In re ATM FEE ANTITRUST LITIGATION

Plaintiff: Pamela Brennan, Terry Crayton and Darla Martinez
Defendant: Concord EFS, Inc., First Data Corp., Bank One, N.A., Citibank (West), F.S.B., Suntrust Banks, Inc., Wachovia Corporation, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Servus Financial Corp., Bank of America, N.A., JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. and Citibank, N.A.
Movant: Gilberto Felix and Gino Romano
Case Number: 3:2004cv02676
Filed: February 22, 2010
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1 Antitrust Litigation

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 4, 2011 758 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to withdraw as counsel re 757 Notice filed by Terry Crayton, Pamela Brennan, Darla Martinez, Attorney Daniel O. Myers and Gregg Aaron Myers terminated.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/3/2011. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2011)
November 29, 2010 753 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer Denying 738 Motion to Amend/Correct ; Granting 742 Motion to Dismiss; and Vacating Hearing. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2010)
September 29, 2010 737 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING DOCKET NO. 736. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/29/2010. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2010)
September 23, 2010 736 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 728 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 09/23/10. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2010)
September 16, 2010 733 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 674 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 689 Motion to Compel; denying 690 Motion to Shorten Time; denying 728 Motion to Compel (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2010)
July 29, 2010 684 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 683 Stipulation filed by Terry Crayton, Pamela Brennan, Darla Martinez, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 683 Stipulation. Plaintiff's Answering Brief due by 8/20/2010. Defendant's Reply Brief due by 9/3/2010. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 7/29/2010. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2010)
June 21, 2010 658 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/21/2010. (crblc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2010)
May 12, 2010 652 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on May 12, 2010. (crblc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2010)
February 22, 2010 646 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Continuing hearing currently on calendar re 645 Stipulation filed by Pamela Brennan. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/22/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2010)
October 5, 2009 624 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 623 Stipulation filed by Terry Crayton, Pamela Brennan, Darla Martinez, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 623 Stipulation. Third Amended Complaint due by 10/16/2009. Motions due by 11/13/2009. Responses due by 12/4/2009. Replies due by 12/23/2009. Motion Hearing set for 1/22/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/05/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2009)
April 6, 2009 596 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE re 592 Stipulation filed by Terry Crayton, Pamela Brennan, Darla Martinez, Chase Bank USA, N.A. and JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. terminated.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/3/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2009)
February 23, 2009 581 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER for substitution of counsel re 573 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Citibank (West), F.S.B., Attorney Gregory D. Hull; Peter D. Isakoff; Steven A. Newborn; Carrie M. Anderson and James Christopher Egan, Jr terminated.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/23/009. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2009)
February 20, 2009 571 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 569 Stipulation filed by Bank One, N.A., Set/Reset Deadlines as to 569 Stipulation. Motions due by 4/6/2009.Responses due by 6/5/2009. Replies due by 7/10/2009. Motion Hearing set for 8/28/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/19/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2009)
February 5, 2009 562 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: seal request (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2009)
September 18, 2008 546 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re CMC (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re ATM FEE ANTITRUST LITIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Brennan
Represented By: Daniel Bruce Allanoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Crayton
Represented By: Daniel Bruce Allanoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darla Martinez
Represented By: Daniel Bruce Allanoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Concord EFS, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen R. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Data Corp.
Represented By: Stephen R. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank One, N.A.
Represented By: Benjamin Jonathan Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citibank (West), F.S.B.
Represented By: David F. Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suntrust Banks, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen V. Bomse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wachovia Corporation
Represented By: Kirsten Joy Daru
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Donald I Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Servus Financial Corp.
Represented By: Katie Ya-yee Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Kelly Patrice Finley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Sylvia Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citibank, N.A.
Represented By: David F. Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Gilberto Felix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Gino Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?