Oakland Raiders v. Romanowski Featured Case

On August 24, 2003, Bill Romanowski allegedly attacked Marcus Williams at the Oakland Raiders training facility. Both were team members of the Oakland Raiders. Williams later sued Romanowski for battery, intentional infliction of emotional distress and negligence. Romanowski requested that the Oakland Raiders defend and indemnify him. Plaintiff Oakland Raiders seeks declaratory relief in the form of a judicial determination that the Oakland Raiders have no duty to defend or indemnify Defendant Romanowski.

Plaintiff: Oakland Raiders
Defendant: William Romanowski
Case Number: 3:2004cv05402
Filed: December 21, 2004
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 10, 2005 8
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice by Oakland Raiders (McKinney, Patrick) (Filed on 2/10/2005)
January 12, 2005 7
CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Oakland Raiders.. (McKinney, Patrick) (Filed on 1/12/2005)
December 29, 2004 6
CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF RE: Consent to Proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Form due by JAN. 12, 2005. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2004)
December 22, 2004 5
Summons Issued as to William Romanowski. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2004) Additional attachment(s) added on 12/27/2004 (gba, COURT STAFF).
December 21, 2004 4
NOTICE of Related Case C04-1920 SC filed by The Oakland Raiders (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2004) Additional attachment(s) added on 12/27/2004 (gba, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oakland Raiders v. Romanowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oakland Raiders
Represented By: Patrick R. McKinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Romanowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?