Azam v. Contra Costa County et al

Case Number: 3:2005cv01858
Filed: May 6, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Marilyn H. Patel
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 12, 2009 132 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of M. Johnson against Zameer Riaz Azam (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2009)
February 17, 2009 120 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 117 Stipulation filed by Zameer Riaz Azam, WRIT of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum issued. Signed by Judge Marilyn H. Patel on 2/17/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2009)
February 6, 2009 106 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SCHEDULING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE for February 11, 2009 at 9:00a.m. before Judge Bernard Zimmerman. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 2/6/09. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2009)
February 5, 2009 103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND WRIT of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum issued; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 1/5/2009. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2009)
January 16, 2009 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL 46 ; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 1/15/2009. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2009)
January 14, 2009 56 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER: Pretrial submissions to be filed by 1/26/2009; Objections to be filed by 2/2/2009; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 1/13/2009. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2009)
January 6, 2009 53 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time to 1/16/09 to serve rebuttal report; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 1/5/2009. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Azam v. Contra Costa County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?