Tyson aka Al-Hizbullahi v. Bliesner et al

Case Number: 3:2004cv04903
Filed: November 17, 2004
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 8, 2010 83 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT: Plaintiffs motion to compel discovery is hereby DENIED, and defendant Woodfords motion for summary judgment is hereby GRANTED on all claims. (tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2010)
June 10, 2010 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION; DENYING 67 DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STAY DISCOVERY; DENYING 64 , 72 PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY-RELATED MOTIONS; SETTING DISCOVERY AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 10, 2010. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2010)
February 3, 2010 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 59 , 60 , EXTENSION OF TIME TO OPPOSE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; DENYING 54 PLAINTIFF'S OCTOBER 22, 2009 RULE 7-9(a)MOTION; GRANTING 62 PLAINTIFF'S JANUARY 7, 2010 RULE 7-9(a) MOTION; DIRECTING DEFENDANTS' COUNSEL TO RESPOND TO MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 3, 2010. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2010)
October 2, 2009 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 51 MOTION TO COMPEL; DISMISSING ALL UNSERVED DEFENDANTS; DIRECTING DEFENDANT WOODFORD TO FILE DISPOSITIVE MOTION. All defendants dimissed other than J. Woodford without prejudice. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 2, 2009. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2009) Modified on 10/5/2009 (aaa, COURT STAFF).
April 10, 2009 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL EITHER TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANTS OR FILE RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ORDER FINDING DEFENDANTS HAVE BEEN PROPERLY SERVED; DIRECTIONS TO CLERK. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 10, 2009. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tyson aka Al-Hizbullahi v. Bliesner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?