Darensburg et al v. Metropolitan Transportation Commission

Case Number: 3:2005cv01597
Filed: April 19, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 4, 2009 460 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting 434 Motion ; finding as moot 441 Motion for Taxation of Costs. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2009)
July 10, 2009 457 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING BRIEFING AND VACATING HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR REVIEW OF TAXATION OF COSTS AND DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO REVIEW CLERK'S TAXATION OF COSTS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on July 10, 2009. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2009)
July 7, 2009 453 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: DEFENDANT'S OBJECTIONS TO EVIDENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on July 7, 2009. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2009)
April 14, 2009 405 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte denying 394 Motion for Extension of Time to File (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2009)
April 8, 2009 399 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: Stipulation Regarding Extention of Time 397 . Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 4/8/09. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2009)
April 7, 2009 398 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER EXTENDING TIME to File Motions for Attorneys' Fees to 5/1/2009.Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 4/7/09. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2009)
March 27, 2009 392 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on March 27, 2009. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2009)
September 29, 2008 339 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 338 Proposed Order filed by Metropolitan Transportation Commission. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on September 29, 2008. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2008)
September 19, 2008 330 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOLLOWING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on September 19, 2008. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2008)
September 15, 2008 326 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY; OVERRULING DEFENDANT'S OBJECTIONS TO EVIDENCE SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFFS AND REGARDING DEFENDANT'S OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS' OTHER EVIDENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D.Laporte on September 15, 2008. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Darensburg et al v. Metropolitan Transportation Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?