glendon) (Filed on 9/22/2008)
September 22, 2008 Filing 315 TRIAL BRIEF by Charles O. Bradley Trust. (Miskel, Glendon) (Filed on 9/22/2008)
September 22, 2008 Filing 314 Joinder re #298 MOTION in Limine Plaintiffs' No. 5 Chiao Smith Defendants' Joinder in Zenith Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine Number 5 [To Allow Plaintiffs to Use Photocopies of Transcripts from Other Cases] by Judy Smith, Chiao, Smith & Associates Accountancy Corporation. (Wild, Donald) (Filed on 9/22/2008)
September 22, 2008 Filing 313 Joinder re #296 MOTION in Limine Plaintiffs' No. 4 Chiao Smith Defendants' Joinder in Zenith Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine Number 4 [To Limit Evidence of Defendants' Financial Condition] by Judy Smith, Chiao, Smith & Associates Accountancy Corporation. (Wild, Donald) (Filed on 9/22/2008)
September 22, 2008 Filing 312 Joinder re #295 MOTION in Limine Plaintiffs' No. 3 Chiao Smith Defendants' Joinder in Zenith Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine Number 3 [To Preclude Defendants From Introducing Evidence Inconsistent With Admissions] by Judy Smith, Chiao, Smith & Associates Accountancy Corporation. (Wild, Donald) (Filed on 9/22/2008)
September 22, 2008 Filing 311 Joinder re #294 MOTION in Limine Plaintiffs' No. 2 Chiao Smith Defendants' Joinder in Zenith Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine Number 2 [To Exclude Testimony by Defendant Judy Smith] by Judy Smith, Chiao, Smith & Associates Accountancy Corporation. (Wild, Donald) (Filed on 9/22/2008)
September 22, 2008 Filing 310 Opposition to Defendant's Motion in Limine No 5 filed by Charles O. Bradley Trust. Motion Hearing set for 10/6/2008 02:00 PM. (Miskel, Glendon) (Filed on 9/22/2008) Modified on 10/8/2008 (hdj, COURT STAFF).
September 22, 2008 Filing 309 Joinder re #293 MOTION in Limine re Hedge Fund Chiao Smith Defendants' Joinder in Zenith Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine Number 1 [To Bar Use of Phrase "Hedge Fund" at Voir Dire] by Judy Smith, Chiao, Smith & Associates Accountancy Corporation. (Wild, Donald) (Filed on 9/22/2008)
September 22, 2008 Filing 308 Witness List by Charles O. Bradley Trust Joint with Zenith Defendant. (Miskel, Glendon) (Filed on 9/22/2008)
September 22, 2008 Filing 307 Memorandum in Opposition re #302 MOTION in Limine No. 4 to Exclude Reference to or Evidence of Other Lawsuits filed byBrad Martin Burge, Scott Dykstra, Noa Dykstra, Ronald C. Hall, Rental Center Properties, Charles O. Bradley Trust, Linda L. Bradley Trust, Ken & Sharon Burge Trust. (Bacalski, A.) (Filed on 9/22/2008)
September 22, 2008 Filing 306 Exhibit List Joint by Charles O. Bradley Trust.. (Miskel, Glendon) (Filed on 9/22/2008)
September 22, 2008 Filing 305 Memorandum in Opposition re #301 MOTION in Limine No. 3 to Exclude Reference to or Evidence of Other Investors filed byBrad Martin Burge, Scott Dykstra, Noa Dykstra, Ronald C. Hall, Rental Center Properties, Charles O. Bradley Trust, Linda L. Bradley Trust, Ken & Sharon Burge Trust. (Bacalski, A.) (Filed on 9/22/2008)
September 22, 2008 Filing 304 Memorandum in Opposition re #300 MOTION in Limine No. 2 to Exclude Plaintiffs' Supplemental Expert Report and Any Testimony on Matters Discussed Therein filed byBrad Martin Burge, Scott Dykstra, Noa Dykstra, Ronald C. Hall, Rental Center Properties, Charles O. Bradley Trust, Linda L. Bradley Trust, Ken & Sharon Burge Trust. (Bacalski, A.) (Filed on 9/22/2008)
September 22, 2008 Filing 303 Memorandum in Opposition re #299 MOTION in Limine No. 1 for Bifurcation of the Trial on Liability and Punitive Damages filed byBrad Martin Burge, Scott Dykstra, Noa Dykstra, Ronald C. Hall, Rental Center Properties, Charles O. Bradley Trust, Linda L. Bradley Trust, Ken & Sharon Burge Trust. (Bacalski, A.) (Filed on 9/22/2008)
September 22, 2008 Filing 302 MOTION in Limine No. 4 to Exclude Reference to or Evidence of Other Lawsuits filed by Zenith Capital LLC, Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group Ltd., Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group LLC, Rick Lane Tasker, Martel Jed Cooper, Gregg Smith. Motion Hearing set for 10/6/2008 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Bacalski, A.) (Filed on 9/22/2008)
September 22, 2008 Filing 301 MOTION in Limine No. 3 to Exclude Reference to or Evidence of Other Investors filed by Zenith Capital LLC, Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group Ltd., Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group LLC, Rick Lane Tasker, Martel Jed Cooper, Gregg Smith. Motion Hearing set for 10/6/2008 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Bacalski, A.) (Filed on 9/22/2008)
September 22, 2008 Filing 300 MOTION in Limine No. 2 to Exclude Plaintiffs' Supplemental Expert Report and Any Testimony on Matters Discussed Therein filed by Zenith Capital LLC, Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group Ltd., Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group LLC, Rick Lane Tasker, Martel Jed Cooper, Gregg Smith. Motion Hearing set for 10/6/2008 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Bacalski, A.) (Filed on 9/22/2008)
September 22, 2008 Filing 299 MOTION in Limine No. 1 for Bifurcation of the Trial on Liability and Punitive Damages filed by Zenith Capital LLC, Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group Ltd., Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group LLC, Rick Lane Tasker, Martel Jed Cooper, Gregg Smith. (Bacalski, A.) (Filed on 9/22/2008)
September 22, 2008 Filing 298 MOTION in Limine Plaintiffs' No. 5 filed by Charles O. Bradley Trust. Motion Hearing set for 10/6/2008 02:00 PM. (Miskel, Glendon) (Filed on 9/22/2008)
September 22, 2008 Filing 297 Fifth MOTION in Limine for Order Prohibiting Plaintiffs from Refering to Defendants' Attorney-Client Relationship with Prior Counsel filed by Judy Smith, Chiao, Smith & Associates Accountancy Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 10/6/2008 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Wild, Donald) (Filed on 9/22/2008)
September 22, 2008 Filing 296 MOTION in Limine Plaintiffs' No. 4 filed by Charles O. Bradley Trust. Motion Hearing set for 10/6/2008 02:00 PM. (Miskel, Glendon) (Filed on 9/22/2008)
September 22, 2008 Filing 295 MOTION in Limine Plaintiffs' No. 3 filed by Charles O. Bradley Trust. Motion Hearing set for 10/6/2008 02:00 PM. (Miskel, Glendon) (Filed on 9/22/2008)
September 22, 2008 Filing 294 MOTION in Limine Plaintiffs' No. 2 filed by Charles O. Bradley Trust. Motion Hearing set for 10/6/2008 02:00 PM. (Miskel, Glendon) (Filed on 9/22/2008)
September 22, 2008 Filing 293 MOTION in Limine re Hedge Fund filed by Charles O. Bradley Trust. Motion Hearing set for 10/6/2008 02:00 PM. (Miskel, Glendon) (Filed on 9/22/2008)
September 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 292 ORDER GRANTING #291 Substitution of Counsel. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on September 12, 2008. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2008)
September 11, 2008 Filing 291 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by A. Daniel Bacalski, Jr and [Proposed] Order (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Bacalski, A.) (Filed on 9/11/2008)
August 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 290 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting in part and denying in part #263 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; finding as moot #286 Motion to Strike. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2008)
July 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 289 ORDER VACATING Hearing Date re #263 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on July 16, 2008. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2008)
June 13, 2008 Filing 288 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Zenith Capital LLC, Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group Ltd., Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group LLC, Rick Lane Tasker, Martel Jed Cooper, Gregg Smith, Judy Smith, CSA Consulting, Chiao, Smith & Associates Accountancy Corporation re #287 Memorandum in Opposition, (Bacalski, A.) (Filed on 6/13/2008)
June 13, 2008 Filing 287 Memorandum in Opposition re #286 MOTION Administrative Relief: Strike Portions of Reply Brief filed byZenith Capital LLC, Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group Ltd., Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group LLC, Rick Lane Tasker, Martel Jed Cooper, Gregg Smith, Judy Smith, CSA Consulting, Chiao, Smith & Associates Accountancy Corporation. (Bacalski, A.) (Filed on 6/13/2008)
June 11, 2008 Filing 286 MOTION Administrative Relief: Strike Portions of Reply Brief filed by Charles O. Bradley Trust. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Miskel, Glendon) (Filed on 6/11/2008)
June 3, 2008 Set/Reset Hearings: Jury Trial set for 10/27/2008 08:30 AM. Pretrial Conference set for 10/6/2008 02:00 PM. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2008)
June 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 285 ORDER re #283 Setting Schedule. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on June 3, 2008. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2008)
June 2, 2008 Filing 284 Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Administrative Relief filed byZenith Capital LLC, Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group Ltd., Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group LLC, Rick Lane Tasker, Martel Jed Cooper, Gregg Smith, Judy Smith, Chiao, Smith & Associates Accountancy Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Douglas A. Dube in support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Cert. of Service)(Bacalski, A.) (Filed on 6/2/2008)
May 28, 2008 Filing 283 Proposed Order on Administrative Relief Request by Charles O. Bradley Trust. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Administrative Relief Request)(Miskel, Glendon) (Filed on 5/28/2008)
May 23, 2008 Filing 282 Reply to Opposition re #263 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed byZenith Capital LLC, Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group Ltd., Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group LLC, Rick Lane Tasker, Martel Jed Cooper, Gregg Smith, Judy Smith, CSA Consulting, Chiao, Smith & Associates Accountancy Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Lodgment, #2 Decl of Dube, #3 Exhibit No.19, #4 Exhibit No. 20, #5 Exhibit Ex.21, #6 Exhibit Ex.22, #7 Cert.Service)(Bacalski, A.) (Filed on 5/23/2008)
May 9, 2008 Filing 281 EXHIBITS In Opposition to Summary Judgment #263 filed byCharles O. Bradley Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 Exhibit, #26 Exhibit, #27 Exhibit, #28 Exhibit, #29 Exhibit, #30 Exhibit, #31 Exhibit, #32 Exhibit, #33 Exhibit, #34 Exhibit, #35 Exhibit, #36 Exhibit, #37 Exhibit, #38 Exhibit, #39 Exhibit, #40 Exhibit, #41 Exhibit, #42 Exhibit, #43 Exhibit, #44 Exhibit, #45 Exhibit, #46 Exhibit, #47 Exhibit, #48 Exhibit, #49 Exhibit)(Miskel, Glendon) (Filed on 5/9/2008) Modified on 5/12/2008 (hdj, COURT STAFF).
May 9, 2008 Filing 280 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition #263 >to Summary Judgment by Counsel filed byCharles O. Bradley Trust. (Miskel, Glendon) (Filed on 5/9/2008) Modified on 5/12/2008 (hdj, COURT STAFF).
May 9, 2008 Filing 279 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition #263 to Summary Judgment by Charles Lundelius filed byCharles O. Bradley Trust. (Miskel, Glendon) (Filed on 5/9/2008) Modified on 5/12/2008 (hdj, COURT STAFF).
May 9, 2008 Filing 278 Memorandum in Opposition #263 >to Summary Judgment filed byCharles O. Bradley Trust. (Miskel, Glendon) (Filed on 5/9/2008) Modified on 5/12/2008 (hdj, COURT STAFF).
May 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 277 ORDER GRANTING #276 Stipulationto Join Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Rick Lane Tasker. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/7/08. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2008)
May 6, 2008 Filing 276 STIPULATION re #268 Proposed Order, #264 Brief, #269 Certificate of Service, #265 Declaration in Support, #263 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, #267 Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other), #266 Declaration in Support, to Join Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and proposed order by Rick Lane Tasker. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bacalski, A.) (Filed on 5/6/2008)
May 6, 2008 Filing 275 NOTICE of Appearance by A. Daniel Bacalski, Jr for Rick Lane Tasker (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service via email and fax)(Bacalski, A.) (Filed on 5/6/2008)
May 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 274 ORDER ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/5/08. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2008)
April 28, 2008 Filing 273 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by A. Daniel Bacalski, Jr replacing Paul C. Johnson with Douglas A. Dube (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bacalski, A.) (Filed on 4/28/2008)
April 24, 2008 Filing 272 OPPOSITION BY PLAINTIFFS TO ADMINISTRATIVE #271 MOTION BY DEFENDANTS TO CONTINUE DATE OF JOINT EXPERT DISCLOSURE filed by Charles O. Bradley Trust. (Miskel, Glendon) (Filed on 4/24/2008) Modified on 4/25/2008 (hdj, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/25/2008 (hdj, COURT STAFF).
April 24, 2008 Filing 271 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery for Expert Disclosure filed by Zenith Capital LLC, Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group Ltd., Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group LLC, Gregg Smith, Judy Smith, CSA Consulting, Chiao, Smith & Associates Accountancy Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of A. Daniel Bacalski in support, #2 Proposed Order granting extension of time for expert disclosure, #3 Cert of Service (same day) by fax and email)(Bacalski, A.) (Filed on 4/24/2008)
April 23, 2008 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #263 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment., Set/Reset Hearings: Pretrial Conference set for 8/18/2008 02:00 PM. Jury Trial set for 9/8/2008 08:30 AM. Motion Hearing set for 7/18/2008 09:00 AM. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2008)
April 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 270 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULED AND RESCHEDULING HEARING DATE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/23/08. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2008)
April 22, 2008 Filing 269 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Zenith Capital LLC, Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group Ltd., Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group LLC, Martel Jed Cooper, Gregg Smith, Judy Smith, CSA Consulting, Chiao, Smith & Associates Accountancy Corporation re #263 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Bacalski, A.) (Filed on 4/22/2008)
April 22, 2008 Filing 268 Proposed Order re #263 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Zenith Capital LLC, Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group Ltd., Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group LLC, Martel Jed Cooper, Gregg Smith, Judy Smith, CSA Consulting, Chiao, Smith & Associates Accountancy Corporation. (Bacalski, A.) (Filed on 4/22/2008)
April 22, 2008 Filing 267 NOTICE by Zenith Capital LLC, Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group Ltd., Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group LLC, Martel Jed Cooper, Gregg Smith, Judy Smith, CSA Consulting, Chiao, Smith & Associates Accountancy Corporation re #263 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Lodgment in Support of Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18)(Bacalski, A.) (Filed on 4/22/2008)
April 22, 2008 Filing 266 Declaration of Douglas Dube in Support of #263 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed byZenith Capital LLC, Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group Ltd., Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group LLC, Martel Jed Cooper, Gregg Smith, Judy Smith, CSA Consulting, Chiao, Smith & Associates Accountancy Corporation. (Related document(s) #263 ) (Bacalski, A.) (Filed on 4/22/2008)
April 22, 2008 Filing 265 Declaration of Lisa Roth in Support of #263 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed byZenith Capital LLC, Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group Ltd., Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group LLC, Martel Jed Cooper, Gregg Smith, Judy Smith, CSA Consulting, Chiao, Smith & Associates Accountancy Corporation. (Related document(s) #263 ) (Bacalski, A.) (Filed on 4/22/2008)
April 22, 2008 Filing 264 Brief re #263 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed byZenith Capital LLC, Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group Ltd., Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group LLC, Martel Jed Cooper, Gregg Smith, Judy Smith, CSA Consulting, Chiao, Smith & Associates Accountancy Corporation. (Related document(s) #263 ) (Bacalski, A.) (Filed on 4/22/2008)
April 22, 2008 Filing 263 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Zenith Capital LLC, Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group Ltd., Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group LLC, Martel Jed Cooper, Gregg Smith, Judy Smith, CSA Consulting, Chiao, Smith & Associates Accountancy Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 6/20/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Bacalski, A.) (Filed on 4/22/2008)
January 10, 2008 Filing 262 ASSOCIATION of Counsel ASSOCIATION OF CO-COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS by Charles O. Bradley Trust. (Miskel, Glendon) (Filed on 1/10/2008)
November 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 261 ORDER Denying #249 Plaintiffs' Motion to Reopen Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/15/2007. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2007)
November 15, 2007 Filing 260 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 11/14/2007 before Edward M. Chen. PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REOPEN DISCOVERY is denied. Court will issue order(Date Filed: 11/15/2007). (Court Reporter Connie Kuhl.) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/15/2007)
October 31, 2007 Filing 259 Declaration of Gerald L. Williams In Support of Motion to Reopen Discovery #249 filed by Charles O. Bradley Trust. (Miskel, Glendon) (Filed on 10/31/2007) Modified on 11/1/2007 (hdj, COURT STAFF).
October 31, 2007 Filing 258 Declaration of Glendon W. Miskel In Support of Motion to Reopen Discovery #249 filed by Charles O. Bradley Trust. (Miskel, Glendon) (Filed on 10/31/2007) Modified on 11/1/2007 (hdj, COURT STAFF).
October 31, 2007 Filing 257 Declaration of Charles O. Bradley In Support of Motion To Reopen Discovery #249 filed byCharles O. Bradley Trust. (Miskel, Glendon) (Filed on 10/31/2007) Modified on 11/1/2007 (hdj, COURT STAFF).
October 31, 2007 Filing 256 RESPONSE in Support Reply By Plaintiff's In Support of Motion to Reopen Discovery #249 filed by Charles O. Bradley Trust. (Miskel, Glendon) (Filed on 10/31/2007) Modified on 11/1/2007 (hdj, COURT STAFF).
October 24, 2007 Filing 255 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Zenith Capital LLC, Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group LLC, Martel Jed Cooper, Gregg Smith, Judy Smith, CSA Consulting, Chiao, Smith & Associates Accountancy Corporation re #254 Memorandum in Opposition,, (Johnson, Paul) (Filed on 10/24/2007)
October 24, 2007 Filing 254 Memorandum in Opposition re " Charles O. Bradley Trust's Notice of Motion and Memorandum by Plaintiffs to Reopen Discovery #249 filed byZenith Capital LLC, Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group LLC, Martel Jed Cooper, Gregg Smith, Judy Smith, CSA Consulting, Chiao, Smith & Associates Accountancy Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Paul C. Johnson, Jr. in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Reopen Discovery#2 Affidavit of Douglas A. Dube in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Reopen Discovery)(Johnson, Paul) (Filed on 10/24/2007)
October 16, 2007 Set/Reset Hearings: Jury Trial set for 7/14/2008 08:30 AM. Pretrial Conference set for 6/30/2008 02:00 PM. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2007)
October 16, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ORDER GRANTING #252 ACCEPTANCE OF PRETRIAL AND TRIAL SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/16/07. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2007)
October 5, 2007 Filing 252 Proposed Pretrial Order PLAINTIFFS ACCEPTANCE OF PRETRIAL AND TRIAL SCHEDULE by Charles O. Bradley Trust. (Miskel, Glendon) (Filed on 10/5/2007)
October 3, 2007 Filing 251 CLERK'S NOTICE Motion Hearing set for 11/14/2007 10:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2007)
September 28, 2007 Filing 250 Proposed Order To Reopen Discovery by Charles O. Bradley Trust. (Miskel, Glendon) (Filed on 9/28/2007)
September 28, 2007 Filing 249 NOTICE by Charles O. Bradley Trust Notice of Motion and Memorandum by Plaintiffs to Reopen Discovery (Miskel, Glendon) (Filed on 9/28/2007)
September 28, 2007 Filing 248 Declaration of Gerald L. Williams In Support Of Motion To Reopen Discovery filed byCharles O. Bradley Trust. (Miskel, Glendon) (Filed on 9/28/2007)
September 26, 2007 Filing 247 AFFIDAVIT re #245 Order, #246 Response ( Non Motion ) Declaration of Douglas A. Dube Regarding Plaintiffs' Response to Order re pretrial and trial schedule by Zenith Capital LLC, Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group Ltd., Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group LLC, Martel Jed Cooper, Gregg Smith, Judy Smith, Chiao, Smith & Associates Accountancy Corporation. (Bacalski, A.) (Filed on 9/26/2007)
September 21, 2007 Filing 246 RESPONSE to Order Requiring Pretrial And Trial Schedule by Charles O. Bradley Trust. (Miskel, Glendon) (Filed on 9/21/2007)
August 23, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 245 ORDER REQUIRING Pretrial and Trial Schedule. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on August 23, 2007. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2007)
July 23, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ORDER re #243 Stipulation filed by Charles O. Bradley Trust. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/23/07. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2007)
July 20, 2007 Filing 243 STIPULATION For Limited Discovery By Plaintiffs by Charles O. Bradley Trust. (Miskel, Glendon) (Filed on 7/20/2007)
July 2, 2007 Filing 242 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Charles O. Bradley Trust. (Miskel, Glendon) (Filed on 7/2/2007)
June 22, 2007 Filing 241 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 6/22/2007 before Judge Jeffrey S. White (Date Filed: 6/22/2007). (Court Reporter Belle Ball.) (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/22/2007)
June 15, 2007 Filing 240 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT for June 22, 2007 hearing filed by Zenith Capital LLC, Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group Ltd., Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group LLC, Rick Lane Tasker, Gregg Smith, Judy Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D#5 Cert. of Service (via mail))(Bacalski, A.) (Filed on 6/15/2007)
June 14, 2007 Filing 239 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT And Propsed Order, Plaintiffs' Separate Supplemental filed by Charles O. Bradley Trust. (Miskel, Glendon) (Filed on 6/14/2007)
June 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 238 ORDER GRANTING #236 Stipulation of Dismissal of Albrecht Defendants. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on June 6, 2007. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Full Release and Settlement Agreement)(jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2007)
June 6, 2007 Filing 237 STIPULATION of Dismissal Proof of Service by Charles O. Bradley Trust. (Miskel, Glendon) (Filed on 6/6/2007)
June 6, 2007 Filing 236 STIPULATION of Dismissal Albrecht Defendants And Order Theron by Charles O. Bradley Trust. (Attachments: #1 Full Release And Settlement Agreement)(Miskel, Glendon) (Filed on 6/6/2007)
May 17, 2007 Filing 235 Minute Entry: Settlement Conference (Date Filed: 5/17/2007). () (bjt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/17/2007)
May 17, 2007 Filing 233 AMENDED Minute Entry: Further Settlement Conference (Date Filed: 5/16/2007). Further Settlement Conference set for 5/17/2007 10:00 AM. () (bjt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/17/2007)
May 17, 2007 Filing 232 Minute Entry: Further Settlement Conference (Date Filed: 5/16/2007). Further Settlement Conference set for 5/17/2007 10:00 AM. () (bjt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/17/2007)
May 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ORDER RE ELECTRONIC FILING IN CASES WITH UNREPRESENTED PARTIES: Case designated for electronic filing. Effective immediately all represented parties will e-file their submissions to the court. Represented parties will be required to serve paper copies by mail on unrepresented parties. Unrepresented litigants will continue to file and serve all submissions to the court in paper form unless prior leave is obtained from the assigned judge. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn Walker dated 5/11/07. Copy mailed to counsel of record. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2007)
March 5, 2007 Filing 231 CLERK'S NOTICE Further Case Management Conference set for 6/22/2007 01:30 PM. Case Management Statement due by 6/15/2007. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2007)
March 2, 2007 Filing 230 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Zenith Capital LLC, Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group LLC, Gregg Smith re 229 Case Management Statement (Joint) (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2007)
March 2, 2007 Filing 229 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Zenith Capital LLC, Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group LLC, Gregg Smith. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2007)
January 3, 2007 Filing 227 CLERK'S NOTICE Further Case Management Conference set for 3/16/2007 01:30 PM. Case Management Statement due by 3/9/2007. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2007)
December 29, 2006 Filing 228 Supplemental CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT and Proposed Order filed by Brad Martin Burge, Rental Center Properties, Charles O. Bradley Trust, Linda L. Bradley Trust, Ken & Sharon Burge Trust. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2006)
December 22, 2006 Filing 226 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Zenith Capital LLC, Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group LLC, Martel Jed Cooper, Gregg Smith. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2006)
December 19, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 225 Request and Order for Telephonic Appearance at Case Management Conference.Case Management Conference set for 1/5/2007 01:30 PM. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 12/19/06. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2006)
December 14, 2006 Received Document Request for Telephonic Appearance at Case Management Conference and (Proposed0 Order by Brad Martin Burge, Scott Dykstra, Noa Dykstra, Ronald C. Hall, Rental Center Properties, Charles O. Bradley Trust, Linda L. Bradley Trust, Ken & Sharon Burge Trust. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2006)
November 16, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 207 Albrecht Defendants' Motion to Compel Depositions. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2006)
November 2, 2006 Filing 223 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion re 210 filed byScott Dykstra, Noa Dykstra, Rental Center Properties, Charles O. Bradley Trust, Linda L. Bradley Trust, Ken & Sharon Burge Trust. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2006)
October 31, 2006 Filing 222 Reply in Support re 207 MOTION to Compel by Mark J. Albrecht, Mark J. Albrecht Accountancy Corporation. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2006)
October 25, 2006 Filing 221 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Zenith Capital LLC, Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group Ltd., Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group LLC, Rick Lane Tasker, Martel Jed Cooper, Gregg Smith re 220 Declaration in Support,, 219 Memorandum in Opposition, (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2006)
October 25, 2006 Filing 220 Declaration of Douglas Dube' in Support of 219 Memorandum in Opposition, filed byZenith Capital LLC, Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group Ltd., Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group LLC, Rick Lane Tasker, Martel Jed Cooper, Gregg Smith. (Related document(s) 219 ) (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2006)
October 25, 2006 Filing 219 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 207 MOTION to Compel filed byZenith Capital LLC, Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group Ltd., Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group LLC, Martel Jed Cooper, Gregg Smith. (Related document(s) 207 ) (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2006)
October 18, 2006 Filing 218 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant by Irwin S. Rothenberg (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2006)
September 29, 2006 Filing 217 CLERK'S NOTICE Further Case Management Conference set for 1/5/2007 01:30 PM, previously noted for October 5, 2006 (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2006)
September 28, 2006 Filing 216 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Zenith Capital LLC, Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group Ltd., Rick Lane Tasker, Martel Jed Cooper, Gregg Smith re Received Document, 215 Case Management Statement (Joint) (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2006)
September 28, 2006 Filing 215 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Zenith Capital LLC, Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group Ltd., Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group LLC, Martel Jed Cooper, Gregg Smith. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2006)
September 28, 2006 Received Document Request for Telephonic Appearance and (Proposed) Order by Zenith Capital LLC, Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group Ltd., Martel Jed Cooper, Gregg Smith. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2006)
September 27, 2006 Filing 214 Plaintiffs' Separate Supplemental CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Scott Dykstra, Noa Dykstra, Ronald C. Hall, Rental Center Properties, Charles O. Bradley Trust, Linda L. Bradley Trust, Ken & Sharon Burge Trust. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2006)
September 26, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 213 STIPULATION AND ORDER Re: discovery cut off time for motion to compel discovery relating to Defendant Zenith Capital's Outlook e-mail messages is extended to October 4, 2006. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/25/06. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2006)
September 25, 2006 Filing 212 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Mark Albrecht's Motion to Compel Depositions Hearing. Motion Hearing set for 11/15/2006 03:00 PM. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2006)
September 22, 2006 Filing 211 Declaration of Gerald L. Williams in Support of 210 MOTION to Compel filed byBrad Martin Burge, Scott Dykstra, Noa Dykstra, Ronald C. Hall, Rental Center Properties, Charles O. Bradley Trust, Linda L. Bradley Trust, Ken & Sharon Burge Trust. (Related document(s) 210 ) (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2006)
September 22, 2006 Filing 210 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents by Defendants Zenith Capital and Rothenberg filed by Brad Martin Burge, Scott Dykstra, Noa Dykstra, Ronald C. Hall, Rental Center Properties, Charles O. Bradley Trust, Linda L. Bradley Trust, Ken & Sharon Burge Trust. Motion Hearing set for 11/15/2006 03:00 PM. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2006)
September 22, 2006 Filing 209 Declaration of Michael L. Marx in Support of 207 MOTION to Compel filed byMark J. Albrecht, Mark J. Albrecht Accountancy Corporation. (Related document(s) 207 ) (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2006)
September 22, 2006 Filing 208 MEMORANDUM in Support re 207 MOTION to Compel filed byMark J. Albrecht, Mark J. Albrecht Accountancy Corporation. (Related document(s) 207 ) (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2006)
September 22, 2006 Filing 207 MOTION to Compel Depositions filed by Mark J. Albrecht Accountancy Corporation, Mark J. Albrecht. Motion Hearing set for 11/29/2006 02:30 PM. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2006)
September 22, 2006 Received Document (Proposed) Order re 210 MOTION to Compel by Brad Martin Burge, Scott Dykstra, Noa Dykstra, Ronald C. Hall, Rental Center Properties, Charles O. Bradley Trust, Linda L. Bradley Trust, Ken & Sharon Burge Trust. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2006)
September 22, 2006 Received Document (Proposed) Order re 207 MOTION to Compel by Mark J. Albrecht, Mark J. Albrecht Accountancy Corporation. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2006)
August 29, 2006 Filing 206 CLERK'S NOTICE Removing Case from E-Filing Program (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2006)
August 28, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER Granting #202 Substitution of Counsel. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/28/06. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2006)
August 25, 2006 Filing 204 STIPULATION RE DEPOSITIONS by Zenith Capital LLC, Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group Ltd., Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group LLC, Martel Jed Cooper, Gregg Smith. (Bacalski, A.) (Filed on 8/25/2006)
August 24, 2006 Filing 203 CLERK'S NOTICE Advancing Further Case Management Conference to 10/5/2006 09:30 AM. Case Management Statement due by 9/28/2006. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2006)
August 23, 2006 Filing 202 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by A. Daniel Bacalski, Jr of Rick Tasker (Bacalski, A.) (Filed on 8/23/2006)
May 1, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER VACATING MAY 10, 2006, SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 5/1/2006. (mejlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2006)
April 27, 2006 Filing 200 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 3/22/06 before Judge Edward M. Chen. Court Reporter: Juanita Gonzalez. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2006)
April 20, 2006 Filing 199 STIPULATION of Dismissal Defendant Paul Levy by Charles O. Bradley Trust. (Miskel, Glendon) (Filed on 4/20/2006)
April 18, 2006 Filing 198 Minute Entry: Settlement Conference (Date Filed: 4/18/2006). Settlement Conference set for 5/10/2006 10:00 AM. () (bjt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/18/2006)
April 13, 2006 Filing 197 Minute Entry: Settlement Conference (Date Filed: 4/13/2006). () (bjt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/13/2006)
April 10, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER CLARIFYING THE COURT'S APRIL 5, 2006 ORDER re #193 Order,. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 4/10/2006. (mejlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2006)
April 7, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER re #194 Stipulation filed by Zenith Capital LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/7/2006. (hlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2006)
April 6, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 194 STIPULATION and Order to Protect the Confidentiality of Documents to be Produced to Plaintiffs' Counsel by Zenith Capital LLC. (Bacalski, A.) (Filed on 4/6/2006)
April 5, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER REQUESTING THE PRESENCE OF THE PARTIES' RESPECTIVE ATTORNEYS IN THIS MATTER ONLY AT THE APRIL 12, 2006, 10:00 A.M. SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE re #192 Settlement Conference, Set Hearings. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 4/5/2006. (mejlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2006)
April 5, 2006 Filing 192 Minute Entry: Settlement Conference (Date Filed: 4/5/2006). Settlement Conference set for 4/12/2006 10:00 AM. () (bjt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/5/2006)
March 24, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part #176 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel; Denying #178 Plaintiffs' Motion for Expenses. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2006)
March 22, 2006 Filing 190 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 3/22/2006 before Edward M. Chen (Date Filed: 3/22/2006) re #178 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Charles O. Bradley Trust,, #176 MOTION to Compel Production and Depositions filed by Charles O. Bradley Trust. Court took matter under submission and will issue order. (Court Reporter Juanita Gonzalez.) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/22/2006)
March 15, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER EXCUSING ALBRECHT'S PRESENCE AT THE APRIL 12, 2006, SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/15/2006. (mejlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2006)
March 8, 2006 Filing 188 Declaration of Gerald L Williams for Motion to Compel filed byCharles O. Bradley Trust. (Attachments: #1 #2 #3 #4)(Miskel, Glendon) (Filed on 3/8/2006)
March 8, 2006 Filing 187 Reply to Opposition to Motion for Sanctions filed byCharles O. Bradley Trust. (Miskel, Glendon) (Filed on 3/8/2006)
March 8, 2006 Filing 186 Reply to Opposition to Motion to Compel filed byCharles O. Bradley Trust. (Miskel, Glendon) (Filed on 3/8/2006)
March 1, 2006 Filing 185 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Pltfs' Motion to Compel Production of Document by, and Depos. of, Zenith Defendants filed byIrwin S. Rothenberg. (Fisher, Kyle) (Filed on 3/1/2006)
March 1, 2006 Filing 184 Declaration of Doulgas A. Dube in Support of #183 Memorandum in Opposition, to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Documents by, and Depsitions of, Zenith Defendants, and Opposing Sanctions filed byZenith Capital LLC, Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group Ltd., Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group LLC, Rick Lane Tasker, Martel Jed Cooper, Gregg Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1#2 Exhibit 2#3 Exhibit 3#4 Exhibit 4#5 Exhibit 5#6 Exhibit 6#7 Exhibit 7#8 Exhibit 8#9 Exhibit 9)(Related document(s) #183 ) (Bacalski, A.) (Filed on 3/1/2006)
March 1, 2006 Filing 183 Memorandum in Opposition re #178 MOTION for Sanctions, #176 MOTION to Compel Production and Depositions filed byZenith Capital LLC, Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group Ltd., Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group LLC, Rick Lane Tasker, Martel Jed Cooper, Gregg Smith. (Bacalski, A.) (Filed on 3/1/2006)
February 23, 2006 Filing 182 Defendant's ANSWER to Amended Complaint byChiao, Smith & Associates Accountancy Corporation. (Bacalski, A.) (Filed on 2/23/2006)
February 22, 2006 Filing 181 STIPULATION of Dismissal without Prejudice of Defendant Pisenti & Brinker LLP by Pisenti & Brinker LLP. (Fisher, Kyle) (Filed on 2/22/2006)
February 17, 2006 Filing 180 ANSWER to Complaint , Third Amended byZenith Capital LLC. (Bacalski, A.) (Filed on 2/17/2006)
February 14, 2006 Filing 179 ANSWER to Amended Complaint (Third) byIrwin S. Rothenberg. (Fisher, Kyle) (Filed on 2/14/2006)
February 10, 2006 Filing 178 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Charles O. Bradley Trust. Motion Hearing set for 3/22/2006 10:30 AM. (Miskel, Glendon) (Filed on 2/10/2006)
February 10, 2006 Filing 177 Declaration of Gerald L. Williams for Motion to Compel Production and Depositions filed byCharles O. Bradley Trust. (Attachments: #1 #2 #3 #4 #5 #6 #7 #8 #9 #10 #11 #12 #13)(Miskel, Glendon) (Filed on 2/10/2006)
February 10, 2006 Filing 176 MOTION to Compel Production and Depositions filed by Charles O. Bradley Trust. Motion Hearing set for 3/22/2006 10:30 AM. (Miskel, Glendon) (Filed on 2/10/2006)
February 10, 2006 Filing 175 DEFENDANTS ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Mark J. Albrecht and byMark J. Albrecht Accountancy Corporation. (Marx, Michael) (Filed on 2/10/2006)
February 1, 2006 Summons Issued as to Judy Smith, CSA Consulting, Chiao, Smith & Associates Accountancy Corporation. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2006)
January 31, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER Settlement Conference set for 4/12/2006 10:00 AM.. Signed by Judge MARIA-ELENA JAMES on 1/31/06. (bjt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2006)
January 25, 2006 Filing 173 AMENDED COMPLAINT Third Amended against all defendants. Filed byCharles O. Bradley Trust. (Miskel, Glendon) (Filed on 1/25/2006)
January 24, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White GRANTING #146 Motion to Amend. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2006)
January 24, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White GRANTING #99 Second Motion to Dismiss Eighth Claim for Relief Against Albrecht Defendants and Motion to Strike Allegations of Fiduciary Duty. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2006)
January 23, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER re Stipulation to Protect Confidentiality of Documents Produced in Response to Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Defendant Rothenberg to Produce Documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen on 01/23/2006. (hlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2006)
January 20, 2006 Filing 169 STIPULATION and [Prop] Order to Protect Confidentiality of Docs. Produced in Resp to Order Granding Pltfs' Motion to Comepl Dfdt Rothenberg to Produce Docs. by Irwin S. Rothenberg. (Fisher, Kyle) (Filed on 1/20/2006)
January 20, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on January 20, 2006. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2006)
January 20, 2006 Filing 167 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 1/20/2006 before Judge Jeffrey S. White (Date Filed: 1/20/2006). (Court Reporter Jim Yeomans.) (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/20/2006)
January 20, 2006 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James for Settlement (wh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2006)
January 18, 2006 Filing 166 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byCharles O. Bradley Trust. (Miskel, Glendon) (Filed on 1/18/2006)
January 17, 2006 Filing 165 NOTICE OF TENTATIVE RULING AND QUESTIONS re #99 Second MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Eighth Claim for Relief and to Strike Plaintiffs' Allegations Of Fiduciary Duty. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on January 17, 2006. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2006)
January 17, 2006 Filing 164 NOTICE OF TENTATIVE RULING AND QUESTIONS re #146 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on January 17, 2006. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2006)
January 13, 2006 Filing 163 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Charles O. Bradley Trust. (Miskel, Glendon) (Filed on 1/13/2006)
January 9, 2006 Filing 162 CLERK'S NOTICE Motion Hearing re: motion to dismiss plaintiffs eighth claim for relief and to strike allegations of fiduciary duty (#99), filed July 11, 2005, set for 1/20/2006 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (epb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2006)
January 6, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER GRANTING #156 MOTION to Appear by Telephone at Joint Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on January 6, 2006. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2006)
January 6, 2006 Filing 160 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant Milton Lohr by Charles O. Bradley Trust. (Miskel, Glendon) (Filed on 1/6/2006)
January 6, 2006 Filing 159 Reply Memorandum For Leave to Amend filed byCharles O. Bradley Trust. (Miskel, Glendon) (Filed on 1/6/2006)
January 5, 2006 Filing 158 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Milton Lohr, Paul Levy re #156 MOTION to Appear by Telephone at Joint Case Management Conference, #157 Proposed Order 1/20/06 (Murray, Colin) (Filed on 1/5/2006)
January 5, 2006 Filing 157 Proposed Order re #156 MOTION to Appear by Telephone at Joint Case Management Conference 1/20/06 by Milton Lohr, Paul Levy. (Murray, Colin) (Filed on 1/5/2006)
January 5, 2006 Filing 156 MOTION to Appear by Telephone at Joint Case Management Conference filed by Milton Lohr, Paul Levy. Motion Hearing set for 1/20/2006 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Murray, Colin) (Filed on 1/5/2006)
January 3, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen Granting #129 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Defendant Rothenberg to Produce Documents and Vacating Hearing on January 4, 2006. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2006)
January 3, 2006 Filing 154 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Case Management Conference to 1/20/2006 09:00 AM. Case Management Statement due by 1/13/2006. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2006)
December 30, 2005 Filing 153 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Milton Lohr, Paul Levy re #151 MOTION to Appear by Telephone at Joint Case Management Conference, #152 Proposed Order (Murray, Colin) (Filed on 12/30/2005)
December 30, 2005 Filing 152 Proposed Order re #151 MOTION to Appear by Telephone at Joint Case Management Conference by Milton Lohr, Paul Levy. (Murray, Colin) (Filed on 12/30/2005)
December 30, 2005 Filing 151 MOTION to Appear by Telephone at Joint Case Management Conference filed by Milton Lohr, Paul Levy. Motion Hearing set for 1/13/2006 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Murray, Colin) (Filed on 12/30/2005)
December 30, 2005 Filing 150 Declaration of Paul C. Johnson, Jr. in Support of #149 Memorandum in Opposition filed byZenith Capital LLC, Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group LLC, Rick Lane Tasker, Martel Jed Cooper, Gregg Smith. (Related document(s) #149 ) (Bacalski, A.) (Filed on 12/30/2005)
December 30, 2005 Filing 149 Memorandum in Opposition re #146 MOTION to Amend/Correct Leave to File 3d Amnd Complaint filed byZenith Capital LLC, Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group LLC, Rick Lane Tasker, Martel Jed Cooper, Gregg Smith. (Bacalski, A.) (Filed on 12/30/2005)
December 16, 2005 Filing 148 Declaration for Leave to File 3d Amnd Complaint filed by Charles O. Bradley Trust. Motion Hearing set for 1/20/2006 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 #2 #3 #4 #5 #6 #7 #8 #9)(Miskel, Glendon) (Filed on 12/16/2005)
December 16, 2005 Filing 147 Proposed Order filed by Charles O. Bradley Trust. (Miskel, Glendon) (Filed on 12/16/2005) Modified on 12/20/2005 (hdj, COURT STAFF).
December 16, 2005 Filing 146 MOTION to Amend/Correct Leave to File 3d Amnd Complaint filed by Charles O. Bradley Trust. Motion Hearing set for 1/20/2006 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Miskel, Glendon) (Filed on 12/16/2005)
December 15, 2005 Filing 145 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING Further Case Management Conference to 1/13/2006 01:30 PM. Case Management Statement due by 1/6/2006. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2005)
December 14, 2005 Filing 144 OBJECTIONS to re #142 Case Management Statement (Joint) Submitted By Plaintiffs by Zenith Capital LLC. (Bacalski, A.) (Filed on 12/14/2005)
December 13, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER GRANTING TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE OF DOUGLAS DUBE AT THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 12/13/05. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2005)
December 9, 2005 Filing 142 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Charles O. Bradley Trust. (Miskel, Glendon) (Filed on 12/9/2005)
December 9, 2005 Filing 141 Reply Memorandum Motion to Compel Rothenberg filed byCharles O. Bradley Trust. (Miskel, Glendon) (Filed on 12/9/2005)
December 5, 2005 Filing 140 MOTION to Appear by Telephone at Case Management Conference filed by Zenith Capital LLC. (Bacalski, A.) (Filed on 12/5/2005)
December 5, 2005 Filing 139 NOTICE by Zenith Capital LLC of Change of Firm Name (Bacalski, A.) (Filed on 12/5/2005)
December 2, 2005 Filing 138 Declaration of Kyle M. Fisher in support of Opposition to Motion to Compel Defendant Rothenberg to Produce Documents filed byIrwin S. Rothenberg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Decl. of Kyle M. Fisher in support of opposition to Motion to Compel Production of Documents)(Fisher, Kyle) (Filed on 12/2/2005)
December 2, 2005 Filing 137 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Compel Defendant Rothenberg to Produce Documents filed byIrwin S. Rothenberg. (Fisher, Kyle) (Filed on 12/2/2005)
December 2, 2005 Filing 136 Declaration of Defendant Irwin S. Rothenberg in Support of Opposition to Motion to Compel Defendant Rothenberg to Produce Documents filed byIrwin S. Rothenberg. (Fisher, Kyle) (Filed on 12/2/2005)
November 28, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER re #134 Stipulation filed by Irwin S. Rothenberg resetting motion hearing from 12/21/05 to 1/4/06. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/28/05. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2005)
November 28, 2005 Filing 134 STIPULATION & [PROP] ORDER REGARDING HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL DOCUMENT PRODUCTION by Irwin S. Rothenberg. (Fisher, Kyle) (Filed on 11/28/2005)
November 18, 2005 Filing 133 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Milton Lohr, Paul Levy re #132 Notice of Appearance (Murray, Colin) (Filed on 11/18/2005)
November 18, 2005 Filing 132 NOTICE of Appearance by Colin H. Murray Re Attorney of Record (Murray, Colin) (Filed on 11/18/2005)
November 15, 2005 Filing 131 Proposed Order re #130 Declaration in Support, #129 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents by Defendant Rothenberg by Charles O. Bradley Trust. (Miskel, Glendon) (Filed on 11/15/2005)
November 15, 2005 Filing 130 Declaration of Gerald L. Williams for Motion to Compel Production filed byCharles O. Bradley Trust. (Miskel, Glendon) (Filed on 11/15/2005)
November 15, 2005 Filing 129 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents filed by Charles O. Bradley Trust. Motion Hearing set for 12/21/2005 10:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Miskel, Glendon) (Filed on 11/15/2005)
October 17, 2005 Filing 128 Notice of Application to Another District for Stay of this Action filed by Charles O. Bradley Trust. (Miskel, Glendon) (Filed on 10/17/2005) Modified on 10/18/2005 (hdj, COURT STAFF).
October 7, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER Vacating Hearing Date and Continuing Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on October 6, 2005. (jswlc3, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2005)
October 6, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 126 **INCORRECT ENTRY - SEE DOCKET ENTRY NO. 127** ORDER VACATING November 4, 2005 hearing date and CONTINUING case management conference to December 16, 2005 at 1:30 p.m. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on October 6, 2005. (jswlc3, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2005) Modified on 10/7/2005 (jjo, COURT STAFF).
October 6, 2005 Set/Reset Hearings: Case Management Conference set for 12/16/2005 01:30 PM. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2005)
September 14, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL re #124 Proposed Order filed by Charles O. Bradley Trust,. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/14/05. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2005)
September 8, 2005 Filing 124 Proposed Order to Compel Production of Documents by Charles O. Bradley Trust. (Miskel, Glendon) (Filed on 9/8/2005)
August 25, 2005 Filing 123 Reply to Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Eighth Claim for Relief From Their Second Amended Complaint Pursuant To F.R.C.P. Rule 12(b)(6) And To Strike Plaintiffs' Allegations Of Fiduciary Duty Pursuant To F.R.C.P. Rule 12(f) filed byMark J. Albrecht. (Marx, Michael) (Filed on 8/25/2005)
August 24, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #102 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Albrecht Defendants to Produce Documents. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2005)
August 24, 2005 Filing 121 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 8/24/2005 before Edward M. Chen (Date Filed: 8/24/2005) re #102 MOTION to Compel Defendants Albrecht To Produce Documents filed by Charles O. Bradley Trust. Plaintiff?s motion is granted. Court will issue order. (Court Reporter Juanita Gonzalez.) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/24/2005)
August 19, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER GRANTING #118 Stipulation of Dismissal of Defendant Marvin Friedman. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on August 19, 2005. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2005)
August 19, 2005 Filing 119 Memorandum in Opposition to the Motion by Defendants Albrecht to Dismiss and/or Strike Allegations in the Second Amended Complaint filed byCharles O. Bradley Trust. (Miskel, Glendon) (Filed on 8/19/2005)
August 18, 2005 Filing 118 Proposed Order Stipulation to Dismissal by Charles O. Bradley Trust. (Miskel, Glendon) (Filed on 8/18/2005)
August 15, 2005 Filing 117 CLERK'S NOTICE Further Case Management Conference set for 11/4/2005 09:00 AM. Case Management Statement due by 10/28/2005. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2005)
August 15, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER GRANTING #114 Stipulation of Dismissal of Defendant Kenneth Widder. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on August 15, 2005. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2005)
August 15, 2005 Filing 115 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Charles O. Bradley Trust. (Miskel, Glendon) (Filed on 8/15/2005)
August 15, 2005 Filing 114 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant Kenneth Widder by Kenneth Widder. (Rez, Donald) (Filed on 8/15/2005)
August 15, 2005 Filing 113 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Charles O. Bradley Trust. (Miskel, Glendon) (Filed on 8/15/2005)
August 10, 2005 Filing 112 Reply Memorandum by Plaintiffs in Support of Motion to Compel Production of Documents by Defendant Albrecht filed byCharles O. Bradley Trust. (Miskel, Glendon) (Filed on 8/10/2005)
July 28, 2005 Filing 111 Proposed Order On Motion By Plaintiffs To Compel Albrecht To Produce Documents by Mark J. Albrecht. (Marx, Michael) (Filed on 7/28/2005)
July 28, 2005 Filing 110 Memorandum in Opposition #102 to Motion by Plaintiffs to Compel Albrecht to Produce Documents filed by Mark J. Albrecht. (Marx, Michael) (Filed on 7/28/2005) Modified on 8/1/2005 (hdj, COURT STAFF).
July 28, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on July 28, 2005. (jswlc3, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2005)
July 14, 2005 Filing 108 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Completion of Criminal Proceedings to 11/4/2005 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2005)
July 14, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER GRANTING #106 Stipulation re Dr. Widder Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on July 14, 2005. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2005)
July 13, 2005 Filing 106 STIPULATION (1) RE-NOTICING DEFENDANT DR. KENNETH WIDDER?S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF?S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. RULE 9(b), 12(b)(6) or ALTERNATIVELY MOTION FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 12(e), AND AN ALTERNATIVE MOTION TO STRIKE RULE 12(f) AND (2) HAVING DR. WIDDER?S MOTION PAPERS APPLY TO PLAINTIFF?S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Kenneth Widder. (Rez, Donald) (Filed on 7/13/2005) Modified on 7/13/2005 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
July 13, 2005 Filing 105 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Charles O. Bradley Trust. Amendment to #88 Amended Complaint signature page for Gerald Williams, Esq.. (Miskel, Glendon) (Filed on 7/13/2005)
July 13, 2005 Filing 104 Proposed Order re #102 MOTION to Compel Defendants Albrecht To Produce Documents by Charles O. Bradley Trust. (Miskel, Glendon) (Filed on 7/13/2005)
July 13, 2005 Filing 103 Declaration of Gerald L. WIlliams in Support of #102 MOTION to Compel Defendants Albrecht To Produce Documents filed byCharles O. Bradley Trust. (Related document(s) #102 ) (Miskel, Glendon) (Filed on 7/13/2005)
July 13, 2005 Filing 102 MOTION to Compel Defendants Albrecht To Produce Documents filed by Charles O. Bradley Trust. Motion Hearing set for 8/24/2005 10:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C-1#4 Exhibit C-2#5 Exhibit D-1#6 Exhibit D-2#7 Exhibit D-3#8 Exhibit E)(Miskel, Glendon) (Filed on 7/13/2005)
July 11, 2005 Filing 101 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Eighth Claim For Relief From Their Second Amended Complaint Pursuant To F.R.C.P. Rule 12(b)(6) And To Strike Plaintiffs' Allegations Of Fiduciary Duty Pursuant To F.R.C.P. Rule 12(f) by Mark J. Albrecht. (Marx, Michael) (Filed on 7/11/2005)
July 11, 2005 Filing 100 EXHIBITS : Exhibit A to Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Eighth Claim For Relief From Their Second Amended Complaint Pursuant To F.R.C.P. Rule 12(b)(6) And To Strike Plaintiffs' Allegations Of Fiduciary Duty Pursuant To F.R.C.P. Rule 12(f) filed byMark J. Albrecht. (Marx, Michael) (Filed on 7/11/2005)
July 11, 2005 Filing 99 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Eighth Claim for Relief From Their Second Amended Complaint Pursuant To F.R.C.P. Rule 12(b)(6) And To Strike Plaintiffs' Allegations Of Fiduciary Duty Pursuant To F.R.C.P. Rule 12(f) filed by Mark J. Albrecht. Motion Hearing set for 11/4/2005 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Marx, Michael) (Filed on 7/11/2005)
July 11, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER GRANTING #82 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on July 11, 2005. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2005)
July 8, 2005 Pro Hac Vice fee: $ 210, receipt number 3374209. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2005)
July 5, 2005 Filing 97 CLERK'S NOTICE re: Failure to E-File and/or Failure to Register as an E-Filer (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2005) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/5/2005 (hdj, COURT STAFF).
July 1, 2005 Filing 96 Request for Judicial Notice re #91 MOTION to Stay filed byMarvin Friedman. (Related document(s) #91 ) (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2005)
July 1, 2005 Filing 89 *** FILED IN ERROR. DUPLICATE OF DOCKET #88 . *** AMENDED COMPLAINT Second -- Amendments against Mark J. Albrecht. Filed byCharles O. Bradley Trust. (Miskel, Glendon) (Filed on 7/1/2005) Modified on 7/12/2005 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
July 1, 2005 Filing 88 AMENDED COMPLAINT Second-Amendments as against Mark J. Albrecht. Filed byCharles O. Bradley Trust. (Miskel, Glendon) (Filed on 7/1/2005)
June 30, 2005 Filing 95 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Marvin Friedman re #91 MOTION to Stay (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2005)
June 30, 2005 Filing 94 Declaration of Jack R. Leer in Support of #91 MOTION to Stay filed byMarvin Friedman. (Related document(s) #91 ) (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2005)
June 30, 2005 Filing 93 Request for Judicial Notice re #91 MOTION to Stay filed byMarvin Friedman. (Related document(s) #91 ) (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2005)
June 30, 2005 Filing 92 MEMORANDUM in Support re #91 MOTION to Stay filed byMarvin Friedman. (Related document(s) #91 ) (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2005) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/22/2005 (hdj, COURT STAFF).
June 30, 2005 Filing 91 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Completion of Criminal Proceedings filed by Marvin Friedman. Motion Hearing set for 10/28/2005 09:00 AM. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2005) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/22/2005 (hdj, COURT STAFF).
June 30, 2005 Filing 90 ***erroneous docket entry**** (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2005) Modified on 7/5/2005 (hdj, COURT STAFF).
June 30, 2005 Received Document (Proposed) Order re #91 MOTION to Stay by Marvin Friedman. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2005)
June 30, 2005 Filing 87 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kenneth Widder re #85 MOTION to Dismiss and NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. RULE 9(B), 12(B)(6), OR ALTERNATIVELY MOTION FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 12(E), AND ALTERNATIVE MOTION TO STRIKE, #86 Request for Judicial Notice, Exhibits A-E (Rez, Donald) (Filed on 6/30/2005)
June 30, 2005 Filing 86 Request for Judicial Notice re #85 MOTION to Dismiss and NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. RULE 9(B), 12(B)(6), OR ALTERNATIVELY MOTION FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 12(E), AND ALTERNATIVE MOTION TO STRIKE (RULE 12) filed byKenneth Widder. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D#5 Exhibit E)(Related document(s) #85 ) (Rez, Donald) (Filed on 6/30/2005)
June 30, 2005 Filing 85 MOTION to Dismiss and NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. RULE 9(B), 12(B)(6), OR ALTERNATIVELY MOTION FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 12(E), AND ALTERNATIVE MOTION TO STRIKE (RULE 12) filed by Kenneth Widder. Motion Hearing set for 10/28/2005 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order #2 Memorandum of Points and Authorities)(Rez, Donald) (Filed on 6/30/2005)
June 28, 2005 Filing 84 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Milton Lohr, Paul Levy re #83 Proposed Order, #81 Answer to Amended Complaint, #82 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Dixon, Christina) (Filed on 6/28/2005)
June 28, 2005 Filing 83 Proposed Order re #82 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Milton Lohr, Paul Levy. (Dixon, Christina) (Filed on 6/28/2005)
June 28, 2005 Filing 82 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice filed by Milton Lohr, Paul Levy. (Dixon, Christina) (Filed on 6/28/2005)
June 28, 2005 Filing 81 ANSWER to Amended Complaint byMilton Lohr, Paul Levy. (Dixon, Christina) (Filed on 6/28/2005)
June 21, 2005 Filing 80 CLERK'S NOTICE re: Failure to E-File and/or Failure to Register as an E-Filer (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2005)
June 20, 2005 Filing 79 NOTICE of Change of Firm Name by Zenith Capital LLC, Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group Ltd., Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group LLC, Rick Lane Tasker, Martel Jed Cooper, Gregg Smith. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2005) Additional attachment(s) added on 6/22/2005 (hdj, COURT STAFF).
June 15, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO PROTECT THE CONFIDENTIALITY OF DOCUMENTS, ETC.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/15/05. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2005)
June 13, 2005 Filing 77 Stipulation and (Proposd) Order to Protect the Confidentiality of Documents Containing Defendants' Financial Information to be Produced to Plaintiffs' Counsel, filed by Charles O. Bradley Trust. (Miskel, Glendon) (Filed on 6/13/2005) Modified on 6/14/2005 (hdj, COURT STAFF).
June 1, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER GRANTING #46 MOTION to Dismiss Eighth and Ninth Causes of Action Against Albrecht Defendants. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on June 1, 2005. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2005)
May 27, 2005 Filing 75 Reply to Opposition filed by Mark J. Albrecht. (Neuman, Farley) (Filed on 5/27/2005)
May 20, 2005 Filing 74 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition TO MOTION BY DEFENDANTS ALBRECHT FOR DISMISSAL OF 8TH AND 9TH CLAIMS - RULE 12(b)(6) filed byCharles O. Bradley Trust. (Miskel, Glendon) (Filed on 5/20/2005)
May 18, 2005 Filing 73 Letter from Plaintiffs. (Miskel, Glendon) (Filed on 5/18/2005)
May 9, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER GRANTING #58 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and VACATING Hearing Date of May 27, 2005. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on May 9, 2005. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2005)
May 9, 2005 Filing 71 RESPONSE in Support of Motion to Change Discovery Cut-Off by Defendant Albrecht filed byCharles O. Bradley Trust. (Miskel, Glendon) (Filed on 5/9/2005)
May 3, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER Granting in Part Plaintiffs' Motion to Obtain Discovery of Finances of Defendants ( #47 , #53 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/3/2005. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2005)
April 29, 2005 Filing 69 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Charles O. Bradley Trust. Service waived by Paul Levy waiver sent on 4/29/2005, answer due 6/28/2005. (Miskel, Glendon) (Filed on 4/29/2005)
April 29, 2005 Filing 68 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Charles O. Bradley Trust Service on Defendant Kenneth Widder (Miskel, Glendon) (Filed on 4/29/2005)
April 28, 2005 Filing 67 STIPULATION to Enlarge Time To File Responsive Pleading or Otherwise Move Under FRCP 12 by Charles O. Bradley Trust. (Miskel, Glendon) (Filed on 4/28/2005)
April 27, 2005 Filing 66 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 4/27/2005 before Edward M. Chen (Date Filed: 4/27/2005) re #53 First MOTION for Discovery of Defendants' Financial Matters filed by Charles O. Bradley Trust. Parties to meet and confer. Joint letter due 5/18/05. Court will take matter under submission. (Court Reporter Jeanne Bishop.) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/27/2005)
April 25, 2005 Received Document (Proposed) Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Modify Scheduling Order to Extend Discovery Cutoff by Mark J. Albrecht Accountancy Corporation, Mark J. Albrecht. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2005)
April 25, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER GRANTING #57 Ex Parte MOTION Request for an Order Shortening Time. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on April 25, 2005. (jswlc3, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2005)
April 22, 2005 Filing 64 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Eighth and Ninth Causes of Action by Mark J. Albrecht. (Neuman, Farley) (Filed on 4/22/2005)
April 22, 2005 Filing 63 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Ex Parte Request for OST to Hear Motion to Modify Scheduling Order to Extend Discovery Cutoff on May 20, 2005 by Mark J. Albrecht. (Neuman, Farley) (Filed on 4/22/2005)
April 22, 2005 Filing 62 Proposed Order Granting Albrecht's Motion to MOdify Scheduling Order to Extend Discovery Cutoff by Mark J. Albrecht. (Neuman, Farley) (Filed on 4/22/2005)
April 22, 2005 Filing 61 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Charles O. Bradley Trust PROOF - Lohr (Miskel, Glendon) (Filed on 4/22/2005)
April 22, 2005 Filing 60 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Charles O. Bradley Trust Proof - Friedman (Miskel, Glendon) (Filed on 4/22/2005)
April 15, 2005 Filing 59 Declaration of Tom Prountzos in Support of Defendants Motion to Modify Scheduling Order to Extend Discovery Cutoff filed byMark J. Albrecht. (Neuman, Farley) (Filed on 4/15/2005)
April 15, 2005 Filing 58 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Motion to Extend Scheduling Order to Extend Discovery Cutoff filed by Mark J. Albrecht. Motion Hearing set for 6/24/2005 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Neuman, Farley) (Filed on 4/15/2005)
April 15, 2005 Filing 57 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by Mark J. Albrecht. Motion Hearing set for 6/24/2005 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Neuman, Farley) (Filed on 4/15/2005)
April 13, 2005 Filing 56 Brief in Reply and in Opposition to Pltf's Motion for Discovery Order filed by Defdt Pisenti & Brinker and filed byIrwin S. Rothenberg. (Fisher, Kyle) (Filed on 4/13/2005)
April 7, 2005 Filing 55 Memorandum in Opposition re #53 First MOTION for Discovery of Defendants' Financial Matters filed byZenith Capital LLC, Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group LLC, Rick Lane Tasker, Martel Jed Cooper, Gregg Smith. (Bacalski, A.) (Filed on 4/7/2005)
April 6, 2005 Filing 54 Memorandum in Opposition re #53 First MOTION for Discovery of Defendants' Financial Matters filed by Def. Pisenti & Brinker and filed byIrwin S. Rothenberg. (Attachments: #1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations) Declaration of Irwin S. Rothenberg)(Fisher, Kyle) (Filed on 4/6/2005)
April 4, 2005 Filing 53 First MOTION for Discovery of Defendants' Financial Matters filed by Charles O. Bradley Trust. Motion Hearing set for 4/27/2005 10:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Memorandum and Declaration#3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Memo and Declaration#4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Memo and Declaration#5 Exhibit Exhibit 4 to Memo and Declaration#6 Exhibit Exhibit 5 to Memo and Declaration#7 Exhibit Exhibit 6 to Memo and Declaration#8 Exhibit Exhibit 7 to Memo and Declaration#9 Exhibit Exhibit 8 to Memo and Declaration#10 Exhibit Exhibit 9 to Memo and Declaration#11 Exhibit Exhibit 10 to Memo and Declaration#12 Exhibit Exhibit 11 to Memo and Declaration)(Miskel, Glendon) (Filed on 4/4/2005)
March 29, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER RE #47 PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR DISCOVERY. Cross-briefs and supporting evidence shall be filed by April 6, 2005. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on March 29, 2005. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2005)
March 22, 2005 Filing 51 CLERK'S NOTICE setting Motion Hearing on PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR DISCOVERY ORDER REGARDING FINANCES OF DEFENDANTS for 4/27/2005 10:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2005)
March 22, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 50 NOTICE OF REFERENCE AND ORDER RE DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/22/05. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2005)
March 17, 2005 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge for Discovery Edward M. Chen. (wh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2005)
March 15, 2005 Filing 49 NOTICE by Mark J. Albrecht Re-Notice Motion to Dismiss to June 10, 2005 (Neuman, Farley) (Filed on 3/15/2005)
March 15, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER #47 REFERRING DISCOVERY TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on March 15, 2005. (jswlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2005)
March 15, 2005 Filing 47 MOTION for Discovery filed by Charles O. Bradley Trust. (Attachments: #1)(Miskel, Glendon) (Filed on 3/15/2005)
March 15, 2005 Filing 46 MOTION to Dismiss 8th and 9th Causes of Action filed by Mark J. Albrecht. Motion Hearing set for 4/22/2005 09:00 AM. (Neuman, Farley) (Filed on 3/15/2005)
February 28, 2005 Filing 45 ANSWER to Amended Complaint byPisenti & Brinker LLP. (Friedemann, John) (Filed on 2/28/2005)
February 28, 2005 Filing 44 ANSWER to Amended Complaint byIrwin S. Rothenberg. (Friedemann, John) (Filed on 2/28/2005)
February 16, 2005 Filing 43 ANSWER to Amended Complaint #32 byZenith Capital LLC, Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group Ltd., Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group LLC, Rick Lane Tasker, Gregg Smith. (Bacalski, A.) (Filed on 2/16/2005) Modified on 2/17/2005 (ga, COURT STAFF).
February 11, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER #38 GRANTING Substitution of Counsel. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on February 11, 2005. (jswlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2005)
February 11, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER #39 GRANTING Substitution of Counsel. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on February 11, 2005. (jswlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2005)
February 11, 2005 Filing 40 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 2/11/2005 before Judge Jeffrey S. White (Date Filed: 2/11/2005). (Court Reporter Catherine Luciano.) (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/11/2005)
February 8, 2005 Filing 39 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Kyle M. Fisher by Defendant Irwin S. Rothenberg (Fisher, Kyle) (Filed on 2/8/2005)
February 8, 2005 Filing 38 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Kyle M. Fisher for Defendant Pisenti & Brinker (Fisher, Kyle) (Filed on 2/8/2005)
February 4, 2005 Filing 37 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Charles O. Bradley Trust. (Miskel, Glendon) (Filed on 2/4/2005)
February 3, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER #35 GRANTING REQUEST TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on February 3, 2005. (jswlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2005)
February 2, 2005 Filing 35 MOTION Request to Appear Telephonically at Case Management Conference filed by Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group Ltd., Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group LLC, Rick Lane Tasker, Gregg Smith. Motion Hearing set for 2/11/2005 09:00 AM. (Bacalski, A.) (Filed on 2/2/2005)
February 2, 2005 Filing 34 CLERK'S NOTICE Further Case Management Conference set for 2/11/2005 01:30 PM. Case Management Statement due by 2/4/2005. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2005)
January 25, 2005 Filing 33 CERTIFICATION OF ENE Session held on 1/20/05 w/Martin Quinn. Case did not settle. ADR process completed. (bt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2005)
January 25, 2005 (AMENDED)Summons Issued as to Mark J. Albrecht, Marvin Friedman, Paul Levy, Milton Lohr, Mark J. Albrecht Accountancy Corporation, Kenneth Widder. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2005)
January 19, 2005 Filing 32 AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) against Mark J. Albrecht, Marvin Friedman, Paul Levy, Milton Lohr, Mark J. Albrecht Accountancy Corporation, Kenneth Widder, Zenith Capital LLC, Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group Ltd., Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group LLC, Pisenti & Brinker LLP, Rick Lane Tasker, Martel Jed Cooper, Gregg Smith, Irwin S. Rothenberg, Mark J. Albrecht, Marvin Friedman, Paul Levy, Milton Lohr, Mark J. Albrecht Accountancy Corporation, Kenneth Widder, Zenith Capital LLC, Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group Ltd., Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group LLC, Pisenti & Brinker LLP, Rick Lane Tasker, Martel Jed Cooper, Gregg Smith, Irwin S. Rothenberg, Mark J. Albrecht, Marvin Friedman, Paul Levy, Milton Lohr, Mark J. Albrecht Accountancy Corporation, Kenneth Widder, Zenith Capital LLC, Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group Ltd., Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group LLC, Pisenti & Brinker LLP, Rick Lane Tasker, Martel Jed Cooper, Gregg Smith, Irwin S. Rothenberg. Filed byCharles O. Bradley Trust. (Miskel, Glendon) (Filed on 1/19/2005)
January 19, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER #30 GRANTING Stipulation. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on January 19, 2005. (jswlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2005)
January 13, 2005 Filing 30 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Charles O. Bradley Trust. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint)(Miskel, Glendon) (Filed on 1/13/2005)
January 11, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER NOT RELATING CASE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/11/05. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2005)
January 10, 2005 Set/Reset Hearings: ENE Hearing set for 1/20/2005 (bt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2005)
December 21, 2004 Filing 28 NOTICE of Related Case Amended (Bacalski, A.) (Filed on 12/21/2004)
December 14, 2004 Filing 27 NOTICE of Related Case 04-3112MMC and 04-2239JSW filed by Zenith Capital, LLC, Tasker Cooper, Jed Cooper, Gregg Smith, Richard Tasker. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2004)
December 14, 2004 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE 27 by Zenith Capital LLC, Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group Ltd., Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group LLC, Rick Lane Tasker, Martel Jed Cooper, Gregg Smith (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2004)
November 4, 2004 Filing 25 ADR Clerks Notice Appointing Martin Quinn as ENE Evaluator. (bt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2004)
November 1, 2004 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Further Case Management Conference set for 2/11/2005 09:00 AM. Motion Hearing set for 2/11/2005 09:00 AM. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2004)
November 1, 2004 Filing 24 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 10/29/2004 before Judge Jeffrey S. White (Date Filed: 11/1/2004). (Court Reporter Rosita Flores.) (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/1/2004)
November 1, 2004 CASE REFERRED to Early Neutral Evaluation per minutes dtd 10/29/04 (bt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2004)
October 28, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER DENYING #22 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on October 28, 2004. (jswlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2004)
October 27, 2004 Filing 22 STIPULATION for continuation of CMC date by Zenith Capital LLC. (Bacalski, A.) (Filed on 10/27/2004)
October 26, 2004 Filing 21 CLERK'S NOTICE re: Failure to E-File and/or Failure to Register as an E-Filer (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2004)
October 25, 2004 Filing 20 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Brad Martin Burge, Charles O. Bradley Trust, Noa Dykstra, Scott Dykstra, Ronald C. Hall, Ken & Sharon Burge Trust, Linda L. Bradley Trust, Rental Center Properties. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2004)
October 25, 2004 Filing 19 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT AND PROPOSED ORDER filed by Charles O. Bradley Trust. (Miskel, Glendon) (Filed on 10/25/2004)
August 30, 2004 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint by Martel Jed Cooper, Gregg Smith, Rick Lane Tasker, Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group LLC, Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group Ltd., Zenith Capital LLC. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2004)
August 30, 2004 Filing 17 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint for Relief by Pisenti & Brinker LLP. (Fisher, Kyle) (Filed on 8/30/2004)
August 30, 2004 Filing 16 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint for Relief by Irwin S. Rothenberg. (Fisher, Kyle) (Filed on 8/30/2004)
August 3, 2004 Filing 15 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Zenith Capital LLC. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2004)
July 19, 2004 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Charles O. Bradley Trust. Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group LLC waiver sent on 7/1/2004, answer due 8/30/2004. (Miskel, Glendon) (Filed on 7/19/2004)
July 19, 2004 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Charles O. Bradley Trust. Martel Jed Cooper waiver sent on 7/1/2004, answer due 8/30/2004. (Miskel, Glendon) (Filed on 7/19/2004)
July 19, 2004 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Charles O. Bradley Trust. Zenith Capital LLC waiver sent on 7/1/2004, answer due 8/30/2004. (Miskel, Glendon) (Filed on 7/19/2004)
July 19, 2004 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Charles O. Bradley Trust. Gregg Smith waiver sent on 7/1/2004, answer due 8/30/2004. (Miskel, Glendon) (Filed on 7/19/2004)
July 19, 2004 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Charles O. Bradley Trust. Rick Lane Tasker waiver sent on 7/1/2004, answer due 8/30/2004. (Miskel, Glendon) (Filed on 7/19/2004)
July 14, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 10/29/2004 01:30 PM. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/13/04. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2004)
July 12, 2004 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Charles O. Bradley Trust. Irwin S. Rothenberg waiver sent on 7/1/2004, answer due 8/30/2004. (Miskel, Glendon) (Filed on 7/12/2004)
July 12, 2004 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Charles O. Bradley Trust re Summons Issued (Miskel, Glendon) (Filed on 7/12/2004)
July 7, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jeffrey S. White for all further proceedings. Judge Bernard Zimmerman no longer assigned to case. Signed by Executive Committee on 07/07/04. (mab, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2004)
July 6, 2004 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2004)
July 1, 2004 Filing 4 First Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Charles O. Bradley Trust , et al.. (Miskel, Glendon) (Filed on 7/1/2004)
June 25, 2004 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE To Plaintiffs' Counsel re: Failure to E-File and/or Failure to Register as an E-Filer. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2004)
June 7, 2004 Filing 2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 10/12/2004 & Initial Case Management Conference set for 4:00 p.m. on 10/18/2004. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order).(tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2004)
June 7, 2004 Filing 1 COMPLAINT; Jury Trial Demanded - [Summons Issued] against Martel Jed Cooper, Pisenti & Brinker LLP, Irwin S. Rothenberg, Gregg Smith, Rick Lane Tasker, Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group LLC, Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group Ltd. & Zenith Capital LLC, [Filing Fee: $150.00, Receipt No. 3360593]. Filed by Plaintiffs Brad Martin Burge, Charles O. Bradley Trust, Noa Dykstra, Scott Dykstra, Ronald C. Hall, Ken & Sharon Burge Trust, Linda L. Bradley Trust & Rental Center Properties. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2004) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/9/2004 (tn, COURT STAFF). Additional attachment(s) added on 7/9/2004 (tn, COURT STAFF).
June 7, 2004 Summons Issued as to Martel Jed Cooper, Pisenti & Brinker LLP, Irwin S. Rothenberg, Gregg Smith, Rick Lane Tasker, Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group LLC, Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group Ltd., Zenith Capital LLC. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2004)
June 7, 2004 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2004)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Charles O. Bradley Trust et al v. Zenith Capital LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martel Jed Cooper
Represented By: A. Daniel Bacalski, Jr.
Represented By: Donald R. Wild
Represented By: Douglas A. Dube
Represented By: Paul Cambron Johnson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judy Smith aka Judy Smith individually and doing business as also known as Judy Chiao Smith
Represented By: A. Daniel Bacalski, Jr.
Represented By: Donald R. Wild
Represented By: Paul Cambron Johnson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Irwin S. Rothenberg
Represented By: Donald R. Wild
Represented By: Kyle M. Fisher
Represented By: John F. Friedemann, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chiao, Smith & Associates Accountancy Corporation
Represented By: A. Daniel Bacalski, Jr.
Represented By: Donald R. Wild
Represented By: Paul Cambron Johnson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marvin Friedman
Represented By: Donald R. Wild
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Lane Tasker
Represented By: A. Daniel Bacalski, Jr.
Represented By: Donald R. Wild
Represented By: Douglas A. Dube
Represented By: Paul Cambron Johnson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group LLC
Represented By: A. Daniel Bacalski, Jr.
Represented By: Donald R. Wild
Represented By: Douglas A. Dube
Represented By: Paul Cambron Johnson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judy Chiao Smith
Represented By: A. Daniel Bacalski, Jr.
Represented By: Donald R. Wild
Represented By: Paul Cambron Johnson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Levy
Represented By: Christina Keiko Dixon
Represented By: Donald R. Wild
Represented By: Thomas M. Connelly
Represented By: Thomas A. Connelly
Represented By: Colin H. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pisenti & Brinker LLP
Represented By: Donald R. Wild
Represented By: Kyle M. Fisher
Represented By: John F. Friedemann, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark J. Albrecht
Represented By: Donald R. Wild
Represented By: Michael Lee Marx
Represented By: Farley Jay Neuman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Irv Rothenberg
Represented By: Donald R. Wild
Represented By: Kyle M. Fisher
Represented By: John F. Friedemann, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregg Smith
Represented By: A. Daniel Bacalski, Jr.
Represented By: Donald R. Wild
Represented By: Douglas A. Dube
Represented By: Paul Cambron Johnson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tasker Cooper Smith/Zenith Group Ltd.
Represented By: A. Daniel Bacalski, Jr.
Represented By: Donald R. Wild
Represented By: Douglas A. Dube
Represented By: Paul Cambron Johnson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jed Cooper
Represented By: A. Daniel Bacalski, Jr.
Represented By: Donald R. Wild
Represented By: Douglas A. Dube
Represented By: Paul Cambron Johnson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zenith Capital LLC
Represented By: A. Daniel Bacalski, Jr.
Represented By: Donald R. Wild
Represented By: Douglas A. Dube
Represented By: Paul Cambron Johnson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Widder
Represented By: Donald R. Wild
Represented By: Donald Gary Rez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark J. Albrecht Accountancy Corporation
Represented By: Donald R. Wild
Represented By: Michael Lee Marx
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milton Lohr
Represented By: Christina Keiko Dixon
Represented By: Donald R. Wild
Represented By: Thomas M. Connelly
Represented By: Thomas A. Connelly
Represented By: Colin H. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSA Consulting
Represented By: A. Daniel Bacalski, Jr.
Represented By: Donald R. Wild
Represented By: Paul Cambron Johnson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brad Martin Burge
Represented By: A. Daniel Bacalski, Jr.
Represented By: Donald R. Wild
Represented By: Gerald L. Williams
Represented By: Tammy Albarran
Represented By: Glendon W. Miskel
Represented By: David B. Bayless
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda L. Bradley Trust
Represented By: A. Daniel Bacalski, Jr.
Represented By: Donald R. Wild
Represented By: Gerald L. Williams
Represented By: Tammy Albarran
Represented By: Glendon W. Miskel
Represented By: David B. Bayless
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald C. Hall
Represented By: A. Daniel Bacalski, Jr.
Represented By: Donald R. Wild
Represented By: Gerald L. Williams
Represented By: Tammy Albarran
Represented By: Glendon W. Miskel
Represented By: David B. Bayless
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rental Center Properties
Represented By: A. Daniel Bacalski, Jr.
Represented By: Donald R. Wild
Represented By: Gerald L. Williams
Represented By: Tammy Albarran
Represented By: Glendon W. Miskel
Represented By: David B. Bayless
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ken & Sharon Burge Trust
Represented By: A. Daniel Bacalski, Jr.
Represented By: Donald R. Wild
Represented By: Gerald L. Williams
Represented By: Tammy Albarran
Represented By: Glendon W. Miskel
Represented By: David B. Bayless
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles O. Bradley Trust
Represented By: A. Daniel Bacalski, Jr.
Represented By: Donald R. Wild
Represented By: Gerald L. Williams
Represented By: Tammy Albarran
Represented By: Glendon W. Miskel
Represented By: David B. Bayless
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Dykstra
Represented By: A. Daniel Bacalski, Jr.
Represented By: Donald R. Wild
Represented By: Gerald L. Williams
Represented By: Tammy Albarran
Represented By: Glendon W. Miskel
Represented By: David B. Bayless
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noa Dykstra
Represented By: A. Daniel Bacalski, Jr.
Represented By: Donald R. Wild
Represented By: Gerald L. Williams
Represented By: Tammy Albarran
Represented By: Glendon W. Miskel
Represented By: David B. Bayless
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: ALL PARTIES
Represented By: Donald R. Wild
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?