St. Paul Reinsurance Company Limited London v. The Fort Miller Group, Inc. et al

Case Number: 3:2005cv01912
Filed: May 9, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Bernard Zimmerman
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 13, 2010 427 Opinion or Order of the Court SECOND AMENDED ORDER FOR THE COURT'S REGISTRY TO RELEASE FUNDS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 8/13/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2010)
August 10, 2010 425 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER FOR THE COURT'S REGISTRY TO RELEASE FUNDS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 8/10/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2010)
August 9, 2010 423 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 8/9/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2010)
July 28, 2010 420 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING REQUEST TO APPEAR BY PHONE AT MOTION HEARING. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 7/28/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2010)
July 1, 2010 415 Opinion or Order of the Court BRIEFING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 7/1/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2010)
July 8, 2009 407 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman denying as moot 395 Motion for Protective Order (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2009)
May 18, 2009 390 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 5/18/2009. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2009)
April 27, 2009 386 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AMENDING JUDGMENT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 4/24/2009. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2009)
April 1, 2009 372 Opinion or Order of the Court BRIEFING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 4/1/2009. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2009)
March 16, 2009 355 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 3/16/2009. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2009)
March 11, 2009 352 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ENTERING ERRATA SHEET INTO THE RECORD. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 3/11/2009. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2009)
February 19, 2009 332 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (bzlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2009)
February 4, 2009 318 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Plaintiff's motion to exclude Expert testimony and for monetary santions.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 2/4/09. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2009)
January 14, 2009 277 Opinion or Order of the Court PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 1/14/2009. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2009)
January 7, 2009 249 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING REQUEST FOR TELEPHONE CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 1/7/2009. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2009)
January 5, 2009 246 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman denying 236 Motion to Shorten Time (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2009)
December 22, 2008 234 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman denying 207 Motion for Summary Judgment (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2008)
December 16, 2008 232 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE RE HEARING. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 12/16/2008. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2008)
December 3, 2008 218 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER - Settlement Conference set for 1/9/2009 01:30 PM. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 12/3/08. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2008)
November 5, 2008 183 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman vacating 163 Motion to Quash (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2008)
October 30, 2008 175 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER STAYING COUNTERCLAIM AND DENYING REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS. (Corrects tentative date of jury trial). Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 10/30/2008. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2008)
October 29, 2008 172 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING CASE FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCEMagistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 10/29/2008. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2008)
October 20, 2008 166 Opinion or Order of the Court Briefing ORDER re Non-Party Witness Squire, Sanders & Dempsey's Motion to Quash Subpoenas and Production of Documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 10/20/08.(sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2008)
October 7, 2008 159 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 10/7/2008. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2008)
September 25, 2008 156 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF CERTIFICATION DEADLINE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 9/25/2008. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2008)
September 18, 2008 153 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR FURTHER BRIEFING. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 9/18/2008. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: St. Paul Reinsurance Company Limited London v. The Fort Miller Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?