Faith Center Church Evengelist Ministries et al v. Glover et al Featured Case

First Amendment claim by religious group who claims that a public library is not allowing it to hold services in the meeting room.

On October 1st, 2007, the Supreme Court denied review of this case.

Plaintiff: Hattie Hopkins and Faith Center Church Evengelist Ministries
Defendant: Gayle B. Uilkema, Millie Greenberg, John M. Gioia, Laura O'Donahue, Federal D. Glover, John Sweeten, Mark DeSaulnier, Patty Chan and Anne Cain
Case Number: 3:2004cv03111
Filed: July 30, 2004
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 8, 2009 121 Costs Taxed in amount of $ 2,689.30 against Defendants. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2009)
September 4, 2009 120 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 119 Stipulation to Extend Time to File Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Non-Taxable Costs. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on September 4, 2009. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2009)
September 4, 2009 119 STIPULATION Requesting Order to Extend Time to File Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Non-Taxable Costs by Faith Center Church Evengelist Ministries, Hattie Hopkins. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Chandler, Timothy) (Filed on 9/4/2009)
August 17, 2009 118 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 117 Stipulation to Extend Time to File Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Non-Taxable Costs. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/17/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2009)
August 14, 2009 117 STIPULATION Requesting Order to Extend Time to File Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Non-Taxable Costs by Faith Center Church Evengelist Ministries, Hattie Hopkins. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Chandler, Timothy) (Filed on 8/14/2009)
July 6, 2009 116 BILL OF COSTS by Faith Center Church Evengelist Ministries, Hattie Hopkins. (Chandler, Timothy) (Filed on 7/6/2009)
June 19, 2009 115 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on June 19, 2009. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2009)
June 19, 2009 114 PERMANENT INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on June 19, 2009. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2009)
June 19, 2009 113 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting in part and denying in part 99 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 104 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2009)
February 17, 2009 112 CLERKS NOTICE VACATING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND BENCH TRIAL DATES. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2009)
January 9, 2009 111 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 1/9/2009 before Judge Jeffrey S. White (Date Filed: 1/9/2009). (Court Reporter 1/9/09.) (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/9/2009)
January 7, 2009 110 NOTICE OF QUESTIONS FOR HEARING. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on January 7, 2009. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2009)
October 27, 2008 Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 1/9/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Pretrial Conference set for 3/16/2009 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Bench Trial set for 4/13/2009 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2008)
October 27, 2008 109 CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing, Pretrial Conference and Bench Trial Dates. Hearing on Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment is continued to 1/9/2009 at 09:00 AM; Pretrial Conference is continued to 3/16/2009 at 02:00 PM; Bench Trial is continued to 4/13/2009 at 8:30 AM. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2008)
October 23, 2008 108 Reply Memorandum re 104 MOTION for Summary Judgment (DEFENDANTS' CROSS-MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT AND IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION) MOTION for Summary Judgment (DEFENDANTS' CROSS-MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT AND IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION) (DEFENDANTS' REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF THEIR CROSS-MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION) filed byFederal D. Glover, Mark DeSaulnier, John M. Gioia, Millie Greenberg, Gayle B. Uilkema, John Sweeten, Anne Cain, Patty Chan, Laura O'Donahue. (Geiger, Thomas) (Filed on 10/23/2008)
October 10, 2008 107 Memorandum in Opposition re 104 MOTION for Summary Judgment (DEFENDANTS' CROSS-MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT AND IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION) MOTION for Summary Judgment (DEFENDANTS' CROSS-MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT AND IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION) Reply Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment and in Opposition to Defendants' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment filed byFaith Center Church Evengelist Ministries, Hattie Hopkins. (Chandler, Timothy) (Filed on 10/10/2008)
September 26, 2008 106 Proposed Order re 104 MOTION for Summary Judgment (DEFENDANTS' CROSS-MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT AND IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION) MOTION for Summary Judgment (DEFENDANTS' CROSS-MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT AND IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION) ([PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' CROSS-MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION) by Federal D. Glover, Mark DeSaulnier, John M. Gioia, Millie Greenberg, Gayle B. Uilkema, John Sweeten, Anne Cain, Patty Chan, Laura O'Donahue. (Geiger, Thomas) (Filed on 9/26/2008)
September 26, 2008 105 Declaration of Anne Cain in Support of 104 MOTION for Summary Judgment (DEFENDANTS' CROSS-MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT AND IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION) MOTION for Summary Judgment (DEFENDANTS' CROSS-MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT AND IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION) (DECLARATION OF ANNE CAIN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' CROSS-MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION) filed byFederal D. Glover, Mark DeSaulnier, John M. Gioia, Millie Greenberg, Gayle B. Uilkema, John Sweeten, Anne Cain, Patty Chan, Laura O'Donahue. (Related document(s) 104 ) (Geiger, Thomas) (Filed on 9/26/2008)
September 26, 2008 104 MOTION for Summary Judgment (DEFENDANTS' CROSS-MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT AND IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION) filed by Federal D. Glover, Mark DeSaulnier, John M. Gioia, Millie Greenberg, Gayle B. Uilkema, John Sweeten, Anne Cain, Patty Chan, Laura O'Donahue. Motion Hearing set for 11/7/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Geiger, Thomas) (Filed on 9/26/2008)
September 9, 2008 103 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 102 Stipulation RE: Briefing Schedule for Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/9/08. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2008)
September 8, 2008 102 STIPULATION on Briefing Schedule for Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment by Faith Center Church Evengelist Ministries, Hattie Hopkins. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Chandler, Timothy) (Filed on 9/8/2008)
September 8, 2008 101 Declaration of Timothy D. Chandler in Support of 99 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byFaith Center Church Evengelist Ministries, Hattie Hopkins. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V, # 23 Exhibit W, # 24 Exhibit X)(Related document(s) 99 ) (Chandler, Timothy) (Filed on 9/8/2008)
September 8, 2008 100 Declaration of Dr. Hattie M. Hopkins in Support of 99 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byFaith Center Church Evengelist Ministries, Hattie Hopkins. (Related document(s) 99 ) (Chandler, Timothy) (Filed on 9/8/2008)
September 8, 2008 99 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Faith Center Church Evengelist Ministries, Hattie Hopkins. Motion Hearing set for 11/7/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Chandler, Timothy) (Filed on 9/8/2008)
August 14, 2008 98 Featured Case ORDER ON 96 Stipulated Request to Extend Time for Parties to File Dispositive Motions. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on August 14, 2008. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2008)
August 13, 2008 97 AFFIDAVIT re 96 Stipulation of Timothy D. Chandler in Support of Stipulatd Request to Extend Time for Parties to File Dispositive Motions by Faith Center Church Evengelist Ministries, Hattie Hopkins. (Chandler, Timothy) (Filed on 8/13/2008)
August 13, 2008 96 STIPULATION to Extend Tim for Parties to File Dispositive Motions by Faith Center Church Evengelist Ministries, Hattie Hopkins. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Chandler, Timothy) (Filed on 8/13/2008)
January 18, 2008 95 Featured Case ORDER ADOPTING 94 Joint Case Management Statement and VACATING Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on January 18, 2008. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2008)
January 18, 2008 94 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Supplemental filed by Faith Center Church Evengelist Ministries, Hattie Hopkins. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Chandler, Timothy) (Filed on 1/18/2008)
November 26, 2007 Set/Reset Deadline/Hearing 93 : Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/18/2008. Case Management Conference set for 1/25/2008 01:30 PM. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2007)
November 26, 2007 93 Featured Case ORDER ON 92 Case Management Statement (Joint), CONTINUING Case Management Conference to January 25, 2008 at 1:30 p.m., further Joint Case Management Statement due on January 18, 2008. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on November 26, 2007. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2007)
November 21, 2007 92 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Faith Center Church Evengelist Ministries, Hattie Hopkins. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Chandler, Timothy) (Filed on 11/21/2007)
November 6, 2007 91 NOTICE of Change of Address by Timothy D Chandler for Benjamin W. Bull and Gary S. McCaleb (Chandler, Timothy) (Filed on 11/6/2007)
October 31, 2007 Set/Reset Hearings: Case Management Conference set for 11/30/2007 01:30 PM. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2007)
October 31, 2007 90 Featured Case ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/31/07. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2007)
October 31, 2007 89 STATUS REPORT Joint by Faith Center Church Evengelist Ministries, Hattie Hopkins. (Chandler, Timothy) (Filed on 10/31/2007)
October 30, 2007 88 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Cynthia Anne Schwerin (Schwerin, Cynthia) (Filed on 10/30/2007)
October 30, 2007 87 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Thomas Lawrence Geiger (Geiger, Thomas) (Filed on 10/30/2007)
August 22, 2007 86 STATUS REPORT Joint, as required by 04/24/07 order [dkt. 82] by Faith Center Church Evengelist Ministries, Hattie Hopkins. (Chandler, Timothy) (Filed on 8/22/2007)
June 14, 2007 85 Appeal Record Returned: (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2007)
May 16, 2007 84 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED REQUEST TO REMOVE CASE FROM COURT ADR PROGRAM. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on May 16, 2007. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2007)
May 16, 2007 83 STIPULATION to Remove Case from Alternative Dispute Resolution Program Pending Appeal by Faith Center Church Evengelist Ministries, Hattie Hopkins. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Chandler, Timothy) (Filed on 5/16/2007)
April 24, 2007 82 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/24/07. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2007)
April 23, 2007 81 STIPULATION to Continue Case Management Conference by Faith Center Church Evengelist Ministries, Hattie Hopkins. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Chandler, Timothy) (Filed on 4/23/2007)
April 12, 2007 Set/Reset Hearings: Case Management Conference set for 5/11/2007 01:30 PM. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2007)
April 12, 2007 80 Featured Case ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/12/07. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2007)
April 11, 2007 79 CLERKS Letter Spreading Mandate to Counsel (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2007)
April 10, 2007 78 USCA JUDGMENT as to 65 Notice of Appeal. On consideration whereof, it is now here ordered and adjudged by this Court, that the judgment of the said District Court in this cause be, and hereby is REVERSED in part, VACATED in part and REMANDED.(hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2007)
October 5, 2006 77 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White GRANTING 76 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Elizabeth A. Murray terminated. (jswlc3, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2006)
October 4, 2006 76 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Elizabeth A. Murray filed by Faith Center Church Evengelist Ministries, Hattie Hopkins. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Murray, Elizabeth) (Filed on 10/4/2006)
August 18, 2006 75 NOTICE of Change of Address by Timothy D Chandler (Chandler, Timothy) (Filed on 8/18/2006)
January 12, 2006 Certified and Transmitted Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2006)
September 2, 2005 74 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Elizabeth A. Murray and Change of Firm Address (Murray, Elizabeth) (Filed on 9/2/2005)
July 14, 2005 73 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 5/13/05 before Judge White. Court Reporter: Joan Columbini.. (far, Court Staff) (Filed on 7/14/2005)
July 1, 2005 72 Featured Case ORDER APPROVING Notice of Withdrawl and Withdrawing Motion 54 and Joint Stipulation to Change the Time for Plaintiffs' Application for Attorneys Fees and Costs by Judge Jeffrey S. White. (jswlc3, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2005)
June 30, 2005 71 STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Change the Time for Plaintiffs' Application for Attorneys' Fees and Costs; Notice of Withdrawal of Motion by Hattie Hopkins. (Murray, Elizabeth) (Filed on 6/30/2005) Modified on 7/1/2005 (rcs, COURT STAFF).
June 23, 2005 USCA Case Number 05-16132 for 65 Notice of Appeal filed by Gayle B. Uilkema, Mark DeSaulnier, John M. Gioia, Federal D. Glover, Millie Greenberg, John Sweeten, Anne Cain, Patty Chan, Laura O'Donahue. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2005)
June 22, 2005 70 TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION by Federal D. Glover, Mark DeSaulnier, John M. Gioia, Millie Greenberg, Anne Cain, Patty Chan, Federal D. Glover, Mark DeSaulnier, John M. Gioia, Millie Greenberg, Anne Cain, Patty Chan for proceedings held on 1/28/05 and 5/13/05 before Judge Jeffrey S. White. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2005)
June 21, 2005 69 CLERK'S NOTICE re: Failure to E-File and/or Failure to Register as an E-Filer (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2005)
June 17, 2005 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re 65 Notice of Appeal. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2005)
June 17, 2005 Copy of Notice of Appeal and Docket sheet mailed to all counsel (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2005)
June 17, 2005 68 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Federal D. Glover, Mark DeSaulnier, John M. Gioia, Millie Greenberg, Gayle B. Uilkema, John Sweeten, Anne Cain, Patty Chan, Laura O'Donahue re 65 Notice of Appeal 66 Notice (Other) (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2005)
June 17, 2005 67 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Federal D. Glover, Mark DeSaulnier, John M. Gioia, Millie Greenberg, Gayle B. Uilkema, John Sweeten, Anne Cain, Patty Chan, Laura O'Donahue re 65 Notice of Appeal 66 Notice (Other) (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2005) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/12/2005 (hdj, COURT STAFF).
June 17, 2005 66 Representation Statement by Federal D. Glover, Mark DeSaulnier, John M. Gioia, Millie Greenberg, Gayle B. Uilkema, John Sweeten, Anne Cain, Patty Chan, Laura O'Donahue. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2005) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/12/2005 (hdj, COURT STAFF).
June 17, 2005 65 Preliminary Injunction Appeal as to 53 Order by Federal D. Glover, Mark DeSaulnier, John M. Gioia, Millie Greenberg, Gayle B. Uilkema, John Sweeten, Anne Cain, Patty Chan, Laura O'Donahue. Filing fee $ 255, receipt number 3373428.(hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2005) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/12/2005 (hdj, COURT STAFF).
June 13, 2005 64 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White GRANTING 63 Second Unopposed Motion to Continue ENE Deadline. (jswlc3, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2005)
June 13, 2005 63 Second MOTION to Continue ENE Deadline filed by Hattie Hopkins. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Second Unopposed Motion to Extend ENE Deadline)(Murray, Elizabeth) (Filed on 6/13/2005)
June 7, 2005 Set/Reset Hearings: ENE Hearing set for 6/22/2005 at 10:00 AM in the evaluator's office. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2005)
June 6, 2005 62 Proposed Order re 54 First MOTION for Attorney Fees and Nontaxable Expenses and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support by Hattie Hopkins. (Murray, Elizabeth) (Filed on 6/6/2005)
June 6, 2005 61 Declaration of Chad A. Adams in Support of 54 First MOTION for Attorney Fees and Nontaxable Expenses and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support filed byHattie Hopkins. (Related document(s) 54 ) (Murray, Elizabeth) (Filed on 6/6/2005)
June 6, 2005 60 Declaration of Danna S. Farney in Support of 54 First MOTION for Attorney Fees and Nontaxable Expenses and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support filed byHattie Hopkins. (Related document(s) 54 ) (Murray, Elizabeth) (Filed on 6/6/2005)
June 6, 2005 59 Declaration of Michele L. Magnaghi in Support of 54 First MOTION for Attorney Fees and Nontaxable Expenses and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support filed byHattie Hopkins. (Related document(s) 54 ) (Murray, Elizabeth) (Filed on 6/6/2005)
June 6, 2005 58 Declaration of Elizabeth A. Murray in Support of 54 First MOTION for Attorney Fees and Nontaxable Expenses and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support filed byHattie Hopkins. (Related document(s) 54 ) (Murray, Elizabeth) (Filed on 6/6/2005)
June 6, 2005 57 Declaration of Joshua W. Carden in Support of 54 First MOTION for Attorney Fees and Nontaxable Expenses and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support filed byHattie Hopkins. (Related document(s) 54 ) (Murray, Elizabeth) (Filed on 6/6/2005)
June 6, 2005 56 Declaration of Terry L. Thompson in Support of 54 First MOTION for Attorney Fees and Nontaxable Expenses and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support filed byHattie Hopkins. (Related document(s) 54 ) (Murray, Elizabeth) (Filed on 6/6/2005)
June 6, 2005 55 Declaration of Gary S. McCaleb in Support of 54 First MOTION for Attorney Fees and Nontaxable Expenses and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support filed byHattie Hopkins. (Related document(s) 54 ) (Murray, Elizabeth) (Filed on 6/6/2005)
June 6, 2005 54 First MOTION for Attorney Fees and Nontaxable Expenses and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support filed by Hattie Hopkins. Motion Hearing set for 7/29/2005 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Itemized Statement of Nontaxable Expenses)(Murray, Elizabeth) (Filed on 6/6/2005)
May 23, 2005 53 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION 21 RE MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on May 23, 2005. (jswlc3, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2005)
May 23, 2005 52 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 21 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on May 23, 2005. (jswlc3, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2005)
May 13, 2005 50 Minute Entry: Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on 5/13/2005 before Judge Jeffrey S. White (Date Filed: 5/13/2005). (Court Reporter Joan Columbini.) (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/13/2005)
May 12, 2005 49 ADDITIONAL QUESTIONS FOR HEARING. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on May 12, 2005. (jswlc3, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2005)
April 29, 2005 48 Brief re 40 Order filed byFederal D. Glover, Mark DeSaulnier, John M. Gioia, Millie Greenberg, Gayle B. Uilkema, John Sweeten, Anne Cain, Patty Chan, Laura O'Donahue. (Related document(s) 40 ) (Flanagan, Kelly) (Filed on 4/29/2005)
April 29, 2005 47 Brief re 40 Order filed byFaith Center Church Evengelist Ministries. (Related document(s) 40 ) (Murray, Elizabeth) (Filed on 4/29/2005)
April 25, 2005 46 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 41 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on April 25, 2005. (jswlc3, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2005)
April 22, 2005 45 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting 43 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Atty. Gary S. McCaleb (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2005)
April 20, 2005 44 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Faith Center Church Evengelist Ministries, Hattie Hopkins re 43 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, Received Document (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2005)
April 20, 2005 Received Document (PROPOSED) Order re 43 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Faith Center Church Evengelist Ministries, Hattie Hopkins. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2005)
April 20, 2005 43 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid-#3371552 filed by Faith Center Church Evengelist Ministries, Hattie Hopkins. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2005)
April 19, 2005 42 Proposed Order re 41 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Joshua W. Carden by Faith Center Church Evengelist Ministries. (Carden, Joshua) (Filed on 4/19/2005)
April 19, 2005 41 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Joshua W. Carden filed by Faith Center Church Evengelist Ministries. (Carden, Joshua) (Filed on 4/19/2005)
April 18, 2005 40 NOTICE OF TENTATIVE RULING AND SETTING OF HEARING. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on April 18, 2005. (jswlc3, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2005)
February 23, 2005 39 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 37 Unopposed Motion to Continue or Extend Deadline for Early Neutral Evaluation. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on February 23, 2005. (jswlc3, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2005)
February 23, 2005 38 Proposed Order re 37 First MOTION to Continue or Extend Deadline for Early Neutral Evaluation by Faith Center Church Evengelist Ministries. (Murray, Elizabeth) (Filed on 2/23/2005)
February 23, 2005 37 First MOTION to Continue or Extend Deadline for Early Neutral Evaluation filed by Faith Center Church Evengelist Ministries. (Murray, Elizabeth) (Filed on 2/23/2005)
January 31, 2005 36 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 1/28/2005 before Judge Jeffrey S. White (Date Filed: 1/31/2005). (Court Reporter Rosita Flores.) (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/31/2005)
January 20, 2005 35 Featured Case ORDER Vacating Hearing Date. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on January 20, 2005. (jswlc3, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2005)
January 20, 2005 34 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Faith Center Church Evengelist Ministries. (Murray, Elizabeth) (Filed on 1/20/2005)
January 14, 2005 33 Declaration of Robert H. Leach in Support of 32 Reply to Opposition filed byFaith Center Church Evengelist Ministries. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-L)(Related document(s) 32 ) (Murray, Elizabeth) (Filed on 1/14/2005)
January 14, 2005 32 Reply to Opposition re 21 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byFaith Center Church Evengelist Ministries. (Murray, Elizabeth) (Filed on 1/14/2005)
January 6, 2005 51 ***Erroneous Docket Entry***. (Related document(s) 30 , 31 ) (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2005) Modified on 5/13/2005 (hdj, COURT STAFF).
January 6, 2005 31 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Affidavit of Danielle Merida) filed byFederal D. Glover, Mark DeSaulnier, John M. Gioia, Millie Greenberg, Gayle B. Uilkema, John Sweeten, Anne Cain, Patty Chan, Laura O'Donahue. (Merida, Danielle) (Filed on 1/6/2005)
January 6, 2005 30 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed byFederal D. Glover, Mark DeSaulnier, John M. Gioia, Millie Greenberg, Gayle B. Uilkema, John Sweeten, Anne Cain, Patty Chan, Laura O'Donahue. (Merida, Danielle) (Filed on 1/6/2005)
January 6, 2005 29 Memorandum in Opposition filed byFederal D. Glover, Mark DeSaulnier, John M. Gioia, Millie Greenberg, Gayle B. Uilkema, John Sweeten, Anne Cain, Patty Chan, Laura O'Donahue. (Merida, Danielle) (Filed on 1/6/2005)
December 27, 2004 Set/Reset Hearings: ENE Hearing set for 3/10/2005 at 09:30 AM at the Evaluator's office. Written statements should be delivered no later than 2/28/2005. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2004)
December 7, 2004 28 ADR Clerks Notice dated 12/7/2005 appointing Harold J. McElhinny as ENE Evaluator. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2004)
November 16, 2004 CASE REFERRED to Early Neutral Evaluation. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2004)
November 16, 2004 27 Featured Case ORDER Approving 26 Stipulation Selecting Early Neutral Evaluation. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on November 16, 2004. (jswlc3, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2004)
November 15, 2004 26 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Early Neutral Evaluation by Federal D. Glover, Mark DeSaulnier, John M. Gioia, Millie Greenberg, Gayle B. Uilkema, John Sweeten, Anne Cain, Patty Chan, Laura O'Donahue, Federal D. Glover, Mark DeSaulnier, John M. Gioia, Millie Greenberg, Gayle B. Uilkema, John Sweeten, Anne Cain, Patty Chan, Laura O'Donahue (Merida, Danielle) (Filed on 11/15/2004)
November 15, 2004 25 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING Initial Case Management Conference to 1/28/2005 09:00 AM. (To be heard immediately following the Motion for Preliminary Injunction.) Case Management Statement due by 1/21/2005. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2004)
November 12, 2004 24 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Early Neutral Evaluation by Anne Cain, Patty Chan, Mark DeSaulnier, John M. Gioia, Federal D. Glover, Millie Greenberg, Laura O'Donahue, John Sweeten, Gayle B. Uilkema (Merida, Danielle) (Filed on 11/12/2004)
October 26, 2004 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Faith Center Church Evengelist Ministries re 21 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, 22 Proposed Order Granting Preliminary Injunction (Carden, Joshua) (Filed on 10/26/2004)
October 26, 2004 22 Proposed Order re 21 Preliminary Injunction by Faith Center Church Evengelist Ministries. (Carden, Joshua) (Filed on 10/26/2004)
October 26, 2004 21 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Faith Center Church Evengelist Ministries. Motion Hearing set for 1/28/2005 09:00 AM. (Carden, Joshua) (Filed on 10/26/2004)
October 6, 2004 20 Featured Case ORDER ON 19 Joint Stipulation to File Amended Verified Complaint. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on October 6, 2004. (jswlc3, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2004)
October 6, 2004 19 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation to File Amended Verified Complaint by Hattie Hopkins. (Carden, Joshua) (Filed on 10/6/2004)
October 6, 2004 18 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Hattie Hopkins. Amended Complaint. (Carden, Joshua) (Filed on 10/6/2004)
September 30, 2004 17 NOTICE by Faith Center Church Evengelist Ministries Proof of Service by Federal Express (Carden, Joshua) (Filed on 9/30/2004)
September 2, 2004 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Faith Center Church Evengelist Ministries, Hattie Hopkins. Patty Chan served on 8/3/2004, answer due 8/23/2004. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2004)
September 2, 2004 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Faith Center Church Evengelist Ministries, Hattie Hopkins. Laura O'Donahue served on 8/2/2004, answer due 8/23/2004. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2004)
September 2, 2004 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Faith Center Church Evengelist Ministries, Hattie Hopkins. Anne Cain, John M. Gioia Federal D. Glover, Gayle B. Uilkema, John Sweeten, Mark Desaulnier and Millie Greenburg Served on 7/30/04 Answer due 8/19/04.
September 2, 2004 13 Featured Case INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 12/10/2004 01:30 PM. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/1/04. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2004)
August 20, 2004 12 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jeffrey S. White for all further proceedings. Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to case. Signed by EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE on 8/19/04. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2004)
August 18, 2004 11 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (drk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2004)
August 18, 2004 10 ANSWER to Complaint by Anne Cain, Patty Chan, Mark DeSaulnier, John M. Gioia, Federal D. Glover, Millie Greenberg, Laura O'Donahue, John Sweeten, Gayle B. Uilkema. (Flanagan, Kelly) (Filed on 8/18/2004)
August 17, 2004 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Faith Center Church Evengelist Ministries re 8 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge (Carden, Joshua) (Filed on 8/17/2004)
August 17, 2004 8 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Faith Center Church Evengelist Ministries. (Carden, Joshua) (Filed on 8/17/2004)
August 13, 2004 7 CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Anne Cain, Patty Chan, Mark DeSaulnier, John M. Gioia, Federal D. Glover, Millie Greenberg, Laura O'Donahue, John Sweeten, Gayle B. Uilkema.. (Flanagan, Kelly) (Filed on 8/13/2004)
August 10, 2004 6 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Laporte granting 3 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(drk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2004)
August 10, 2004 5 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Laporte granting 4 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(drk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2004)
July 30, 2004 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2004)
July 30, 2004 RECEIVED ORDER: [Proposed] Order Granting Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice re 4 Submitted by Plaintiffs Faith Center Church Evengelist Ministries & Hattie Hopkins. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2004)
July 30, 2004 4 APPLICATION of Elizabeth A. Murray for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice [Filing Fee: $60.00, Receipt No. 4409906]. Filed by Plaintiffs Faith Center Church Evengelist Ministries & Hattie Hopkins. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2004)
July 30, 2004 RECEIVED ORDER: [Proposed] Order Granting Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice re 3 Submitted by Plaintiffs Faith Center Church Evengelist Ministries & Hattie Hopkins. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2004)
July 30, 2004 3 APPLICATION of Joshua W. Carden for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice [Filing Fee: $60.00, Receipt No. 4409906]. Filed by Plaintiffs Faith Center Church Evengelist Ministries & Hattie Hopkins. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2004)
July 30, 2004 2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 11/23/2004 & Initial Case Management Conference set for 3:00 p.m. on 11/30/2004. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order).(tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2004)
July 30, 2004 Summons Issued as to Laura O'Donahue. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2004)
July 30, 2004 Summons Issued as to Gayle B. Uilkema. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2004)
July 30, 2004 Summons Issued as to Mark DeSaulnier. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2004)
July 30, 2004 Summons Issued as to Patty Chan. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2004)
July 30, 2004 Summons Issued as to John M. Gioia. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2004)
July 30, 2004 Summons Issued as to Federal D. Glover. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2004)
July 30, 2004 Summons Issued as to Millie Greenberg. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2004)
July 30, 2004 Summons Issued as to Anne Cain. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2004)
July 30, 2004 Summons Issued as to John Sweeten. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2004)
July 30, 2004 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT For Declaratory & Injunctive Relief & Damages - [Summons Issued] against Anne Cain, Patty Chan, Mark DeSaulnier, John M. Gioia, Federal D. Glover, Millie Greenberg, Laura O'Donahue, John Sweeten, And Gayle B. Uilkema, [Filing Fee: $150.00, Receipt Number 4409904]. Filed by Plaintiffs Faith Center Church Evengelist Ministries & Hattie Hopkins. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2004) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/6/2004 (tn, COURT STAFF). Additional attachment(s) added on 8/6/2004 (tn, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Faith Center Church Evengelist Ministries et al v. Glover et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hattie Hopkins
Represented By: Gary Stuart McCaleb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Faith Center Church Evengelist Ministries
Represented By: Gary Stuart McCaleb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gayle B. Uilkema
Represented By: Thomas Lawrence Geiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Millie Greenberg
Represented By: Thomas Lawrence Geiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John M. Gioia
Represented By: Thomas Lawrence Geiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura O'Donahue
Represented By: Thomas Lawrence Geiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal D. Glover
Represented By: Thomas Lawrence Geiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Sweeten
Represented By: Thomas Lawrence Geiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark DeSaulnier
Represented By: Cynthia Anne Schwerin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patty Chan
Represented By: Thomas Lawrence Geiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anne Cain
Represented By: Thomas Lawrence Geiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?