July 1, 2016 |
Filing
253
ORDER approving 252 MOTION to Unseal Document 234 Document E-Filed Under Seal, filed by Paul Infantino, Allan Ross, Jorge Isla, Suzanne Andrade, Dean Alexander, Ely Ines, Jarrett Henderson, Joey Rodriguez, Jesse Padilla, Bern ard Mendoza, 246 Order, [232 filed by Paul Infantino, Allan Ross, Jorge Isla, Suzanne Andrade, Dean Alexander, Ely Ines, Jarrett Henderson, Joey Rodriguez, Jesse Padilla, Bernard Mendoza. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/1/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2016)
|
June 15, 2016 |
Filing
247
ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 185 Final Approval and Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorney's Fees (REDACTED/PUBLIC VERSION). (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2016)
|
May 6, 2016 |
Filing
240
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 239 STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/6/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2016)
|
May 3, 2016 |
Filing
238
ORDER re 236 , 237 Meet and Confer. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/3/2016. (emclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2016)
|
April 25, 2016 |
Filing
230
CORRECTIVE NOTICE. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/25/2016. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2016)
|
April 20, 2016 |
Filing
221
ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 216 Plaintiffs' Motion to Shorten Time. (emclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2016)
|
April 19, 2016 |
Filing
217
ORDER re 216 Plaintiffs' Motion to Shorten Time. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/19/2016. (emclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2016)
|
April 12, 2016 |
Filing
215
ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Conditionally Granting 204 Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement; and Deferring Ruling on 185 Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs and Class Representative Service Payments. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2016)
|
December 4, 2015 |
Filing
193
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 192 JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER DIRECTING RE-NOTICE OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AND RE-SETTING DEADLINES FOR THE FILING OF CLAIM FORMS, AND CHALLENGES, OBJECTIONS filed by Paul Infantino, Allan Ross, Jorge Isla, Suzanne Andrade, Dean Alexander, Ely Ines, Jarrett Henderson, Joey Rodriguez, Jesse Padilla, Bernard Mendoza. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/4/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2015)
|
October 22, 2015 |
Filing
179
ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen finding as moot 119 Plaintiffs' Motion for Settlement; finding as moot 134 Plaintiffs' Motion for Settlement; and granting 148 Plaintiffs' Motion for Settlement (emclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2015)
|
October 15, 2015 |
Filing
177
STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/15/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2015)
|
September 29, 2015 |
Filing
175
ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying 135 Zohrabians's Motion to Intervene and for Appointment; and Granting 172 Zohrabians's Motion for Leave to File Reply. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2015)
|
August 24, 2015 |
Filing
136
ORDER re Supplemental Briefing re 34 Joint Submission; and 35 Ex Parte Motion to Intervene and for Appointment. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on August 24, 2015. (emclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2015)
|
August 3, 2015 |
Filing
128
ORDER Re Further Supplemental Briefing Re Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/3/2015. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2015)
|
July 14, 2015 |
Filing
125
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 123 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING filed by Paul Infantino, etc. Supplemental briefing due 7/22/15. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/14/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2015)
|
July 10, 2015 |
Filing
122
ORDER re Supplemental Briefing re 119 Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval. The joint supplemental brief, including any or all supporting evidence, shall be filed within one week of the date of this order. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/10/2015. (emclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2015)
|
June 26, 2015 |
Filing
117
ORDER re 116 Notice (Other) filed by FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., Motions terminated: 108 MOTION for More Definite Statement to Clarify Class Definition filed by FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., Fedex Ground Package System Inc., 111 MOTION Limit Plaintiffs' Recoverable Damages filed by FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., Fedex Ground Package System Inc., 113 MOTION to Exclude Settlement Deductions from Damages filed by FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., Fedex Ground Package System Inc. Case Management Statement due by 8/13/2015. Further Case Management Conference reset for 8/20/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/26/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2015)
|
May 13, 2015 |
Filing
107
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 106 JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE INITIAL MOTIONS AND OPPOSITIONS) filed by FedEx Ground Package System, Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/13/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2015)
|
April 27, 2015 |
Filing
105
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL re 103 Stipulation, filed by Paul Infantino, Allan Ross, Jorge Isla, Suzanne Andrade, Dean Alexander, Ely Ines, Jarrett Henderson, Joey Rodriguez, Jesse Padilla, Bernard Mendoza. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/27/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2015)
|
April 24, 2015 |
Filing
104
ORDER re 103 Stipulation of dismissal as to Plaintiff Dean Wiley only. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/24/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2015)
|
April 6, 2015 |
Filing
102
ORDER re 101 Notice of briefing schedule of early MSJ filed by FedEx Ground Package System, Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/6/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2015)
|
October 16, 2012 |
Filing
61
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 60 OF DISMISSAL OF PLAINTIFFS' CLAIMS UNDER THE FAMILY MEDICAL LEAVE ACT filed by Paul Infantino, Allan Ross, Jorge Isla, Suzanne Andrade, Dean Alexander, Ely Ines, Jarrett Henderson, Joey Rodriguez, Jesse Padilla, Bernard Mendoza. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/16/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2012)
|
May 16, 2012 |
Filing
56
STIPULATION AND ORDER RESETTING CMC FROM 5/21/12 TO 5/25/12 AT 10:30 A.M. re 55 Proposed Order, filed by Paul Infantino. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/25/2012 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/16/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2012)
|