Ideaflood, Inc. v. Google, Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff Ideaflood, Inc. sued defendant Google, Inc. and alleged that Google\'s blogging service infringed U.S. Patent No. 6,687,746 B1 entitled \"System apparatus and method for hosting and assigning domain names on a wide area network.\" Plaintiff alleged that the patent covers a service for hosting domains and assigning domain names to users, were the domain name is defined, in part, by the user.

Plaintiff: Ideaflood, Inc.
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2004cv04201
Filed: October 4, 2004
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 21, 2005 7
NOTICE by Ideaflood, Inc. OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE (Yorio, Robert) (Filed on 3/21/2005)
January 18, 2005 6
CLERK'S NOTICE - Case Management Conference rescheduled to 3/22/2005 at 10:00 AM. (lh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2005)
November 4, 2004 4
CLERK'S NOTICE To Plaintiff's Counsel re: Failure to E-File and/or Failure to Register as an E-Filer. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2004)
October 4, 2004 3
REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Patent Infringement. (cc: form mailed to register). (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2004)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ideaflood, Inc. v. Google, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ideaflood, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Joseph Yorio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?