Saldana-Neily v. Taco Bell of America, Inc. et al

Case Number: 3:2004cv04571
Filed: October 28, 2004
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Martin J. Jenkins
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101 Americans w/ Disabilities Act (ADA)
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 13, 2015 129 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 2/13/15. (nap, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2015)
November 3, 2014 126 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER re 125 Case Management Conference - Initial. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 11/3/14. (nahS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2014)
September 24, 2014 119 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING STAY AND SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/23/2014. Case Management Conference set for 10/30/2014 09:00 AM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 9/24/14. (nahS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saldana-Neily v. Taco Bell of America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?