Cherry et al v. The City College of San Francisco et al

Case Number: 3:2004cv04981
Filed: November 23, 2004
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: William H. Alsup
Referring Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 4, 2011 930 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONFIRMING JURISDICTION HAS ENDED by Judge Alsup finding as moot 859 Motion to Vacate (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2011)
December 23, 2010 922 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REQUESTING MISSING EXHIBITS re 918 Declaration in Support, filed by The City College of San Francisco, 916 Response in Support filed by The City College of San Francisco. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 23, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2010)
December 20, 2010 915 Opinion or Order of the Court SECOND ORDER REQUESTING SUPPLEMENTAL INFORMATION REGARDING LIGHT SWITCHES re 902 Order. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 20, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2010)
December 16, 2010 914 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REQUESTING SUPPLEMENTAL INFORMATION REGARDING DIEGO RIVERA THEATRE, VISUAL ARTS BUILDING, AND CLOUD HALL Supplemental Information due by noon on 12/23/2010. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 12/16/2010. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2010)
December 13, 2010 902 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REQUESTING SUPPLEMENTAL INFORMATION REGARDING LIGHT SWITCH ISSUE. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 13, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2010)
November 23, 2010 894 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE REPLY. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 22, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2010)
January 29, 2010 856 Opinion or Order of the Court USCA Mandate - Petition for Writ of Certiorari is denied (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2010)
January 8, 2010 845 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING EXTENSION OF FINAL COMPLIANCE DEADLINE. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 8, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2010)
November 20, 2009 842 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING SCHEDULE FOR MEETINGS AND MOTIONS RE COMPLIANCE WITH STIPULATED JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 20, 2009. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2009)
September 24, 2009 838 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE STATUS CONFERENCE. The Status Conference is Continued to November 19, 2009 at 11 a.m. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 24, 2009. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2009)
August 5, 2009 835 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING STATUS CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 5, 2009. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2009)
March 26, 2009 829 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE STATUS CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 26, 2009. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2009)
September 11, 2008 818 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 11, 2008. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cherry et al v. The City College of San Francisco et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?