In re: First Virtual Communications, Inc. Securities Litigation.

Case Number: 3:2004cv03585
Filed: August 25, 2004
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Martin J. Jenkins
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 7, 2008 136 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF REFERENCE AND ORDER RE DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/7/08. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2008)
October 6, 2008 135 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING 133 Ex Parte Application for Order Authorizing Distribution of Settlement Funds and for Payment of Administration Fees and Expenses TO A RANDOMLY ASSIGNED MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/6/08. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2008)
March 20, 2007 119 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Martin J. Jenkins on 3/19/07. (epb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2007)
March 16, 2007 118 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER, Case reopened. Court's March 7, 2007 Order Dismissing Action vacated. Signed by Judge Martin J. Jenkins on 3/13/07. (epb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2007)
March 8, 2007 114 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE - case dismissed without prejudice; any party within ninety days may certify to court, with proof of service of a copy thereon on opposing counsel, that the agreed consideration for said settlement has not been delivered over, shall have Order stand vacated and case restored to the calendar to be set for trial. Signed by Judge Martin J. Jenkins on 3/7/07. (epb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2007)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: First Virtual Communications, Inc. Securities Litigation.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?