Smajlaj v. Brocade Communications Systems, Inc. et al

Case Number: 3:2005cv02042
Filed: May 19, 2005
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 5, 2010 522 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to appear telephonically regarding motion. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/5/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2010)
August 4, 2010 520 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER for telephonic appearance. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/3/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2010)
October 5, 2009 510 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on October 5, 2009. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smajlaj v. Brocade Communications Systems, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?