Ko v. City of Hayward, California

Case Number: 3:2005cv01686
Filed: April 25, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 29, 2009 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 64 Amended MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by City of Hayward, California. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 9/29/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2009)
September 16, 2009 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE Supplemental Briefing by Defendant. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 09/16/09. (mejlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2009)
September 15, 2009 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER for Supplemental Reply Brief by Defendant (due 9/18/2009). Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 09/15/2009. (mejlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2009)
September 14, 2009 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE Plaintiff's Failure to File Supplemental Response Brief. Plaintiff's Show Cause Response due by 9/15/2009.Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 09/14/2009. (mejlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2009)
August 26, 2009 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR DEFENDANT TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY re 77 Brief, filed by City of Hayward, California. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 8/26/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2009)
July 7, 2009 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR DEFENDANTS TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPIES re 66 Amended MOTION for Summary Judgment CITY OF HAYWARD'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACT #16 filed by City of Hayward, California, 67 Declaration in Support filed by City of Hayw ard, California, 65 Amended MOTION for Summary Judgment JOINT STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS filed by City of Hayward, California, 68 Declaration in Support filed by City of Hayward, California, 64 Amended MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by City of Hayward, California. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 7/7/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2009)
June 19, 2009 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PARTIES' REQUEST TO RESCHEDULE HEARING; SUMMARY JUDGMENT HEARING SHALL TAKE PLACE ON 7/30/09 re 62 Status Report filed by City of Hayward, California. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 6/19/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2009)
May 19, 2009 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR PARTIES TO FILE A JOINT STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS re 51 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by City of Hayward, California. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 5/19/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2009)
April 24, 2009 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING DISCOVERY COMPLIANCE HEARING; ORDER CONTINUING CERTAIN PRETRIAL AND TRIAL DATES. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 4/24/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2009)
March 4, 2009 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING COMPLIANCE HEARING re 41 Order. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/4/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2009)
February 23, 2009 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER COMPELLING DOCUMENT PRODUCTION re 38 Notice (Other) filed by City of Hayward, California. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 2/23/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2009)
January 23, 2009 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY HEARING. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/23/09. (mejlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ko v. City of Hayward, California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?