Shasta Strategic Investment Fund LLC et al v. United States of America

Case Number: 3:2004cv04264
Filed: October 7, 2004
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Vaughn R. Walker
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7401 IRS: Tax Liability
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 12, 2015 273 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO MEET AND CONFER REGARDING JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/12/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2015)
December 19, 2014 270 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON SUPPLEMENTAL MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/19/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2014)
October 2, 2014 257 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND SCHEDULING ORDER RE: ADDITIONAL MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/2/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2014)
September 11, 2014 252 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING SUPPLEMENTAL ISSUES. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/25/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/11/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2014)
August 26, 2014 250 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL BRIEFING. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/26/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2014)
July 31, 2014 247 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING RESPONDENT'S MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DENYING INTERVENORS' MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/31/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2014)
May 7, 2014 221 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND PAGE LIMITS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/7/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2014)
April 17, 2014 219 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER. Motion Hearing set for 7/23/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/17/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2014)
January 14, 2014 208 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/14/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2014)
December 20, 2013 206 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO DEPOSE JOHN LARSON IN PRISON. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/20/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2013)
October 23, 2013 203 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/22/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2013)
July 24, 2013 196 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO REOPEN DISCOVERY FOR LIMITED PURPOSES AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/24/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2013)
July 18, 2013 193 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REQUESTING STATUS UPDATE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/18/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2013)
April 1, 2013 177 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER, Set/Reset Deadlines as to (112 in 3:05-cv-01123-RS) MOTION for Summary Judgment , (113 in 3:05-cv-01123-RS) MOTION for Summary Judgment , (167 in 3:04-cv-04264-RS) MOTION for Summary Judgment , (6 9 in 3:04-cv-04309-RS) MOTION for Summary Judgment , (58 in 3:04-cv-04398-RS) MOTION for Summary Judgment , (59 in 3:04-cv-04964-RS) MOTION for Summary Judgment , (23 in 3:05-cv-01996-RS) MOTION for Summary Judgment < i>, (78 in 3:05-cv-02835-RS) MOTION for Summary Judgment . Responses due by 4/18/2013. Replies due by 5/2/2013. Dispositive Motion(s) Hearing re-set to 6/20/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg.. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/1/13. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2013)
March 14, 2013 166 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF PAGE LIMITS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/14/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2013)
January 4, 2013 163 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO MODIFY SCHEDULE. Pretrial Conference set for 9/26/2013 10:00 AM; Jury Selection set for 10/7/2013 09:00 AM; Jury Trial set for 10/7/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/4/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2013)
October 15, 2012 160 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER. Pretrial Conference set for 4/4/2013 10:00 AM; Jury Selection set for 4/15/2013 09:00 AM; Jury Trial set for 4/15/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/15/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2012)
September 18, 2012 146 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING AND MOTION TO CONTINUE. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/4/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/17/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2012)
August 7, 2012 141 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING AS PREMATURE RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF STUART A. SMITH re (23 in 3:05-cv-03887-JW), (37 in 3:05-cv-02835-JW), (36 in 3:04-cv-04398-JW), (46 in 3:04-cv-04309-JW), (80 in 3:05-cv-01123-JW), (37 in 3:04-cv-04964-JW), (136 in 3:04-cv-04264-JW) MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Expert Report and Testimony of Stuart Smith filed by United States of America. Signed by Chief Judge James Ware on August 7, 2012. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2012)
June 22, 2012 135 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER VACATING DEADLINES RELATING TO PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE re (134 in 3:04-cv-04264-JW) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re (133) Stipulation and Order. Signed by Chief Judge James Ware on June 22, 2012. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2012)
March 12, 2012 133 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED re (132 in 3:04-cv-04264-JW) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND DEADLINES filed by Tom Gonzales. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/12/12. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2012)
September 28, 2011 130 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re (128 in 3:04-cv-04264-JW) Stipulation filed by United States of America. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/28/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2011)
July 6, 2011 127 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; SETTING SCHEDULE Discovery due by 1/13/2012. Last day for hearing dispositive motions by 3/12/2012. Preliminary Pretrial Conference Statement due by 12/2/2011. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 12/12/2011 11:00 AM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Ware. Signed by Judge James Ware on 7/5/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shasta Strategic Investment Fund LLC et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?