McCollum v. The State of California et al
Plaintiff: Ian Shane Duncan, Donnie Dacus, Kenneth E. Capogreco, Patrick M. McCollum, Scott Forrest Collins, Gregory L. Mourland, Josef Michael Jensen, David Spooner and Kevin Coy Iloff
Defendant: Michael Evans, Sharrell Blakely, R.J. Donovan Correctional Facility at Rock Mountain, Sean Harrigan, California Men's Colony, High Desert State Prison, Ito Neinhuis, P. L. Vasquez, Ron Alvarado, Margo Bach, California Medical Facility, Ironwood State Prison, California Department of Corrections, et al. (Defendants), California Institution for Men, The State of California Youth & Adult Correctional Authority, Maeley Tom, Folsom State Prison, Merrie Koshell, California State Prison at Sacramento, Roderick Q. Hickman, California Correctional Institution, Salinas Valley State Prison, Chaplain Richie, California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, Cal Terhune, Stuart J. Ryan, Robert Ayers, William Elkins, Calipatria State Prison, Octavio Peraza, San Quentin State Prison, Dawn Davison, Lee Ann Chrones, A. K. Scribner, Arnold Ortega, California Institution for Women, Pleasant Valley State Prison, Rosanne Campbell, George Cerelli, Lynn Harrison, The State of California, Valley State Prison for Women, Governor Arnold Schwarzenegger, Correctional Training Facility, California Substance Abuse Treatment Facility and State Prison at Corcoran, California Correctional Center, Martin Veal, K. J. Williams, Wasco State Prison, Derral Adams, Guillermina Hall, Deuel Vocational Institution, T. Felker, Edward S. Alameida, Jr., Barry Smith, California Rehabilitation Center, California State Personnel Board, Madelene A. Muntz, M. E. Poulos, North Kern State Prison, Avenal State Prison, Derrick Ollison, Anthony Kane, Richard Kirkland, Sabrina Johnson, Floyd Shimomura, Jorge Sareli, California State Prison, Los Angeles County, Kathy Mendoza-Powers, J. Salazar, California Correctional Institution at Tehachapi, John Marshall, Mule Creek State Prison, California State Prison, Solano, Mark Shepherd, Corcoran State Prison, Pelican Bay State Prison, Chaplain Stewart, Steve Moore, Scott M. Kernan, Gloria Henry, Thomas L. Carey, Ronald Barnes, Al Bonilla, Jill Brown, Anne Sheehan, William Sullivan, Joel Valenzuela, Robert J. Hernandez, Steven Oronski, California State Prison, Centinela, Matthew Kramer, Office of Community Resources, Sgt. R. Gomez, Tip Kendal, Jeanne Woodford, Chuckawalla Valley State Prison, James A. Yates, California Department of Corrections, Office of Community Resources, Kathleen Prosper and George J. Giurbino
Case Number: 3:2004cv03339
Filed: August 16, 2004
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Charles R Breyer
Referring Judge: Elizabeth D Laporte
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2011 Filing 420 Appeal Record Returned from USCA. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
August 16, 2011 Filing 419 Letter from David Kiernan to 9th Circuit Clerk Regarding Parties Reached an Agreement. (Kiernan, David) (Filed on 8/16/2011)
August 16, 2011 Filing 418 NOTICE by California Department of Corrections, et al. (Defendants) Defendants Notice and Withdrawal of Pending Motion Seeking Costs [Re: ECF Document No. 383] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Irwin, Joshua) (Filed on 8/16/2011)
June 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 417 ORDER of USCA as to #399 Notice of Appeal, filed by Donnie Dacus, Ian Shane Duncan, Kenneth E. Capogreco, Patrick M. McCollum, David Spooner, Gregory L. Mourland, Scott Forrest Collins, Kevin Coy Iloff. Plaintiffs-Appellees' motion for an extension of time to file a Petition for Rehearing and Suggestion for Rehearing en Banc is granted. The petition is now due on 7/15/11. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2011)
June 13, 2011 Filing 416 USCA Opinion as to #399 Notice of Appeal, filed by Donnie Dacus, Ian Shane Duncan, Kenneth E. Capogreco, Patrick M. McCollum, David Spooner, Gregory L. Mourland, Scott Forrest Collins, Kevin Coy Iloff. The decision of the district court is affirmed. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2011)
March 23, 2011 ***Deadlines terminated. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
December 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 415 ORDER of USCA as to #399 Notice of Appeal, filed by Donnie Dacus, Ian Shane Duncan, Kenneth E. Capogreco, Patrick M. McCollum, David Spooner, Gregory L. Mourland, Scott Forrest Collins, Kevin Coy Iloff. The court directs counsel for appellants to provide record citations to evidence by 12/17/10. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2010)
September 22, 2010 Filing 414 RECEIPT OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT from the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals. Re #413 Record transmittal form. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2010)
September 14, 2010 Filing 413 Certified and Transmitted Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #399 Notice of Appeal. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2010)
December 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 412 ORDER GRANTING WITHDRAWAL re #411 Notice (Other) filed by Donnie Dacus, Ian Shane Duncan, Kenneth E. Capogreco, Patrick M. McCollum, David Spooner, Gregory L. Mourland, Scott Forrest Collins, Kevin Coy Iloff. Attorney Sarah Kepner Hamilton terminated. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/29/09. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2009)
December 22, 2009 Filing 411 PROPOSED ORDER re NOTICE by Kenneth E. Capogreco, Scott Forrest Collins, Donnie Dacus, Ian Shane Duncan, Kevin Coy Iloff, Patrick M. McCollum, Gregory L. Mourland, David Spooner Notice of Withdrawal (Kiernan, David) (Filed on 12/22/2009) Modified on 12/23/2009 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
October 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 410 ORDER of USCA as to #399 Notice of Appeal, filed by Donnie Dacus, Ian Shane Duncan, Kenneth E. Capogreco, Patrick M. McCollum, David Spooner, Gregory L. Mourland, Scott Forrest Collins, Kevin Coy Iloff. The appellants' motion for an extension of time to file the opening brief is granted. Opening brief due 11/19/09 ; answering brief due 12/21/09. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2009)
September 16, 2009 Filing 409 Certificate of Record forwarded to USCA. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
August 24, 2009 Filing 408 Transcript of Proceedings held on April 22, 2005, before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Court Reporter/Transcriber Rosita Flores, Telephone number (916) 392-4637. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/19/2009. (djc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2009)
August 10, 2009 Filing 407 Transcript of FTR Proceedings held on 08/30/05, before Judge Elizabeth D. LaPorte. Court Reporter/Transcriber Kelly Bryce, E-mail courtreporter232@aol.com Telephone number (510)828-9404. Tape Number: FTR 10:58-11:15. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/5/2009. (Bryce, Kelly) (Filed on 8/10/2009)
July 30, 2009 Filing 406 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kenneth E. Capogreco, Scott Forrest Collins, Donnie Dacus, Ian Shane Duncan, Kevin Coy Iloff, Josef Michael Jensen, Patrick M. McCollum, Gregory L. Mourland, David Spooner re #405 Transcript Designation and Ordering Form, (Kiernan, David) (Filed on 7/30/2009)
July 30, 2009 Filing 405 Transcript Designation and Ordering Form for proceedings held on (8/30/05, 6/6/07) / (4/22/05, 3/3/06, 7/7/07, 12/14/07, 9/12/08, 12/12/08) before Judge Laporte / Breyer, re #399 Notice of Appeal, Transcript due by 8/31/2009. (Kiernan, David) (Filed on 7/30/2009)
July 14, 2009 Filing 404 USCA Case Number 09-16404 USCA for #399 Notice of Appeal, filed by Donnie Dacus, Ian Shane Duncan, Kenneth E. Capogreco, Patrick M. McCollum, David Spooner, Gregory L. Mourland, Scott Forrest Collins, Kevin Coy Iloff. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
July 7, 2009 Filing 403 Copy of Notice of Appeal and Docket sheet mailed to all counsel. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (mcl, COURT STAFF).
July 7, 2009 Filing 402 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #399 Notice of Appeal. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
July 2, 2009 Filing 401 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kenneth E. Capogreco, Scott Forrest Collins, Donnie Dacus, Ian Shane Duncan, Patrick M. McCollum, Gregory L. Mourland re #399 Notice of Appeal, #400 Civil Appeals Docketing Statement to USCA. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2009)
July 2, 2009 Filing 400 RECEIVED: Civil Appeals Docketing Statement forwarded to 9th Circuit US Court of Appeals by Kenneth E. Capogreco, Scott Forrest Collins, Donnie Dacus, Ian Shane Duncan, Kevin Coy Iloff, Patrick M. McCollum, Gregory L. Mourland, David Spooner re #399 Notice of Appeal. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
July 2, 2009 Filing 399 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #398 Judgment, #397 Order by Kenneth E. Capogreco, Scott Forrest Collins, Donnie Dacus, Ian Shane Duncan, Kevin Coy Iloff, Patrick M. McCollum, Gregory L. Mourland, David Spooner. Filing fee $ 455, Receipt # 34611033952. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2009)
June 3, 2009 Filing 398 JUDGMENT in favor of defendants and against plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/3/2009. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2009) Modified on 6/4/2009 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
June 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 397 ORDER DISMISSING INMATE PLAINTIFFS' THIRD, FOURTH AND FIFTH CLAIMS WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/2/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2009)
June 2, 2009 Filing 396 Letter from DAVID A. CARRILLO DATED JUNE 2, 2009. (Carrillo, David) (Filed on 6/2/2009)
May 27, 2009 Filing 395 Proposed Order re #393 Letter Proposed Judgment by Patrick M. McCollum. (Kiernan, David) (Filed on 5/27/2009)
May 27, 2009 Filing 394 Proposed Order re #393 Letter re Dismissing Inmate Plaintiffs' Third, Fourth, and Fifth Claims with Prejudice by Patrick M. McCollum. (Kiernan, David) (Filed on 5/27/2009)
May 27, 2009 Filing 393 Letter from David Kiernan Re Dismissal of the Inmates' Claims. (Kiernan, David) (Filed on 5/27/2009)
April 21, 2009 Filing 392 Minute Entry: FurtherSettlement Conference held on 4/21/2009 before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Case did not settle. (Court Reporter Not reported.) (klh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/21/2009)
April 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 391 ORDER GRANTING re #390 Letter filed by California Department of Corrections, et al. (Defendants) for Dft CA State Personnel Board client representative to appear on telephone standby at the 4/21/9 settlement conference. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 4/20/09. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2009)
April 16, 2009 Filing 390 Letter from David A. Carrillo to The Honorable Joseph C. Spero dated April 16, 2009. (Carrillo, David) (Filed on 4/16/2009)
March 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 389 ORDER to dismiss re #388 Stipulation filed by Josef Michael Jensen, Josef Michael Jensen terminated.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/30/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2009)
March 27, 2009 Filing 388 STIPULATION to Dismiss Inmate Josef Michael Jensen by Josef Michael Jensen. (Mitchell, Caroline) (Filed on 3/27/2009)
March 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 387 NOTICE AND ORDER SETTING FURTHER SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Further Settlement Conference set for 4/21/2009 at 09:30 AM, 450 Golden Gate Avenue., Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco, CA. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 3/23/09. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2009)
March 13, 2009 Filing 386 AMENDED Minutes #384 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 3/13/2009 before Charles R. Breyer. Pretrial Conference set for 9/10/2009 02:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Status Conference set for 6/26/2009 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Court Reporter - Not Reported.) (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2009)
March 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 385 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Bench Trial set for 9/21/2009 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/13/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2009)
March 13, 2009 Filing 384 *** ERRONEOUS ENTRY *** Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 3/13/2009 before Charles R. Breyer (Date Filed: 3/13/2009). Pretrial Conference set for 9/10/2009 02:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Status Conference set for 6/26/2009 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Court Reporter - Not Reported.) (be, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/13/2009) Modified on 3/16/2009 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
March 6, 2009 Filing 383 Bill of Costs filed by California Department of Corrections, et al. (Defendants). (Irwin, Joshua) (Filed on 3/6/2009) Modified on 3/9/2009 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
March 6, 2009 Filing 382 REQUEST FOR CALENDAR PREFERENCE by California Department of Corrections, et al. (Defendants). (Carrillo, David) (Filed on 3/6/2009) Modified on 3/9/2009 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
March 5, 2009 Filing 381 NOTICE by California Department of Corrections, et al. (Defendants) NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY (Carrillo, David) (Filed on 3/5/2009)
March 5, 2009 Filing 380 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT AND [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by California Department of Corrections, et al. (Defendants). (Carrillo, David) (Filed on 3/5/2009)
February 24, 2009 Filing 379 DOCUMENTS FILED UNDER SEAL by defendant CDCR. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2009)
February 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 378 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #297 Motion for Summary Judgment and setting further CMC for 3/13/2009. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2009)
February 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 377 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #308 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying #309 Motion for Summary Judgment. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2009)
January 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 376 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #331 Motion to Quash. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2009)
December 24, 2008 Filing 375 REPLY to Response to #331 Motion FOR AN ORDER TO QUASH SUBPOENA FOR THE DEPOSITION OF CAL TERHUNE AND FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER filed byCalifornia Department of Corrections, et al. (Defendants). (Irwin, Joshua) (Filed on 12/24/2008) Modified on 12/29/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
December 23, 2008 Filing 374 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation [PROPOSED] ORDER ALLOWING MORE THAN 5 MOTIONS IN LIMINE (Carrillo, David) (Filed on 12/23/2008)
December 23, 2008 Filing 373 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation re #369 REQUEST FOR ORDER ALLOWING MORE THAN 5 MOTIONS IN LIMINE (Carrillo, David) (Filed on 12/23/2008) Modified on 12/24/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
December 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 372 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer vacating trial date pending ruling on summary judgment motions. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2008)
December 22, 2008 Filing 371 Proposed Order Continuing Trial Date And Final Pretrial Conference by Patrick M. McCollum. (Kiernan, David) (Filed on 12/22/2008)
December 22, 2008 Filing 370 MOTION Expedited rulings on motions for summary judgment ; alternatively, Request to Continue Trial And Final Pretrial Conference filed by Patrick M. McCollum. (Kiernan, David) (Filed on 12/22/2008)
December 22, 2008 Filing 369 MOTION REQUESTING FOR ORDER ALLOWING MORE THAN 5 MOTIONS IN LIMINE filed by California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation. Motion Hearing set for 1/20/2009 09:00 AM. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER ALLOWING MORE THAN 5 MOTIONS IN LIMINE)(Carrillo, David) (Filed on 12/22/2008) Modified on 12/23/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
December 19, 2008 Filing 368 Declaration of Patrick McCollum in Support of #366 Memorandum in Opposition filed byPatrick M. McCollum. (Related document(s) #366 ) (Kiernan, David) (Filed on 12/19/2008)
December 19, 2008 Filing 367 Declaration of James Mink in Support of #366 Memorandum in Opposition filed byPatrick M. McCollum. (Related document(s) #366 ) (Kiernan, David) (Filed on 12/19/2008)
December 19, 2008 Filing 366 Memorandum in Opposition re #331 MOTION to Quash SUBPOENA FOR THE DEPOSITION OF CAL TERHUNE AND FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT filed byPatrick M. McCollum. (Kiernan, David) (Filed on 12/19/2008)
December 16, 2008 Filing 365 Minute Entry: Settlement Conference held on 12/16/8 before Judge Joseph C. Spero. Case did not settle. Parties are invited to contact Judge Spero's chambers if they would like a further settlement conference. (Court Reporter Not recorded.) (klh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/16/2008)
December 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 364 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #363 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (June K. Ghezzi) (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2008)
December 15, 2008 Filing 363 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (June K. Ghezzi) ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611026566.) filed by Patrick M. McCollum, Ian Shane Duncan, Josef Michael Jensen, Kenneth E. Capogreco, Donnie Dacus, Scott Forrest Collins, Kevin Coy Iloff, Gregory L. Mourland. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2008)
December 15, 2008 Filing 362 Transcript of Proceedings held on 12/12/08, before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Court Reporter/Transcriber James Yeomans, Telephone number (415) 863-5179. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/12/2009. (jjy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2008)
December 12, 2008 Filing 361 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 12/12/2008 before Charles R. Breyer (Date Filed: 12/12/2008) re #297 MOTION for Summary Judgment OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF COUNTS 7 AND 12 UNDER RULE 56; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES filed by California Department of Corrections, et al. (Defendants), #308 MOTION for Summary Judgment NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF COUNTS 6 AND 9 UNDER RULE 56 BY DEFENDANTS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES filed by California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, #352 MOTION to Strike Defendant's Objections and Motion to Strike Evidence Submitted in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motions for Summary Adjudication filed by California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, California State Personnel Board, #353 MOTION to Strike #324 Declaration in Opposition,, Defendants' Objections and Motion to Strike The Declaration of Nadia Brannon In Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment MOTION to Strike #324 Declaration in Opposition,, Defendants' Objections and Motion to Strike The Declaration of Nadia Brannon In Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment filed by California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, California State Personnel Board, #350 MOTION to Strike #324 Declaration in Opposition,, Defendants Objections and Motion to Strike the Declaration of Sarah Pike in Support of Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendants Motions for Summary Judgment MOTION to Strike #324 Declaration in Opposition,, Defendants Objections and Motion to Strike the Declaration of Sarah Pike in Support of Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendants Motions for Summary Judgment filed by California Department of Corrections, et al. (Defendants), #309 MOTION for Summary Judgment On The Establishment Clause Claims filed by Donnie Dacus, Ian Shane Duncan, Kenneth E. Capogreco, Patrick M. McCollum, David Spooner, Gregory L. Mourland, Scott Forrest Collins, Kevin Coy Iloff, Josef Michael Jensen. (Court Reporter James Yeomans.) (be, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/12/2008)
December 11, 2008 Filing 360 REPLY to Response to Motion re #352 MOTION to Strike Defendant's Objections and Motion to Strike Evidence Submitted in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motions for Summary Adjudication filed byPatrick M. McCollum, Ian Shane Duncan, Josef Michael Jensen, Kenneth E. Capogreco, Donnie Dacus, Scott Forrest Collins, Kevin Coy Iloff, David Spooner, Gregory L. Mourland. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Mitchell, Caroline) (Filed on 12/11/2008)
December 11, 2008 Filing 359 Memorandum in Opposition re #350 MOTION to Strike #324 Declaration in Opposition,, Defendants Objections and Motion to Strike the Declaration of Sarah Pike in Support of Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendants Motions for Summary Judgment MOTION to Strike #324 Declaration in Opposition,, Defendants Objections and Motion to Strike the Declaration of Sarah Pike in Support of Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendants Motions for Summary Judgment filed byPatrick M. McCollum, Ian Shane Duncan, Josef Michael Jensen, Kenneth E. Capogreco, Donnie Dacus, Scott Forrest Collins, Kevin Coy Iloff, David Spooner, Gregory L. Mourland. (Mitchell, Caroline) (Filed on 12/11/2008)
December 11, 2008 Filing 358 Memorandum in Opposition re #353 MOTION to Strike #324 Declaration in Opposition,, Defendants' Objections and Motion to Strike The Declaration of Nadia Brannon In Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment MOTION to Strike #324 Declaration in Opposition,, Defendants' Objections and Motion to Strike The Declaration of Nadia Brannon In Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment filed byPatrick M. McCollum, Ian Shane Duncan, Josef Michael Jensen, Kenneth E. Capogreco, Donnie Dacus, Scott Forrest Collins, Kevin Coy Iloff, David Spooner, Gregory L. Mourland. (Mitchell, Caroline) (Filed on 12/11/2008)
December 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 357 ORDER re motion to strike. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/10/2008. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2008) Modified on 12/15/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
December 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 356 *** ERRONEOUS ENTRY *** ORDER. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/4/2008. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2008) Modified on 12/10/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
December 5, 2008 Filing 355 Reply Memorandum in Support of #309 Motion for Summary Judgment on the Establishment Clause Claims filed byPatrick M. McCollum, Ian Shane Duncan, Josef Michael Jensen, Kenneth E. Capogreco, Donnie Dacus, Scott Forrest Collins, Kevin Coy Iloff, David Spooner, Gregory L. Mourland. (Wallace, Elaine) (Filed on 12/5/2008) Modified on 12/8/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
December 5, 2008 Filing 354 Reply Memorandum ON #308 MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF COUNTS 6 AND 9 UNDER RULE 56 BY DEFENDANTS filed byCalifornia Department of Corrections, et al. (Defendants). (Carrillo, David) (Filed on 12/5/2008) Modified on 12/8/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
December 5, 2008 Filing 353 MOTION to Strike #324 Declaration in Opposition,, Defendants' Objections and Motion to Strike The Declaration of Nadia Brannon In Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment filed by California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, California State Personnel Board. Motion Hearing set for 12/12/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Irwin, Joshua) (Filed on 12/5/2008)
December 5, 2008 Filing 352 MOTION to Strike Defendant's Objections and Motion to Strike Evidence Submitted in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motions for Summary Adjudication filed by California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, California State Personnel Board. Motion Hearing set for 12/12/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Objections to Evidence Attachment A)(Gowe, Michael) (Filed on 12/5/2008)
December 5, 2008 Filing 351 Reply to Opposition Defendant's Reply to Plaintiff's Objections and Opposition to Motion to Strike Evidence Submitted in Support of Defendants' Motions for Summary Adjudication filed byCalifornia Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, California State Personnel Board. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reply to Objections to Evidence Attachment A)(Gowe, Michael) (Filed on 12/5/2008)
December 5, 2008 Filing 350 MOTION to Strike #324 Declaration in Opposition,, Defendants Objections and Motion to Strike the Declaration of Sarah Pike in Support of Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendants Motions for Summary Judgment filed by California Department of Corrections, et al. (Defendants). Motion Hearing set for 12/12/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Irwin, Joshua) (Filed on 12/5/2008)
December 5, 2008 Filing 349 Declaration of BARRY SMITH CORRECTED DECLARATION OF BARRY SMITH SUPPORTING #308 MOTION UNDER RULE 56 (COUNTS 6 AND 9) BY DEFENDANTS filed byCalifornia Department of Corrections, et al. (Defendants). (Carrillo, David) (Filed on 12/5/2008) Modified on 12/8/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
December 5, 2008 Filing 348 Reply Memorandum IN SUPPORT OF #297 DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF COUNTS 7 AND 12 UNDER RULE 56 filed byCalifornia Department of Corrections, et al. (Defendants). (Chen, Bonnie) (Filed on 12/5/2008) Modified on 12/8/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
December 5, 2008 Filing 347 Declaration of Joshua C. Irwin in Support of #308 Defendants Motion for Summary Adjudication of Counts 6 and 9 Under Rule 56 filed byCalifornia Department of Corrections, et al. (Defendants). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Irwin, Joshua) (Filed on 12/5/2008) Modified on 12/8/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
December 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 346 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting in part and denying in part Motion to Compel. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2008)
December 3, 2008 Filing 345 Proposed Order re #341 Memorandum in Opposition Granting Motion For Leave To File Opposition Papers and Corrected Opposition Papers by Patrick M. McCollum. (Kiernan, David) (Filed on 12/3/2008)
December 3, 2008 Filing 344 Proposed Order re #340 MOTION to Strike OBJECTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE UNTIMELY-FILED PAPERS AND RE-FILED PAPERS; REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE Denying Objection and Motion To Strike by Patrick M. McCollum. (Kiernan, David) (Filed on 12/3/2008)
December 3, 2008 Filing 343 Declaration of Derral G. Adams in Support of #314 Memorandum in Opposition, DECLARATION OF DERRAL G. ADAMS IN SUPPORT OF ASSERTION OF DELIBERATIVE PROCESS PRIVILEGE filed byCalifornia Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, California State Personnel Board. (Related document(s) #314 ) (Gowe, Michael) (Filed on 12/3/2008)
December 3, 2008 Filing 342 Declaration of David C. Kiernan in Support of #341 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Strike; Alternatively, Motion For Leave To File Opposition Papers filed byPatrick M. McCollum. (Related document(s) #341 ) (Kiernan, David) (Filed on 12/3/2008)
December 3, 2008 Filing 341 Memorandum in Opposition re #340 MOTION to Strike OBJECTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE UNTIMELY-FILED PAPERS AND RE-FILED PAPERS; REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE filed byPatrick M. McCollum. (Kiernan, David) (Filed on 12/3/2008)
November 25, 2008 Filing 340 MOTION to Strike OBJECTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE UNTIMELY-FILED PAPERS AND RE-FILED PAPERS; REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE filed by California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, California State Personnel Board. Motion Hearing set for 12/12/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Carrillo, David) (Filed on 11/25/2008)
November 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 339 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER. Settlement Conference set for 12/16/2008 at 09:30 AM. Confidential settlement conference statements shall be lodged with chambers 7 days prior to the conference. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 11/25/8. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2008)
November 24, 2008 Filing 338 Declaration of DAVID KIERNAN in Support of #334 Errata, [CORRECTED] DECLARATION OF DAVID KIERNAN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITIONS TO THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF COUNTS 6 & 9 AND TO THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF COUNTS 7 AND 12 filed byPatrick M. McCollum. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-17, #2 Exhibit 18-20, #3 Exhibit 21-22, #4 Exhibit 23-26, #5 Exhibit 27-28, #6 Exhibit 29-35, #7 Exhibit 36-43, #8 Exhibit 44-46, #9 Exhibit 47-50, #10 Exhibit 51-53)(Related document(s) #334 ) (Kiernan, David) (Filed on 11/24/2008)
November 24, 2008 Filing 337 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #334 Errata, [CORRECTED] PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF COUNTS 7 AND 12 UNDER RULE 56 filed byPatrick M. McCollum. (Related document(s) #334 ) (Kiernan, David) (Filed on 11/24/2008)
November 24, 2008 Filing 336 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #334 Errata, [CORRECTED] PLAINTIFF McCOLLUM'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION ON COUNTS 6 AND 9 filed byPatrick M. McCollum. (Related document(s) #334 ) (Kiernan, David) (Filed on 11/24/2008)
November 24, 2008 Filing 335 Request for Judicial Notice re #334 Errata, [CORRECTED] PLAINTIFF McCOLLUM'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION ON COUNTS 6 AND 9; [CORRECTED] DECLARATION OF JAMES MINK filed byPatrick M. McCollum. (Related document(s) #334 ) (Kiernan, David) (Filed on 11/24/2008)
November 24, 2008 Filing 334 ERRATA re #329 Proposed Order, #326 Exhibits, #328 Proposed Order, #324 Declaration in Opposition,, #325 Memorandum in Opposition, #327 Memorandum in Opposition, #322 Memorandum in Opposition, #323 Request for Judicial Notice, NOTICE OF ERRATA AND CORRECTED FILINGS by Patrick M. McCollum. (Kiernan, David) (Filed on 11/24/2008)
November 24, 2008 Filing 333 Declaration of ALAN SOBEL IN SUPPORT OF #331 MOTION FOR AN ORDER TO QUASH SUBPOENA FOR THE DEPOSITION OF CAL TERHUNE AND FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER filed byCalifornia Department of Corrections, et al. (Defendants). (Chen, Bonnie) (Filed on 11/24/2008) Modified on 11/26/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
November 24, 2008 Filing 332 Declaration of BONNIE J. CHEN IN SUPPORT OF #331 MOTION FOR AN ORDER TO QUASH SUBPOENA FOR THE DEPOSITION OF CAL TERHUNE AND FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER filed byCalifornia Department of Corrections, et al. (Defendants). (Chen, Bonnie) (Filed on 11/24/2008) Modified on 11/26/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
November 24, 2008 Filing 331 MOTION to Quash SUBPOENA FOR THE DEPOSITION OF CAL TERHUNE AND FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT filed by California Department of Corrections, et al. (Defendants). Motion Hearing set for 1/9/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Chen, Bonnie) (Filed on 11/24/2008)
November 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 330 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero for Settlement. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/24/08. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2008)
November 22, 2008 Filing 329 Proposed Order re #297 Motion[Proposed] Order Denying Defendants' Motion For Summary Judgment, Or In The Alternative, Summary Adjudication On Counts 7 And 12 by Patrick M. McCollum. (Mitchell, Caroline) (Filed on 11/22/2008) Modified on 11/25/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
November 22, 2008 Filing 328 Proposed Order re #308 Motion[Proposed] Order Denying Defendants' Motion For Summary Adjudication on Counts 6 And 9 by Patrick M. McCollum. (Mitchell, Caroline) (Filed on 11/22/2008) Modified on 11/25/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
November 22, 2008 Filing 327 Memorandum in Opposition Plaintiff's Opposition To #297 Motion For Summary Judgment, Or In The Alternative, Summary Adjudication Of Counts 7 And 12 Under Rule 56 filed byPatrick M. McCollum. (Mitchell, Caroline) (Filed on 11/22/2008) Modified on 11/25/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
November 22, 2008 Filing 326 EXHIBITS re #325 Memorandum in Opposition, Attachments To Plaintiff McCollum's Objections And Motion To Strike Evidence Submitted In Support Of Defendants' Motions For Summary Adjudication filed byPatrick M. McCollum. (Related document(s) #325 ) (Mitchell, Caroline) (Filed on 11/22/2008)
November 22, 2008 Filing 325 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #297 motion, #308 motionPlaintiff McCollum's Objections And Motion To Strike Evidence Submitted In Support Of Defendants' Motions For Summary Adjudication filed byPatrick M. McCollum. (Related document(s) #322 ) (Mitchell, Caroline) (Filed on 11/22/2008) Modified on 11/25/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
November 22, 2008 Filing 324 DECLARATION of David Kiernan in support of #322 Memorandum in Opposition Declaration Of David Kiernan In Support Of Plaintiff's Oppositions To The Motion For Summary Adjudication Of Counts 6 & 9 and To The Motion For Summary judgment, Or In The Altnernative, Summary Adjudication Of County 7 And 12 filed byPatrick M. McCollum. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 17, #2 Exhibit 18 - 20, #3 Exhibit 21 - 22, #4 Exhibit 23 - 26, #5 Exhibit 27 - 28, #6 Exhibit 29-35, #7 Exhibit 36-43, #8 Exhibit 44-46, #9 Exhibit 47-50)(Related document(s) #322 ) (Mitchell, Caroline) (Filed on 11/22/2008) Modified on 11/25/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
November 22, 2008 Filing 323 Request for Judicial Notice re #322 Memorandum in Opposition Plaintiff McCollum's Request For Judicial Notice In Support Of Opposition To Defendants' Motion For Summary Adjudication On Counts 6 And 9; Declaration Of James Mink filed byPatrick M. McCollum. (Related document(s) #322 ) (Mitchell, Caroline) (Filed on 11/22/2008)
November 21, 2008 Filing 322 Memorandum in Opposition Plaintiff McCollum's Opposition To #308 Defendants' Motion For Summary Adjudication On Counts 6 And 9 filed byPatrick M. McCollum. (Mitchell, Caroline) (Filed on 11/21/2008) Modified on 11/25/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
November 21, 2008 Filing 321 DECLARATION of Michael Scott in support of #320 Response in Support Declaration of Michael Scott In Support Of Reply In Support Of Motion To Compel filed byPatrick M. McCollum. (Related document(s) #320 ) (Scott, Michael) (Filed on 11/21/2008) Modified on 11/25/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
November 21, 2008 Filing 320 RESPONSE in Support Plaintiff's Reply In Support Of #268 Motion To Compel filed byPatrick M. McCollum. (Scott, Michael) (Filed on 11/21/2008) Modified on 11/25/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
November 21, 2008 Filing 319 MEMORANDUM in Opposition To #309 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment on Counts 6 and 9 filed byCalifornia Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation. (Carrillo, David) (Filed on 11/21/2008) Modified on 11/25/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
November 21, 2008 Filing 318 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Tedder Scott (Scott, Michael) (Filed on 11/21/2008)
November 21, 2008 Filing 317 Declaration of DECLARATION OF DAVID C. KIERNAN IN SUPPORT OF #316 PLAINTIFF MCCOLLUMS MOTION TO REFER THIS ACTION TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOSEPH C. SPERO FOR A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE in Support of #316 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF UNOPPOSED MOTION, UNOPPOSED MOTION, AND [PROPOSED] ORDER REFERRING THIS ACTION TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOSEPH C. SPERO FOR A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE filed byPatrick M. McCollum. (Related document(s) #316 ) (Kiernan, David) (Filed on 11/21/2008) Modified on 11/25/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
November 21, 2008 Filing 316 NOTICE by Patrick M. McCollum PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF UNOPPOSED MOTION, UNOPPOSED MOTION, AND [PROPOSED] ORDER REFERRING THIS ACTION TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOSEPH C. SPERO FOR A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kiernan, David) (Filed on 11/21/2008)
November 14, 2008 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #297 MOTION for Summary Judgment OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF COUNTS 7 AND 12 UNDER RULE 56; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES. Motion Hearing set for 12/12/2008 10:00 AM. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
November 14, 2008 Filing 315 NOTICE by California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, California State Personnel Board Amended #297 Notice of Motion for Summary Judgment, Or In The Alternative, Summary Adjudication of Counts 7 and 12 under Rule 56 (Chen, Bonnie) (Filed on 11/14/2008) Modified on 11/17/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
November 14, 2008 Filing 314 Memorandum in Opposition DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO #268 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION AND TO PROVIDE COMPLETE RESPONSE TO INTERROGATORIES filed byCalifornia Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, California State Personnel Board. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Gowe, Michael) (Filed on 11/14/2008) Modified on 11/17/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
November 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 313 ORDER extending time to file summary judgment reply briefs re #312 Stipulation filed by Patrick M. McCollum. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/14/08. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2008)
November 12, 2008 Filing 312 STIPULATION Extending Time To File Summary Judgment Reply Briefs by Patrick M. McCollum. (Kiernan, David) (Filed on 11/12/2008)
November 10, 2008 Filing 311 NOTICE by Patrick M. McCollum Of Unavailability (Kiernan, David) (Filed on 11/10/2008)
November 7, 2008 Filing 310 Declaration of Elaine Wallace in Support of #309 MOTION for Summary Judgment On The Establishment Clause Claims filed byPatrick M. McCollum, Ian Shane Duncan, Josef Michael Jensen, Kenneth E. Capogreco, Donnie Dacus, Scott Forrest Collins, Kevin Coy Iloff, David Spooner, Gregory L. Mourland. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-6, #2 Exhibit 7-13)(Related document(s) #309 ) (Wallace, Elaine) (Filed on 11/7/2008)
November 7, 2008 Filing 309 MOTION for Summary Judgment On The Establishment Clause Claims filed by Patrick M. McCollum, Ian Shane Duncan, Josef Michael Jensen, Kenneth E. Capogreco, Donnie Dacus, Scott Forrest Collins, Kevin Coy Iloff, David Spooner, Gregory L. Mourland. Motion Hearing set for 12/12/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wallace, Elaine) (Filed on 11/7/2008)
November 7, 2008 Filing 308 MOTION for Summary Judgment NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF COUNTS 6 AND 9 UNDER RULE 56 BY DEFENDANTS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES filed by California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation. Motion Hearing set for 12/12/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Carrillo, David) (Filed on 11/7/2008)
November 7, 2008 Filing 307 Declaration of LINDA BARNETT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION UNDER RULE 56 filed byCalifornia Department of Corrections, et al. (Defendants). (Chen, Bonnie) (Filed on 11/7/2008)
November 7, 2008 Filing 306 Proposed Order GRANTING SUMMARY JUDGMENT by California Department of Corrections, et al. (Defendants). (Chen, Bonnie) (Filed on 11/7/2008)
November 7, 2008 Filing 305 Declaration of SABRINA JOHNSON IN SUPPORT OF MOTION UNDER RULE 56 filed byCalifornia Department of Corrections, et al. (Defendants). (Chen, Bonnie) (Filed on 11/7/2008)
November 7, 2008 Filing 304 Declaration of RAFAEL FLORES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION UNDER RULE 56 filed byCalifornia Department of Corrections, et al. (Defendants). (Chen, Bonnie) (Filed on 11/7/2008)
November 7, 2008 Filing 303 Declaration of MARCIA CONTRERAS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION UNDER RULE 56 filed byCalifornia Department of Corrections, et al. (Defendants). (Chen, Bonnie) (Filed on 11/7/2008)
November 7, 2008 Filing 302 Declaration of LAURA BOWMAN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION UNDER RULE 56 filed byCalifornia Department of Corrections, et al. (Defendants). (Chen, Bonnie) (Filed on 11/7/2008)
November 7, 2008 Filing 301 Declaration of GABRIEL VELA IN SUPPORT OF MOTION UNDER RULE 56 filed byCalifornia Department of Corrections, et al. (Defendants). (Chen, Bonnie) (Filed on 11/7/2008)
November 7, 2008 Filing 300 Declaration of BARRY SMITH IN SUPPORT OF MOTION UNDER RULE 56 filed byCalifornia Department of Corrections, et al. (Defendants). (Chen, Bonnie) (Filed on 11/7/2008)
November 7, 2008 Filing 299 Declaration of BONNIE J. CHEN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION UNDER RULE 56 filed byCalifornia Department of Corrections, et al. (Defendants). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Part 1, #2 Exhibit A, Part 2, #3 Exhibit A, Part 3, #4 Exhibit A, Part 4, #5 Exhibit A, Part 5, #6 Exhibit A, Part 6, #7 Exhibit B, #8 Exhibit C, #9 Exhibit D, #10 Exhibit E, #11 Exhibit F, #12 Exhibit G, #13 Exhibit H)(Chen, Bonnie) (Filed on 11/7/2008)
November 7, 2008 Filing 298 EXHIBITS re #296 Supporting Motion Under Rule 56 filed byCalifornia Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-7, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #3 Exhibit 9-11, #4 Exhibit 12-14, #5 Exhibit 15-17, #6 Exhibit 18-21, #7 Exhibit Exh. 22-23, #8 Exhibit Exh. 24-25, #9 Exhibit Exh. 26, #10 Exhibit Exh. 27, part 1, #11 Exhibit Exh. 27, part b, #12 Exhibit Exh. 28, #13 Exhibit Exh. 29, #14 Exhibit Exh. 30-31, #15 Exhibit Exh. 32-33, #16 Exhibit Exh. 34, #17 Exhibit Exh. 35, #18 Exhibit Exh. 36, #19 Exhibit Exh. 37, #20 Exhibit Exh. 38, #21 Exhibit Exh. 39, #22 Exhibit Exh. 40, #23 Exhibit Exh. 41, #24 Exhibit Exh. 42, #25 Exhibit Exh. 43, #26 Exhibit Exh. 44, #27 Exhibit Exh. 45)(Carrillo, David) (Filed on 11/7/2008) Modified on 11/10/2008 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
November 7, 2008 Filing 297 MOTION for Summary Judgment OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF COUNTS 7 AND 12 UNDER RULE 56; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES filed by California Department of Corrections, et al. (Defendants). Motion Hearing set for 11/14/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Chen, Bonnie) (Filed on 11/7/2008)
November 7, 2008 Filing 296 EXHIBITS Supporting Motion Under Rule 56 (Counts 6 & 9) filed byCalifornia Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation. (Carrillo, David) (Filed on 11/7/2008)
November 7, 2008 Filing 295 Proposed Order Granting Motion Under Rule 56 (Counts 6 & 9) by California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation. (Carrillo, David) (Filed on 11/7/2008)
November 7, 2008 Filing 294 Declaration of David Carrillo Supporting Motion Under Rule 56 (Counts 6 & 9) filed byCalifornia Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation. (Carrillo, David) (Filed on 11/7/2008)
November 7, 2008 Filing 293 Declaration of Fiel Tigno Supporting Motion Under Rule 56 (Counts 6 & 9) filed byCalifornia Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation. (Carrillo, David) (Filed on 11/7/2008)
November 7, 2008 Filing 292 Declaration of Carol Ong Supporting Rule 56 Motion (Counts 6 & 9) filed byCalifornia Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation. (Carrillo, David) (Filed on 11/7/2008)
November 7, 2008 Filing 291 Declaration of Tip Kindel Supporting Motion Under Rule 56 (Counts 6 & 9) filed byCalifornia Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation. (Carrillo, David) (Filed on 11/7/2008)
November 7, 2008 Filing 290 Declaration of Sandi Sale Supporting Motion for Summary Adjudication of (Counts 6 & 9) Under Rule 56 filed byCalifornia Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation. (Carrillo, David) (Filed on 11/7/2008)
November 7, 2008 Filing 289 Declaration of Claude Muncey Supporting Motion Under Rule 56 by Defendants filed byCalifornia Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation. (Carrillo, David) (Filed on 11/7/2008)
November 7, 2008 Filing 288 Declaration of Native American Spiritual Leader John Funmaker In Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Adjudication as to Plaintiff McCollum's Establishment Clause Claims Under the Federal and State Constitutions filed byCalifornia Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation. (Carrillo, David) (Filed on 11/7/2008)
November 7, 2008 Filing 287 Declaration of Muslim Chaplain Kamal Abdul-Jabbaar In Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Adjudication as to Plaintiff McCollum's Establishment Clause Claims Under the Federal and State Constitutions filed byCalifornia Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation. (Carrillo, David) (Filed on 11/7/2008)
November 7, 2008 Filing 286 Declaration of Rabbi Lon Alan Moskowitz In Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Adjudication as to Plaintiff McCollum's Establishment Clause Claims Under the Federal and State Constitutions filed byCalifornia Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation. (Carrillo, David) (Filed on 11/7/2008)
November 7, 2008 Filing 285 Declaration of Protestant Chaplain Robert Nicholas Ristad Jr. In Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Adjudication as to Plaintiff McCollum's Establishment Clause Claims Under the Federal and State Constitutions filed byCalifornia Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation. (Carrillo, David) (Filed on 11/7/2008)
November 7, 2008 Filing 284 Declaration of Volunteer Protestant Chaplain Timothy R. May In Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Adjudication as to Plaintiff McCollum's Espablishment Clause Claims Under the Federal and State Constitutions filed byCalifornia Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation. (Carrillo, David) (Filed on 11/7/2008)
November 7, 2008 Filing 283 Declaration of James Flynn Supporting Motion Under Rule 56 (Counts 6 &9) filed byCalifornia Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation. (Carrillo, David) (Filed on 11/7/2008)
November 7, 2008 Filing 282 Declaration of Barry Smith Supporting Motion Under Rule 56 (Counts 6 & 9) filed byCalifornia Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation. (Carrillo, David) (Filed on 11/7/2008)
November 7, 2008 Filing 281 Declaration of Jennifer Nolan Supporting Motion Under Rule 56 (Counts 6 & 9) filed byCalifornia Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation. (Carrillo, David) (Filed on 11/7/2008)
November 7, 2008 Filing 280 Request for Judicial Notice Supporting Motion Under Rule 56 (Counts 6 & 9) filed byCalifornia Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation. (Carrillo, David) (Filed on 11/7/2008)
November 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 279 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying #271 Motion to enlarge time (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2008)
November 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 278 ORDER to Dismiss Certain Individual Capacity Defendants re #274 Stipulation filed by California Department of Corrections, et al. (Defendants). Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/31/08. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2008)
October 28, 2008 Filing 277 Transcript of Proceedings held on 9-12-08, before Judge Charles Breyer. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Wyatt, Telephone number 925-212-5224. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/23/2009. (kpw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2008)
October 28, 2008 Filing 276 Declaration of DAVID C. KIERNAN in Support of #275 Memorandum in Opposition, filed byPatrick M. McCollum. (Related document(s) #275 ) (Kiernan, David) (Filed on 10/28/2008)
October 28, 2008 Filing 275 Memorandum in Opposition re #271 MOTION Enlarge time regarding expert testimony disclosure Defendant CDCR'S Notice of Motion and Motion to Enlarge Time Regarding Expert Testimony Disclosure PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT CDCRS MOTION TO ENLARGE TIME filed byPatrick M. McCollum. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kiernan, David) (Filed on 10/28/2008)
October 28, 2008 Filing 274 STIPULATION TO DISMISS CERTAIN INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY DEFENDANTS by California Department of Corrections, et al. (Defendants). (Carrillo, David) (Filed on 10/28/2008)
October 27, 2008 Filing 273 Proposed Order Granting #271 Defendant CDCR'S Motioni to Enlarge Time Regarding Expert Testimony Disclosure by California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, California State Personnel Board. (Carrillo, David) (Filed on 10/27/2008) Modified on 10/28/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
October 27, 2008 Filing 272 Declaration of Michael D. Gowe in Support of #271 Defendant CDCR's Motion to Enlarge Time Regarding Expert Testimony Disclosure filed byCalifornia Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, California State Personnel Board. (Carrillo, David) (Filed on 10/27/2008) Modified on 10/28/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
October 27, 2008 Filing 271 MOTION Enlarge time regarding expert testimony disclosure Defendant CDCR'S Notice of Motion and Motion to Enlarge Time Regarding Expert Testimony Disclosure filed by California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation, California State Personnel Board. Motion Hearing set for 10/31/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Carrillo, David) (Filed on 10/27/2008)
October 21, 2008 Filing 270 Plaintiff's Re-Notice of #268 Motion to Compel filed by Patrick M. McCollum. Motion Hearing set for 12/5/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Kiernan, David) (Filed on 10/21/2008) Modified on 10/22/2008 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
October 15, 2008 Filing 269 Declaration of David C. Kiernan in Support of #268 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and to Provide Complete Response to Interrogatories filed byPatrick M. McCollum, Ian Shane Duncan, Josef Michael Jensen, Kenneth E. Capogreco, Donnie Dacus, Scott Forrest Collins, Kevin Coy Iloff, David Spooner, Gregory L. Mourland. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12)(Related document(s) #268 ) (Kiernan, David) (Filed on 10/15/2008)
October 15, 2008 Filing 268 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and to Provide Complete Response to Interrogatories filed by Patrick M. McCollum, Ian Shane Duncan, Josef Michael Jensen, Kenneth E. Capogreco, Donnie Dacus, Scott Forrest Collins, Kevin Coy Iloff, David Spooner, Gregory L. Mourland. Motion Hearing set for 11/21/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)(Kiernan, David) (Filed on 10/15/2008) Modified on 11/25/2008 (wv, COURT STAFF).
September 12, 2008 Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 12/12/2008 10:00 AM. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
September 12, 2008 Filing 267 2nd AMENDED MINUTES #264 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 9/12/2008 before Charles R. Breyer (Date Filed: 9/12/2008) re 261 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY DEADLINE AND REQUEST FOR HEARING filed by Patrick M. McCollum, ***Motions terminated: 261 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY DEADLINE AND REQUEST FOR HEARING filed by Patrick M. McCollum. Motion for Summary Judgment Hearing set for 12/12/2008 10:00 AM. Pretrial Conference set for 1/20/2009 02:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Court Reporter Kathy Wyatt.)The case management conference set for 10/03/08 is vacated. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2008)
September 12, 2008 Filing 266 AMENDED MINUTES to #264 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 9/12/2008 before Charles R. Breyer (Date Filed: 9/12/2008) re 261 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY DEADLINE AND REQUEST FOR HEARING filed by Patrick M. McCollum, ***Motions terminated: 261 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY DEADLINE AND REQUEST FOR HEARING filed by Patrick M. McCollum.. Motion for Summary Judgment Hearing set for 11/14/2008 10:00 AM. Pretrial Conference set for 1/20/2009 02:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Court Reporter Kathy Wyatt.)The case management conference set for 10/03/08 is vacated. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2008)
September 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 265 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Jury Trial set for 2/2/2009 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/12/08. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2008)
September 12, 2008 Filing 264 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 9/12/2008 before Charles R. Breyer (Date Filed: 9/12/2008) re #261 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY DEADLINE AND REQUEST FOR HEARING filed by Patrick M. McCollum, ***Motions terminated: #261 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY DEADLINE AND REQUEST FOR HEARING filed by Patrick M. McCollum.. Motion for Summary Judgment Hearing set for 11/12/2008 10:00 AM. Pretrial Conference set for 1/20/2009 02:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Court Reporter Kathy Wyatt.)The case management conference set for 10/03/08 is vacated. (be, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/12/2008)
September 9, 2008 Filing 263 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Patrick M. McCollum re #261 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY DEADLINE AND REQUEST FOR HEARING, #262 Proposed Order, PROOF OF SERVICE (Kiernan, David) (Filed on 9/9/2008)
September 9, 2008 Filing 262 Proposed Order re #261 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY DEADLINE AND REQUEST FOR HEARING [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY DEADLINE by Patrick M. McCollum. (Kiernan, David) (Filed on 9/9/2008)
September 9, 2008 Filing 261 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY DEADLINE AND REQUEST FOR HEARING filed by Patrick M. McCollum. Motion Hearing set for 9/12/2008 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Kiernan, David) (Filed on 9/9/2008)
September 8, 2008 Filing 260 NOTICE of Appearance by David Craig Kiernan Notice of Appearance (Kiernan, David) (Filed on 9/8/2008)
July 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 259 ORDER DENYING EXTENSION re #258 Stipulation filed by Patrick M. McCollum. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 7/31/08. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2008)
July 29, 2008 Filing 258 STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Extend Discovery Cut-Off Date and [PROPOSED] Order Granting Extension by Patrick M. McCollum. (Kiernan, David) (Filed on 7/29/2008)
July 29, 2008 Filing 257 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Substitution of Counsel filed by California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation. (Irwin, Joshua) (Filed on 7/29/2008)
January 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 256 ORDER re #253 MOTION Plaintiffs' Administrative Request to Amend January 8, 2008 Order re #251 Order MOTION Plaintiffs' Administrative Request to Amend January 8, 2008 Order. Motions terminated: #253 MOTION Plaintiffs' Administrative Request to Amend January 8, 2008 Order. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/31/08. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2008)
January 31, 2008 Filing 255 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Elaine Wallace Notice of Change of Counsel (Wallace, Elaine) (Filed on 1/31/2008)
January 29, 2008 Filing 254 STIPULATION re #253 MOTION Plaintiffs' Administrative Request to Amend January 8, 2008 Order re #251 Order MOTION Plaintiffs' Administrative Request to Amend January 8, 2008 Order re #251 Order by Patrick M. McCollum, Ian Shane Duncan, Josef Michael Jensen, Kenneth E. Capogreco, Donnie Dacus, Scott Forrest Collins, Kevin Coy Iloff, David Spooner, Gregory L. Mourland. (Wallace, Elaine) (Filed on 1/29/2008)
January 29, 2008 Filing 253 MOTION Plaintiffs' Administrative Request to Amend January 8, 2008 Order re #251 Order filed by Patrick M. McCollum, Ian Shane Duncan, Josef Michael Jensen, Kenneth E. Capogreco, Donnie Dacus, Scott Forrest Collins, Kevin Coy Iloff, David Spooner, Gregory L. Mourland. (Wallace, Elaine) (Filed on 1/29/2008)
January 11, 2008 Filing 252 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 12/14/07 before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Court Reporter: Joan Marie Columbini. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2008)
January 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 251 ORDER re: statute of limitations. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/8/2008. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2008)
January 7, 2008 Filing 250 Letter from Elaine Wallace to the Honorable Charles R. Breyer. (Wallace, Elaine) (Filed on 1/7/2008)
December 14, 2007 Filing 249 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 12/14/2007 before Charles R. Breyer (Date Filed: 12/14/2007). Further Case Management Conference set for 10/3/2008 08:30 AM. Discovery due by 10/3/2008. CRB to hold discovery issues (Court Reporter Joan Columbini.) (fj, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/14/2007)
December 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting in part and denying in part #232 Motion to Dismiss (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2007)
November 30, 2007 Filing 247 Reply to Opposition Defendants Reply Brief in Support of #232 Defendants Motion to Dismiss the Inmate-Plaintiffs Third Amended Complaint filed byCalifornia Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation. (Irwin, Joshua) (Filed on 11/30/2007) Modified on 12/3/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
November 30, 2007 Filing 246 Reply to Opposition #236 TO REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE filed byCalifornia Department of Corrections, et al. (Defendants). (Irwin, Joshua) (Filed on 11/30/2007) Modified on 12/3/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
November 21, 2007 Filing 245 Proposed Order Denying #232 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Inmate-Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint by Patrick M. McCollum, Ian Shane Duncan, Josef Michael Jensen, Kenneth E. Capogreco, Donnie Dacus, Scott Forrest Collins, Kevin Coy Iloff, David Spooner, Gregory L. Mourland. (Wallace, Elaine) (Filed on 11/21/2007) Modified on 11/26/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
November 21, 2007 Filing 244 Memorandum in Opposition to #236 Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice filed byPatrick M. McCollum, Ian Shane Duncan, Josef Michael Jensen, Kenneth E. Capogreco, Donnie Dacus, Scott Forrest Collins, Kevin Coy Iloff, David Spooner, Gregory L. Mourland. (Wallace, Elaine) (Filed on 11/21/2007) Modified on 11/26/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
November 21, 2007 Filing 243 Declaration of Elaine Wallace in Support of #242 Memorandum in Opposition, to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Inmate-Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint filed byPatrick M. McCollum, Ian Shane Duncan, Josef Michael Jensen, Kenneth E. Capogreco, Donnie Dacus, Scott Forrest Collins, Kevin Coy Iloff, David Spooner, Gregory L. Mourland. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Part 1 of 3#2 Exhibit A, Part 2 of 3#3 Exhibit A, Part 3 of 3#4 Exhibit B through F)(Related document(s) #242 ) (Wallace, Elaine) (Filed on 11/21/2007)
November 21, 2007 Filing 242 Memorandum in Opposition to #232 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Inmate-Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint filed byPatrick M. McCollum, Ian Shane Duncan, Josef Michael Jensen, Kenneth E. Capogreco, Donnie Dacus, Scott Forrest Collins, Kevin Coy Iloff, David Spooner, Gregory L. Mourland. (Wallace, Elaine) (Filed on 11/21/2007) Modified on 11/26/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
November 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 241 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #240 Stipulation filed by California Department of Corrections, et al. (Defendants). Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on November 8, 2007. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2007)
November 7, 2007 Filing 240 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING THE DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS AND REHABILITATION'S SEARCHES FOR IAB-PURGED DOCUMENTS by California Department of Corrections, et al. (Defendants). (Irwin, Joshua) (Filed on 11/7/2007)
October 17, 2007 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #232 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Notice of Motion and Rule 12(b), 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss the Inmate-Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Notice of Motion and Rule 12(b), 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss the Inmate-Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 12/14/2007 10:00 AM. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
October 17, 2007 Filing 239 NOTICE by California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation Amended Defendants Notice of Motion and Rule 12(b), 12(b)(1), and 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss the Inmate-Plaintiffs Third Amended Complaint (Irwin, Joshua) (Filed on 10/17/2007)
October 16, 2007 Filing 238 NOTICE by California Department of Corrections, et al. (Defendants) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF COUNSEL AND NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY (Chen, Bonnie) (Filed on 10/16/2007)
October 12, 2007 Filing 237 Proposed Order Granting #232 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Inmate-Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint by California Department of Corrections, et al. (Defendants). (Chen, Bonnie) (Filed on 10/12/2007) Modified on 10/15/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
October 12, 2007 Filing 236 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of #232 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Inmate-Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint filed byCalifornia Department of Corrections, et al. (Defendants). (Chen, Bonnie) (Filed on 10/12/2007) Modified on 10/15/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
October 12, 2007 Filing 235 Appendix in Support of #232 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Inmate Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint filed byCalifornia Department of Corrections, et al. (Defendants). (Chen, Bonnie) (Filed on 10/12/2007) Modified on 10/15/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
October 12, 2007 Filing 234 Declaration of BONNIE J. CHEN In Support of #232 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Inmate-Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint filed byCalifornia Department of Corrections, et al. (Defendants). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to C#2 Exhibit D#3 Exhibit E#4 Exhibit F to I#5 Exhibit J to K#6 Exhibit L#7 Exhibit M#8 Exhibit N to R#9 Exhibit S#10 Exhibit T to V)(Chen, Bonnie) (Filed on 10/12/2007) Modified on 10/15/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
October 12, 2007 Filing 233 MEMORANDUM in Support of #232 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Inmate-Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint filed byCalifornia Department of Corrections, et al. (Defendants). (Chen, Bonnie) (Filed on 10/12/2007) Modified on 10/15/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
October 12, 2007 Filing 232 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Notice of Motion and Rule 12(b), 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss the Inmate-Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint filed by California Department of Corrections, et al. (Defendants). Motion Hearing set for 11/16/2007 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Chen, Bonnie) (Filed on 10/12/2007)
October 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 231 ORDER re #230 Stipulation filed by California Department of Corrections, et al. (Defendants). Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/10/07. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2007)
October 10, 2007 Filing 230 STIPULATION [Proposed] Stipulated Order Extending Page Limit for Motion to Dismiss and Opposition by California Department of Corrections, et al. (Defendants). (Chen, Bonnie) (Filed on 10/10/2007)
August 23, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER re #228 Stipulation, filed by Donnie Dacus, Ian Shane Duncan, Kenneth E. Capogreco, Patrick M. McCollum, David Spooner, Gregory L. Mourland, Scott Forrest Collins, Kevin Coy Iloff, Josef Michael Jensen Motions due by 10/15/2007. Stay on discovery shall be deemed lifted as of 10/16/2007. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/22/07. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2007)
August 20, 2007 Filing 228 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Re Deadline for Defendants to Renew Their Motion to Dismiss by Patrick M. McCollum, Ian Shane Duncan, Josef Michael Jensen, Kenneth E. Capogreco, Donnie Dacus, Scott Forrest Collins, Kevin Coy Iloff, David Spooner, Gregory L. Mourland. (Wallace, Elaine) (Filed on 8/20/2007)
August 10, 2007 Filing 227 AFFIDAVIT of Bonnie J. Chen re #216 Order on Motion to Compel filed on 6/25/2007 by California Department of Corrections, et al. (Defendants). (Chen, Bonnie) (Filed on 8/10/2007) Modified on 8/13/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
July 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ORDER RE DISCOVERY DISPUTE re #224 Letter filed by Donnie Dacus, Ian Shane Duncan, Kenneth E. Capogreco, Patrick M. McCollum, David Spooner, Gregory L. Mourland, Scott Forrest Collins, Kevin Coy Iloff, Josef Michael Jensen, #222 Letter filed by California Department of Corrections, et al. (Defendants). Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on July 24, 2007. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2007)
July 23, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 225 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #223 Stipulation filed by California Department of Corrections, et al. (Defendants). Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on July 23, 2007. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2007)
July 16, 2007 Filing 224 Letter from Sarah Hamilton to Magistrate Judge Laporte. (Hamilton, Sarah) (Filed on 7/16/2007)
July 13, 2007 Filing 223 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' EXHAUSTION OF ADMINISTRATIVE REMEDIES by California Department of Corrections, et al. (Defendants). (Chen, Bonnie) (Filed on 7/13/2007)
July 13, 2007 Filing 222 Letter from Bonnie J. Chen Requesting Court to Resolve Issues Upon Which Parties Have Been Unable to Reach Agreement. (Chen, Bonnie) (Filed on 7/13/2007)
July 10, 2007 Filing 221 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 6/6/07 before Judge Laporte. Court Reporter: Sahar McVickar. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2007) Modified on 7/11/2007 (sv, COURT STAFF). (aaa, COURT STAFF).
July 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 220 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #217 Stipulation, filed by Donnie Dacus, Ian Shane Duncan, Kenneth E. Capogreco, Patrick M. McCollum, David Spooner, Gregory L. Mourland, Scott Forrest Collins, Kevin Coy Iloff, Josef Michael Jensen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on July 5, 2007. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2007)
July 9, 2007 Filing 219 AFFIDAVIT of Joshua C. Irwin Regarding Investigation into Whether Documents Relevant to This Litigation Have Been Destroyed by California Department of Corrections, et al. (Defendants). (Irwin, Joshua) (Filed on 7/9/2007)
July 6, 2007 Filing 218 AFFIDAVIT of Bonnie J. Chen Filed in Compliance with 6/25/07 Order by California Department of Corrections, et al. (Defendants). (Chen, Bonnie) (Filed on 7/6/2007)
July 2, 2007 Filing 217 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Regarding Plaintiffs' Exhaustion of Administrative Remedies by Patrick M. McCollum, Ian Shane Duncan, Josef Michael Jensen, Kenneth E. Capogreco, Donnie Dacus, Scott Forrest Collins, Kevin Coy Iloff, David Spooner, Gregory L. Mourland. (Hamilton, Sarah) (Filed on 7/2/2007)
June 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 216 STIPULATION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting in part and denying in part #183 Motion to Compel (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2007)
June 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying #205 Motion for Reconsideration (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2007)
June 8, 2007 Filing 213 Proposed Order Stipulated [Proposed] Order on Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Responses to Exhaustion Discovery and For An Order to Preserve Relevant Documents by Patrick M. McCollum, Ian Shane Duncan, Josef Michael Jensen, Kenneth E. Capogreco, Donnie Dacus, Scott Forrest Collins, Kevin Coy Iloff, David Spooner, Gregory L. Mourland. (Wallace, Elaine) (Filed on 6/8/2007)
June 8, 2007 Filing 212 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #205 PLAINTIFF McCOLLUM'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION filed byCalifornia Department of Corrections, et al. (Defendants). (Chen, Bonnie) (Filed on 6/8/2007) Modified on 6/11/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
June 6, 2007 Filing 215 Minute Entry: Hearing held on 6/6/2007 before Elizabeth D. Laporte re Plaintiff's Motion to Compel #183 . (Court Reporter Sahar McVickar) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/6/2007)
June 5, 2007 Filing 211 EXHIBITS A & B to #209 Declaration of A. Santiago in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel filed byCalifornia Department of Corrections, et al. (Defendants). (Chen, Bonnie) (Filed on 6/5/2007) Modified on 6/7/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
June 5, 2007 Filing 210 Declaration of Robert Cobb (SUPPLEMENTAL) in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Responses to Exhaustion Discovery and for an Order to Preserve Relevant Documents filed byCalifornia Department of Corrections, et al. (Defendants). (Chen, Bonnie) (Filed on 6/5/2007)
June 5, 2007 Filing 209 Declaration of A. Santiago in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel filed byCalifornia Department of Corrections, et al. (Defendants). (Chen, Bonnie) (Filed on 6/5/2007)
June 5, 2007 Filing 208 Letter from Joshua C. Irwin, Deputy Attorney General Requesting the Court to Grant Permission for Defendants to File Two Further Declarations to Give the Court Additional Factual Information Concerning Matters Raised by Plaintiffs in their Reply Brief re Motion to Compel Responses to Exhaustion Discovery. (Chen, Bonnie) (Filed on 6/5/2007)
June 1, 2007 Filing 207 Declaration of Elaine Wallace in Support of #205 MOTION for Reconsideration Plaintifff McCollum's Motion for Leave to File a Motion for Reconsideration of August 8, 2006 Order Dismissing His Title VII, FEHA, and Equal Protection Claims, #206 Proposed Order, Declaration of Elaine Wallace in Support or Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File a Motion for Reconsideration filed byPatrick M. McCollum, Ian Shane Duncan, Josef Michael Jensen, Kenneth E. Capogreco, Donnie Dacus, Scott Forrest Collins, Kevin Coy Iloff, David Spooner, Gregory L. Mourland. (Related document(s) #205 , #206 ) (Wallace, Elaine) (Filed on 6/1/2007)
May 30, 2007 Filing 206 Proposed Order on #205 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File a Motion for Reconsideration of August 8, 2006 Order by Patrick M. McCollum, Ian Shane Duncan, Josef Michael Jensen, Kenneth E. Capogreco, Donnie Dacus, Scott Forrest Collins, Kevin Coy Iloff, David Spooner, Gregory L. Mourland. (Wallace, Elaine) (Filed on 5/30/2007) Modified on 5/31/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
May 30, 2007 Filing 205 MOTION for Reconsideration Plaintifff McCollum's Motion for Leave to File a Motion for Reconsideration of August 8, 2006 Order Dismissing His Title VII, FEHA, and Equal Protection Claims filed by Patrick M. McCollum, Ian Shane Duncan, Josef Michael Jensen, Kenneth E. Capogreco, Donnie Dacus, Scott Forrest Collins, Kevin Coy Iloff, David Spooner, Gregory L. Mourland. (Wallace, Elaine) (Filed on 5/30/2007)
May 23, 2007 Filing 204 Declaration of Sarah Hamilton in Support of #200 Reply to Opposition, regarding Motion to Compel Responses to Exhaustion Discovery and for an Order to Preserve Relevant Documents filed byPatrick M. McCollum, Ian Shane Duncan, Josef Michael Jensen, Kenneth E. Capogreco, Donnie Dacus, Scott Forrest Collins, Kevin Coy Iloff, David Spooner, Gregory L. Mourland. (Attachments: #1 Errata A-J#2 Exhibit K, part 1#3 Exhibit K, part 2#4 Exhibit K, part 3#5 Exhibit K, part 4#6 Exhibit K, part 5#7 Exhibit K, part 6#8 Exhibit K, part 7#9 Exhibit K, part 8#10 Exhibit K, part 9#11 Exhibit L-O)(Related document(s) #200 ) (Mitchell, Caroline) (Filed on 5/23/2007)
May 23, 2007 Filing 203 Declaration of Lara Kollios in Support of #200 Reply to Opposition, Regarding Motion to Compel Responses to Exhaustion Discovery and for an Order to Preserve Relevant Documents filed byPatrick M. McCollum, Ian Shane Duncan, Josef Michael Jensen, Kenneth E. Capogreco, Donnie Dacus, Scott Forrest Collins, Kevin Coy Iloff, David Spooner, Gregory L. Mourland. (Related document(s) #200 ) (Mitchell, Caroline) (Filed on 5/23/2007)
May 23, 2007 Filing 202 Declaration of David J. Mandella in Support of #200 Reply to Opposition, Regarding Motion to Compel Responses to Exhaustion Discovery and for an Order to Preserve Relevant Documents filed byPatrick M. McCollum, Ian Shane Duncan, Josef Michael Jensen, Kenneth E. Capogreco, Donnie Dacus, Scott Forrest Collins, Kevin Coy Iloff, David Spooner, Gregory L. Mourland. (Related document(s) #200 ) (Mitchell, Caroline) (Filed on 5/23/2007)
May 23, 2007 Filing 201 Declaration of Adam R. Sand in Support of #200 Reply to Opposition, Regarding Motion to Compel Responses to Exhaustion Discovery and for an Order to Preserve Relevant Documents filed byPatrick M. McCollum, Ian Shane Duncan, Josef Michael Jensen, Kenneth E. Capogreco, Donnie Dacus, Scott Forrest Collins, Kevin Coy Iloff, David Spooner, Gregory L. Mourland. (Related document(s) #200 ) (Mitchell, Caroline) (Filed on 5/23/2007)
May 23, 2007 Filing 200 Reply to Opposition re #187 Memorandum in Opposition, Regarding Motion to Compel Responses to Exhaustion Discovery and for an Order to Preserve Relevant Documents filed byPatrick M. McCollum, Ian Shane Duncan, Josef Michael Jensen, Kenneth E. Capogreco, Donnie Dacus, Scott Forrest Collins, Kevin Coy Iloff, David Spooner, Gregory L. Mourland. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A)(Mitchell, Caroline) (Filed on 5/23/2007)
May 16, 2007 Filing 199 Proposed Order Denying #183 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel by California Department of Corrections, et al. (Defendants). (Chen, Bonnie) (Filed on 5/16/2007) Modified on 5/18/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
May 16, 2007 Filing 198 Declaration of Robert Cobb in Support of #187 Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel filed byCalifornia Department of Corrections, et al. (Defendants). (Chen, Bonnie) (Filed on 5/16/2007) Modified on 5/17/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
May 16, 2007 Filing 197 Declaration of Robert Shannon in Support of #187 Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel filed byCalifornia Department of Corrections, et al. (Defendants). (Chen, Bonnie) (Filed on 5/16/2007) Modified on 5/17/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
May 16, 2007 Filing 196 Declaration of Rick Ivicevich in Support of #187 Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel filed byCalifornia Department of Corrections, et al. (Defendants). (Chen, Bonnie) (Filed on 5/16/2007) Modified on 5/17/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
May 16, 2007 Filing 195 Declaration of Denise Dull in Support of #187 Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel filed byCalifornia Department of Corrections, et al. (Defendants). (Chen, Bonnie) (Filed on 5/16/2007) Modified on 5/17/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
May 16, 2007 Filing 194 Declaration of Linda Young in Support of #187 Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel filed byCalifornia Department of Corrections, et al. (Defendants). (Chen, Bonnie) (Filed on 5/16/2007) Modified on 5/17/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
May 16, 2007 Filing 193 Declaration of Enedelia Donnelly in Support of #187 Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel filed byCalifornia Department of Corrections, et al. (Defendants). (Chen, Bonnie) (Filed on 5/16/2007) Modified on 5/17/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
May 16, 2007 Filing 192 Declaration of Rey Navarro in Support of #187 Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel filed byCalifornia Department of Corrections, et al. (Defendants). (Chen, Bonnie) (Filed on 5/16/2007) Modified on 5/17/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
May 16, 2007 Filing 191 Declaration of Joshua C. Irwin in Support of #187 Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel filed byCalifornia Department of Corrections, et al. (Defendants). (Chen, Bonnie) (Filed on 5/16/2007) Modified on 5/17/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
May 16, 2007 Filing 190 Declaration of Shannon L. Dillon in Support of #187 Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel filed byCalifornia Department of Corrections, et al. (Defendants). (Chen, Bonnie) (Filed on 5/16/2007) Modified on 5/17/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
May 16, 2007 Filing 189 Declaration of N. Grannis in Support of #187 Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel filed byCalifornia Department of Corrections, et al. (Defendants). (Chen, Bonnie) (Filed on 5/16/2007) Modified on 5/17/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
May 16, 2007 Filing 188 Declaration of Bonnie J. Chen in Support of #187 Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel filed byCalifornia Department of Corrections, et al. (Defendants). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Bonnie Chen in Support of Defs' Opposition to Pltfs' Motion to Compel#2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Bonnie Chen in Support of Defs' Opposition to Pltfs' Motion to Compel#3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Bonnie Chen in Support of Defs' Opposition to Pltfs' Motion to Compel#4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 (Part 1 of 2) to Declaration of Bonnie Chen in Support of Defs' Opposition to Pltfs' Motion to Compel#5 Exhibit Exhibit 4 (Part 2 of 2) to Declaration of Bonnie Chen in Support of Defs' Opposition to Pltfs' Motion to Compel#6 Exhibit Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Bonnie Chen in Support of Defs' Opposition to Pltfs' Motion to Compel#7 Exhibit Exhibit 6 to Declaration of Bonnie Chen in Support of Defs' Opposition to Pltfs' Motion to Compel#8 Exhibit Exhibit 7 to Declaration of Bonnie Chen in Support of Defs' Opposition to Pltfs' Motion to Compel#9 Exhibit Exhibit 8 to Declaration of Bonnie Chen in Support of Defs' Opposition to Pltfs' Motion to Compel#10 Exhibit Exhibit 9 to Declaration of Bonnie Chen in Support of Defs' Opposition to Pltfs' Motion to Compel#11 Exhibit Exhibit 10 (Part 1 of 2) to Declaration of Bonnie Chen in Support of Defs' Opposition to Pltfs' Motion to Compel#12 Exhibit Exhibit 10 (Part 2 of 2) to Declaration of Bonnie Chen in Support of Defs' Opposition to Pltfs' Motion to Compel#13 Exhibit Exhibit 11 (Part 1 of 2) to Declaration of Bonnie Chen in Support of Defs' Opposition to Pltfs' Motion to Compel#14 Exhibit Exhibit 11 (Part 2 of 2) to Declaration of Bonnie Chen in Support of Defs' Opposition to Pltfs' Motion to Compel#15 Exhibit Exhibit 12 to Declaration of Bonnie Chen in Support of Defs' Opposition to Pltfs' Motion to Compel#16 Exhibit Exhibit 13 to Declaration of Bonnie Chen in Support of Defs' Opposition to Pltfs' Motion to Compel#17 Exhibit Exhibit 14 to Declaration of Bonnie Chen in Support of Defs' Opposition to Pltfs' Motion to Compel#18 Exhibit Exhibit 15 to Declaration of Bonnie Chen in Support of Defs' Opposition to Pltfs' Motion to Compel#19 Exhibit Exhibit 16 to Declaration of Bonnie Chen in Support of Defs' Opposition to Pltfs' Motion to Compel#20 Exhibit Exhibit 17 to Declaration of Bonnie Chen in Support of Defs' Opposition to Pltfs' Motion to Compel#21 Exhibit Exhibit 18 to Declaration of Bonnie Chen in Support of Defs' Opposition to Pltfs' Motion to Compel#22 Exhibit Exhibit 19 to Declaration of Bonnie Chen in Support of Defs' Opposition to Pltfs' Motion to Compel#23 Exhibit Exhibit 20 to Declaration of Bonnie Chen in Support of Defs' Opposition to Pltfs' Motion to Compel)(Chen, Bonnie) (Filed on 5/16/2007) Modified on 5/17/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
May 16, 2007 Filing 187 Memorandum in Opposition to #183 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Responses to Exhaustion Discovery and for an Order to Preserve Relevant Documents filed byCalifornia Department of Corrections, et al. (Defendants). (Chen, Bonnie) (Filed on 5/16/2007) Modified on 5/17/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
April 27, 2007 Filing 186 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel #183 .Hearing reset to 6/6/2007 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Laporte in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2007)
April 24, 2007 Filing 185 Brief re #184 Declaration in Support,,, #183 MOTION to Compel Responses to Exhaustion Discovery and For an Order to Preserve Relevant Documents filed byPatrick M. McCollum, Ian Shane Duncan, Josef Michael Jensen, Kenneth E. Capogreco, Donnie Dacus, Scott Forrest Collins, Kevin Coy Iloff, David Spooner, Gregory L. Mourland. (Related document(s) #184 , #183 ) (Repa, Jessica) (Filed on 4/24/2007)
April 24, 2007 Filing 184 Declaration of Jessica L. Repa in Support of #183 MOTION to Compel Responses to Exhaustion Discovery and For an Order to Preserve Relevant Documents filed byPatrick M. McCollum, Ian Shane Duncan, Josef Michael Jensen, Kenneth E. Capogreco, Donnie Dacus, Scott Forrest Collins, Kevin Coy Iloff, David Spooner, Gregory L. Mourland. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D#2 Exhibit E-F#3 Exhibit G-I#4 Exhibit J-K#5 Exhibit L-M#6 Exhibit N-P#7 Exhibit Q#8 Exhibit R-V#9 Exhibit W-Y)(Related document(s) #183 ) (Repa, Jessica) (Filed on 4/24/2007)
April 24, 2007 Filing 183 MOTION to Compel Responses to Exhaustion Discovery and For an Order to Preserve Relevant Documents filed by Patrick M. McCollum, Ian Shane Duncan, Josef Michael Jensen, Kenneth E. Capogreco, Donnie Dacus, Scott Forrest Collins, Kevin Coy Iloff, David Spooner, Gregory L. Mourland. Motion Hearing set for 5/29/2007 09:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Proposed Order)(Repa, Jessica) (Filed on 4/24/2007)
April 3, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER re #181 Stipulation, filed by Patrick M. McCollum,, Kenneth E. Capogreco,, Ian Shane Duncan,, Josef Michael Jensen,, Donnie Dacus,, Scott Forrest Collins,, Kevin Coy Iloff,, David Spooner,, Gregory L. Mourland. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 4/03/2007. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2007)
April 2, 2007 Filing 181 STIPULATION Confidentiality Stipulation and [Proposed] Protective Order by Patrick M. McCollum, Ian Shane Duncan, Josef Michael Jensen, Kenneth E. Capogreco, Donnie Dacus, Scott Forrest Collins, Kevin Coy Iloff, David Spooner, Gregory L. Mourland. (Repa, Jessica) (Filed on 4/2/2007)
March 28, 2007 Filing 180 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Elaine Wallace (Wallace, Elaine) (Filed on 3/28/2007)
March 20, 2007 Filing 179 NOTICE of Appearance by Elaine Wallace Notice of Appearance by Jessica L. Repa (Wallace, Elaine) (Filed on 3/20/2007)
March 9, 2007 Filing 178 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Karen O'Brien Hourigan Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel (Hourigan, Karen) (Filed on 3/9/2007)
March 8, 2007 Filing 177 NOTICE of Appearance by Elaine Wallace (Wallace, Elaine) (Filed on 3/8/2007)
October 23, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 176 STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on October 23, 2006. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2006)
October 17, 2006 Filing 175 STIPULATION & Proposed Order Regarding Discovery on Inmate Plaintiffs' Exhaustion by Patrick M. McCollum. (Bea, Renee) (Filed on 10/17/2006)
September 7, 2006 Filing 174 NOTICE by Patrick M. McCollum Notice of Change of Attorney Information (Bea, Renee) (Filed on 9/7/2006)
August 30, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER re #172 Letter. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/30/06. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2006)
August 21, 2006 Filing 172 Letter from Donald W. Davis requesting copies of documents. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2006) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/14/2010: #1 Envelope) (wsn, COURT STAFF).
August 18, 2006 Filing 171 Defendant's Answer to Plaintiff McCollum's Third Amended Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial ANSWER to Amended Complaint byCalifornia Department of Corrections, et al. (Defendants). (Chen, Bonnie) (Filed on 8/18/2006)
August 8, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting in part and denying in part #111 Motion to Dismiss (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2006)
August 4, 2006 Filing 169 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 7/7/06 before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Court Reporter: Sahar McVickar. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2006)
July 21, 2006 Filing 168 Letter Brief Response to Plaintiffs' Letter Brief filed byCalifornia Department of Corrections, et al. (Defendants). (Chen, Bonnie) (Filed on 7/21/2006)
July 14, 2006 Filing 167 Letter Brief to Judge Breyer from S. Hamilton dated 7-14-06 filed byPatrick M. McCollum, Ian Shane Duncan, Josef Michael Jensen, Kenneth E. Capogreco, Donnie Dacus, Scott Forrest Collins, Kevin Coy Iloff, David Spooner, Gregory L. Mourland. (Hamilton, Sarah) (Filed on 7/14/2006)
July 7, 2006 Filing 166 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 7/7/2006 before Charles R. Breyer (Date Filed: 7/7/2006) re #111 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint filed by California Department of Corrections, et al. (Defendants),. (Court Reporter Sahar McVickar.) (be, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/7/2006)
July 6, 2006 Filing 165 OBJECTIONS to Plaintiffs' Objections to Declarations of Andrea Buckley, Bonnie J. Chen, Lisa Dovey, Eloy Medina, and R. Shannon by Patrick M. McCollum, Ian Shane Duncan, Josef Michael Jensen, Kenneth E. Capogreco, Donnie Dacus, Scott Forrest Collins, Kevin Coy Iloff, David Spooner, Gregory L. Mourland. (Mitchell, Caroline) (Filed on 7/6/2006)
June 29, 2006 Filing 164 Letter from Stacy Monahan to The Honorable Charles R. Breyer dated 6-29-06. (Monahan, Stacy) (Filed on 6/29/2006)
June 16, 2006 Filing 163 Reply to Opposition Defendants' Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed byCalifornia Department of Corrections, et al. (Defendants). (Chen, Bonnie) (Filed on 6/16/2006)
June 16, 2006 Filing 162 Reply Memorandum Defendants' Reply to Plaintiffs' Response to Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed byCalifornia Department of Corrections, et al. (Defendants). (Chen, Bonnie) (Filed on 6/16/2006)
June 16, 2006 Filing 161 Reply to Opposition Defendants' Reply to Plaintiffs' Objections to Defendants' Declarations filed byCalifornia Department of Corrections, et al. (Defendants). (Chen, Bonnie) (Filed on 6/16/2006)
June 16, 2006 Filing 160 Reply to Opposition Defendants' Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT filed byCalifornia Department of Corrections, et al. (Defendants). (Irwin, Joshua) (Filed on 6/16/2006) Modified on 6/19/2006 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
June 16, 2006 Filing 159 Declaration of ANDREA BUCKLEY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION DISMISS filed byCalifornia Department of Corrections, et al. (Defendants). (Chen, Bonnie) (Filed on 6/16/2006)
June 16, 2006 Filing 158 Declaration of R. SHANNON IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS filed byCalifornia Department of Corrections, et al. (Defendants). (Chen, Bonnie) (Filed on 6/16/2006)
June 16, 2006 Filing 157 Declaration of LISA DOVEY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS filed byCalifornia Department of Corrections, et al. (Defendants). (Chen, Bonnie) (Filed on 6/16/2006)
June 16, 2006 Filing 156 Declaration of ELROY MENDINA IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS filed byCalifornia Department of Corrections, et al. (Defendants). (Chen, Bonnie) (Filed on 6/16/2006)
June 12, 2006 Filing 155 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing Motions Hearing set for 7/7/2006 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2006)
June 9, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #149 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2006)
June 8, 2006 Filing 153 MEMORANDUM in Support re #149 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Renee Beltranena, Application for Admission filed byPatrick M. McCollum, Ian Shane Duncan, Josef Michael Jensen, Kenneth E. Capogreco, Donnie Dacus, Scott Forrest Collins, Kevin Coy Iloff, David Spooner, Gregory L. Mourland. (Related document(s) #149 ) (Mitchell, Caroline) (Filed on 6/8/2006)
June 8, 2006 Filing 152 Proposed Order re #151 Response ( Non Motion ) Proposed Order Denying Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice by California Department of Corrections, et al. (Defendants). (Irwin, Joshua) (Filed on 6/8/2006)
June 8, 2006 Filing 151 RESPONSE to Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice by California Department of Corrections, et al. (Defendants). (Irwin, Joshua) (Filed on 6/8/2006)
June 7, 2006 Filing 150 Proposed Order re #149 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Renee Beltranena by Patrick M. McCollum, Ian Shane Duncan, Josef Michael Jensen, Kenneth E. Capogreco, Donnie Dacus, Scott Forrest Collins, Kevin Coy Iloff, David Spooner, Gregory L. Mourland. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2006)
June 7, 2006 Filing 149 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Renee Beltranena filed by Patrick M. McCollum, Ian Shane Duncan, Josef Michael Jensen, Kenneth E. Capogreco, Donnie Dacus, Scott Forrest Collins, Kevin Coy Iloff, David Spooner, Gregory L. Mourland. FEE PAID. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2006)
June 2, 2006 Filing 148 Declaration of Christine Yip in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed byPatrick M. McCollum, Ian Shane Duncan, Josef Michael Jensen, Kenneth E. Capogreco, Donnie Dacus, Scott Forrest Collins, Kevin Coy Iloff, David Spooner, Gregory L. Mourland. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1#2 Exhibit 2#3 Exhibit 3)(Mitchell, Caroline) (Filed on 6/2/2006)
June 2, 2006 Filing 147 Memorandum in Opposition Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Dismiss and Request, in the Alternative, for Discovery Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 56(f) filed byPatrick M. McCollum, Ian Shane Duncan, Josef Michael Jensen, Kenneth E. Capogreco, Donnie Dacus, Scott Forrest Collins, Kevin Coy Iloff, David Spooner, Gregory L. Mourland. (Mitchell, Caroline) (Filed on 6/2/2006)
June 2, 2006 Filing 146 OBJECTIONS to Plaintiffs' Objections to April 21, 2006 Declaration of Bonnie J. Chen and Accompanying Declarations by Patrick M. McCollum, Ian Shane Duncan, Josef Michael Jensen, Kenneth E. Capogreco, Donnie Dacus, Scott Forrest Collins, Kevin Coy Iloff, David Spooner, Gregory L. Mourland. (Mitchell, Caroline) (Filed on 6/2/2006)
June 2, 2006 Filing 145 OBJECTIONS to Plaintiffs' Objections to Declaration of N. Grannis in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Patrick M. McCollum, Ian Shane Duncan, Josef Michael Jensen, Kenneth E. Capogreco, Donnie Dacus, Scott Forrest Collins, Kevin Coy Iloff, David Spooner, Gregory L. Mourland. (Mitchell, Caroline) (Filed on 6/2/2006)
June 2, 2006 Filing 144 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for More Definite Statement Under Rule 12(e) filed byPatrick M. McCollum, Ian Shane Duncan, Josef Michael Jensen, Kenneth E. Capogreco, Donnie Dacus, Scott Forrest Collins, Kevin Coy Iloff, David Spooner, Gregory L. Mourland. (Mitchell, Caroline) (Filed on 6/2/2006)
June 2, 2006 Filing 143 Declaration of Kenneth Capogreco in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed byPatrick M. McCollum, Ian Shane Duncan, Josef Michael Jensen, Kenneth E. Capogreco, Donnie Dacus, Scott Forrest Collins, Kevin Coy Iloff, David Spooner, Gregory L. Mourland. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1 - 9 of Declaration of K. Capogreco#2 Exhibit Exhibits 10 - 15 of Declaration of K. Capogreco)(Hamilton, Sarah) (Filed on 6/2/2006)
June 2, 2006 Filing 142 Declaration of David Spooner in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed byPatrick M. McCollum, Ian Shane Duncan, Josef Michael Jensen, Kenneth E. Capogreco, Donnie Dacus, Scott Forrest Collins, Kevin Coy Iloff, David Spooner, Gregory L. Mourland. (Hamilton, Sarah) (Filed on 6/2/2006)
June 2, 2006 Filing 141 Declaration of Paige E. Finkelman in Support of #140 Declaration in Support, Declaration of Paige E. Finkelman in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed byPatrick M. McCollum, Ian Shane Duncan, Josef Michael Jensen, Kenneth E. Capogreco, Donnie Dacus, Scott Forrest Collins, Kevin Coy Iloff, David Spooner, Gregory L. Mourland. (Related document(s) #140 ) (Hamilton, Sarah) (Filed on 6/2/2006)
June 2, 2006 Filing 140 Declaration of Scott Collins in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed byPatrick M. McCollum, Ian Shane Duncan, Josef Michael Jensen, Kenneth E. Capogreco, Donnie Dacus, Scott Forrest Collins, Kevin Coy Iloff, David Spooner, Gregory L. Mourland. (Hamilton, Sarah) (Filed on 6/2/2006)
June 2, 2006 Filing 139 Declaration of Sarah K. Hamilton in Support of #138 Declaration in Support, Regarding Correction to Declaration of Kevin Iloff filed byPatrick M. McCollum, Ian Shane Duncan, Josef Michael Jensen, Kenneth E. Capogreco, Donnie Dacus, Scott Forrest Collins, Kevin Coy Iloff, David Spooner, Gregory L. Mourland. (Related document(s) #138 ) (Mitchell, Caroline) (Filed on 6/2/2006)
June 2, 2006 Filing 138 Declaration of Kevin Iloff in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed byPatrick M. McCollum, Ian Shane Duncan, Josef Michael Jensen, Kenneth E. Capogreco, Donnie Dacus, Scott Forrest Collins, Kevin Coy Iloff, David Spooner, Gregory L. Mourland. (Mitchell, Caroline) (Filed on 6/2/2006)
June 2, 2006 Filing 137 Declaration of Donald Dacus in Support of #131 Declaration in Support, of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed byPatrick M. McCollum, Ian Shane Duncan, Josef Michael Jensen, Kenneth E. Capogreco, Donnie Dacus, Scott Forrest Collins, Kevin Coy Iloff, David Spooner, Gregory L. Mourland. (Related document(s) #131 ) (Mitchell, Caroline) (Filed on 6/2/2006) Modified on 6/6/2006 (ewn, COURT STAFF). Modified on 6/7/2006 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
June 2, 2006 Filing 136 Declaration of Gregory Mourland in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed byPatrick M. McCollum, Ian Shane Duncan, Josef Michael Jensen, Kenneth E. Capogreco, Donnie Dacus, Scott Forrest Collins, Kevin Coy Iloff, David Spooner, Gregory L. Mourland. (Mitchell, Caroline) (Filed on 6/2/2006)
June 2, 2006 Filing 135 Declaration of Ian Duncan in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed byPatrick M. McCollum, Ian Shane Duncan, Josef Michael Jensen, Kenneth E. Capogreco, Donnie Dacus, Scott Forrest Collins, Kevin Coy Iloff, David Spooner, Gregory L. Mourland. (Mitchell, Caroline) (Filed on 6/2/2006)
June 2, 2006 Filing 134 EXHIBITS re #125 Declaration of Caroline N. Mitchell filed byPatrick M. McCollum. (Related document(s) #125 ) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2006) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/14/2010: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17) (wsn, COURT STAFF).
June 2, 2006 Filing 133 Declaration of Nobuyo Breen in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed byPatrick M. McCollum, Ian Shane Duncan, Josef Michael Jensen, Kenneth E. Capogreco, Donnie Dacus, Scott Forrest Collins, Kevin Coy Iloff, David Spooner, Gregory L. Mourland. (Mitchell, Caroline) (Filed on 6/2/2006)
June 2, 2006 Filing 132 Declaration of Josef Jensen in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed byPatrick M. McCollum, Ian Shane Duncan, Josef Michael Jensen, Kenneth E. Capogreco, Donnie Dacus, Scott Forrest Collins, Kevin Coy Iloff, David Spooner, Gregory L. Mourland. (Mitchell, Caroline) (Filed on 6/2/2006)
June 2, 2006 Filing 131 Declaration of Christina Filios in Support of #130 Declaration in Support, Declaration of Christina Filios Regarding Corrections to the Declaration of Donald Dacus filed byPatrick M. McCollum, Ian Shane Duncan, Josef Michael Jensen, Kenneth E. Capogreco, Donnie Dacus, Scott Forrest Collins, Kevin Coy Iloff, David Spooner, Gregory L. Mourland. (Related document(s) #130 ) (Hamilton, Sarah) (Filed on 6/2/2006)
June 2, 2006 Filing 130 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET #137 . *** Declaration of Donald Dacus in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Dismiss filed byPatrick M. McCollum, Ian Shane Duncan, Josef Michael Jensen, Kenneth E. Capogreco, Donnie Dacus, Scott Forrest Collins, Kevin Coy Iloff, David Spooner, Gregory L. Mourland. (Hamilton, Sarah) (Filed on 6/2/2006) Modified on 6/6/2006 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
June 2, 2006 Filing 129 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET #136 . *** Declaration of Gregory Mourland in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Dismiss filed byPatrick M. McCollum, Ian Shane Duncan, Josef Michael Jensen, Kenneth E. Capogreco, Donnie Dacus, Scott Forrest Collins, Kevin Coy Iloff, David Spooner, Gregory L. Mourland. (Hamilton, Sarah) (Filed on 6/2/2006) Modified on 6/6/2006 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
June 2, 2006 Filing 128 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET #141 . *** Declaration of Paige E. Finkelman in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Dismiss filed byPatrick M. McCollum, Ian Shane Duncan, Josef Michael Jensen, Kenneth E. Capogreco, Donnie Dacus, Scott Forrest Collins, Kevin Coy Iloff, David Spooner, Gregory L. Mourland. (Hamilton, Sarah) (Filed on 6/2/2006) Modified on 6/6/2006 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
June 2, 2006 Filing 127 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET #140 . *** Declaration of Scott Collins in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Dismiss filed byPatrick M. McCollum, Ian Shane Duncan, Josef Michael Jensen, Kenneth E. Capogreco, Donnie Dacus, Scott Forrest Collins, Kevin Coy Iloff, David Spooner, Gregory L. Mourland. (Hamilton, Sarah) (Filed on 6/2/2006) Modified on 6/7/2006 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
June 2, 2006 Filing 126 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET #143 . *** Declaration of Kenneth Capogreco in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Dismiss filed byPatrick M. McCollum, Ian Shane Duncan, Josef Michael Jensen, Kenneth E. Capogreco, Donnie Dacus, Scott Forrest Collins, Kevin Coy Iloff, David Spooner, Gregory L. Mourland. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1 - 9 of Declaration of K. Capogreco#2 Exhibit Exhibits 10 - 15 of Declaration of K. Capogreco)(Hamilton, Sarah) (Filed on 6/2/2006) Modified on 6/6/2006 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
June 2, 2006 Filing 125 Declaration of Caroline N. Mitchell in Support of Plaintiffs' 56(f) Argument in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed byPatrick M. McCollum, Ian Shane Duncan, Josef Michael Jensen, Kenneth E. Capogreco, Donnie Dacus, Scott Forrest Collins, Kevin Coy Iloff, David Spooner, Gregory L. Mourland. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Manual Filing Notification for all exhibits#2 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations) Proof of Service)(Mitchell, Caroline) (Filed on 6/2/2006)
June 2, 2006 Filing 124 NOTICE by Patrick M. McCollum, Ian Shane Duncan, Josef Michael Jensen, Kenneth E. Capogreco, Donnie Dacus, Scott Forrest Collins, Kevin Coy Iloff, David Spooner, Gregory L. Mourland Plaintiffs' Response to Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Mitchell, Caroline) (Filed on 6/2/2006)
May 15, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER re #122 Stipulation, filed by Patrick M. McCollum,, Kenneth E. Capogreco,, Ian Shane Duncan,, Josef Michael Jensen,, Donnie Dacus,, Scott Forrest Collins,, Kevin Coy Iloff,, David Spooner,, Gregory L. Mourland,. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/13/06. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2006)
May 11, 2006 Filing 122 STIPULATION Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Extend Deadlines and Page Limits for Opposition and Reply to Opposition to Motion to Dismiss by Patrick M. McCollum, Ian Shane Duncan, Josef Michael Jensen, Kenneth E. Capogreco, Donnie Dacus, Scott Forrest Collins, Kevin Coy Iloff, David Spooner, Gregory L. Mourland. (Hamilton, Sarah) (Filed on 5/11/2006)
May 9, 2006 Filing 121 Declaration of Sarah K. Hamilton in Support of #120 Response in Support, of Objection to Suggestion of Death filed byPatrick M. McCollum, Ian Shane Duncan, Josef Michael Jensen, Kenneth E. Capogreco, Donnie Dacus, Scott Forrest Collins, Kevin Coy Iloff, David Spooner, Gregory L. Mourland. (Related document(s) #120 ) (Hamilton, Sarah) (Filed on 5/9/2006)
May 9, 2006 Filing 120 RESPONSE in Support of Objection to Suggestion of Death filed byPatrick M. McCollum, Ian Shane Duncan, Josef Michael Jensen, Kenneth E. Capogreco, Donnie Dacus, Scott Forrest Collins, Kevin Coy Iloff, David Spooner, Gregory L. Mourland. (Hamilton, Sarah) (Filed on 5/9/2006)
April 28, 2006 Filing 119 Memorandum in Opposition Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' "Opposition to Suggestion of Death and Request for Order to Name Substitute of Party" filed byCalifornia Department of Corrections, et al. (Defendants). (Chen, Bonnie) (Filed on 4/28/2006)
April 25, 2006 Filing 118 MEMORANDUM in Support re #111 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint, #106 Declaration in Support,, Motion to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint filed byCalifornia Department of Corrections, et al. (Defendants). (Related document(s) #111 , #106 ) (Chen, Bonnie) (Filed on 4/25/2006)
April 24, 2006 Filing 117 NOTICE by California Department of Corrections, et al. (Defendants) re #115 Memorandum in Support Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion for More Definite Statment Under Rule 12(e) (Chen, Bonnie) (Filed on 4/24/2006)
April 24, 2006 Filing 116 Proposed Order re #115 Memorandum in Support Granting Defendants' Motion for More Definite Statement Under Rule 12(e) by California Department of Corrections, et al. (Defendants). (Chen, Bonnie) (Filed on 4/24/2006)
April 24, 2006 Filing 115 MEMORANDUM in Support Of Defendants' Motion For More Definite Statement Under Rule 12(e) filed byCalifornia Department of Corrections, et al. (Defendants). (Chen, Bonnie) (Filed on 4/24/2006)
April 24, 2006 Filing 114 Declaration of N. Grannis in Support of #111 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint filed byCalifornia Department of Corrections, et al. (Defendants). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D#5 Exhibit E#6 Exhibit F#7 Exhibit G)(Related document(s) #111 ) (Chen, Bonnie) (Filed on 4/24/2006)
April 24, 2006 Filing 113 Proposed Order re #111 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint, #106 Declaration in Support,, Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint by California Department of Corrections, et al. (Defendants). (Chen, Bonnie) (Filed on 4/24/2006)
April 24, 2006 Filing 112 Request for Judicial Notice re #111 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint, #106 Declaration in Support,, Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed byCalifornia Department of Corrections, et al. (Defendants). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, Article 31 Religious Programs#2 Exhibit Exhibit B SPB Specifications for employment positions)(Related document(s) #111 , #106 ) (Chen, Bonnie) (Filed on 4/24/2006)
April 21, 2006 Filing 111 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint filed by California Department of Corrections, et al. (Defendants). Motion Hearing set for 6/30/2006 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Chen, Bonnie) (Filed on 4/21/2006)
April 21, 2006 Filing 110 EXHIBITS re #106 Declaration in Support,, Exhibit A-Declaration of Bonnie J. Chen in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed byCalifornia Department of Corrections, et al. (Defendants). (Related document(s) #106 ) (Chen, Bonnie) (Filed on 4/21/2006)
April 21, 2006 Filing 109 EXHIBITS re #108 Exhibits,,,, Declaration of Bonnie J. Chen in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed byCalifornia Department of Corrections, et al. (Defendants). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Sergio Babich#2 Exhibit Exhibit G1, Computer printout re computerized search for Mourland's appeals#3 Exhibit Exhibit G2, Sample CDC Form 695#4 Exhibit Exhibit H, Declaration of Custodian of Records, CSP Valley re Spooner's inmate records#5 Exhibit Exhibit H1, Spooner's appeal & responses LN SAC-00-01355#6 Exhibit Exhibit H2, Spooner's appeal & responses LG SVSP-A-03-02254#7 Exhibit Exhibit H2.1 Continuation of H2#8 Exhibit Exhibit I, McCollum's claim with DFEH, 7-21-2003#9 Exhibit Exhibit J, California Code of Regulations, title 15)(Related document(s) #108 ) (Chen, Bonnie) (Filed on 4/21/2006)
April 21, 2006 Filing 108 EXHIBITS re #107 Exhibits,, Declaration of Bonnie J. Chen in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed byCalifornia Department of Corrections, et al. (Defendants). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit C1 Dacus' appeal & responses LN: PBSP-91-2377#2 Exhibit Exhibit C2 Dacus' appeal & response LN: ASP-05-2749#3 Exhibit Exhibit D, Declaration of Custodian of Records, CSP, Sacramento re Duncan's inmate records#4 Exhibit Exhibit D1, Duncan's appeal & response LN: CCI-98-2782#5 Exhibit Exhibit D2, Duncan's appeal & response LN: CCI-S-00-00321#6 Exhibit Exhibit D3, Duncan's appeal & response LN CCI-7-02-1612#7 Exhibit Exhibit E, Declaration of Custodian of Records, CSP-Valley State re Iioff's inmates records#8 Exhibit Exhibit E1, Iiloff's appeal & responses LN PVSP-A-04-03398#9 Exhibit Exhibit F, Declaration of Custodian of Records, CSP, Sacramento re Jensen's inmates records)(Related document(s) #107 ) (Chen, Bonnie) (Filed on 4/21/2006)
April 21, 2006 Filing 107 EXHIBITS re #106 Declaration in Support,, Declaration of Bonnie J. Chen in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed byCalifornia Department of Corrections, et al. (Defendants). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit B2.1-B, Continuation of Exhibit B2#2 Exhibit Exhibit B2.2 - Continuation of Exhibit B2#3 Exhibit Exhibit B2.3 Continuation of B2#4 Exhibit Exhibit B2.4 Continuation of B2#5 Exhibit Exhibit B2.5 Continuation of B2#6 Exhibit Exhibit B2.6 Continuation of B2#7 Exhibit Exhibit B2.7 Continuation of B2#8 Exhibit Exhibit B2.8 Continuation of B2#9 Exhibit ExhibitB2.9 Continuation of B2#10 Exhibit ExhibitB2.10 Continuation of B2)(Related document(s) #106 ) (Chen, Bonnie) (Filed on 4/21/2006)
April 21, 2006 Filing 106 Declaration of Bonnie J. Chen in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed byCalifornia Department of Corrections, et al. (Defendants). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Custodian of Records-CSP, Sacramento re Capogreco's inmate records#2 Exhibit Capagreco's appeal & responses; LN: HDSP-B-01-01518#3 Exhibit Capogreco's appeal & responses, LN: SVSP-B-02-4401#4 Exhibit Continuation of A2#5 Exhibit Declaration of Custodian, CSP, San Quentin#6 Exhibit Collins' appeal & response, LN: SQ-02-1790#7 Exhibit Continuation of B1#8 Exhibit Collins' appeal & responses, LN: SQ-04-1760#9 Exhibit Continuation of B2)(Chen, Bonnie) (Filed on 4/21/2006)
April 19, 2006 Filing 105 Proposed Order re #103 Memorandum in Opposition,, #104 Declaration in Support, re: Suggestion of Death and Request for Order to Name Substitute of Party by Patrick M. McCollum, Ian Shane Duncan, Josef Michael Jensen, Kenneth E. Capogreco, Donnie Dacus, Scott Forrest Collins, Kevin Coy Iloff, David Spooner, Gregory L. Mourland. (Hamilton, Sarah) (Filed on 4/19/2006)
April 19, 2006 Filing 104 Declaration of Stacy Monahan in Support of #103 Memorandum in Opposition, re: Suggestion of Death and Request for Order to Name Substitute of Party filed byPatrick M. McCollum, Ian Shane Duncan, Josef Michael Jensen, Kenneth E. Capogreco, Donnie Dacus, Scott Forrest Collins, Kevin Coy Iloff, David Spooner, Gregory L. Mourland. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #103 ) (Hamilton, Sarah) (Filed on 4/19/2006)
April 19, 2006 Filing 103 Memorandum in Opposition to (83) Suggestion of Death and Request for Order to Name Substitute of Party filed byPatrick M. McCollum, Ian Shane Duncan, Josef Michael Jensen, Kenneth E. Capogreco, Donnie Dacus, Scott Forrest Collins, Kevin Coy Iloff, David Spooner, Gregory L. Mourland. (Hamilton, Sarah) (Filed on 4/19/2006)
March 29, 2006 Filing 102 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Patrick M. McCollum, Ian Shane Duncan, Josef Michael Jensen, Kenneth E. Capogreco, Donnie Dacus, Scott Forrest Collins, Kevin Coy Iloff, David Spooner, Gregory L. Mourland. Service waived by Ironwood State Prison waiver sent on 12/28/2005, answer due 2/27/2006; Derrick Ollison waiver sent on 12/28/2005, answer due 2/27/2006; K. J. Williams waiver sent on 12/28/2005, answer due 2/27/2006. (Hamilton, Sarah) (Filed on 3/29/2006)
March 16, 2006 Filing 101 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 3/3/06 before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Court Reporter: Leo Mankiewicz. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2006)
March 10, 2006 Filing 100 AMENDED COMPLAINT Third Amended Complaint and Class Action for Civil Rights Violations, Permanent Injunction, Declaratory Judgment, and Damages against all defendants. Filed byPatrick M. McCollum, Ian Shane Duncan, Josef Michael Jensen, Kenneth E. Capogreco, Donnie Dacus, Scott Forrest Collins, Kevin Coy Iloff, David Spooner, Gregory L. Mourland. (Monahan, Stacy) (Filed on 3/10/2006)
March 3, 2006 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Amended Complaint due by 3/10/2006. Motions due by 4/21/2006. Motion Hearing set for 6/30/2006 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2006)
March 3, 2006 Filing 99 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 3/3/2006 before Charles R. Breyer (Date Filed: 3/3/2006) re #81 MOTION to Sever Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion for Severance filed by California Department of Corrections, et al. (Defendants),, #79 MOTION for Protective Order Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion for a Protective Order and for a Stay of Discovery; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support filed by California Department of Corrections, et al. (Defendants). Third Amended Complaint filed by 3/10/06. (Court Reporter Leo Mankiewicz.) (be, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/3/2006) Modified on 3/8/2006 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
March 2, 2006 Filing 98 NOTICE by Patrick M. McCollum, Ian Shane Duncan, Josef Michael Jensen, Kenneth E. Capogreco, Donnie Dacus, Scott Forrest Collins, Kevin Coy Iloff, David Spooner, Gregory L. Mourland of Association of Counsel (Hourigan, Karen) (Filed on 3/2/2006)
February 28, 2006 Filing 97 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Patrick M. McCollum, Ian Shane Duncan, Josef Michael Jensen, Kenneth E. Capogreco, Donnie Dacus, Scott Forrest Collins, Kevin Coy Iloff, David Spooner, Gregory L. Mourland. Service waived by Avenal State Prison waiver sent on 12/28/2005, answer due 2/27/2006; California Institution for Men waiver sent on 12/28/2005, answer due 2/27/2006; California Institution for Women waiver sent on 12/28/2005, answer due 2/27/2006; California Men's Colony waiver sent on 12/28/2005, answer due 2/27/2006; California Medical Facility waiver sent on 12/28/2005, answer due 2/27/2006; California Rehabilitation Center waiver sent on 12/28/2005, answer due 2/27/2006; Chuckawalla Valley State Prison waiver sent on 12/28/2005, answer due 2/27/2006; Deuel Vocational Institution waiver sent on 12/28/2005, answer due 2/27/2006; High Desert State Prison waiver sent on 12/28/2005, answer due 2/27/2006; R.J. Donovan Correctional Facility at Rock Mountain waiver sent on 12/28/2005, answer due 2/27/2006; Valley State Prison for Women waiver sent on 12/28/2005, answer due 2/27/2006; Wasco State Prison waiver sent on 12/28/2005, answer due 2/27/2006; Kathy Mendoza-Powers waiver sent on 12/28/2005, answer due 2/27/2006; Kathleen Prosper waiver sent on 12/28/2005, answer due 2/27/2006; M. E. Poulos waiver sent on 12/28/2005, answer due 2/27/2006; Dawn Davison waiver sent on 12/28/2005, answer due 2/27/2006; John Marshall waiver sent on 12/28/2005, answer due 2/27/2006; Guillermina Hall waiver sent on 12/28/2005, answer due 2/27/2006; J. Salazar waiver sent on 12/28/2005, answer due 2/27/2006; Madelene A. Muntz waiver sent on 12/28/2005, answer due 2/27/2006; Steve Moore waiver sent on 12/28/2005, answer due 2/27/2006; T. Felker waiver sent on 12/28/2005, answer due 2/27/2006; Robert J. Hernandez waiver sent on 12/28/2005, answer due 2/27/2006. OF SUMMONS (Attachments: #1 Waivers part 1#2 Waivers part 2)(Hamilton, Sarah) (Filed on 2/28/2006)
February 17, 2006 Filing 96 Reply to Opposition DEFENDANTS REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND FOR A STAY OF DISCOVERY filed byCalifornia Department of Corrections, et al. (Defendants). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Chen, Bonnie) (Filed on 2/17/2006)
February 17, 2006 Filing 95 Reply to Opposition Reply Brief in Support of Defendants' Motion for Severance filed byCalifornia Department of Corrections, et al. (Defendants). (Irwin, Joshua) (Filed on 2/17/2006)
February 10, 2006 Filing 94 Declaration of Stacy Monahan in Support of #93 Memorandum in Opposition, Declaration of Stacy Monahan In Support Of Opposition To Motion For Protective Order And Stay Of Discovery filed byPatrick M. McCollum, Ian Shane Duncan, Josef Michael Jensen, Kenneth E. Capogreco, Donnie Dacus, Scott Forrest Collins, Kevin Coy Iloff, David Spooner, Gregory L. Mourland. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 #4 Exhibit D part 1#5 Exhibit D part 2#6 Exhibit E#7 Exhibit F#8 Exhibit G#9 Exhibit H#10 Exhibit I#11 Exhibit J#12 Exhibit K#13 Exhibit L#14 Exhibit M part 1#15 Exhibit M part 2#16 Exhibit M part 3#17 Exhibit N#18 Exhibit O#19 Exhibit P)(Related document(s) #93 ) (Monahan, Stacy) (Filed on 2/10/2006)
February 10, 2006 Filing 93 MEMORANDUM in Oppostion Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion for a Protective Order and for a Stay of Discovery filed byPatrick M. McCollum, Ian Shane Duncan, Josef Michael Jensen, Kenneth E. Capogreco, Donnie Dacus, Scott Forrest Collins, Kevin Coy Iloff, David Spooner, Gregory L. Mourland. (Monahan, Stacy) (Filed on 2/10/2006)
February 10, 2006 Filing 92 Memorandum in Opposition re #81 MOTION to Sever Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion for Severance filed byPatrick M. McCollum, Ian Shane Duncan, Josef Michael Jensen, Kenneth E. Capogreco, Donnie Dacus, Scott Forrest Collins, Kevin Coy Iloff, David Spooner, Gregory L. Mourland. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hourigan, Karen) (Filed on 2/10/2006)
February 8, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying #84 Ex Parte Application (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2006)
February 7, 2006 Filing 90 Reply to Opposition Defendants' to Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application for Defendants' Motion for Protective Order and Stay of Discovery to Be Heard Before Assigned Magistrate Judge filed byPatrick M. McCollum, Ian Shane Duncan, Josef Michael Jensen, Kenneth E. Capogreco, Donnie Dacus, Scott Forrest Collins, Kevin Coy Iloff, David Spooner, Gregory L. Mourland. (Monahan, Stacy) (Filed on 2/7/2006)
February 7, 2006 Filing 89 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Patrick M. McCollum. Waivers of Service of Summons (Attachments: #1 Waivers)(Monahan, Stacy) (Filed on 2/7/2006)
February 7, 2006 Filing 88 Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's ExParte Application for Defendants' Motion for Protective Order and for Stay of Discovery to be Heard before Assigned Magistrate Judge filed byCalifornia Department of Corrections, et al. (Defendants). (Chen, Bonnie) (Filed on 2/7/2006)
February 3, 2006 Filing 87 Letter dated 2/3/06 from Bonnie J. Chen re defendants' motion for protective order and for a stay of discovery. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2006) (wsn, COURT STAFF).
February 3, 2006 Filing 86 Proposed Order re #84 Ex Parte Application for Defendants' Motion for Protective Order and Stay of Discovery to be Heard Before Assigned Magistrate Judge by Patrick M. McCollum, Ian Shane Duncan, Josef Michael Jensen, Kenneth E. Capogreco, Donnie Dacus, Scott Forrest Collins, Kevin Coy Iloff, David Spooner, Gregory L. Mourland. (Monahan, Stacy) (Filed on 2/3/2006)
February 3, 2006 Filing 85 Declaration of Stacy Monahan in Support of #84 Ex Parte Application for Defendants' Motion for Protective Order and Stay of Discovery to be Heard Before Assigned Magistrate Judge filed byPatrick M. McCollum, Ian Shane Duncan, Josef Michael Jensen, Kenneth E. Capogreco, Donnie Dacus, Scott Forrest Collins, Kevin Coy Iloff, David Spooner, Gregory L. Mourland. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit C#4 Exhibit D#5 Exhibit E#6 Exhibit F#7 Exhibit G#8 Exhibit H#9 Exhibit I#10 Exhibit J Part 1#11 Exhibit J Part 2#12 Exhibit J Part 3#13 Exhibit K#14 Exhibit L)(Related document(s) #84 ) (Monahan, Stacy) (Filed on 2/3/2006)
February 3, 2006 Filing 84 Ex Parte Application for Defendants' Motion for Protective Order and Stay of Discovery to be Heard Before Assigned Magistrate Judge filed by Patrick M. McCollum, Ian Shane Duncan, Josef Michael Jensen, Kenneth E. Capogreco, Donnie Dacus, Scott Forrest Collins, Kevin Coy Iloff, David Spooner, Gregory L. Mourland. (Monahan, Stacy) (Filed on 2/3/2006)
January 27, 2006 Filing 83 SUGGESTION OF DEATH Upon the Record as to Octavio Peraza Pursuant to Rule 25(a)(1) by California Department of Corrections, et al. (Defendants), California Department of Corrections, et al. (Defendants). (Chen, Bonnie) (Filed on 1/27/2006)
January 24, 2006 Filing 82 MEMORANDUM in Support re #81 MOTION to Sever Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion for Severance filed byCalifornia Department of Corrections, et al. (Defendants). (Related document(s) #81 ) (Irwin, Joshua) (Filed on 1/24/2006)
January 24, 2006 Filing 81 MOTION to Sever Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion for Severance filed by California Department of Corrections, et al. (Defendants). Motion Hearing set for 3/3/2006 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion for Severance)(Irwin, Joshua) (Filed on 1/24/2006)
January 20, 2006 Filing 80 Declaration of Bonnie J. Chen in Support of #79 MOTION for Protective Order Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion for a Protective Order and for a Stay of Discovery; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendants' Motion for a Protective Order and for a Stay of Discovery filed byCalifornia Department of Corrections, et al. (Defendants). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notices of Depositions of Various Defendants#2 Exhibit Notices of Depositions for Various Defendants#3 Exhibit January 6, 2006 Letter to Monahan#4 Exhibit January 10, 2006 Letter to Chen#5 Exhibit December 2, 2005 Letter to Monahan)(Related document(s) #79 ) (Chen, Bonnie) (Filed on 1/20/2006)
January 20, 2006 Filing 79 MOTION for Protective Order Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion for a Protective Order and for a Stay of Discovery; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support filed by California Department of Corrections, et al. (Defendants). Motion Hearing set for 3/3/2006 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion for a Protective Order and for a Stay of Discovery)(Chen, Bonnie) (Filed on 1/20/2006)
January 9, 2006 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Answer or Motions due by 4/21/2006. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2006)
January 9, 2006 Set/Reset Deadlines as to, Set Deadlines/Hearings: Responses due by 5/26/2006. Replies due by 6/9/2006. Motion Hearing set for 6/30/2006 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2006)
January 9, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #75 Ex Parte Application (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2006)
January 6, 2006 Filing 77 Declaration of Bonnie J. Chen in Support of #75 Ex Parte Ex Parte Application Defendants' ExParte Application for an Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading and for Permission to Exceed Page Limit, #76 Proposed Order, filed byCalifornia Department of Corrections, et al. (Defendants). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A-Email#2 Exhibit Exhibit B 12/29/05 letter#3 Exhibit Exhibit C 12/30/05 Letter)(Related document(s) #75 , #76 ) (Chen, Bonnie) (Filed on 1/6/2006)
January 6, 2006 Filing 76 Proposed Order re #75 Ex Parte Ex Parte Application Defendants' ExParte Application for an Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading and for Permission to Exceed Page Limit by California Department of Corrections, et al. (Defendants). (Chen, Bonnie) (Filed on 1/6/2006)
January 6, 2006 Filing 75 Ex Parte Ex Parte Application Defendants' ExParte Application for an Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading and for Permission to Exceed Page Limit filed by California Department of Corrections, et al. (Defendants). (Chen, Bonnie) (Filed on 1/6/2006)
December 28, 2005 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT SUMMONS ISSUED as to Avenal State Prison, California Correctional Center, California Institution for Men, California Institution for Women, California Men's Colony, California Medical Facility, California Rehabilitation Center, California State Prison, Solano, California Substance Abuse Treatment Facility and State Prison at Corcoran, Chuckawalla Valley State Prison, Correctional Training Facility, Deuel Vocational Institution, High Desert State Prison, Ironwood State Prison, North Kern State Prison, Pelican Bay State Prison, R.J. Donovan Correctional Facility at Rock Mountain, Valley State Prison for Women, Wasco State Prison, Kathy Mendoza-Powers, Kathleen Prosper, M. E. Poulos, Dawn Davison, John Marshall, Martin Veal, Guillermina Hall, Thomas L. Carey, Derral Adams, Madelene A. Muntz, Anthony Kane, Steve Moore, T. Felker, Derrick Ollison, Lee Ann Chrones, Richard Kirkland, Robert J. Hernandez, Gloria Henry, P. L. Vasquez, K. J. Williams. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
December 21, 2005 Filing 74 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Second) and Class Action for Civil Rights Violations, Permanent Injunction, Declaratory Judgment, and Damages against all defendants. Filed byPatrick M. McCollum. (Monahan, Stacy) (Filed on 12/21/2005)
November 21, 2005 Filing 73 NOTICE by R. Gomez, Sean Harrigan, Lynn Harrison, Roderick Q. Hickman, Sabrina Johnson, Tip Kendal, Scott M. Kernan, Mule Creek State Prison, Ito Neinhuis, Arnold Ortega, Merrie Koshell, Octavio Peraza, Pleasant Valley State Prison, Chaplain Richie, Stuart J. Ryan, Salinas Valley State Prison, San Quentin State Prison, Arnold Schwarzenegger, A. K. Scribner, Anne Sheehan, Mark Shepherd, Cal Terhune, Floyd Shimomura, Chaplain Stewart, William Sullivan, Maeley Tom, Joel Valenzuela, James A. Yates, Edward S. Alameida, Jr, California State Prison at Sacramento, Jeanne Woodford, Margo Bach, California Department of Corrections, Office of Community Resources, The State of California, The State of California Youth & Adult Correctional Authority, California Correctional Institution at Tehachapi, Ron Alvarado, Sharrell Blakely, Al Bonilla, Jill Brown, California State Personnel Board, Ronald Barnes, California State Prison, Centinela, California State Prison, Los Angeles County, Calipatria State Prison, Rosanne Campbell, George Cerelli, Corcoran State Prison, William Elkins, Michael Evans, Folsom State Prison, George J. Giurbino, Barry Smith Notice of Association of Counsel (Irwin, Joshua) (Filed on 11/21/2005)
November 18, 2005 Filing 72 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 11/18/2005 before Charles R. Breyer (Date Filed: 11/18/2005). Motions due by 1/20/2006. Motion Hearing set for 3/3/2006 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. The court grants leave to file amended complaint. AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by 12/21/05. (Court Reporter N/A.) (be, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/18/2005) Modified on 11/21/2005 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
November 15, 2005 Filing 71 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT and [Proposed] Order filed by Patrick M. McCollum. (Monahan, Stacy) (Filed on 11/15/2005)
November 8, 2005 Set/Reset Hearings: Further Case Management Conference set for 11/18/2005 08:30 AM. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
November 8, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting #62 Motion to Continue in part. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2005)
November 7, 2005 Filing 69 Reply to Opposition re #68 MOTION to Amend/Correct #64 Ex Parte Application re #58 Stipulation and Order, Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for an Order Continuing The December 2 Hearing Date on Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgmen, #64 Ex Parte Application re #58 Stipulation and Order, Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for an Order Continuing The December 2 Hearing Date on Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed byPatrick M. McCollum. (Mitchell, Caroline) (Filed on 11/7/2005)
November 7, 2005 Filing 68 Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for an Order Continuing The December 2 Hearing Date on Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment #62 filed by The State of California. (Chen, Bonnie) (Filed on 11/7/2005) Modified on 11/8/2005 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
November 7, 2005 Filing 67 CLERK'S NOTICE re: Failure to E-File and/or Failure to Register as an E-Filer (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2005)
November 7, 2005 Filing 66 DECLARATION of Bonnie Chen in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application #64 filed byThe State of California. (Related document(s) #64 ) (Chen, Bonnie) (Filed on 11/7/2005) Modified on 11/8/2005 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
November 7, 2005 Filing 64 *** ERRONEOUS DOCKET ENTRY. SEE BELOW #68 . *** Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for an Order Continuing The December 2 Hearing Date on Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment #62 filed by Patrick M. McCollum. (Chen, Bonnie) (Filed on 11/7/2005) Modified on 11/8/2005 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
November 3, 2005 Filing 65 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Patrick M. McCollum re #62 MOTION to Continue, #63 Declaration in Support, Received Order (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2005) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/16/2005 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
November 3, 2005 Received Order re #62 MOTION to Continue by Patrick M. McCollum. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
November 3, 2005 Filing 63 Declaration of Stacy Monahan in Support of #62 MOTION to Continue filed byPatrick M. McCollum. (Related document(s) #62 ) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2005) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/16/2005 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
November 3, 2005 Filing 62 EX PARTE MOTION to Continue the December 2 Hearing Date on defendant's motion for summary judgment filed by Patrick M. McCollum. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2005) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/16/2005 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
October 18, 2005 Filing 61 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Patrick M. McCollum. Service waived by San Quentin State Prison waiver sent on 10/7/2005, answer due 12/6/2005; Joel Valenzuela waiver sent on 10/7/2005, answer due 12/6/2005; Jill Brown waiver sent on 10/7/2005, answer due 12/6/2005; William Elkins waiver sent on 10/7/2005, answer due 12/6/2005 ; Maeley Tom waiver sent on 10/7/04 ; George Sareli waiver sent on 10/7/04. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Mitchell, Caroline) (Filed on 10/18/2005) Modified on 10/19/2005 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
October 17, 2005 Filing 60 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Patrick M. McCollum re Summons Issued,,,,,,, for IDO NEINHUIS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Mitchell, Caroline) (Filed on 10/17/2005)
October 6, 2005 Filing 59 ASSOCIATION of Counsel by Merrie Koshell, Cal Terhune, Edward S. Alameida, Jr, California State Prison at Sacramento, Jeanne Woodford, Margo Bach, California Department of Corrections, Office of Community Resources, The State of California, The State of California Youth & Adult Correctional Authority, California Correctional Institution at Tehachapi, Ronald Barnes, Barry Smith. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2005) (wsn, COURT STAFF).
October 4, 2005 Filing 56 CLERK'S NOTICE re Inclusion of Case Into E-Filing Program. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2005)
October 3, 2005 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 25 motion for summary judgment, or alternatively, motion for partial summary judgment Motion Hearing set for 12/2/2005 10:00 AM. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
October 3, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 58 STIPULATION AND ORDER continuing the hearing date on defendants' motion for summary judgment, or alternatively, partial summary judgment 25 to 12/2/05.Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/3/05. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2005) Additional attachment(s) added on 10/6/2005 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
October 3, 2005 Filing 57 SUMMONS Returned Executed R. Gomez served on 9/9/2005, answer due 9/29/2005; Sean Harrigan served on 9/6/2005, answer due 9/26/2005; Roderick Q. Hickman served on 9/23/2005, answer due 10/13/2005; Sabrina Johnson served on 9/9/2005, answer due 9/29/2005; Tip Kendal served on 9/23/2005, answer due 10/13/2005; Scott M. Kernan served on 9/7/2005, answer due 9/27/2005; Mule Creek State Prison served on 9/12/2005, answer due 10/3/2005; Arnold Ortega served on 9/9/2005, answer due 9/29/2005; Octavio Peraza served on 9/9/2005, answer due 9/29/2005; Pleasant Valley State Prison served on 9/9/2005, answer due 9/29/2005; Chaplain Richie served on 9/9/2005, answer due 9/29/2005; Stuart J. Ryan served on 9/15/2005, answer due 10/5/2005; Salinas Valley State Prison served on 9/9/2005, answer due 9/29/2005; Arnold Schwarzenegger served on 9/23/2005, answer due 10/13/2005; A. K. Scribner served on 9/9/2005, answer due 9/29/2005; Anne Sheehan served on 9/6/2005, answer due 9/26/2005; Mark Shepherd served on 9/7/2005, answer due 9/27/2005; Floyd Shimomura served on 9/6/2005, answer due 9/26/2005; Chaplain Stewart served on 9/7/2005, answer due 9/27/2005; William Sullivan served on 9/23/2005, answer due 10/13/2005; Maeley Tom served on 9/6/2005, answer due 9/26/2005; James A. Yates served on 9/9/2005, answer due 9/29/2005; Ron Alvarado served on 9/6/2005, answer due 9/26/2005; California State Personnel Board served on 9/6/2005, answer due 9/26/2005; California State Prison, Centinela served on 9/9/2005, answer due 9/29/2005; California State Prison, Los Angeles County served on 9/9/2005, answer due 9/29/2005; Calipatria State Prison served on 9/9/2005, answer due 9/29/2005; Rosanne Campbell served on 9/12/2005, answer due 10/3/2005; George Cerelli served on 9/13/2005, answer due 10/3/2005; Corcoran State Prison served on 9/9/2005, answer due 9/29/2005; Michael Evans served on 9/9/2005, answer due 9/29/2005; Folsom State Prison served on 9/7/2005, answer due 9/27/2005; George J. Giurbino served on 9/9/2005, answer due 9/29/2005. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2005)
October 3, 2005 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
October 3, 2005 Filing 55 NOTICE of representation by counsel filed by Patrick M. McCollum. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2005)
September 21, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER re 52 Request for clarification of 8/30/05 Order filed by Patrick M. McCollum. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 9/21/05. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2005)
September 21, 2005 Received Stipulation and proposed Order continuing hearing date on defendants' motion for summary judgment, or alternatively, partial summary judgment. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
September 19, 2005 Filing 53 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Patrick M. McCollum re 52 Request (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2005)
September 14, 2005 Filing 52 REQUEST for clarification re 51 Order on Motion to Compel, Order on Motion for Sanctions by Patrick M. McCollum. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2005)
September 1, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting in part 33 Motion to Compel, denying 35 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 8/30/05. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2005)
August 30, 2005 Filing 50 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 8/30/2005 before Elizabeth D. Laporte (Date Filed: 8/30/2005) granting in part 33 MOTION to Compel filed by Patrick M. McCollum, denying 35 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Patrick M. McCollum,. (FTR Digital Recording.) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/30/2005)
August 26, 2005 Filing 49 Declaration of Patrick M. McCollum in Support of 48 Request filed byPatrick M. McCollum. (Related document(s) 48 ) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2005)
August 26, 2005 Filing 48 Stipulated REQUEST to extend time for reply by Patrick M. McCollum. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2005)
August 26, 2005 Received Order re 33 MOTION to Compel by Patrick M. McCollum. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
August 26, 2005 Filing 47 Declaration of Josef Michael Jensen filed byPatrick M. McCollum. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2005)
August 26, 2005 Filing 46 Declaration of Ian Shayne Duncan filed byPatrick M. McCollum. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2005)
August 26, 2005 Filing 45 Declaration of Kenneth Edward Capogreco filed byPatrick M. McCollum. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2005)
August 26, 2005 Filing 44 Declaration of William Robert Black Cloud Sales filed byPatrick M. McCollum. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2005)
August 26, 2005 Filing 43 Supplemental Declaration of Patrick M. McCollum in Support of 42 Reply Memorandum filed byPatrick M. McCollum. (Related document(s) 42 ) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2005)
August 26, 2005 Filing 42 Reply Memorandum re 33 MOTION to Compel, 35 MOTION for Sanctions filed byPatrick M. McCollum. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2005)
August 24, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting stipulated request to extend time to file reply in support of plaintiff's motion to compel. Plaintiff will file a reply by 8/25/05. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 8/24/05. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2005)
August 19, 2005 Filing 40 Declaration of Fiel D. Tigno in Support of 38 Memorandum in Opposition, filed byMerrie Koshell, Cal Terhune, Edward S. Alameida, Jr, California State Prison at Sacramento, Jeanne Woodford, Margo Bach, California Department of Corrections, Office of Community Resources, The State of California, The State of California Youth & Adult Correctional Authority, California Correctional Institution at Tehachapi, Ronald Barnes, Barry Smith. (Related document(s) 38 ) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2005)
August 19, 2005 Filing 39 Declaration of N. Grannis in Support of 38 Memorandum of Opposition, filed byMerrie Koshell, Cal Terhune, Edward S. Alameida, Jr, California State Prison at Sacramento, Jeanne Woodford, Margo Bach, California Department of Corrections, Office of Community Resources, The State of California, The State of California Youth & Adult Correctional Authority, California Correctional Institution at Tehachapi, Ronald Barnes, Barry Smith. (Related document(s) 38 ) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2005)
August 19, 2005 Filing 38 Opposition to plaintiff's motion to compel and request for sanctions filed byMerrie Koshell, Cal Terhune, Edward S. Alameida, Jr, California State Prison at Sacramento, Jeanne Woodford, Margo Bach, California Department of Corrections, Office of Community Resources, The State of California, The State of California Youth & Adult Correctional Authority, California Correctional Institution at Tehachapi, Ronald Barnes, Barry Smith. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2005)
August 18, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER re 33 MOTION to Compel filed by Patrick M. McCollum. 33 MOTION to Compel hearing set for 8/30/2005 09:00 AM. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 8/18/05. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2005)
August 16, 2005 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge for Discovery Elizabeth D. Laporte. (wh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2005)
August 15, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Discovery purposes. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/15/05. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2005)
August 11, 2005 Received Order re 35 MOTION for Sanctions by Patrick M. McCollum. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
August 11, 2005 Filing 35 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Patrick M. McCollum. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2005)
August 11, 2005 Received Order re 33 MOTION to Compel by Patrick M. McCollum. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
August 11, 2005 Filing 34 Declaration of Patrick M. McCollum in Support of 33 MOTION to Compel filed byPatrick M. McCollum. (Related document(s) 33 ) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2005)
August 11, 2005 Filing 33 MOTION to Compel production of documents and interviews; supporting memorandum of points and authorities filed by Patrick M. McCollum. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2005)
August 11, 2005 Filing 32 Declaration of Patrick M. McCollum in Support of 31 Stipulated Request, filed byPatrick M. McCollum. (Related document(s) 31 ) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2005)
August 11, 2005 Filing 31 STIPULATED REQUEST to shorten time for hearing plaintiff's motion to compel and motion for sanctions by plaintiff Patrick M. McCollum and defendants California Department of Corrections, Office of Community Resources et. al. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2005)
August 10, 2005 Filing 30 Renotice motion hearing re 25 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, MOTION for Summary Judgment, filed byMerrie Koshell, Cal Terhune, Edward S. Alameida, Jr, California State Prison at Sacramento, Jeanne Woodford, Margo Bach, California Department of Corrections, Office of Community Resources, The State of California, The State of California Youth & Adult Correctional Authority, California Correctional Institution at Tehachapi, Ronald Barnes, Barry Smith. Motion Hearing set for 10/7/2005 10:00 AM. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2005)
August 8, 2005 Filing 29 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Merrie Koshell, Cal Terhune, Edward S. Alameida, Jr, California State Prison at Sacramento, Jeanne Woodford, Margo Bach, California Department of Corrections, Office of Community Resources, The State of California, The State of California Youth & Adult Correctional Authority, California Correctional Institution at Tehachapi, Ronald Barnes, Barry Smith re 28 Declaration in Support,,, Received Order,, 25 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment MOTION for Summary Judgment MOTION for Summary Judgment MOTION for Summary Judgment, 26 Declaration in Support,,, 27 Declaration in Support,, (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2005)
August 8, 2005 Received Order re 25 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, MOTION for Summary Judgment by Merrie Koshell, Cal Terhune, Edward S. Alameida, Jr, California State Prison at Sacramento, Jeanne Woodford, Margo Bach, California Department of Corrections, Office of Community Resources, The State of California, The State of California Youth & Adult Correctional Authority, California Correctional Institution at Tehachapi, Ronald Barnes, Barry Smith. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
August 8, 2005 Filing 28 Declaration of Fiel D. Tigno in Support of 25 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byMerrie Koshell, Cal Terhune, Edward S. Alameida, Jr, California State Prison at Sacramento, Jeanne Woodford, Margo Bach, California Department of Corrections, Office of Community Resources, The State of California, The State of California Youth & Adult Correctional Authority, California Correctional Institution at Tehachapi, Ronald Barnes, Barry Smith. (Related document(s) 25 ) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2005)
August 8, 2005 Filing 27 Declaration of Barry Smith in Support of 25 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byMerrie Koshell, Cal Terhune, Edward S. Alameida, Jr, California State Prison at Sacramento, Jeanne Woodford, Margo Bach, California Department of Corrections, Office of Community Resources, The State of California, The State of California Youth & Adult Correctional Authority, California Correctional Institution at Tehachapi, Ronald Barnes, Barry Smith. (Related document(s) 25 ) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2005)
August 8, 2005 Filing 26 Declaration of Karen Coffee in Support of 25 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byMerrie Koshell, Cal Terhune, Edward S. Alameida, Jr, California State Prison at Sacramento, Jeanne Woodford, Margo Bach, California Department of Corrections, Office of Community Resources, The State of California, The State of California Youth & Adult Correctional Authority, California Correctional Institution at Tehachapi, Ronald Barnes, Barry Smith. (Related document(s) 25 ) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2005)
August 8, 2005 Filing 25 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, MOTION for Summary Judgment and supporting Memorandum of points and authorities filed by Merrie Koshell, Cal Terhune, Edward S. Alameida, Jr, California State Prison at Sacramento, Jeanne Woodford, Margo Bach, California Department of Corrections, Office of Community Resources, The State of California, The State of California Youth & Adult Correctional Authority, California Correctional Institution at Tehachapi, Ronald Barnes, Barry Smith. Motion Hearing set for 9/16/2005 10:00 AM. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2005)
July 7, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION AND ORDER by Judge Breyer : Filing ddl for dispositive motions due by 8/8/2005. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 7/7/05. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2005)
July 6, 2005 Received Stipulation and Order continuing date to file dispositive motions by defendants California Department of Corrections et. al.(mcl, COURT STAFF)
June 1, 2005 Filing 23 ANSWER to First Amended Complaint byMerrie Koshell, Cal Terhune, Edward S. Alameida, Jr, Jeanne Woodford, Margo Bach, California Department of Corrections, Office of Community Resources, The State of California, The State of California Youth & Adult Correctional Authority, California Correctional Institution at Tehachapi, California State Prison at Sacramento, Ronald Barnes, Barry Smith. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2005)
May 17, 2005 First Amended Complaint Summons Issued as to R. Gomez, Sean Harrigan, Lynn Harrison, Roderick Q. Hickman, Sabrina Johnson, Tip Kendal, Scott M. Kernan, Mule Creek State Prison, Ito Neinhuis, Arnold Ortega, Octavio Peraza, Pleasant Valley State Prison, Chaplain Richie, Stuart J. Ryan, Salinas Valley State Prison, San Quentin State Prison, Arnold Schwarzenegger, A. K. Scribner, Anne Sheehan, Mark Shepherd, Floyd Shimomura, Chaplain Stewart, William Sullivan, Maeley Tom, Joel Valenzuela, James A. Yates, Ron Alvarado, Sharrell Blakely, Al Bonilla, Jill Brown, California State Personnel Board, California State Prison, Centinela, California State Prison, Los Angeles County, Calipatria State Prison, Rosanne Campbell, George Cerelli, Corcoran State Prison, William Elkins, Michael Evans, Folsom State Prison, George J. Giurbino. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
May 17, 2005 Filing 22 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against all defendants. Filed byPatrick M. McCollum. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2005)
April 22, 2005 Filing 21 Summary Judgment Warning to Pro Se Plaintiffs by the Court. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2005)
April 22, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting in part and denying in part 11 Motion to Dismiss. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2005)
April 22, 2005 Filing 19 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 4/22/2005 before Charles R. Breyer. Motion Hearing held on 4/22/2005 before Charles R. Breyer re 11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by California Department of Corrections, Office of Community Resources. Summary Judgment Warning served on pro se plaintiff in open court, the Court grants plaintiff leave to amend complaint. Motions due by 7/15/05. Motion for Summary Judgment Hearing set for 9/2/05 10:00 AM.(Court Reporter Rosita Flores.) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/22/2005)
April 19, 2005 Filing 18 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT and Proposed Order filed by California Department of Corrections, Office of Community Resources. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2005)
April 8, 2005 Filing 17 Reply to Opposition re 11 MOTION to Dismiss filed byCalifornia Department of Corrections, Office of Community Resources. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2005)
April 1, 2005 Filing 16 Oppostion re 11 MOTION to Dismiss filed byPatrick M. McCollum. (Related document(s) 11 ) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2005)
February 15, 2005 Set/Reset Hearings: Case Management Conference set for 4/22/2005 10:00 AM. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
February 15, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION AND ORDER by Judge Breyer : case management conference continued to 4/22/05 at 10:00 am. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/15/05. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2005)
February 14, 2005 Received Stipulation and Order continuing case management conference date by California Department of Corrections, Office of Community Resources. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
January 31, 2005 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 11 MOTION to Dismiss. Motion Hearing set for 4/22/2005 10:00 AM. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
January 31, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION AND ORDER by Judge Breyer : hearing on defendants' motion to dismiss continued to 4/22/05 at 10:00 am. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/31/05. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2005)
January 28, 2005 Received Stipulation and Order continuing hearing on defendants' motion to dismiss by California Department of Corrections, Office of Community Resources. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
January 19, 2005 Filing 13 Amended CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by California Department of Corrections, Office of Community Resources re 11 MOTION to Dismiss, 12 Request for Judicial Notice (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2005)
January 13, 2005 Filing 12 Request for Judicial Notice re 11 MOTION to Dismiss filed byThe State of California. (Related document(s) 11 ) (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2005)
January 13, 2005 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by California Department of Corrections, Office of Community Resources. Motion Hearing set for 2/18/2005 10:00 AM. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2005)
January 5, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION AND ORDER granting request 9 : Case Management Conference reset for 2/25/2005 08:30 AM.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/5/05. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2005)
January 4, 2005 Filing 9 REQUEST to continue CMC 7 by The State of California. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2005)
December 17, 2004 Filing 8 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by California Department of Corrections, Office of Community Resources. (mmt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2004)
December 17, 2004 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 1/14/2005 08:30 AM. Case Management Statement due by 1/7/2005. (mmt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2004)
December 14, 2004 Filing 6 REASSIGNMENT ORDER Signed by The Executive Committee. Case reassigned to Judge Charles R. Breyer for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman no longer assigned to the case. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2004)
December 13, 2004 Filing 5 DECLINATION To Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge & REQUEST for Reassignment to a United States District Court Judge Filed by Pro se Plaintiff Patrick M. McCollum. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2004)
December 13, 2004 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2004)
December 8, 2004 Summons Issued as to Merrie Koshell, Cal Terhune, Edward S. Alameida, Jr, Jeanne Woodford, Margo Bach, California Department of Corrections, Office of Community Resources, The State of California, The State of California Youth & Adult Correctional Authority, California Correctional Institution at Tehachapi, California State Prisoin at Sacramento, Ronald Barnes, Barry Smith. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2004)
October 20, 2004 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Filing of Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2004)
August 16, 2004 Filing 2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 12/13/2004 & Initial Case Management Conference set for 4:00 p.m. on 12/20/2004. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2004)
August 16, 2004 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Damages & Injunctive Relief; Demand For Jury Trial - [No Summons Issued] against Edward S. Alameida Jr., Margo Bach, Ronald Barnes, California Correctional Institution at Tehachapi, California Department of Corrections, Office of Community Resources, California State Prisoin at Sacramento, Merrie Koshell, Barry Smith, Cal Terhune, The State of California, The State of California Youth & Adult Correctional Authority, And Jeanne Woodford, [Filing Fee: $150.00, Receipt Number 4409972]. Filed by Plaintiff Patrick M. McCollum. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2004)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCollum v. The State of California et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Evans
Represented By: Michael D. Gowe
Represented By: David Antony Carrillo
Represented By: Joshua Irwin
Represented By: Daniel B. Alweiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharrell Blakely
Represented By: Joshua Irwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.J. Donovan Correctional Facility at Rock Mountain
Represented By: Michael D. Gowe
Represented By: David Antony Carrillo
Represented By: Daniel B. Alweiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Harrigan
Represented By: Michael D. Gowe
Represented By: David Antony Carrillo
Represented By: Joshua Irwin
Represented By: Daniel B. Alweiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Men's Colony
Represented By: Michael D. Gowe
Represented By: David Antony Carrillo
Represented By: Daniel B. Alweiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: High Desert State Prison
Represented By: Michael D. Gowe
Represented By: David Antony Carrillo
Represented By: Daniel B. Alweiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ito Neinhuis
Represented By: Michael D. Gowe
Represented By: David Antony Carrillo
Represented By: Joshua Irwin
Represented By: Daniel B. Alweiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. L. Vasquez
Represented By: Michael D. Gowe
Represented By: David Antony Carrillo
Represented By: Daniel B. Alweiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Alvarado
Represented By: Michael D. Gowe
Represented By: David Antony Carrillo
Represented By: Joshua Irwin
Represented By: Daniel B. Alweiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margo Bach
Represented By: Bonnie J. Chen
Represented By: Joshua Irwin
Represented By: Fiel Dizon Tigno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Medical Facility
Represented By: Michael D. Gowe
Represented By: David Antony Carrillo
Represented By: Daniel B. Alweiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ironwood State Prison
Represented By: Michael D. Gowe
Represented By: David Antony Carrillo
Represented By: Daniel B. Alweiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Corrections, et al. (Defendants)
Represented By: Michael D. Gowe
Represented By: David Antony Carrillo
Represented By: Joshua Irwin
Represented By: Bonnie J. Chen
Represented By: Daniel B. Alweiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Institution for Men
Represented By: Michael D. Gowe
Represented By: David Antony Carrillo
Represented By: Daniel B. Alweiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The State of California Youth & Adult Correctional Authority
Represented By: Bonnie J. Chen
Represented By: Joshua Irwin
Represented By: Fiel Dizon Tigno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maeley Tom
Represented By: Michael D. Gowe
Represented By: David Antony Carrillo
Represented By: Joshua Irwin
Represented By: Daniel B. Alweiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Folsom State Prison
Represented By: Michael D. Gowe
Represented By: David Antony Carrillo
Represented By: Joshua Irwin
Represented By: Daniel B. Alweiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrie Koshell
Represented By: Michael D. Gowe
Represented By: David Antony Carrillo
Represented By: Bonnie J. Chen
Represented By: Joshua Irwin
Represented By: Daniel B. Alweiss
Represented By: Fiel Dizon Tigno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California State Prison at Sacramento
Represented By: Michael D. Gowe
Represented By: David Antony Carrillo
Represented By: Bonnie J. Chen
Represented By: Joshua Irwin
Represented By: Daniel B. Alweiss
Represented By: Fiel Dizon Tigno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roderick Q. Hickman
Represented By: Michael D. Gowe
Represented By: David Antony Carrillo
Represented By: Joshua Irwin
Represented By: Daniel B. Alweiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Correctional Institution
Represented By: Michael D. Gowe
Represented By: David Antony Carrillo
Represented By: Daniel B. Alweiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salinas Valley State Prison
Represented By: Michael D. Gowe
Represented By: David Antony Carrillo
Represented By: Joshua Irwin
Represented By: Daniel B. Alweiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chaplain Richie
Represented By: Michael D. Gowe
Represented By: David Antony Carrillo
Represented By: Joshua Irwin
Represented By: Daniel B. Alweiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation
Represented By: Michael D. Gowe
Represented By: David Antony Carrillo
Represented By: Bonnie J. Chen
Represented By: Joshua Irwin
Represented By: Daniel B. Alweiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cal Terhune
Represented By: Bonnie J. Chen
Represented By: Joshua Irwin
Represented By: Fiel Dizon Tigno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stuart J. Ryan
Represented By: Joshua Irwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Ayers
Represented By: Michael D. Gowe
Represented By: David Antony Carrillo
Represented By: Daniel B. Alweiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Elkins
Represented By: Michael D. Gowe
Represented By: David Antony Carrillo
Represented By: Joshua Irwin
Represented By: Daniel B. Alweiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Calipatria State Prison
Represented By: Michael D. Gowe
Represented By: David Antony Carrillo
Represented By: Joshua Irwin
Represented By: Daniel B. Alweiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Octavio Peraza
Represented By: Michael D. Gowe
Represented By: David Antony Carrillo
Represented By: Joshua Irwin
Represented By: Daniel B. Alweiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Quentin State Prison
Represented By: Michael D. Gowe
Represented By: David Antony Carrillo
Represented By: Joshua Irwin
Represented By: Daniel B. Alweiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dawn Davison
Represented By: Michael D. Gowe
Represented By: David Antony Carrillo
Represented By: Daniel B. Alweiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Ann Chrones
Represented By: Michael D. Gowe
Represented By: David Antony Carrillo
Represented By: Daniel B. Alweiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. K. Scribner
Represented By: Michael D. Gowe
Represented By: David Antony Carrillo
Represented By: Joshua Irwin
Represented By: Daniel B. Alweiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arnold Ortega
Represented By: Michael D. Gowe
Represented By: David Antony Carrillo
Represented By: Joshua Irwin
Represented By: Daniel B. Alweiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Institution for Women
Represented By: Michael D. Gowe
Represented By: David Antony Carrillo
Represented By: Daniel B. Alweiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pleasant Valley State Prison
Represented By: Michael D. Gowe
Represented By: David Antony Carrillo
Represented By: Joshua Irwin
Represented By: Daniel B. Alweiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosanne Campbell
Represented By: Michael D. Gowe
Represented By: David Antony Carrillo
Represented By: Joshua Irwin
Represented By: Daniel B. Alweiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Cerelli
Represented By: Joshua Irwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Harrison
Represented By: Joshua Irwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The State of California
Represented By: Bonnie J. Chen
Represented By: Joshua Irwin
Represented By: Fiel Dizon Tigno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valley State Prison for Women
Represented By: Michael D. Gowe
Represented By: David Antony Carrillo
Represented By: Daniel B. Alweiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Governor Arnold Schwarzenegger
Represented By: Michael D. Gowe
Represented By: David Antony Carrillo
Represented By: Joshua Irwin
Represented By: Daniel B. Alweiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Training Facility
Represented By: Michael D. Gowe
Represented By: David Antony Carrillo
Represented By: Daniel B. Alweiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Substance Abuse Treatment Facility and State Prison at Corcoran
Represented By: Michael D. Gowe
Represented By: David Antony Carrillo
Represented By: Daniel B. Alweiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Correctional Center
Represented By: Michael D. Gowe
Represented By: David Antony Carrillo
Represented By: Daniel B. Alweiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Veal
Represented By: Michael D. Gowe
Represented By: David Antony Carrillo
Represented By: Daniel B. Alweiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. J. Williams
Represented By: Michael D. Gowe
Represented By: David Antony Carrillo
Represented By: Daniel B. Alweiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wasco State Prison
Represented By: Michael D. Gowe
Represented By: David Antony Carrillo
Represented By: Daniel B. Alweiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derral Adams
Represented By: Michael D. Gowe
Represented By: David Antony Carrillo
Represented By: Daniel B. Alweiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guillermina Hall
Represented By: Michael D. Gowe
Represented By: David Antony Carrillo
Represented By: Daniel B. Alweiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deuel Vocational Institution
Represented By: Michael D. Gowe
Represented By: David Antony Carrillo
Represented By: Daniel B. Alweiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Felker
Represented By: Michael D. Gowe
Represented By: David Antony Carrillo
Represented By: Daniel B. Alweiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward S. Alameida, Jr.
Represented By: Bonnie J. Chen
Represented By: Joshua Irwin
Represented By: Fiel Dizon Tigno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry Smith
Represented By: Michael D. Gowe
Represented By: David Antony Carrillo
Represented By: Bonnie J. Chen
Represented By: Joshua Irwin
Represented By: Daniel B. Alweiss
Represented By: Fiel Dizon Tigno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Rehabilitation Center
Represented By: Michael D. Gowe
Represented By: David Antony Carrillo
Represented By: Daniel B. Alweiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California State Personnel Board
Represented By: Michael D. Gowe
Represented By: David Antony Carrillo
Represented By: Joshua Irwin
Represented By: Bonnie J. Chen
Represented By: Daniel B. Alweiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madelene A. Muntz
Represented By: Michael D. Gowe
Represented By: David Antony Carrillo
Represented By: Daniel B. Alweiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. E. Poulos
Represented By: Michael D. Gowe
Represented By: David Antony Carrillo
Represented By: Daniel B. Alweiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Kern State Prison
Represented By: Michael D. Gowe
Represented By: David Antony Carrillo
Represented By: Daniel B. Alweiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avenal State Prison
Represented By: Michael D. Gowe
Represented By: David Antony Carrillo
Represented By: Daniel B. Alweiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derrick Ollison
Represented By: Michael D. Gowe
Represented By: David Antony Carrillo
Represented By: Daniel B. Alweiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Kane
Represented By: Michael D. Gowe
Represented By: David Antony Carrillo
Represented By: Daniel B. Alweiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Kirkland
Represented By: Michael D. Gowe
Represented By: David Antony Carrillo
Represented By: Daniel B. Alweiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sabrina Johnson
Represented By: Michael D. Gowe
Represented By: David Antony Carrillo
Represented By: Joshua Irwin
Represented By: Daniel B. Alweiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Floyd Shimomura
Represented By: Michael D. Gowe
Represented By: David Antony Carrillo
Represented By: Joshua Irwin
Represented By: Daniel B. Alweiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jorge Sareli
Represented By: Michael D. Gowe
Represented By: David Antony Carrillo
Represented By: Daniel B. Alweiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California State Prison, Los Angeles County
Represented By: Michael D. Gowe
Represented By: David Antony Carrillo
Represented By: Joshua Irwin
Represented By: Daniel B. Alweiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy Mendoza-Powers
Represented By: Michael D. Gowe
Represented By: David Antony Carrillo
Represented By: Daniel B. Alweiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Salazar
Represented By: Michael D. Gowe
Represented By: David Antony Carrillo
Represented By: Daniel B. Alweiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Correctional Institution at Tehachapi
Represented By: Bonnie J. Chen
Represented By: Joshua Irwin
Represented By: Fiel Dizon Tigno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Marshall
Represented By: Michael D. Gowe
Represented By: David Antony Carrillo
Represented By: Daniel B. Alweiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mule Creek State Prison
Represented By: Michael D. Gowe
Represented By: David Antony Carrillo
Represented By: Joshua Irwin
Represented By: Daniel B. Alweiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California State Prison, Solano
Represented By: Michael D. Gowe
Represented By: David Antony Carrillo
Represented By: Daniel B. Alweiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Shepherd
Represented By: Joshua Irwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corcoran State Prison
Represented By: Michael D. Gowe
Represented By: David Antony Carrillo
Represented By: Joshua Irwin
Represented By: Daniel B. Alweiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pelican Bay State Prison
Represented By: Michael D. Gowe
Represented By: David Antony Carrillo
Represented By: Daniel B. Alweiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chaplain Stewart
Represented By: Michael D. Gowe
Represented By: David Antony Carrillo
Represented By: Joshua Irwin
Represented By: Daniel B. Alweiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Moore
Represented By: Michael D. Gowe
Represented By: David Antony Carrillo
Represented By: Daniel B. Alweiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott M. Kernan
Represented By: Michael D. Gowe
Represented By: David Antony Carrillo
Represented By: Joshua Irwin
Represented By: Daniel B. Alweiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gloria Henry
Represented By: Michael D. Gowe
Represented By: David Antony Carrillo
Represented By: Daniel B. Alweiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas L. Carey
Represented By: Michael D. Gowe
Represented By: David Antony Carrillo
Represented By: Daniel B. Alweiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Barnes
Represented By: Michael D. Gowe
Represented By: David Antony Carrillo
Represented By: Bonnie J. Chen
Represented By: Joshua Irwin
Represented By: Daniel B. Alweiss
Represented By: Fiel Dizon Tigno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Al Bonilla
Represented By: Michael D. Gowe
Represented By: David Antony Carrillo
Represented By: Joshua Irwin
Represented By: Daniel B. Alweiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jill Brown
Represented By: Joshua Irwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anne Sheehan
Represented By: Michael D. Gowe
Represented By: David Antony Carrillo
Represented By: Joshua Irwin
Represented By: Daniel B. Alweiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Sullivan
Represented By: Michael D. Gowe
Represented By: David Antony Carrillo
Represented By: Joshua Irwin
Represented By: Daniel B. Alweiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel Valenzuela
Represented By: Michael D. Gowe
Represented By: David Antony Carrillo
Represented By: Joshua Irwin
Represented By: Daniel B. Alweiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert J. Hernandez
Represented By: Michael D. Gowe
Represented By: David Antony Carrillo
Represented By: Daniel B. Alweiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Oronski
Represented By: Michael D. Gowe
Represented By: David Antony Carrillo
Represented By: Daniel B. Alweiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California State Prison, Centinela
Represented By: Michael D. Gowe
Represented By: David Antony Carrillo
Represented By: Joshua Irwin
Represented By: Daniel B. Alweiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Kramer
Represented By: Michael D. Gowe
Represented By: David Antony Carrillo
Represented By: Daniel B. Alweiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of Community Resources
Represented By: Michael D. Gowe
Represented By: David Antony Carrillo
Represented By: Daniel B. Alweiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. R. Gomez
Represented By: Joshua Irwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tip Kendal
Represented By: Michael D. Gowe
Represented By: David Antony Carrillo
Represented By: Joshua Irwin
Represented By: Daniel B. Alweiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeanne Woodford
Represented By: Michael D. Gowe
Represented By: David Antony Carrillo
Represented By: Bonnie J. Chen
Represented By: Joshua Irwin
Represented By: Daniel B. Alweiss
Represented By: Fiel Dizon Tigno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chuckawalla Valley State Prison
Represented By: Michael D. Gowe
Represented By: David Antony Carrillo
Represented By: Daniel B. Alweiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James A. Yates
Represented By: Michael D. Gowe
Represented By: David Antony Carrillo
Represented By: Joshua Irwin
Represented By: Daniel B. Alweiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Corrections, Office of Community Resources
Represented By: Bonnie J. Chen
Represented By: Joshua Irwin
Represented By: Fiel Dizon Tigno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Prosper
Represented By: Michael D. Gowe
Represented By: David Antony Carrillo
Represented By: Daniel B. Alweiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George J. Giurbino
Represented By: Michael D. Gowe
Represented By: David Antony Carrillo
Represented By: Joshua Irwin
Represented By: Daniel B. Alweiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ian Shane Duncan
Represented By: Jessica Lynn Repa
Represented By: Elaine Wallace
Represented By: June K. Ghezzi
Represented By: David Craig Kiernan
Represented By: Caroline Nason Mitchell
Represented By: Stacy Monahan Tucker
Represented By: Renee C. Beltranena
Represented By: Karen O'Brien Hourigan
Represented By: Sarah Kepner Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donnie Dacus
Represented By: Jessica Lynn Repa
Represented By: Elaine Wallace
Represented By: June K. Ghezzi
Represented By: David Craig Kiernan
Represented By: Caroline Nason Mitchell
Represented By: Stacy Monahan Tucker
Represented By: Renee C. Beltranena
Represented By: Karen O'Brien Hourigan
Represented By: Sarah Kepner Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth E. Capogreco
Represented By: Jessica Lynn Repa
Represented By: Elaine Wallace
Represented By: June K. Ghezzi
Represented By: David Craig Kiernan
Represented By: Caroline Nason Mitchell
Represented By: Stacy Monahan Tucker
Represented By: Renee C. Beltranena
Represented By: Karen O'Brien Hourigan
Represented By: Sarah Kepner Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick M. McCollum
Represented By: Jessica Lynn Repa
Represented By: Elaine Wallace
Represented By: June K. Ghezzi
Represented By: Renee Beltranena Bea
Represented By: Caroline Nason Mitchell
Represented By: David Craig Kiernan
Represented By: Stacy Monahan Tucker
Represented By: Renee C. Beltranena
Represented By: Karen O'Brien Hourigan
Represented By: Sarah Kepner Hamilton
Represented By: Michael Tedder Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Forrest Collins
Represented By: Jessica Lynn Repa
Represented By: Elaine Wallace
Represented By: June K. Ghezzi
Represented By: David Craig Kiernan
Represented By: Caroline Nason Mitchell
Represented By: Stacy Monahan Tucker
Represented By: Renee C. Beltranena
Represented By: Karen O'Brien Hourigan
Represented By: Sarah Kepner Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory L. Mourland
Represented By: Jessica Lynn Repa
Represented By: Elaine Wallace
Represented By: June K. Ghezzi
Represented By: David Craig Kiernan
Represented By: Caroline Nason Mitchell
Represented By: Stacy Monahan Tucker
Represented By: Renee C. Beltranena
Represented By: Karen O'Brien Hourigan
Represented By: Sarah Kepner Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josef Michael Jensen
Represented By: Jessica Lynn Repa
Represented By: Elaine Wallace
Represented By: June K. Ghezzi
Represented By: David Craig Kiernan
Represented By: Caroline Nason Mitchell
Represented By: Stacy Monahan Tucker
Represented By: Renee C. Beltranena
Represented By: Karen O'Brien Hourigan
Represented By: Sarah Kepner Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Spooner
Represented By: Jessica Lynn Repa
Represented By: Elaine Wallace
Represented By: June K. Ghezzi
Represented By: David Craig Kiernan
Represented By: Caroline Nason Mitchell
Represented By: Stacy Monahan Tucker
Represented By: Renee C. Beltranena
Represented By: Karen O'Brien Hourigan
Represented By: Sarah Kepner Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Coy Iloff
Represented By: Jessica Lynn Repa
Represented By: Elaine Wallace
Represented By: June K. Ghezzi
Represented By: David Craig Kiernan
Represented By: Caroline Nason Mitchell
Represented By: Stacy Monahan Tucker
Represented By: Renee C. Beltranena
Represented By: Karen O'Brien Hourigan
Represented By: Sarah Kepner Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?