Board of Trustees of the Sheet Metal Workers Health Care Plan of Northern California et al v. South City Refrigeration and Air Conditioning, Inc.

Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Sheet Metal Workers Health Care Plan of Northern California, Sheet Metal Workers Pension Trust of Northern California, Sheet Metal Workers Local 104 Vacation, Holiday Savings Plan and Anthony Asher
Defendant: South City Refrigeration and Air Conditioning, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2004cv03394
Filed: February 26, 2010
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A
Cause of Action: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Benefits

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 23, 2011 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Exam of Barbara Marchi, Agent and Employee of Judgment Debtor South City Refrigeration & Air Conditioning Inc. set for 4/21/2011 09:30 AM re 27 Proposed Order, filed by Board of Trustees of the Sheet Metal Workers Health Care Plan of Northern California, Anthony Asher, Sheet Metal Workers Local 104 Vacation, Holiday Savings Plan, Sheet Metal Workers Pension Trust of Northern California. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 3/23/11. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2011)
July 7, 2010 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Judgment Debtor Exam (Barbara Marchi, Agent and Employee of the Judgment Debtor) set for 7/20/2010 09:00 AM in Conference Room 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland.. Signed by Judge Donna M. Ryu on 7/7/10. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2010)
July 2, 2010 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAM. Signed by Judge Donna M. Ryu on 7/2/10. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2010)
April 9, 2010 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Judgment Debtor Exam (Barbara Marchi, Agent and Employee of the Judgment Debtor) set for 5/6/2010 09:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 4/9/2010. re 18 Proposed Order, filed by Board of Trustees of the Sheet Metal Workers Health Care Plan of Northern California, Anthony Asher, Sheet Metal Workers Local 104 Vacation, Holiday Savings Plan, Sheet Metal Workers Pension Trust of Northern California (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2010)
February 26, 2010 13 Opinion or Order of the Court WRIT of Execution issued in the amount of $12,872.89 as to South City Refrigeration and Air Conditioning, Inc. (mcl, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Board of Trustees of the Sheet Metal Workers Health Care Plan of Northern California et al v. South City Refrigeration and Air Conditioning, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Sheet Metal Workers Health Care Plan of Northern California
Represented By: Michael Joseph Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheet Metal Workers Pension Trust of Northern California
Represented By: Michael Joseph Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheet Metal Workers Local 104 Vacation, Holiday Savings Plan
Represented By: Michael Joseph Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Asher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South City Refrigeration and Air Conditioning, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?