Boyd et al v. City and County of San Francisco et al

Case Number: 3:2004cv05459
Filed: December 27, 2004
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Referring Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 31, 2008 480 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO APPEAR FOR EXAMINATION re 435 . Judgment Debtor Exam for Marylon Boyd set for 11/17/2008 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 10/31/08. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2008)
October 27, 2008 476 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte denying 471 Motion for Sanctions (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2008)
September 10, 2008 458 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application 439 for Order Staying and Enjoining Enforcement of Judgment of Costs Pending Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion to Stay and/or Enjoin Enforcement of Judgment of Costs Pending Appeal, and ORDERING Plaintiffs Not to Act so as to Thwart Any Future Collection Proceedings. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boyd et al v. City and County of San Francisco et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?