Gutierrez v. Kane et al

Case Number: 3:2005cv01537
Filed: April 14, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 8, 2011 46 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: The petition for writ of habeas corpus is denied. Judgment is entered accordingly. (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2011) Modified on 3/8/2011 (ys, COURT STAFF).
January 24, 2011 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: FURTHER BRIEFING (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2011)
November 1, 2010 36 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, SETTING A BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 11/01/10. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2010)
September 14, 2010 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gutierrez v. Kane et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?