Williams v. Ross et al

Case Number: 3:2004cv02409
Filed: June 17, 2004
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Prisoner: Prison Condition Office
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Referring Judge: Nandor J. Vadas
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 30, 2010 176 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2010)
April 13, 2009 170 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER vacating transport orders. re 169 (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2009) Modified on 4/14/2009 (ys, COURT STAFF).
April 7, 2009 166 Opinion or Order of the Court WRIT issued as to Williams. Signed by Judge Illston on 4/6/09. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2009)
April 1, 2009 160 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' REQUEST FOR QUALIFIED IMMUNITY (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2009)
March 27, 2009 159 Opinion or Order of the Court WRIT of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum issued. Signed by Judge Illston on 3/27/09. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2009)
March 25, 2009 157 Opinion or Order of the Court Report of Pro Se Prisoner Early Settlement Proceeding; not settled. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 3/25/09. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2009)
March 10, 2009 155 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Re-Opening Fact Discovery For The Sole Purpose Of Allowing Deposition. Signed by Judge Illston on 3/9/09 re 154 . (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2009)
February 25, 2009 149 Opinion or Order of the Court CORRECTED PRETRIAL ORDER (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2009)
February 24, 2009 148 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER noticing settlement conference at Salinas Valley State Prison for March 24, 2009 at 1:00 p.m.. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 2/24/09. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2009)
December 5, 2008 139 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER continuing case management conference to 2/20/09 (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2008)
November 5, 2008 137 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER continuing cmc to 12/12/08 @ 2:30 p.m.. Signed by Judge Illston on 11/5/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Ross et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?