Acco Brands, Inc. v. PC Guardian Anti-Theft Products, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Acco Brands, Inc.
Defendant: PC Guardian Anti-Theft Products, Inc. and Fellowes, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2004cv03526
Filed: August 24, 2004
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 4, 2009 316 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Illston on 3/3/09. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2009)
January 21, 2009 311 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 310 Pretrial submission date. Signed by Judge Illston on 1/21/09. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2009)
January 14, 2009 309 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting substitution. Signed by Judge Illston on 1/14/09. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2009)
January 13, 2009 308 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER continuing due date for pretrial disclosures. Signed by Judge Illston on 1/13/09. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2009)
December 10, 2008 304 Opinion or Order of the Court sealing ORDER re 301 (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2008)
December 5, 2008 303 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS ANTITRUST COUNTERCLAIM WITHOUT PREJUDICE [Docket No. 261] (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2008)
December 4, 2008 302 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND GRANTING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT(SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2008)
November 24, 2008 297 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER continuing case management to 12/19/08 (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2008)
October 29, 2008 293 Opinion or Order of the Court SEALING ORDER re 292 . Signed by Judge Illston on 10/29/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2008)
October 7, 2008 283 Opinion or Order of the Court SEALING ORDER re 280 . Signed by Judge Illston on 10/7/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2008)
October 3, 2008 275 Opinion or Order of the Court SEALING ORDER re 269 . Signed by Judge Illston on 10/2/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2008)
October 2, 2008 274 Opinion or Order of the Court SEALING ORDER (#264). Signed by Judge Illston on 10/1/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2008)
October 1, 2008 273 Opinion or Order of the Court SEALING ORDER (264). Signed by Judge Illston on 10/1/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2008)
September 29, 2008 272 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing affirmative defenses for failure to state a claim and patent misuse. Signed by Judge Illston on 9/29/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2008)
September 23, 2008 256 Opinion or Order of the Court SEALING ORDER ORDER (PLTF) re 253 . Signed by Judge Illston on 9/18/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2008)
February 6, 2008 120 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER ( as amended ). Signed by Judge Illston on 2/5/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Acco Brands, Inc. v. PC Guardian Anti-Theft Products, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Acco Brands, Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Avenatti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PC Guardian Anti-Theft Products, Inc.
Represented By: Owen Warner Dukelow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fellowes, Inc.
Represented By: Owen Warner Dukelow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?