Applied Materials,Inc., v. Negevtech,Inc., et al

Plaintiff: Applied Materials,Inc., and Applied Materials Israel, Ltd
Defendant: Negevtech,Inc., and Negevetch LTD.,
Movant: Applied Materials Israel, Ltd.
Case Number: 3:2004cv03656
Filed: October 14, 2009
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 22, 2009 177 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice. Each party is to bear its own costs and attonreys fees. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2009)
October 14, 2009 175 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO FILE JOINT STATUS REPORT AND SETTING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2009)
August 4, 2009 173 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO FILE JOINT STATUS REPORT (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Applied Materials,Inc., v. Negevtech,Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Applied Materials,Inc.,
Represented By: Chuck P. Ebertin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Applied Materials Israel, Ltd
Represented By: Chuck P. Ebertin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Negevtech,Inc.,
Represented By: David S. Brun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Negevetch LTD.,
Represented By: David S. Brun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Applied Materials Israel, Ltd.
Represented By: Chuck P. Ebertin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?