Henderson et al v. San Francisco Sheriff's Department et al

Case Number: 3:2005cv00234
Filed: January 14, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Vaughn R. Walker
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 16, 2010 462 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. The clerk is directed to terminate all motions and close the file. (vrwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2010)
July 13, 2009 455 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING partial judgment on all of plaintiff Janel Gotta's claims. Counsel for defendants shall prepare and submit a proposed form of judgment. (vrwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2009) .
May 13, 2009 451 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why 445 DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR ENTRY OF SEPARATE JUDGMENT AGAINST PLAINTIFF JANEL GOTTA [RULE 54(B)] should not be granted (vrwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2009)
March 16, 2009 443 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Defendants to Respond (vrwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2009)
March 13, 2009 442 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSEShow Cause Response due by 4/13/2009.(vrwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2009)
October 27, 2008 434 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER EXCUSING DEFENDANTS FROM ATTENDING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE re 433 Proposed Order filed by City and County of San Francisco. Signed by Judge James Larson on 10/27/08. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2008)
October 6, 2008 431 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF FURTHER SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER. Signed by Judge James Larson on 10/6/08. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2008)
September 17, 2008 429 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER WITHDRAWING ORDER STYLED AS JUDGMENT re 422 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings, Judgment, Terminate Motions. Signed by Judge William A. Fletcher on 9/17/08. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2008)
February 7, 2008 329 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Allowing defendant's equipment for use in trial through security. Signed by Judge William A. Fletcher on 2/7/08. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2008)
February 6, 2008 325 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REVISING JURY INSTRUCTIONS. Signed by Judge William A. Fletcher on 2/6/08. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henderson et al v. San Francisco Sheriff's Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?