Acacia Media Technologies Corporation v. Comcast Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Acacia Media Technologies Corporation
Defendant: Hospitality Network, Inc., Charter Communications, Inc, DirectV Group, Inc., Echostar Communications Corporation, Central Valley Cable TV,LLC, CoxCom, Inc., Comcast Cable Communications, LLC, Echostar Technologies Corporation and Echostar Satellite LLC
Case Number: 3:2004cv02308
Filed: October 23, 2009
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 25, 2010 158 Opinion or Order of the Court *** THIS ENTRY IS BEING USED TO SPREAD THE COURT'S (450 in 5:05-cv-01114-JW) ORDER IN ALL MEMBER CASES AS LISTED ON 5:05-cv-01114-JW DOCKET *** ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS MOTIONS RE EXCEPTIONAL CASE AND FOR ATTORNEY FEES by Judge James Ware denyin g (428 in 5:05-cv-01114-JW) Motion for Attorney Fees; denying (429 in 5:05-cv-01114-JW) Motion for Attorney Fees; denying 433 in 5:05-cv-01114-JW) Motion for Attorney Fees; denying (439 in 5:05-cv-01114-JW) Motion ; denying (440 in 5:05-cv-01114-JW) Motion for Attorney Fees. The Court DENIES Defendants' Motions Re Exceptional Case and for Attorney Fees. As Judgment has been entered, the Clerk of Court shall close this file and all member cases.(jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2010) Modified text on 5/26/2010 (ecg, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/25/2010). Signed by Judge James Ware on 5/25/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2010)
November 5, 2009 157 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED JUDGMENT re (357 in 5:05-cv-01114-JW) Stipulation filed by ACACIA MEDIA TECHNOLOGIES CORP.. Signed by Judge James Ware on November 5, 2009. (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2009)
October 23, 2009 156 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING BRIEFING FOR MOTIONS FOR ATTORNEY FEES. Signed by Judge James Ware on October 23, 2009. (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2009)
September 25, 2009 153 Opinion or Order of the Court *** THIS ENTRY IS BEING USED TO SPREAD THE COURT'S ORDER IN ALL MEMBER CASES AS LISTED ON 5:05-cv-01114-JW DOCKET *** ORDER by Judge James Ware granting in part and denying in part [291 in 5:05-cv-01114-JW] Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part [292 in 5:05-cv-01114-JW] Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part [in 5:05-cv-01114-JW295] Motion for Joinder; granting in part and denying in part [296 in 5:05-cv-01114-JW] Motion for Joinder; gr anting in part and denying in part [297 in 5:05-cv-01114-JW] Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part [300 in 5:05-cv-01114-JW] Motion for Joinder; granting in part and denying in part [301 in 5:05-cv-01114-JW] Motion for Joi nder; granting in part and denying in part [302 in 5:05-cv-01114-JW] Motion for Joinder; granting in part and denying in part [303 in 5:05-cv-01114-JW] Motion for Joinder On or before 10/9/2009, the parties shall file a joint Proposed Judgment. The Judgment shall include an appropriate disposition for all pending cases.(jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2009) Modified docket text on 9/26/2009 (x2) (ecg, COURT STAFF).
September 30, 2008 152 Opinion or Order of the Court ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE SEE 153 *** ORDER for the Clerk of Court to Administrative Close Cases. The Court orders the Clerk of Court to administratively close the following cases:(1) 04-cv-03789-JW Acacia Media v. Mediacom Communications,(2) 05-cv- 01399-JW Acacia Media v. Mid-Continent Media, Inc., et al.,(3) 05-cv-01543-JW Acacia Media v. Armstrong Group, et al.,(4) 05-cv-01561-JW Acacia Media v. Game Link Inc.,(5) 05-cv-01563-JW Acacia Media v. Cybernet Ventures Inc., et al.,(6) 05-cv-01564- JW Acacia Media v. Global AVS Inc.,(7) 05-cv-01565-JW Acacia Media v. ICS Inc., et al.,(8) 05-cv-01566-JW Acacia Media v. National A-1 Advertising Inc.,(9) 05-cv-01568-JW Acacia Media v. New Destiny Internet Group LLC, et al.,(10) 05-cv-01569-JW Acac ia Media v. Audio Communications Inc.,(11) 05-cv-01570-JW Acacia Media v. VS Media Inc., et al.,(12) 05-cv-01571-JW Acacia Media v. Ademia Multimedia LLC,(13) 05-cv-01572-JW Acacia Media v. International Web Innovations Inc., et al.,(14) 05-cv-01573- JW Acacia Media v. Adult Entertainment Broadcast Network,(15) 05-cv-01574-JW Acacia Media v. Cyber Trend Inc.,(16) 05-cv-01575-JW Acacia Media v. Lightspeedcash,(17) 05-cv-01576-JW Acacia Media v. Innovative Ideas International, et al.,(18) 05-cv-015 98-JW Acacia Media v. Cable America Corp., et al.,(19) 05-cv-01703-JW Acacia Media v. Cebridge Connections,(20) 05-cv-01665-JW In re: Acacia Media Technologies Corp. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/30/2008. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2008) Modified docket text on 9/26/2009 (ecg, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Acacia Media Technologies Corporation v. Comcast Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Acacia Media Technologies Corporation
Represented By: Alan P. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hospitality Network, Inc.
Represented By: Annamarie A. Daley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charter Communications, Inc
Represented By: Jeffrey H. Dean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DirectV Group, Inc.
Represented By: Marsha Ellen Mullin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Echostar Communications Corporation
Represented By: Jason A. Crotty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Valley Cable TV,LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CoxCom, Inc.
Represented By: Annamarie A. Daley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comcast Cable Communications, LLC
Represented By: Jason A. Crotty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Echostar Technologies Corporation
Represented By: Jason A. Crotty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Echostar Satellite LLC
Represented By: Jason A. Crotty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?