Mevorah v. Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc.

Case Number: 3:2005cv01175
Filed: March 22, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Marilyn H. Patel
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Labor/Mgmnt. Relations
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 6, 2011 133 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TERMINATING MDL ACTION (For C06-1770 EMC,C06-1770 EMC, C06-4481 EMC, C05-1175 EMC, C05-2722 EMC, and C06-1991 EMC ONLY). Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/6/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2011)
November 7, 2011 131 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 11/23/2011. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/7/2011. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2011)
January 4, 2011 128 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING Nationwide FLSA claims pursuant to settlement in MDL 06-1770 MHP; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 1/3/2011. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2011)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mevorah v. Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?