Citizens for Better Forestry et al v. United States Department of Agriculture et al

Case Number: 3:2005cv01144
Filed: March 21, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:4321 Review of Agency Action-Environment
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 11, 2008 127 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting in part and denying in part 112 Motion for Attorney Fees (pjhlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2008)
October 29, 2008 125 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES, COSTS, AND EXPENSES re 124 Stipulation filed by Citizens for Better Forestry. Motion Hearing set for 11/12/2008 09:00 AM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 10/29/08. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2008)
September 25, 2008 119 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME re 117 Stipulation filed by United States Forest Service, United States Department of Agriculture. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 9/25/08. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Citizens for Better Forestry et al v. United States Department of Agriculture et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?